Ventura v. Kyle Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jesse Ventura
Defendant: Chris Kyle
Case Number: 0:2012cv00472
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying 404 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 11/26/14. (KLL)
October 3, 2014 Filing 414 REPLY re 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
September 26, 2014 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
September 17, 2014 Filing 412 Response to Objection to Bill of Costss re 402 Bill of Costs, 411 Objection to Bill of Costs by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court)
September 11, 2014 Filing 411 OBJECTION to Bill of Costs re 402 Bill of Costs, by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER setting briefing schedule on 404 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/05/14. (KLL)
September 4, 2014 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Taya Kyle re 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial (Walker, Mary)
September 4, 2014 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taya Kyle re 407 Declaration in Support,,, Conventionally Filed Non Graphical/Textual Computer File (Audio) Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette (Walker, Mary)
September 4, 2014 Filing 407 Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of 406 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13, # 14 Exhibit(s) 14, # 15 Exhibit(s) 15, # 16 Exhibit(s) 16, # 17 Exhibit(s) 17, # 18 Exhibit(s) 18, # 19 Exhibit(s) 19, # 20 Exhibit(s) 20, # 21 Exhibit(s) 21, # 22 Exhibit(s) 22, # 23 Exhibit(s) 23, # 24 Exhibit(s) 24, # 25 Exhibit(s) 25, # 26 Exhibit(s) 26, # 27 Exhibit(s) 27, # 28 Exhibit(s) 28, # 29 Exhibit(s) 29, # 30 Exhibit(s) 30, # 31 Exhibit(s) 31, # 32 Exhibit(s) 32, # 33 Placeholder for Exhibit 33)(Walker, Mary)CONVENTIONAL FILING RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 9/4/14 LGL Modified on 9/5/2014 (LGL).
September 4, 2014 Filing 406 MEMORANDUM in Support re 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
September 4, 2014 Filing 405 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial : at date and time to be determined. (Walker, Mary)
September 4, 2014 Filing 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or a New Trial by Taya Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER that 401 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/28/14. (KLL)
August 28, 2014 Filing 402 BILL OF COSTS by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Bradley Olsen in Support of Plaintiff's Bill of Costs for Taxation Against Defendant Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-H to Affidavit of David Bradley Olsen in Support of Plaintiff's Bill of Costs for Taxation Against Defendant Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle)(Olsen, David)
August 28, 2014 Filing 401 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Webber, Charles)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER that the automatic stay of execution on the judgment in this case shall be extended through August 29, 2014 re 399 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/20/14. (KLL)
August 18, 2014 Filing 399 STIPULATION Regarding Stay of Execution on Judgment by Taya Kyle. Jointly Signed by Jesse Ventura. (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Webber, Charles) Modified text on 8/20/2014 (LPH).
August 18, 2014 Filing 398 RESPONSE re 395 Brief Defendant's Bench Brief in Response to Ventura's Brief Regarding Specific Acts of Dishonesty Committed by Chris Kyle filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 18, 2014 Filing 397 RESPONSE re 393 Brief Defendant's Bench Brief in Response to Ventura's Brief Regarding the Admissibility of Evidence of the Estate's Liability Insurance filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 18, 2014 Filing 396 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE - RESPONSE re 393 Brief Defendant's Bench Brief in Response to Ventura's Brief Regarding the Admissibility of Evidence of the Estate's Liability Insurance filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John) Modified text on 8/18/2014 (MMP).
August 15, 2014 Filing 395 BRIEF Plaintiff Jesse Ventura's Bench Brief in Opposition to Any Objection Made at Trial to Cross-Examination of the Estate's Witnesses Regarding Specific Acts of Dishonesty Committed by Chris Kyle. (Olsen, David)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER that the parties shall file forthwith all documents delivered to the Court during trial that have not yet been filed. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/15/14. (KLL)
August 14, 2014 Filing 393 BRIEF Plaintiff Jesse Ventura's Bench Brief in Support of the Admissibility of Evidence of the Estate's Liability Insurance. (Olsen, David)
August 7, 2014 Filing 392 JUDGMENT in favor of Jesse Ventura against Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal)(LPH)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER adopting jury verdicts. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/07/14. (KLL)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER denying 388 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/01/14. (KLL) cc: Davis on 8/1/2014 (LPH).
July 31, 2014 Filing 389 EXHIBIT(s) re 388 MOTION to Intervene filed by Leslie Davis. (TSS) Document QC'd on 8/6/2014 (JGK).
July 31, 2014 Filing 388 MOTION to Intervene by Leslie Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(TSS) Document QC'd on 8/6/2014 (JGK).
July 31, 2014 Filing 387 Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List. (KLL)
July 31, 2014 Filing 386 Defendant's Trial Exhibit List. (KLL)
July 29, 2014 Filing 385 REDACTED JURY VERDICT. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Original Jury Verdict)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 384 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 10. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 383 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #9. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 382 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 9. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 381 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #8. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 380 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 8. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 379 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 378 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 7. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 377 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 6. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 376 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 5. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 375 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 4. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 374 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #3. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 373 REDACTED JURY QUESTION(s) No. 3. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Original Jury Question)(TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 372 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #2. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 371 JURY QUESTION No. 2. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 370 ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #1. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 369 JURY QUESTION No. 1. (TSS)
July 29, 2014 Filing 368 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury deliberations continued on 7/29/2014. Jury Trial completed on 7/29/2014. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 28, 2014 Filing 367 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/28/2014. Jury deliberations continued. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 25, 2014 Filing 366 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/25/2014. Jury deliberations continued. (KAT)
July 24, 2014 Filing 365 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/24/2014. Jury deliberations continued. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 23, 2014 Filing 364 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/23/2014. Jury deliberations continue. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 22, 2014 Filing 363 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/22/2014. Closing arguments. Jury received case. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 22, 2014 Filing 362 FINAL Jury Instructions. (KLL)
July 21, 2014 Filing 361 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Charge Conference held on 7/21/2014. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 21, 2014 Filing 360 REPLY re 357 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER denying 347 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/21/14. (KLL)
July 18, 2014 Filing 358 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
July 18, 2014 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
July 18, 2014 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance for Holly A. Miller by John P Borger on behalf of Taya Kyle. (Borger, John) Modified text on 7/18/2014 (MMP).
July 18, 2014 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance for Amy Gernon by John P Borger on behalf of Taya Kyle. (Borger, John) Modified text on 7/18/2014 (MMP).
July 18, 2014 Filing 354 Defendant's Bench Brief Regarding a Proposed Curative Jury Instruction on Retraction by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John) Modified text on 7/18/2014 (MMP).
July 18, 2014 FILED IN ERROR: WRONG CASE. Notice to Attorney: Defendants Stryker Corp., Stryker Sales Corporation and Stryker Ireland Limited have been added to this case pursuant to 342 Amended Pretrial Order No. 10 in 13-md-2441 DWF/FLN and the Master Short Form Complaint. (kt) Modified on 7/18/2014 (kt).
July 18, 2014 Filing 353 REVISED Proposed Special Verdict Form by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John) Modified on 7/18/2014 (kt).
July 18, 2014 Filing 352 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/18/2014. Plaintiff rests. Defendant rests. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KLL)
July 18, 2014 Filing 351 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Conference scheduled for 7/18/2014 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (KLL)
July 17, 2014 Filing 350 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/17/2014. Defendants witnesses: Jim DeFelice, Sharyn Rosenblum, Peter Hubbard, video deposition testimony of JohnJones, Jr. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KLL)
July 17, 2014 Filing 349 MEMORANDUM in Support re 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
July 17, 2014 Filing 348 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law : at date and time to be determined. (Borger, John)
July 17, 2014 Filing 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions made on July 9, 2014 to allow counsel to question witness. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 007/16/14. (KLL)
July 16, 2014 Filing 345 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/16/2014. Defendants witnesses: video deposition testimony of Robert Gassoff, Jeremiah Dinnell, Debbie Job, GuyBudinscak, video deposition testimony of Kevin Lacz. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KLL)
July 15, 2014 Filing 344 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/15/2014. Defendant's Witnesses: Debbie Lee, Rosemary deShazo, John Kelly, III, video deposition testimony of AndrewPaul, video deposition testimony of Robert Gassoff. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KLL)
July 14, 2014 Filing 343 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/15/2014. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Jesse Ventura, Teresa Janos Ventura. Defendant's Witnesses: Laura deShazo, Debbie Lee. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KLL) Modified docket text on 7/15/2014 (TSS).
July 11, 2014 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/11/2014. Plaintiff Witnesses: Robert Leonard, Tyrel Ventura, Jesse Ventura. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 10, 2014 Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/10/2014. Plaintiff Witnesses: Video Deposition of Christopher Kyle, Bill DeWitt, Charlene Dewitt. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 9, 2014 Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Trial continued on 7/9/2014. Plaintiff witnesses: Taya Kyle, Video Deposition of Christopher Kyle. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 8, 2014 Filing 339 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Jury Selection held on 7/8/2014, Jury Trial begun on 7/8/2014. Opening Statements. Plaintiff witness: Taya Kyle. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 3, 2014 Filing 338 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/3/2014. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
July 3, 2014 Filing 337 Exhibit List -- PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
July 2, 2014 Filing 336 Exhibit List Defendant's First Amended Trial Exhibit List by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
July 1, 2014 Filing 335 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (KAT)
June 30, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F Webber on behalf of Taya Kyle. (Webber, Charles)
June 25, 2014 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on June 13, 2014 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (62 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 7/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (CRB)
June 25, 2014 Filing 332 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion in Limine; granting 288 Motion in Limine; denying 290 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 292 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 294 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 06/16/14. (KLL)
June 13, 2014 Filing 330 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2014 re 288 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Chris Kyle's Character filed by Taya Kyle, 290 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Plaintiff's Reputation filed by Taya Kyle, 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing filed by Jesse Ventura, 294 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Mental Distress" and "Emotional Distress" filed by Taya Kyle, 292 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication filed by Taya Kyle. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
June 9, 2014 Filing 329 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: The continued Hearing on Motions in Limine will be held on Friday, June 13, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. in St. Paul Courtroom 7A. (KAT)
June 4, 2014 Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: The Hearing on Motions in Limine is CONTINUED. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KAT)
June 2, 2014 Filing 327 Exhibit List AND Witness List (Second Amended) by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
June 2, 2014 Filing 326 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Taya Kyle . (Borger, John)
June 2, 2014 Filing 325 RESPONSE re 311 Objection Defendant's Amended Responses to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibit List filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER that a hearing on the parties' MOTIONS in Limine is set for Wednesday, June 4, 2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) and the Trial is rescheduled to Tuesday, July 8, 2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle.. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/23/14. (KLL)
May 13, 2014 Filing 323 DECLARATION of Taya Kyle by Taya Kyle in Support of Defendant's Memorandum Opposing Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Witnesses to Events at McP's. (Borger, John)
May 12, 2014 Filing 322 RESPONSE re 311 Objection (Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibit List) filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 12, 2014 Filing 321 RESPONSE re 312 Objection (Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Objections and Counter-Designations to Defendant's Designated Deposition Testimony) filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 12, 2014 Filing 320 RESPONSE re 303 Objection of Defendant to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 12, 2014 Filing 319 RESPONSE re 302 Objection to Defendant's Written Objections - Deposition Designations filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 6, 2014 Filing 318 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes held on 5/6/2014. No settlement reached. (MMP)
May 5, 2014 Filing 317 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 294 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Mental Distress" and "Emotional Distress" filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 316 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 292 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 315 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 292 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 314 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 290 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Plaintiff's Reputation filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 313 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 288 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Chris Kyle's Character filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 312 OBJECTION re 283 List of Deposition Testimony and Counter-Designations filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 311 OBJECTION re 285 Exhibit List of Defendant filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 310 TRIAL BRIEF Reply by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 309 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Circumstances of Chris Kyle's Death filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Testimony of David Schultz filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 307 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Witnesses to Events at McP's filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Filed in Error-Declaration of Taya Kyle, # 2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John) Modified text on 5/13/2014 (JZ).
May 5, 2014 Filing 306 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Evidence of Chris Kyle's Military Heroism filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Preclude Defendant Taya Kyle From Offering Evidence at Trial Regarding Taxes Paid or Payable on Revenues Received From American Sniper or Other Sources filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 304 REPLY re 275 Trial Brief filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 303 OBJECTION re 272 Exhibit List, 301 Exhibit List Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 302 OBJECTION re 274 List of Deposition Testimony Defendant's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Designations filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 25, 2014 Filing 301 Exhibit List AND Witness List (First Amended) by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
April 22, 2014 Filing 300 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Jesse Ventura re 279 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 299 TRIAL BRIEF by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 298 EXHIBIT re 293 Memorandum in Support of Motion, in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication by Taya Kyle filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 297 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 296 Proposed Special Verdict Form by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM in Support re 294 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Mental Distress" and "Emotional Distress" filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order)(Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 294 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of "Mental Distress" and "Emotional Distress" by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM in Support re 292 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order)(Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 292 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Jesse Ventura's Medication by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM in Support re 290 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Plaintiff's Reputation filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order)(Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 290 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Plaintiff's Reputation by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM in Support re 288 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Chris Kyle's Character filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order)(Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 288 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence Not Properly Admissible With Regard to Chris Kyle's Character by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 287 Proposed Voir Dire by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 286 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 285 Exhibit List by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 284 Witness List by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 283 List of Deposition Testimony submitted by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 282 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in SUPPORT OF 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Testimony of Untimely Disclosed Witnesses filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H)(Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM in Support re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Evidence of Specific Instances of Conduct to Prove Chris Kyle's Character for Truthfulness filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-(2) Exhibit(s))(Olsen, David) Modified on 4/22/2014 (AKL).
April 21, 2014 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM in Support re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Testimony of Untimely Disclosed Witnesses filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM in Support re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Circumstances of Chris Kyle's Death filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-(1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David) Modified on 4/22/2014 (AKL).
April 21, 2014 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM in Support re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Exclude David A. Schultz from Testifying as an Expert Witness for the Defense and to Confirm the Exclusion of Robert G. Meekins as a Defense Expert filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM in Support re 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing to Preclude Defendant Taya Kyle from Offering Evidence at Trial Regarding Taxes Paid or Payable on Revenues Received from American Sniper or Other Sources filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 276 MOTION in Limine and Notice of Hearing by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 275 TRIAL BRIEF by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 4/22/14LGL Modified on 4/22/2014 (LGL).
April 21, 2014 Filing 274 List of Deposition Testimony Designation submitted by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 273 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 272 Exhibit List and Witness List by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 271 Proposed Voir Dire by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
April 21, 2014 Filing 270 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying 180 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/19/14. (KLL)
March 18, 2014 Filing 268 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement Conference: 266 257 252 Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2014 reset for 5/6/2014 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. All parties must appear in person. Confidential settlement letters due in Chambers by 5/1/2014.(JEP)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER that a jury trial will commence on Monday, June 30, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7A, in St. Paul, Minnesota and schedule for submission of trial materials. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/18/14. (KLL)
February 27, 2014 Filing 266 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement Conference: 257 252 Settlement Conference set for 4/25/2014 09:30 AM reset for 4/23/2014 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. All parties must appear in person. Confidential settlement letters due in Chambers by 4/18/2014. (JEP)
February 27, 2014 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on September 24, 2013 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 3/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (CRB)
February 27, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
February 11, 2014 Filing 263 CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 262 Motions Hearing held on January 29, 2014 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (35 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 3/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (CRB)
February 7, 2014 Filing 262 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on January 29, 2014 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (35 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (CRB) Modified on 2/11/2014 (kt).
February 7, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
January 29, 2014 Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2014 re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Taya Kyle. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
January 27, 2014 Filing 259 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Leslie Davis. (lmb)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 1/30/14 LGL Modified on 1/30/2014 (LGL).
January 23, 2014 Filing 258 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: All parties must appear in person for the settlement conference on 4/25/2014 before Magistrate Judge Keyes. (JEP)
January 23, 2014 Filing 257 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement Conference: 252 Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2014 reset for 4/25/2014 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Confidential settlement letters due in chambers 4/22/2014.(JEP)
January 16, 2014 Filing 256 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Taya Kyle . (Borger, John)
January 15, 2014 Filing 255 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jesse Ventura to Hon. Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Olsen, David)
January 15, 2014 Filing 254 Declaration of John P. Borger in Support of 253 Reply filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 13, # 2 Exhibit(s) 14, # 3 Exhibit(s) 15)(Borger, John)
January 15, 2014 Filing 253 REPLY re 234 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Second) filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2014 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 01/15/2014. (MMP)
January 10, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR TRIAL BEFORE JUDGE KYLE, MAY 1, 2014. (KAT)
January 8, 2014 Filing 250 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jesse Ventura re 249 Exhibit, 238 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (serving via U.S. Mail the UNREDACTED Plaintiff Jesse Ventura's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment, and EXHIBIT KK to the Affidavit of David Bradley Olsen in Support of Motion in Opposition to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment) (Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 249 EXHIBIT re 246 Exhibit, 242 Exhibit, 244 Exhibit, 243 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 247 Exhibit, 245 Exhibit, 248 Exhibit, GG (Exs. GG-MM of Exhibits A-MM) filed by Jesse Ventura. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 1/9/14. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit HH, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit II, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit JJ, # 4 Placeholder for Exhibit KK, # 5 Placeholder for Exhibit LL, # 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit MM)(Bisanz, John) Modified on 1/13/2014 (akl).
January 8, 2014 Filing 248 EXHIBIT re 243 Exhibit, 246 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 247 Exhibit, 245 Exhibit, 242 Exhibit, 244 Exhibit DD (Exs. DD-FF of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) EE, # 2 Exhibit(s) FF)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 247 EXHIBIT re 243 Exhibit, 246 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 245 Exhibit, 242 Exhibit, 244 Exhibit AA (Exs. AA-CC of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) BB, # 2 Exhibit(s) CC)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 246 EXHIBIT re 243 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 245 Exhibit, 242 Exhibit, 244 Exhibit Y (Exs. Y-Z of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Z)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 245 EXHIBIT re 242 Exhibit, 244 Exhibit, 243 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Exhibit Q (Exs. Q-X of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit R, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit S, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit T, # 4 Placeholder for Exhibit U, # 5 Placeholder for Exhibit V, # 6 Placeholder for Exhibit W, # 7 Placeholder for Exhibit X)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 244 EXHIBIT re 243 Exhibit, 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 242 Exhibit, N (Exs. N-P of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) O, # 2 Exhibit(s) P)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 243 EXHIBIT re 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 242 Exhibit, J (Exs. J-M of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) K, # 2 Exhibit(s) L, # 3 Exhibit(s) M)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 242 EXHIBIT re 241 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion , Exhibit D (Exs. D-I of Exhibits A-MM) by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E, # 2 Exhibit(s) F, # 3 Exhibit(s) G, # 4 Exhibit(s) H, # 5 Exhibit(s) I)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 241 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Exhibits A-C (of A-MM) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 240 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Leonard in OPPOSITION TO 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 239 AFFIDAVIT of Wayne Robertson in OPPOSITION TO 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
January 8, 2014 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second) filed by Jesse Ventura. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 1/9/14. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Plaintiff's UNREDACTED Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John) Modified on 1/13/2014 (akl).
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying 222 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on December 23, 2013. (ALT)
December 18, 2013 Filing 236 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taya Kyle of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Document (Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of Defendan'ts Second Motion for Summary Judgment) (Borger, John)
December 18, 2013 Filing 235 Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of 234 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-41, # 14 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-49, # 15 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-50, # 16 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-54, # 17 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-55, # 18 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-56, # 19 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-72, # 20 Exhibit(s) DEP. EX-75)(Borger, John)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/18/13 LGL Modified on 12/20/2013 (LGL).
December 18, 2013 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Support re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying 223 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/9/13. (KLL)
December 2, 2013 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 222 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 219 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders, Order Regarding Forensic Expert Witness Robert G. Meekins filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12-cv-472 RHK/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/27/13. (jam)
November 27, 2013 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taya Kyle of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Document (Borger, John)
November 27, 2013 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Claire H. Ouellette by Taya Kyle Attaching Corrected Sealed and Redacted Transcript. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Borger, John)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 11/27/13 LGL Modified on 11/27/2013 (LGL).
November 26, 2013 Filing 228 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jesse Ventura re 227 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene (Bisanz, John)
November 26, 2013 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 223 MOTION to Intervene of Leslie Davis filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12-cv-472 RHK/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/26/13. (jam)
November 19, 2013 Filing 225 EXHIBIT LIST filed by Leslie Davis (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(MMP) Modified text on 11/20/2013 (MMP). CONVENTIONAL FILING RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 11/20/13 LGL Modified on 11/20/2013 (LGL). DOCUMENT QC'D ON 11/22/13 LGL Modified on 11/22/2013 (LGL).
November 19, 2013 Filing 224 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 223 MOTION to Intervene: at date and time to be determined. (Attachment: Cover Letter).(lmb) Modified text on 11/19/2013 (lmb).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 11/22/13 LGL Modified on 11/22/2013 (LGL).
November 19, 2013 Filing 223 MOTION to Intervene by Leslie Davis. (lmb)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 11/22/13 LGL Modified on 11/22/2013 (LGL).
November 18, 2013 Filing 222 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 219 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders, (Borger, John)
November 15, 2013 Filing 221 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Boylan, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 12-cv-0472 RHK/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (LJG)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER rescheduling the January 30, 2014 hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment to Wednesday, January 29, 2014, Courtroom 7A in St. Paul before the undersigned; the briefing schedule shall remain as if the Motion was being heard on January 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 11/12/13. (KLL)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER: that Defendant's Motion to Amend Second Pretrial Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz (Docket No. 208) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as provided below. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/04/2013. (MMP)
October 30, 2013 Filing 218 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 10/30/2013. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Amend Second Pretrial Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz (Docket No. 208). Motions Taken Under Advisement: October 30, 2013. Order to be submitted by the Court. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (MMP)
October 22, 2013 Filing 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesse Ventura re 216 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Documents Exhibit E and Exhibit F (Bisanz, John)
October 22, 2013 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in OPPOSITION TO 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Placeholder for Exhibit E, # 6 Placeholder for Exhibit F)(Bisanz, John)
October 22, 2013 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
October 16, 2013 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2013 re 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records filed by Taya Kyle, 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Jesse Ventura. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and for Sanctions denied [Docket No. 190] on the hearing record; and defendant's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records denied[Docket No. 196] on the hearing record. No further written order to be issued. (kt)
October 16, 2013 Filing 213 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Borger, John)
October 15, 2013 Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Taya Kyle re 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz (Borger, John)
October 15, 2013 Filing 211 Declaration of John P. Borger in Support of 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J)(Borger, John)
October 15, 2013 Filing 210 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 208 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 15, 2013 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM in Support re 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
October 15, 2013 Filing 208 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 179 Scheduling Order to Expressly Approve Service of Report of Forensics Expert Robert Meekins and Supplemental Expert Report of David Schultz by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 9, 2013 Filing 207 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taya Kyle of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Document (Exhibit D to the Declaration of John P. Borger) (Borger, John)
October 9, 2013 Filing 206 DECLARATION of John P. Borger in Opposition to 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Placeholder for Exhibit D)(Borger, John)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/9/13 LGL Modified on 10/10/2013 (LGL).
October 9, 2013 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
October 9, 2013 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in OPPOSITION TO 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Anderson, Court)
October 9, 2013 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT of Terry Janos in OPPOSITION TO 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records filed by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court)
October 9, 2013 Filing 202 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
October 2, 2013 Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesse Ventura re 192 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 193 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions (Anderson, Court)
October 2, 2013 Filing 200 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 196 Motion for Sanctions filed by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Taya Kyle re 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records (Borger, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM in Support re 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 197 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Borger, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 196 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Respond Fully to Order for Production of Military Records by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Jesse Ventura re 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions (Anderson, Court)
October 2, 2013 Filing 194 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 190 Motion to Compel filed by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court)
October 2, 2013 Filing 193 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in SUPPORT OF 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 7)(Anderson, Court)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/3/13 LGL Modified on 10/3/2013 (LGL).
October 2, 2013 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Support re 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Unredacted Document, # 2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/3/13 LGL Modified on 10/3/2013 (LGL).
October 2, 2013 Filing 191 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Anderson, Court)
October 2, 2013 Filing 190 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court)
September 26, 2013 Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 2, 2013, before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (9 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 10/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2013. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
September 26, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
September 24, 2013 Filing 187 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: denying 172 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue; Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2013 re 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Taya Kyle. Case caption is amended. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (KAT)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying 185 Letter Request to continue the September 24, 2013 hearing on 172 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/17/13. (KLL)
September 16, 2013 Filing 185 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jesse Ventura . (Olsen, David)
September 10, 2013 Filing 184 REPLY re 182 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
September 3, 2013 Filing 183 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L)(Bisanz, John)
September 3, 2013 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
August 15, 2013 Filing 181 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 15, 2013 Filing 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Taya Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 6, 2013 Filing 179 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (non-disp) due 10/15/2013. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2014. Ready for trial due by 5/1/2014. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 08/05/2013. (lmb)
August 5, 2013 Filing 178 DECLARATION of John P. Borger by Taya Kyle . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Declaration of John P. Borger (Redacted version of Dkt. #114-15 Ex. O - Ventura Deposition Transcript)(Borger, John)
August 5, 2013 Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Taya Kyle re 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue (Walker, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 176 Declaration of Taya Kyle in Support of 175 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Taya Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support re 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Taya Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 174 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 172 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Taya Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 5, 2013 Filing 172 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue by Taya Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant (Docket No. 151) is GRANTED; 2. The stay imposed by the Court's Order dated April 4, 2013 is lifted; 3. The parties shall meet and confer regarding a proposed second amended pretrial scheduling order and file a report with the Court no later than July 29, 2013 setting forth the parties' proposal for deadlines governing the remaining proceedings in the case; 4. Leslie Davis' Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 157) is DENIED; 5. Plaintiff shall provide written notice to Defendant of confidentiality designations for his deposition transcript and exhibits no later than July 29, 2013; after Defendant receives that information, Defendant shall file a publically-available, redacted version of its Docket No. 114, Exhibit O. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/18/2013. (lmb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Settlement Conference held on 7/15/2013. No settlement reached. (jz)
July 12, 2013 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Support re 157 MOTION to Intervene filed by Leslie Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(kt) Modified filing date on 7/15/2013 (kt).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 7/17/13 LGL Modified on 7/17/2013 (LGL).
July 2, 2013 Filing 168 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2013 re 157 MOTION to Intervene filed by Leslie Davis. Motion taken under advisement. (kt)
July 2, 2013 Filing 167 EXHIBIT re 163 Response to Leslie Davis Motion to Intervene (efiled on 6/24/13) by Chris Kyle filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
June 26, 2013 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jesse Ventura re 152 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 151 MOTION to Substitute Party Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant, 153 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Anderson, Court)
June 24, 2013 Filing 165 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE: The LOCATION of the Motion Hearing on July 2, 2013, has been changed. The Motion to Intervene [Docket No. 157] will be held at 10:00 a.m. on July 2, 2013, in Courtroom 3C, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Minnesota.(kat) Modified text on 6/24/2013 (jz). (cc: Leslie Davis) Modified text on 6/24/2013 (jz).
June 24, 2013 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Chris Kyle re 163 Response to Leslie Davis Motion to Intervene (Borger, John)
June 24, 2013 Filing 163 RESPONSE re 157 MOTION to Intervene by Leslie Davis filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jesse Ventura re 161 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene (Bisanz, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 157 MOTION to Intervene by Leslie Davis -- Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition is filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
June 18, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 157 MOTION to Intervene: Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(GMW)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/21/13 LGL Modified on 6/21/2013 (LGL).
June 17, 2013 Filing 159 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 6/17/2013. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant (Docket No. 151). Motions taken under advisement as of: June 17, 2013. Order to be submitted and issued by the Court.(Court Reporter n/a) (MMP)
June 14, 2013 Filing 158 EXHIBIT 1 & 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(MMP)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/17/13LGL Modified on 6/17/2013 (LGL). CONVENTIONAL DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 6/14/13 LGL
June 14, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION to Intervene filed by Leslie Davis. (MMP)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/17/13 LGL Modified on 6/17/2013 (LGL).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER striking 155 Motion to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 6/6/13. (kt)
June 5, 2013 Filing 155 STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER: MOTION re: 114 Declaration filed by Leslie Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(TSS) Modified on 6/6/2013 (kt).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 6/7/13 LGL Modified on 6/7/2013 (LGL).
May 29, 2013 Filing 154 RESPONSE re 151 MOTION to Substitute Party Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 22, 2013 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re 151 MOTION to Substitute Party Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
May 22, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 151 MOTION to Substitute Party Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant : Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Olsen, David)
May 22, 2013 Filing 151 MOTION to Substitute Party Taya Kyle, Executrix of the Estate of Chris Kyle, as Defendant by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
May 16, 2013 Filing 150 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Chris Kyle by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2013 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 05/01/2013. (MMP)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document (Docket No. 138 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter are hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. Counsel of record for Kyle shall file a notice with the Court within 10 days of counsel's receipt of notice of the appointment of a personal representative for the Estate of Chris Kyle. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 04/04/2013. (MMP)
March 29, 2013 Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Status Conference held on 3/29/2013. Settlement Conference to be scheduled. (lmb)
March 28, 2013 Filing 146 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR DUPLICATE ENTRY. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2013. Parties will appear before the Court on March 29, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9E. (GMW) Modified on 3/28/2013 (GMW).
March 28, 2013 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2013. Parties will appear before the Court on March 29, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9E. (lmb)
March 25, 2013 Filing 144 Supplemental Declaration of John P. Borger in Support of 140 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 0-R)(Borger, John)
March 22, 2013 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in OPPOSITION TO 138 MOTION to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - E)(Anderson, Court)
March 22, 2013 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 138 MOTION to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
March 15, 2013 Filing 141 Declaration of John P. Borger in Support of 140 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N)(Borger, John)
March 15, 2013 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM in Support re 138 MOTION to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
March 15, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 138 MOTION to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document : Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Borger, John)
March 15, 2013 Filing 138 MOTION to Compel Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-Redacted Document by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: 1. The Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order is hereby VACATED. 2. After any appropriate party substitution has been completed, the Court will set a pre-trial conference with counsel for the then-existing parties to establish a new schedule for the remaining limited discovery, for dispositive motions, and for trial. 3. The summary judgment hearing currently scheduled before Judge Kyle on April 29, 2013 is stricken from the Courts calendar. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 03/07/2013. (MMP)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER that: 1. Defendant's Motion to Strike (Docket No. 92) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as provided below; and 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to Claim Punitive Damages (Docket No. 100) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 2/28/13. (jam)
February 15, 2013 Filing 135 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Chris Kyle by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
February 15, 2013 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Status Conference held on 2/15/2013. (lmb)
February 14, 2013 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Claire H. Ouellette in Opposition to 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Borger, John)
February 7, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR TRIAL, AUGUST 1, 2013 BEFORE JUDG KYLE. (ds)
January 25, 2013 Filing 131 DECLARATION of John P. Borger in Opposition to 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) F)(Borger, John)
January 4, 2013 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle re 129 Declaration in Opposition,,,,, 128 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to Claim Punitive Damages (Borger, John)
January 4, 2013 Filing 129 DECLARATION of John P. Borger in Opposition to 128 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 DEP. EX. 81, # 7 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 88, # 8 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 89, # 9 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 90, # 10 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 91, # 11 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 92, # 12 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 93, # 13 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 94, # 14 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 95, # 15 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 96, # 16 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 97, # 17 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 106, # 18 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 107, # 19 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 108, # 20 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 109, # 21 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 110, # 22 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 111, # 23 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 112, # 24 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 114, # 25 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 115, # 26 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 116, # 27 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 117, # 28 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 118, # 29 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 119, # 30 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 120, # 31 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 121, # 32 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 122, # 33 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 142, # 34 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 143, # 35 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 145, # 36 Placeholder for DEP. EX. 146)(Borger, John)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 1/4/13 Modified on 1/9/2013 (LGL).
January 4, 2013 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages (Supplemental) filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
December 21, 2012 Filing 127 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 126 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Borger, John)
December 21, 2012 Filing 126 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/20/12. (kll)
December 19, 2012 Filing 124 VACATED PER [137} ORDER DATED 3-7-13 - AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Based upon the record, memoranda, and oral arguments of counsel, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Docket No. 87) is GRANTED. The previously entered Scheduling Order (Docket No. 7) is hereby amended as follows: (See Order for Complete Text). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 12/19/2012. (lmb) Modified text on 3/7/2013 (MMP).
December 18, 2012 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2012. Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Docket No. 87), Defendants Motion to Strike (Docket No. 92), and Plaintiffs Motion to Amend to Claim Punitive Damages (Docket No. 100). Defendant may file a supplemental submission as stated at the hearing by January 4, 2013 at 12:00 p.m. Motions taken under advisement as of: December 18, 2012. ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (Court Reporter N/A and Tape #9E). (lmb)
December 14, 2012 Filing 122 Second AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Anderson, Court)
December 12, 2012 Filing 121 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Anderson, Court)
December 12, 2012 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in OPPOSITION TO 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Anderson, Court)
December 11, 2012 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Documents (Borger, John)
December 11, 2012 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle of Conventionally Filed Non Graphical/Textual Computer File (Audio, Video, etc.) on CD or Other Media (Borger, John)
December 11, 2012 Filing 117 Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of 115 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit A, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit B, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit C) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/11/12. (Borger, John) Modified on 12/14/2012 (akl).
December 11, 2012 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages PLACEHOLDER for UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM filed by Chris Kyle. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/11/12. (Borger, John) Modified on 12/14/2012 (akl).
December 11, 2012 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages (REDACTED) filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
December 11, 2012 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Leita Walker by Chris Kyle in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions to Amend to Claim Punitive Damages and To Amend Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Placeholder for Exhibit O) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/11/12. (Borger, John) Modified on 12/14/2012 (akl).
December 11, 2012 Filing 113 DECLARATION of John P. Borger in Opposition to 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L)(Borger, John)
December 11, 2012 Filing 112 RESPONSE re 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
December 7, 2012 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT of John N. Bisanz, Jr. in OPPOSITION TO 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
December 7, 2012 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Olsen, David)
December 7, 2012 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
December 3, 2012 Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jesse Ventura re 105 Affidavit in Support of Motion, exhibits filed under seal. (Bisanz, John) Modified on 12/4/2012 (kt).
December 3, 2012 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Jesse Ventura re 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages (Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 106 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 100 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Placeholder for Exhibit J, # 11 Placeholder for Exhibit K, # 12 Placeholder for Exhibit L, # 13 Placeholder for Exhibit M, # 14 Placeholder for Exhibit N, # 15 Placeholder for Exhibit O, # 16 Placeholder for Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Placeholder for Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit(s) S, # 20 Exhibit(s) T, # 21 Exhibit(s) U, # 22 Placeholder for Exhibit V, # 23 Placeholder for Exhibit W, # 24 Placeholder for Exhibit X, # 25 Placeholder for Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit(s) Z, # 27 Exhibit(s) AA, # 28 Exhibit(s) BB) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/3/12. (Bisanz, John) Modified on 12/5/2012 (akl).
November 30, 2012 Filing 104 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John) Modified on 11/30/2012 (akl).
November 30, 2012 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Governor Jesse Ventura in SUPPORT OF 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D)(Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Support re 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages : Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to claim punitive damages by Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle re 97 Declaration in Support, 96 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Chris Kyle re 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS (Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 97 Declaration of Leita Walker in Support of 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-M, # 2 Exhibit(s) O-Y, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibit N) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 11/30/12. (Walker, Mary) Modified on 12/5/2012 (akl).
November 30, 2012 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Support re 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS Placeholder for UNREDACTED filed by Chris Kyle. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 11/30/12. (Walker, Mary) Modified on 12/5/2012 (akl).
November 30, 2012 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support re 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS REDACTED filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 94 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 92 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS : Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS BELATED AND SHAM THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
November 30, 2012 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in SUPPORT OF 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-P)(Olsen, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 89 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 87 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, : Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Olsen, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders 7 Scheduling Order, by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
November 26, 2012 Filing 86 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTIONS OF DOCUMENTS. (See Order). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/26/2012. (lmb)
November 20, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Count I - Defamation) : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Borger, John)
November 20, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Count I - Defamation) by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
November 19, 2012 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on October 31, 2012 before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (52 pages). Transcriber: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 12/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2013. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (cb)
November 19, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (cb)
November 8, 2012 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM by Jesse Ventura re 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 75 Order Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Submitted Pursuant to November 2, 2012 Order filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
November 6, 2012 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle of Conventionally Filed Under Seal Document (Exhibit 1 to the Second Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Borger, John)
November 6, 2012 Filing 79 Second DECLARATION of Claire H. Ouellette by Chris Kyle in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Borger, John) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK's OFFICE ON 11/7/12. (KT)
November 6, 2012 Filing 78 Second DECLARATION of John P. Borger by Chris Kyle in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 31, # 2 Exhibit(s) 32)(Borger, John)
November 6, 2012 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM by Chris Kyle Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant Chris Kyle in Response to Order Filed 11/02/12 filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS: granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Compel; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part 59 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/06/2012. (lmb)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. The Court HEREBY ORDERS the parties as follows: (See Order for Complete Text.) Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/02/2012. (lmb)
October 31, 2012 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2012. Hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Docket No. 54) and Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Docket No. 59). Motions taken under advisement as of October 31, 2012. ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (Court Reporter N/A and Tape #9E). (lmb)
October 24, 2012 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle of Conventionally Filed Documents (Exhibits to Declaration of John P. Borger Filed Under Seal) (Borger, John)
October 24, 2012 Filing 72 DECLARATION of John P. Borger in Opposition to 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Placeholder for Exhibit 4 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Placeholder for Exhibit 5 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Placeholder for Exhibit 7 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13, # 14 Exhibit(s) 14, # 15 Exhibit(s) 15, # 16 Exhibit(s) 16, # 17 Placeholder for Exhibit 17 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 18 Placeholder for Exhibit 18 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 19 Placeholder for Exhibit 19 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 20 Placeholder for Exhibit 20 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 21 Placeholder for Exhibit 21 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 22 Placeholder for Exhibit 22 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 23 Placeholder for Exhibit 23 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 24 Exhibit(s) 24, # 25 Exhibit(s) 25, # 26 Exhibit(s) 26, # 27 Exhibit(s) 27, # 28 Exhibit(s) 28, # 29 Exhibit(s) 29, # 30 Exhibit(s) 30) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECIEVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 10/25/12. (Borger, John) Modified on 10/29/2012 (akl).
October 24, 2012 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Claire H. Ouellette in Opposition to 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 24, 2012 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Trina R. Hunn in Opposition to 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Borger, John)
October 24, 2012 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Chris Kyle in Opposition to 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
October 24, 2012 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
October 24, 2012 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson with Exhibits 1-4 in OPPOSITION TO 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents with Exhibits 1 through 4 filed by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court) Modified text on 10/24/2012 (jz).
October 24, 2012 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesse Ventura re 61 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 64 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 60 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 63 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Court J. Anderson in SUPPORT OF 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in SUPPORT OF 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Chris Kyle re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Walker, Mary)
October 17, 2012 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Jesse Ventura. (Anderson, Court)
October 17, 2012 Filing 58 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 54 Motion to Compel filed by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
October 17, 2012 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
October 17, 2012 Filing 56 Supplemental Declaration of Leita Walker in Support of 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) J, # 2 Exhibit(s) K, # 3 Exhibit(s) L, # 4 Exhibit(s) M)(Walker, Mary)
October 17, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Walker, Mary)
October 17, 2012 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
October 16, 2012 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on /9/6/2012 before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (12 pages). Transcriber: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5102). Redaction Request due 11/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2013. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db)
October 16, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (db)
October 16, 2012 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on October 10, 2012 before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (34 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 11/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2013. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (cb)
October 16, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (cb)
October 10, 2012 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard H. Kyle: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2012 re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (ds)
September 26, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY re 25 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 09/24/2012. (lmb)
September 24, 2012 Filing 46 EXHIBIT/THIRD PARTY AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Michael H. Gotchey in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David) Modified text on 9/25/2012 (jz).
September 20, 2012 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesse Ventura re 43 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 40 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 42 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 41 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 39 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Olsen, David)
September 20, 2012 Filing 44 EXHIBIT re 43 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits A - D by Jesse Ventura filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
September 19, 2012 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) Regarding Facts Unavailable to Nonmovant filed by Jesse Ventura. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - D). (Olsen, David) Modified text on 9/20/2012 (lmb).
September 19, 2012 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of David Bradley Olsen in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-3, # 2 Exhibit(s) 4-5, # 3 Placeholder for Exhibits 6 and 7) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 9/20/12. (Olsen, David) Modified on 9/20/2012 (akl).
September 19, 2012 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Bill DeWitt in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
September 19, 2012 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Charlene DeWitt in OPPOSITION TO 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Olsen, David)
September 19, 2012 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olsen, David)
September 6, 2012 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2012. Hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel Answers to Defendants Discovery Requests (Docket No. 17). Motions taken under advisement as of: September 6, 2012. ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (Tape #9E). (lmb)
August 29, 2012 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests filed by Jesse Ventura. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bisanz, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Kyle re 26 Declaration in Support,, Conventionally Filed Documents Exhibit R and Exhibit U to the Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 35 Declaration of Andrew Paul in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 34 Declaration of Debbie Lee in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 33 Declaration of Kevin Lacz in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 32 Declaration of John Kelly in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 31 Declaration of Debbie Job in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 30 Declaration of Bob Gassoff in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 29 Declaration of Jeremiah Dinnell in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 28 Declaration of Guy Budinscak in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 27 Declaration of Chris Kyle in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 28, 2012 Filing 26 Declaration of Claire H. Ouellette in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Placeholder for Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit(s) R-1, # 20 Exhibit(s) S, # 21 Exhibit(s) T, # 22 Placeholder for Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit(s) U-1)(Borger, John) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 8/28/12 Modified on 8/29/2012 (jam).
August 28, 2012 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Borger, John)
August 24, 2012 Filing 24 Declaration of John P. Borger in Support of 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, # 2 Placeholder for Exhibit A-2)(Borger, John) Exhibit A-2 RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 08/24/2012. (TSS)
August 24, 2012 Filing 23 EXHIBIT re 20 Declaration in Support, REDACTED Exhibit E by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 24, 2012 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Chris Kyle re 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests (Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 17 Motion to Compel filed by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 20 Declaration of Leita Walker in Support of 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests filed by Chris Kyle. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, EXHIBIT E SEALED PER JUDGE BOYLAN. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I). (Walker, Mary) Modified text on 8/24/2012 (lmb).
August 23, 2012 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests : Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Answers to Defendant's Discovery Requests by Chris Kyle. (Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 16 STIPULATION (Joint) of Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims for Damages by Chris Kyle, Jesse Ventura. (Walker, Mary)
August 23, 2012 Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 08/23/2012. (lmb)
August 22, 2012 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Jesse Ventura re 13 Stipulation (Bisanz, John)
August 22, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION Stipulation for Protective Order by Chris Kyle, Jesse Ventura. (Bisanz, John)
August 21, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) : Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 21, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Counts II and III) by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IN RE DISPOSITIVE MOTION PRACTICE IN CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KYLE. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 8/10/12. (ds)
June 4, 2012 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Settlement Conference held on 6/4/2012. NO SETTLEMENT REACHED. (lmb)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: (Settlement Conference set for 6/4/2012 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 4/9/12. (akl)
April 5, 2012 Filing 7 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2012. Discovery due by 12/1/2012. Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2012. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2013. Ready for trial due by 6/1/2013. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 04/05/2012. (lmb)
April 5, 2012 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2012. Scheduling order to be issued. Settlement conference to be scheduled. (lmb)
March 26, 2012 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Chris Kyle, Jesse Ventura.(Borger, John)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2012 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 3/1/12. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jam)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12cv472 RHK/AJB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/29/2012. (JME)
February 24, 2012 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Jesse Ventura by Chris Kyle. (Borger, John)
February 23, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chris Kyle from District Court, Fourth Judicial District, State of Minnesota, County of Hennepin, case number Unknown. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-062518) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham, filed by Chris Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) B: Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) A: Summons, # 3 Exhibit(s) C: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet). (lmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ventura v. Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Ventura
Represented By: John N Bisanz, Jr
Represented By: David Bradley Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kyle
Represented By: John P Borger
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?