Welk et al v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heather L. Welk, Susie B. Jones, William Bigelow, Christine Heinzman, Mark Heinzman, Sigmond Singramdoo, Troy Forte, Lynn M. Forte, David J. Roster, Charity Roster, Patrick Rucci, Gary G. Klingner, Rebecca A. Albers, Ian Patterson, James Willis Konobeck, Jr., Alison Konobeck, Amy B. Tibke, Dane A. Tibke, Tracy J. Miklas and Michelle L. Miklas
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Ally Financial, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Shapiro & Zielke, LLP, U.S. Bank National Association ND, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 0:2011cv02676
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER - Based on the foregoing, and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Attorney William B. Butler is HELD IN CONTEMPT for his failure to comply with the Court's August 12, 2013 order 157 . The Cou rt will defer a decision on the appropriate remedy for Butler's contempt until the Court is able to determine whether Butler makes a good-faith effort to pay his sanctions as a result of the suspension imposed under D. Minn. L.R. 83.6(b)(1). (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 1/21/14. (BJS)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER (Written Opinion) - Based on the foregoing, and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT plaintiff Ian Patterson's motion to alter or amend the judgment, for leave to amend the complaint, and to sever 143 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/10/12. (bjs) Modified on 9/10/2012 (kt).
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. With the exception of claims against defendant GMAC Mortgage, LLC, all claims against all defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ON THE MERITS. 2. Plaintiffs' motion to remand 92 is DENIED except as it pertains to claims against defendant GMAC Mortgage, LLC. 3. Pursuant to the Court's March 29, 2012 order 121 , attorney William Butler is ORDERED to pay into Court a sanction of $50,000. 4. Attorney William Butler is ORDERED to p ay defendants' attorneys fees as follows: a. On behalf of defendants U.S. Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association ND, attorney's fees of $5,746.70 to Dorsey & Whitney LLP. b. On behalf of defendant Shapiro & Zielke, LLP, atto rney's fees of $3,020 to Shapiro & Zielke, LLP. c. On behalf of defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, attorney's fees of $10,000 to Faegre Baker Daniels LLP. d. On behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, attorney's fees of $6,000 to Lindquist & Vennum PLLP. e. On behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, attorney's fees of $5,000 to Dykema Go ssett, LLP and Foley & Mansfield, PLLP. 5. The Court expressly determines, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), that there is no just reason for delay in entering a final judgment as to all claims against all parties, with the exception of the claims against defendant GMAC. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on August 8, 2012. (clg)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying 36 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 51 Motion to Dismiss/G eneral; granting 72 Motion for Sanctions; denying 92 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 109 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; denying AS MOOT 110 Motion for TRO; granting 111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Written Opinion). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 03/29/12. (bjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welk et al v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather L. Welk
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie B. Jones
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bigelow
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Heinzman
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Heinzman
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigmond Singramdoo
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Forte
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M. Forte
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Roster
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Roster
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Rucci
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary G. Klingner
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A. Albers
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Patterson
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Represented By: William B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Willis Konobeck, Jr.
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Konobeck
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy B. Tibke
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane A. Tibke
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy J. Miklas
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Miklas
Represented By: William B Butler
Represented By: Susanne M Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kirstin D Kanski
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: William P Wassweiler
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP, Inc.
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Brian L Vander Pol
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Zielke, LLP
Represented By: Amanda M Govze
Represented By: Kristine M Spiegelberg Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association ND
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Kirstin D Kanski
Represented By: William P Wassweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Trista M Roy
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?