St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. v. Biosense Webster, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Defendant: Biosense Webster, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Jose B. De Castro
Case Number: 0:2012cv00621
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 328 Defendants' Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 01/26/2015. (TLU) Modified on 1/26/2015 (kt).
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 300 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest and Taxation of Expert Fee Costs; denying Defendants' 305 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 11/24/2014. (TLU)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; Plaintiff St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. is awarded $662,018.94 in attorneys fees damages (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/18/2014. (TLU)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER denying 233 Plaintiff's Motion to Redact Hearing Transcript (Written pinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/14/14. (TLU)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 182 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 2/3/2014. (GJS)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Overruling 89 Objection To Discovery Ruling filed by St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc., Affirming 87 Judge Boylan's June 18, 2013 Amended Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/29/2013. (TLU)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 5 Motion for Injunctive Relief to Enjoin Preemptive Action; granting 5 Motion to Expedite Hearing (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 05/04/2012. (TLU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. v. Biosense Webster, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Represented By: Mark R Bradford
Represented By: Nicole A Delaney
Represented By: Edward F Fox
Represented By: Kevin P Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biosense Webster, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose B. De Castro
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?