Magalhaes et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Magalhaes and Joseph Magalhaes
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Pfizer Inc
Case Number: 0:2011cv00412
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 138 Report and Recommendation (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/21/14. (KMW)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1.The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel dated July 11, 2013 96 . 2.Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreements 47 is GRANTED. 3.Plaintiffs filed Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Facts (Federal Rule of Evidence 201) 107 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/26/13. (GRR)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANADUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS Sections I and II(A) and REJECTS Section II(B) of the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel dated August 2, 2012 64 . 2. This m atter is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and for a Report and Recommendation regarding whether H. Lee Thompson had actual or apparent authority or whether estoppel applies. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/11/13. Associated Cases: 0:07-md-01836-MJD-FLN et al.(GRR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magalhaes et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Represented By: Steven J Boranian
Represented By: Michael K Brown
Represented By: Joseph M Price
Represented By: Mildred Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Steven J Boranian
Represented By: Michael K Brown
Represented By: Joseph M Price
Represented By: Mildred Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Represented By: Scott A Smith
Represented By: Jason C Rose
Represented By: Bruce R Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Steven J Boranian
Represented By: Michael K Brown
Represented By: Joseph M Price
Represented By: Mildred Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Magalhaes
Represented By: H Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Magalhaes
Represented By: H Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?