Johnson et al v. Evangelical Lutheran Church in America, The et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin A. Johnson, Ronald A. Lundeen, Larry D. Cartford and Arthur F. Haimerl
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Church in America, The and Board of Pensions of the Evangelical Lutheran Church in America
Case Number: 0:2011cv00023
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Stearns
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant's Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Mark Johnson (Dkt. No. 188-1) 195 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives and Lead and Liaison Counsel 157 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/26/13. (GRR)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1.Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois's September 5, 2012 Order 168 is AFFIRMED. 2. Defendant's objections 180 are DENIED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/29/12. (GRR)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois dated March 9, 2012 128 . 2. ELCA'S Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint 76 is GRANTED. 3. Plaintiffs' claims in the Third Amended Complaint 69 against Defendant ELCA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/22/12. (GRR)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 34 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: 1. Counts One and Two against the Board REMAIN. 2. Count Three is DISMISSED as to both Defendants. 3. Pla intiffs have 30 days from the date of this Order to amend the SAC to add a claim for failure to disclose against the Board. 4. Plaintiffs' claims against ELCA are DISMISSED; however, the Court grants Plaintiffs 30 days from the date of this Order to amend the SAC to state a claim against ELCA. If no amendment is made within 30 days, the claims against ELCA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/22/11. (GRR)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS CO-LEAD & LIAISON COUNSEL 21 .(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/16/11. (GRR)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/06/11. (kll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Evangelical Lutheran Church in America, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin A. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: John S Chapman
Represented By: Scott W Carlson
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Jackson D Bigham
Represented By: Daniel R Karon
Represented By: Laura K Mummert
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Paul J Scarlato
Represented By: Brian M Sund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A. Lundeen
Represented By: Jackson D Bigham
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Scott W Carlson
Represented By: John S Chapman
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Daniel R Karon
Represented By: Laura K Mummert
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Paul J Scarlato
Represented By: Brian M Sund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Cartford
Represented By: Jackson D Bigham
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Scott W Carlson
Represented By: John S Chapman
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Daniel R Karon
Represented By: Laura K Mummert
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Paul J Scarlato
Represented By: Brian M Sund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur F. Haimerl
Represented By: Jackson D Bigham
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Scott W Carlson
Represented By: John S Chapman
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Daniel R Karon
Represented By: Laura K Mummert
Represented By: Brian D Penny
Represented By: Paul J Scarlato
Represented By: Brian M Sund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Church in America, The
Represented By: Brian T Benkstein
Represented By: Nicole A Diller
Represented By: Charles C Jackson
Represented By: Ruth S Marcott
Represented By: S Bradley Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Pensions of the Evangelical Lutheran Church in America
Represented By: Nicole A Diller
Represented By: Thomas S Fraser
Represented By: Charles C Jackson
Represented By: Nicole M Moen
Represented By: S Bradley Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?