Kramer et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Kari Sue Kramer and Paul Kramer
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2012cv01149
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Franklin L Noel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER. The transcripts of trial, located at Docket Entries 473, 475-478, and 480 are to remain sealed. Their redacted versions have been made public in accordance with judiciary policy. However, the transcripts at Docket Entries 474 and 479 have no redacted publicly available counterparts. The Post-Filing Restriction period has run (see D. Minn. L. R. 80.1(b)) and thus the Clerk of Court is directed to make the transcripts at Docket Entries 474 and 479 available to the public. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/27/2016. (SMD)
September 19, 2016 Filing 501 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #480 Trial held on August 11, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (94 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 19, 2016 Filing 500 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #478 Trial held on August 9, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (285 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 19, 2016 Filing 499 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #477 Trial held on August 8, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (205 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 19, 2016 Filing 498 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #476 Trial held on August 4, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (225 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 19, 2016 Filing 497 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #475 Trial held on August 3, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (289 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 19, 2016 Filing 496 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #473 Trial held on August 1, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (116 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting #482 Motion to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/16/2016. (SMD)
September 13, 2016 Filing 494 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer in response to Ford's Motion to Preserve Confidential Designation (Doc. 482). (Murray, Thomas)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Defendant filed two requests related to redacting certain information from the trial transcript in this matter. (Doc. Nos. 482 and 492.) The Court has yet to rule on Defendant's Motion to Preserve the Confidential Designations of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony ("Motion to Preserve"). (Doc. No. 482.) To ensure the record contains a single, appropriately redacted trial transcript, the Court extends the deadline for filing that transcript under Local Rule 5.5(d)-(e) until after the Court can rule on the Motion to Preserve. In that ruling, the Court will set a specific deadline by which the Court Reporter will file a redacted trial transcript that conforms with that ruling and Defendant's Statement of Redaction (Doc. No. 492). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/12/2016. (SMD)
September 11, 2016 Filing 492 STATEMENT OF REDACTION by Ford Motor Company re #478 , #477 , #476 , #480 , #473 Transcript Amended. (Carey, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 491 NOTICE of Noncompliant Statement of Redaction #490 . Under #Local Rule 5.5 and #Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, only specific personal identifiers may be redacted without court approval. Further action is required within 48 hours of this notice.For more information, review Local Rule 5.5 and the #Court's Policy for Electronic Access to Transcripts. (HAS)
September 6, 2016 Filing 490 STATEMENT OF REDACTION by Ford Motor Company re #479 , #478 , #477 , #476 , #475 , #474 , #480 , #473 Transcript . (Carey, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Filing 489 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
September 1, 2016 Filing 488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #486 Declaration in Support,, Conventional Service of Exhibits Filed Under Seal (Carey, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Filing 487 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
September 1, 2016 Filing 486 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. A, #2 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. B, #3 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. C, #4 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. D, #5 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. E, #6 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. F, #7 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. G, #8 Placeholder for Sealed Ex. H)(Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG). Sealed document received on 9/1/2016 (SAE).
September 1, 2016 Filing 485 Declaration of James Engle in Support of #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
September 1, 2016 Filing 484 MEMORANDUM in Support re #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
September 1, 2016 Filing 483 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony: at date and time to be determined. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
September 1, 2016 Filing 482 MOTION to Preserve the Confidential Designation of Certain Trial Exhibits and Testimony by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/2/2016 (LEG).
August 22, 2016 Filing 481 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Ford Motor Company re #479 Transcript,, #478 Transcript,, #477 Transcript,, #476 Transcript,, #475 Transcript,, #474 Transcript,, #480 Transcript,, #473 Transcript,, (Wichelman, Jennifer)
August 15, 2016 Filing 480 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume VIII - Pgs. 1375-1468) held on August 11, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (94 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume VII - Pgs. 1192-1374) held on August 10, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (183 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume VI - Pgs. 907-1191) held on August 9, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (285 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume V - Pgs. 702-906) held on August 8, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (205 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume IV - Pgs. 477-701) held on August 4, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (225 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume III - Pgs. 188-476) held on August 3, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (289 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 474 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume II - Pgs. 117-187) held on August 2, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (71 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 473 TRANSCRIPT of Trial (Volume I - Pgs. 1-116) held on August 1, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (116 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 472 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 8 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
August 11, 2016 Filing 471 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 08/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(TSS)
August 11, 2016 Filing 470 REDACTED JURY VERDICT. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Original Jury Verdict)(TSS)
August 11, 2016 Filing 469 List of Defendant's Admitted Exhibits. (SMD)
August 11, 2016 Filing 468 List of Plaintiffs' Admitted Exhibits. (SMD)
August 11, 2016 Filing 467 Final Jury Instructions. (SMD)
August 11, 2016 Filing 466 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: EIGHTH DAY of Jury Trial on 8/11/2016. Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law was argued outside of the presence of the jury and denied. Closing arguments. Jury received case at 11:45 a.m. Verdict for Defendant returned at 2:15 p.m. Clerk to file Verdict and enter judgment in favor of Defendant. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 11, 2016 Filing 464 RESPONSE re #461 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - refiled in 13 pt font filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
August 11, 2016 Filing 463 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-RESPONSE re #461 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 8/11/2016 (AKL).
August 10, 2016 Filing 465 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: SEVENTH DAY of Jury Trial on 8/10/2016. Defendant's Witnesses Carl Stopschinski, James Engle and James Walker testify. Defendant rests. Jury Charge conference held. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 10, 2016 Filing 462 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL Jury Instructions submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 8/11/2016 (kt).
August 10, 2016 Filing 461 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
August 9, 2016 Filing 460 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Jury Trial continued on 8/9/2016. Plaintiffs witnesses: excerpts from the deposition of Paul Szuszman read for the jury; James Engle and Jessie Ann Hendricks testify. Plaintiffs rest. Defendant's oral motion for a directed verdict is denied. Defendant's witnesses: Stephen Fenton and Carl Stopschinski testify. Trial continued to Wednesday, August 10, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 8, 2016 Filing 459 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: FIFTH DAY of Jury Trial on 8/8/2016. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: excerpts of a video deposition of Daniel Bertsch played for the jury; excerpts of a deposition of Dr. Francille Knowles read for the jury; Linda Graham, Paul Kramer, and Kari Kramer testify. Trial continued to Tuesday, August 9, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 4, 2016 Filing 458 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: FOURTH DAY of Jury Trial on 8/4/2016. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: Dr. William Berg; Melvin Hargrett; Neil Hannemann; and Jenny Peichel testify in person. Excerpts of video depositions of Stan Clark and June Clark played for the jury. Trial to resume at 9:00 am on Monday, August 8, 2016. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 3, 2016 Filing 457 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial Renewed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
August 3, 2016 Filing 456 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: THIRD DAY of Jury Trial on 8/3/2016. Plaintiffs' witnesses David Bilek and Dr. William D. Berg called. Defendant's oral motion for a mistrial was denied. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 2, 2016 Filing 455 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: SECOND DAY of Jury Trial on 8/2/2016. Plaintiffs' witnesses: Excerpts of a video deposition of Paul Szuszman were played for the jury. Plaintiff called Ronald E. Kirk. Excerpts of a video deposition of Trooper Rudolph Johnson were played for the jury. Trial continued to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 2, 2016 Filing 454 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
August 1, 2016 Filing 453 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
August 1, 2016 Filing 452 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: FIRST DAY of TRIAL; Jury Trial begun on 8/1/2016. Jury Selection. Opening statements by Ms. Anthony for the plaintiffs and Ms. Wright for the defendant. Excerpts of deposition of Deputy Greg Anderson were read into the record; excerptsof video deposition of Charles Bennett were played for the jury; excerpts of a video deposition of Paul Szuszman were played for the jury. Trial to resume Tuesday, August 2, 2016 at 8:30 am. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER (Document Sealed). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/29/16. (kt)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER re #448 Stipulation Regarding Confidential Information Used, Introduced, or Admitted Into Evidence During Trial. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 07/29/2016. (SMD)
July 29, 2016 Filing 449 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #448 Stipulation Regarding Confidential Information Used, Introduced or Admitted Into Evidence During Trial (Wichelman, Jennifer)
July 29, 2016 Filing 448 STIPULATION Regarding Confidential Information Used, Introduced or Admiotted Into Evidence During Trial by Ford Motor Company. Jointly signed by Karie Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/1/2016 (lmb).
July 28, 2016 Filing 447 List of Deposition Testimony Placeholder for Plaintiffs' 12-4-14 Designations of the December 4, 2014 Deposition of Paul Joseph Szuszman filed in error [DOC 405] submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Sealed document received on 8/1/2016 (SAE).
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER re: Motions in Limine; denying #354 Defendant's motion requesting judicial notice of certain documents; granting #381 Plaintiffs' motion to exclude certain government reports; denying #366 Defendants motion to exclude testimony interpreting Fords documents and opinions of Fords intent, motive or state of mind; granting in part #387 Plaintiffs' motion to exclude references to child car seats and public assistance. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 07/27/2016. (SMD) Modified text on 7/28/2016 (KMM).
July 25, 2016 Filing 445 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 20, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (43 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 8/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
July 25, 2016 Filing 444 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/22/16. (kt)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER denying #429 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 07/22/2016. (SMD)
July 20, 2016 Filing 441 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2016 re #429 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion to Amend to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. The motion was submitted, argued, and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
July 18, 2016 Filing 440 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company Notice of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at Trial with Exhibit A for Gregory Anderson (Carey, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 439 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ford Motor Company . (Wichelman, Jennifer)
July 15, 2016 Filing 438 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re Ex. 1, 2 and 11 of #437 Declaration. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/18/2016 (KMM).
July 15, 2016 Filing 437 DECLARATION of Jennifer K. Wichelman re #436 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Ford Motor Company to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend to Add a Claim for Punitive Damges. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s))(Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed documents received on 7/15/2016 (SAE).
July 15, 2016 Filing 436 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #429 MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/18/2016 (KMM).
July 14, 2016 Filing 435 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #429 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion to Amend to Add Claim for Punitive Damages : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
July 13, 2016 Filing 434 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re disclosure timing with redacted Exhibits by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer . (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 7/13/2016 (KMM).
July 13, 2016 Filing 433 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR (Refiled at ECF No. #434 ): LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Letter to Judge Nelson re disclosure timing. (O'Neill, Mary) Sealed per Judge Nelson. (TSS).
July 11, 2016 Filing 432 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #429 MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Add Claim for Punitive Damages. (Murray, Thomas) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (KMM).
July 11, 2016 Filing 431 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #429 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
July 11, 2016 Filing 430 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #429 MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Add Claim for Punitive Damages at date and time to be determined. (Murray, Thomas) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (KMM).
July 11, 2016 Filing 429 MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Add Claim for Punitive Damages by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Red Line Proposed Amended Complaint)(Murray, Thomas) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (KMM).
July 8, 2016 Filing 428 Declaration of Thomas J. Murray in Support of #425 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Placeholder for Sealed Exhibits)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (KMM). Sealed document received on 7/11/2016 (SAE).
July 8, 2016 Filing 427 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 06/30/2016 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (96 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1225). Redaction Request due 7/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (LAS)
July 8, 2016 Filing 426 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
July 8, 2016 Filing 425 MEMORANDUM in Support re #429 MOTION to Amend Pleadings to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (lmb). Modified text on 7/11/2016 (KMM). Sealed document received on 7/11/2016 (SAE).
July 8, 2016 Filing 424 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-MISSING ATTACHMENTS-WILL REFILE. MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend to Add a Claim for Punitive Damages by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 7/11/2016 (lmb).
June 30, 2016 Filing 423 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2016. Amendments in italics in attached document. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (SMD)
June 30, 2016 Filing 422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2016. Motions in limine submitted, and argued. The Court denied #357 Defendant's Motion in Limine to exclude late-disclosed fact witnesses; denied as moot #366 Defendant's Motion in Limine to exclude testimony interpreting Ford's documents; and granted #387 Plaintiffs' motion in Limine requesting exclusion of references to child car seats and public assistance. All other motions in limine were taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (SMD)
June 28, 2016 Filing 421 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #360 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
June 28, 2016 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #363 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY RELATING TO OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
June 28, 2016 Filing 419 EXHIBIT 1 (placeholder) re #410 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/29/2016 (KMM). Sealed document received on 7/1/2016 (SAE).
June 28, 2016 Filing 418 EXHIBIT B re #413 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Frankenfeld Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 6/29/2016 (KMM).
June 28, 2016 Filing 417 EXHIBIT A re #413 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Askew Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 6/29/2016 (KMM).
June 28, 2016 Filing 416 EXHIBIT A re #412 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Berg Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 6/29/2016 (KMM).
June 28, 2016 Filing 415 EXHIBITS 1 and 2 (Placeholders) re #414 Memorandum in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibit 2 under seal)(Murray, Thomas) Modified text on 6/29/2016 (KMM). Sealed documents received on 7/1/2016 (SAE).
June 28, 2016 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #357 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
June 28, 2016 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #387 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine Requesting Exclusion of References to Child Car Seats and Public Assistance (Separate Public Assistance Response) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 28, 2016 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #387 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine Requesting Exclusion of References to Child Car Seats and Public Assistance (Separate Child Car Seats Response) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILE SEPARATELY Exhibit(s) A, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) Modified text on 6/28/2016 (kt).
June 28, 2016 Filing 411 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #381 MOTION in Limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 28, 2016 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #366 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY INTERPRETING FORDS DOCUMENTS AND OPINION FORDS INTENT, MOTIVE, OR STATE OF MIND filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE SEPARATELY. Exhibit(s) Placeholder - Exhibit 1 filed under seal)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/28/2016 (kt).
June 28, 2016 Filing 409 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #354 MOTION in Limine REQUESTING THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN THE FEDERAL REGISTER, GOVERNMENT PUBLICATIONS, AND PEER-REVIEWED PAPERS filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
June 27, 2016 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D Anthony on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Anthony, Brooke)
June 27, 2016 Filing 407 List of Deposition Testimony Placeholder for Plaintiffs' Designations of the 3-23-16 Deposition of Paul Joseph Szuszman. submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Sealed document received on 6/30/2016 (SAE). Modified text on 7/13/2016 (LPH).
June 23, 2016 Filing 406 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- DOCUMENT RESTRICTED AS DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED UNDER SEAL: Designations of the 3-23-16 Deposition of Paul Joseph Szuszman submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM). Modified on 6/27/2016 (TSS). Modified text on 6/27/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 404 Designations of the Deposition of Stan Clark submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 403 Designations of the Deposition of Trooper Rudolph Johnson submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 402 Designations of the Deposition of Officer Daniel Bertsch submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 401 Designations of the Deposition of June Price Clark submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 400 Designations of the Deposition of Dr. Francille Knowles submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 399 Designations of the Deposition of Charles Bennett submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 398 Additional Designations of the Deposition of George P. Van Kleek submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 397 Additional Designations of the Deposition of Deputy Greg Anderson submitted by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 396 EXHIBITS 6-13 (Continued from #395 Exhibit Index) re #382 Memorandum in Support of Motion in limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 23, 2016 Filing 395 EXHIBIT INDEX re #382 Memorandum in Support of Motion in limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 394 Declaration of Jennifer K. Wickelman in Support of #393 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations of Ford Corporate Representative, Paul Szuszman, in Jenks v. Ford Motor Co. submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 6/23/2016 (SAE). Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 393 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations of Ford Corporate Representative, Paul Szuszman, in Jenks v. Ford Motor Co. submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 392 Joint Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer and Paul Kramer. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 391 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations of Charles Bennett, June Clark, Stan Clark, Daniel Bertsch, and Rudolph Johnson submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 390 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations of Dr. Francille Knowles submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 389 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #387 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine Requesting Exclusion of References to Child Car Seats and Public Assistance (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 388 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #387 Motion in Limine filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 387 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine Requesting Exclusion of References to Child Car Seats and Public Assistance by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #381 MOTION in Limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 385 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #381 Motion in Limine filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 384 Exhibit List by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
June 22, 2016 Filing 383 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #381 Motion in Limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/23/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM in Support re #381 MOTION in Limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 381 MOTION in Limine Requesting Exclusion of Certain Government Reports by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 380 TRIAL BRIEF by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
June 22, 2016 Filing 379 Proposed Voir Dire by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
June 22, 2016 Filing 378 TRIAL BRIEF of Plaintiffs by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
June 22, 2016 Filing 377 Proposed Voir Dire by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
June 22, 2016 Filing 376 Proposed Joint Introduction to the Case as to Ford Motor Company. Jointly signed by Kari Sue Kramer and Paul Kramer (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/24/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #372 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alina Alonso Rodriguez for Ford Motor Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/22/16. (MAM)
June 22, 2016 Filing 374 Joint Witness List by Ford Motor Company. Jointly signed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/22/2016 (KMM).
June 22, 2016 Filing 373 Witness List by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
June 22, 2016 Filing 372 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alina Alonso Rodriguez. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4987085 by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
June 22, 2016 Filing 371 Witness List by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
June 22, 2016 Filing 370 Trial Exhibit List by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 6/22/2016 (KMM).
June 21, 2016 Filing 369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #357 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES, #354 MOTION in Limine REQUESTING THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN THE FEDERAL REGISTER, GOVERNMENT PUBLICATIONS, AND PEER-REVIEWED PAPERS, #366 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY INTERPRETING FORDS DOCUMENTS AND OPINION FORDS INTENT, MOTIVE, OR STATE OF MIND, #360 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS, #363 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY RELATING TO OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 368 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #366 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 367 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #366 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY INTERPRETING FORDS DOCUMENTS AND OPINION FORDS INTENT, MOTIVE, OR STATE OF MIND filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 366 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY INTERPRETING FORDS DOCUMENTS AND OPINION FORDS INTENT, MOTIVE, OR STATE OF MIND by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 365 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #363 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 364 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #363 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY RELATING TO OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 363 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY RELATING TO OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 362 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #360 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 361 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #360 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 360 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER ALLEGED INCIDENTS by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 359 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #357 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 358 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #357 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 357 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE LATE-DISCLOSED FACT WITNESSES by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 356 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #354 Motion in Limine, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 355 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #354 MOTION in Limine REQUESTING THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN THE FEDERAL REGISTER, GOVERNMENT PUBLICATIONS, AND PEER-REVIEWED PAPERS filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F Part 1, #7 Exhibit(s) F Part 2, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H Part 1, #10 Exhibit(s) H Part 2, #11 Exhibit(s) I, #12 Exhibit(s) J Part 1, #13 Exhibit(s) J Part 2, #14 Exhibit(s) J Part 3, #15 Exhibit(s) K, #16 Exhibit(s) L, #17 Exhibit(s) M Part 1, #18 Exhibit(s) M Part 2, #19 Exhibit(s) N, #20 Exhibit(s) O, #21 Exhibit(s) P, #22 Exhibit(s) Q, #23 Exhibit(s) R Part 1, #24 Exhibit(s) R Part 2, #25 Exhibit(s) S, #26 Exhibit(s) T, #27 Exhibit(s) U, #28 Exhibit(s) V, #29 Exhibit(s) W, #30 Exhibit(s) X, #31 Exhibit(s) Y, #32 Exhibit(s) Z, #33 Exhibit(s) aa, #34 Exhibit(s) bb, #35 Exhibit(s) cc)(Carey, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 354 MOTION in Limine REQUESTING THE COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN THE FEDERAL REGISTER, GOVERNMENT PUBLICATIONS, AND PEER-REVIEWED PAPERS by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Filing 353 List of Deposition Testimony Designations of the Deposition of Deputy Greg Anderson submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Filing 352 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. List of Deposition Testimony Designations of the Deposition of Deputy Greg Anderson submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified on 6/15/2016 (kt).
June 15, 2016 Filing 351 Proposed Special Verdict Form by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Filing 350 List of Deposition Testimony Designations of the Deposition of George P. Van Kleek submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER: The Amended Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order in this case [Doc. No. 329] sets a deadline of June 22, 2016 for the parties to, among other things, submit two copies of trial exhibits to chambers. The Court will accept electronic versions of exhibits, on portable media such as a cd/dvd or external drive, in lieu of paper copies. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 06/15/2016. (SMD)
June 10, 2016 Filing 348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer for Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Requests for Production (O'Neill, Mary)
May 23, 2016 Filing 347 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancellation & Resetting of Hearing: re: Final Pretrial Conference as scheduled in #329 AMENDED JURY TRIAL NOTICE. The Final Pretrial Conference is now set for 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
April 29, 2016 Filing 346 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Peter J Kestner (McEwen, Gregory)
April 29, 2016 Filing 345 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (McEwen, Gregory)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER denying #263 Motion to Compel; granting #288 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/14/16. (kt)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER that, in accordance with the Court's Order dated February 3, 2016 (ECF No. 319), Defendant Ford Motor Company shall pay Plaintiffs' costs and fees in the amount of $4,572.07. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/2/16. (kt)
February 29, 2016 Filing 342 Redacted Memorandum Opinion and Order originally filed under seal on 12/30/2015 (Written Opinion). (LDB)
February 22, 2016 Filing 341 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Submission of Costs filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 2/22/2016 (kt).
February 22, 2016 Filing 340 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Defendants' request to submit a response to Plaintiffs' submission of costs is GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Noel. (TMA)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER that #336 ORDER is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/18/16. (kt)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE ORDER vacating #366 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/18/16. (kt) Modified text on 2/18/2016 (kt).
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER denying #321 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply and cancelling 2/29/16 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/17/16. (kt)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 VACATED PER #339 ORDER: ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/17/16. (kt) Modified on 2/18/2016 (kt).
February 17, 2016 Filing 335 EXHIBIT re #334 Memorandum Exhibit Index Page: Affidavit of Mary S. O'Neill - Exhibit 1 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(O'Neill, Mary)
February 17, 2016 Filing 334 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs re #319 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Mary)
February 16, 2016 Filing 333 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #332 Exhibit of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents re Exhibit F to Declaration of Jennifer K. Wichelman (Wichelman, Jennifer)
February 16, 2016 Filing 332 EXHIBIT re #331 Declaration in Support, Placeholder for Exhibit F to Declaration of Jennifer K. Wichelman by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 2/16/2016 (SAE).
February 16, 2016 Filing 331 Declaration of Jennifer K. Wichelman in Support of #330 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified on 2/17/2016 (JAM).
February 16, 2016 Filing 330 RESPONSE in Opposition re #321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Submit A Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer)
February 10, 2016 Filing 329 AMENDED JURY TRIAL NOTICE. Jury Trial set for 8/1/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
February 10, 2016 Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2016. The trial date in this matter will be continued to August 1, 2016. An amended trial notice will be issued. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
February 9, 2016 Filing 327 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Submit A Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant (Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 326 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Submit A Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant : Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 325 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #321 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 324 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #323 Exhibit, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 323 EXHIBIT re #322 Memorandum in Support of Motion, for Leave to Submit a Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM in Support re #321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Submit A Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
February 9, 2016 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Submit A Memorandum Explaining How the Factual Assertions in the Logel Memorandum are Relevant by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 320 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Settlement Conference held on 2/3/2016. No settlement reached. (kt)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting in part #263 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #269 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/3/16. (kt)
January 29, 2016 Filing 318 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 2/2/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Counsel will be emailed dial-in information before the call. (SMD)
January 28, 2016 Filing 317 CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #316 Motions Hearing held on 011116 before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (48 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck (E-mail: Maria_Weinbeck@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 612-664-5109). Redaction Request due 2/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (MVW)
January 27, 2016 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 011116 before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (48 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck (E-mail: Maria_Weinbeck@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 612-664-5109). Redaction Request due 2/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (MVW)
January 27, 2016 Filing 315 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW)
January 27, 2016 Filing 314 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW) Modified on 1/27/2016 (JAM).
January 21, 2016 Filing 313 RESPONSE re #312 Letter to District Judge Susan Richard Nelson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
January 20, 2016 Filing 312 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ford Motor Company Requesting Continuance of Trial Date. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2016 (JAM).
January 14, 2016 Filing 311 JURY TRIAL NOTICE AND FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/16 at 9:30 am. See Trial Notice for additional deadlines. (SMD)
January 13, 2016 Filing 310 DECLARATION of Mary S. O'Neill re #308 Exhibit by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re Supplemental Authority Regarding Court's Order to Show Cause. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 13, 2016 Filing 309 EXHIBIT re #308 Exhibit No. 1 - Supplemental Authority Regarding Court's Order to Show Cause by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) copy of the Ninth Circuit Court of AppealsOpinion). (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 1/15/2016 (lmb).
January 13, 2016 Filing 308 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #302 Memorandum, by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text, link on 1/13/2016 (lmb).
January 11, 2016 Filing 307 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2016 re #288 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company, #263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer, #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. Motions taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (kt)
January 8, 2016 Filing 306 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #305 Response, of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents re Ford's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause (Wichelman, Jennifer)
January 8, 2016 Filing 305 RESPONSE re #297 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion in Limine,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order Placeholder for Defendant Ford Motor Company's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 1/08/2016 (SAE).
January 7, 2016 Filing 304 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #302 Memorandum, filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 7, 2016 Filing 303 EXHIBIT Index Page by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(O'Neill, Mary)
January 7, 2016 Filing 302 PLACEHOLDER FOR MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs In Support of Unsealing the Memorandum Opinion and Order #297 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 1/7/16. (kt)
January 5, 2016 Filing 301 Declaration of Thomas J. Murray in Support of #299 Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
January 5, 2016 Filing 300 EXHIBIT 1 to Response to Ford's Motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1)(Murray, Thomas)
January 5, 2016 Filing 299 RESPONSE re #288 MOTION for Protective Order Placeholder Filed Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #296 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jodi Munn Schebel for Ford Motor Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/30/2015. (JLW)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/30/15. (kt)
December 30, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jody Munn Schebel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4712562 by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 29, 2015 Filing 295 Declaration of Thomas J. Murray in Support of #293 Reply filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
December 29, 2015 Filing 294 EXHIBIT re #293 Reply re Ford Motor Company's Response to Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Civil Rule 37(e) by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
December 29, 2015 Filing 293 REPLY re #279 Response in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Civil Rule 37(e) filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #288 MOTION for Protective Order (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 28, 2015 Filing 291 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #288 Motion for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 28, 2015 Filing 290 MEMORANDUM in Support re #288 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 28, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #288 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified on 12/29/2015 (JAM).
December 28, 2015 Filing 288 MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 23, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of David R. Kelly for Ford Motor Company (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 23, 2015 Filing 286 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Defendant's request to file a motion for protective order [ECF # 285] is granted. (TMA)
December 22, 2015 Filing 285 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ford Motor Company Requesting Leave to File a Motion for Protective Order. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 18, 2015 Filing 284 Declaration of Jennifer K. Wichelman in Support of #282 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 18, 2015 Filing 283 AFFIDAVIT by Certification of Jay Logel re #282 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified on 12/21/2015 (las).
December 18, 2015 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 18, 2015 Filing 281 DECLARATION of Michael R. Carey in Opposition to #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Carey, Michael)
December 18, 2015 Filing 280 Declaration of Phillip Moore in Support of #279 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
December 18, 2015 Filing 279 RESPONSE in Opposition re #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
December 16, 2015 Filing 278 REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #253 Motions Hearing held on November 6, 2015, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (61 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (HAS)
December 15, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company : Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (O'Neill, Mary)
December 15, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT : Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (O'Neill, Mary)
December 11, 2015 Filing 275 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #269 Motion for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas)
December 11, 2015 Filing 274 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Murray by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. (Murray, Thomas)
December 11, 2015 Filing 273 EXHIBIT Index Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Placeholder for Exhibit 6)(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 12/11/2015 (las). Sealed document received on 12/15/2015 (SAE).
December 11, 2015 Filing 272 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #271 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Murray, Thomas)
December 11, 2015 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Support re #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas) with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Modified text on 12/11/2015 (las).
December 11, 2015 Filing 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company (Murray, Thomas)
December 11, 2015 Filing 269 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Ford Motor Company by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas) with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Modified text on 12/11/2015 (las).
December 11, 2015 Filing 268 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #263 Motion to Compel filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
December 11, 2015 Filing 267 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #266 Exhibit, filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
December 11, 2015 Filing 266 EXHIBIT re #265 Memorandum in Support of Motion EXHIBIT INDEX PAGE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for Exhibit 5)(O'Neill, Mary) Sealed documents received on 12/15/2015 (SAE).
December 11, 2015 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM in Support re #263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary) with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Modified text on 12/11/2015 (las).
December 11, 2015 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT (O'Neill, Mary)
December 11, 2015 Filing 263 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Certificate of Service. Modified on 12/11/2015 (las).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER on #259 Stipulation to Redact References to Confidential Information Disclosed During the November 6, 2015 Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/04/2015. (SMD)
December 2, 2015 Filing 261 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #259 Stipulation, Certificate of Service of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 2, 2015 Filing 260 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #259 Stipulation, Certificate of Service of Proposed Order by Jennifer K Wichelman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
December 2, 2015 Filing 259 STIPULATION re #253 Transcript,, Placeholder For Stipulation to Redact References to Confidential Information Disclosed During November 6, 2015 Hearing by Ford Motor Company. Jointly Signed by plaintiffs and Defendant. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 12/2/2015 (SAE).
November 23, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Ford Motor Company re #253 Transcript,, (Wichelman, Jennifer)
November 23, 2015 Filing 257 RESPONSE re #248 Brief, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murray, Thomas) Sealed document received on 11/30/2015 (JGK).
November 19, 2015 Filing 256 EXHIBIT re #255 Response, Plaintiffs' Response to Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Brief in Support of Renewed Motion to Preserve Confidential Designation by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Murray, Thomas)
November 19, 2015 Filing 255 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DOCUMENT RESTRICTED AS DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED UNDER SEAL - RESPONSE re #248 Brief, Ford Motor Company's Supplemental Brief in Support of Renewed Motion to Preserve Confidential Designation Pursuant to Protective Order filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 11/20/2015 (MMP). Modified text on 11/20/2015 (MMP).
November 16, 2015 Filing 254 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/6/15 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (13 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). (kt)
November 16, 2015 Filing 253 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of Motions Hearing held on November 6, 2015, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (61 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 12/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
November 16, 2015 Filing 252 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
November 13, 2015 Filing 251 EXHIBIT re #250 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Placeholder) by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 11/13/2015 (SAE).
November 13, 2015 Filing 250 DECLARATION of Jennifer K. Wichelman in SUPPORT OF #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/16/2015 (lmb).
November 13, 2015 Filing 249 DECLARATION of James Engle in SUPPORT OF #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation (Placeholder) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 11/13/2015 (SAE). Modified text on 11/16/2015 (lmb).
November 13, 2015 Filing 248 BRIEF re #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation (Placeholder) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wichelman, Jennifer) Sealed document received on 11/13/2015 (SAE).
November 6, 2015 Filing 247 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2016 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/6/15. (kt)
November 6, 2015 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2015 re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company, #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company, #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
November 5, 2015 Filing 245 EXHIBIT re #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Exhibit No. 29) by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
October 30, 2015 Filing 244 REPLY re #205 Memorandum in Support of Motion, in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
October 30, 2015 Filing 243 REPLY re #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED ON 10/30/2015 (TSS)
October 30, 2015 Filing 242 REPLY re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED ON 10/30/2015 (TSS)
October 22, 2015 Filing 241 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Ford Motor Company re #239 Reply, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
October 22, 2015 Filing 240 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Ford Motor Company re #239 Reply, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
October 22, 2015 Filing 239 REPLY re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg, #224 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Reply in Support of Ford Motor Company's Renewed Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek, #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann Replies due by 11/2/2015. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/20/2015. (SMD)
October 20, 2015 Filing 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #236 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #226 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #229 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Wichelman, Jennifer)
October 20, 2015 Filing 236 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #226 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #229 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. (Wichelman, Jennifer)
October 13, 2015 Filing 235 EXHIBIT re #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Exhibit Index Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 15, #2 EXHIBIT 16, #3 EXHIBIT 17, #4 EXHIBIT 18, #5 EXHIBIT 19, #6 EXHIBIT 20, #7 EXHIBIT 21, #8 EXHIBIT 22, #9 EXHIBIT 23, #10 EXHIBIT 24, #11 EXHIBIT 25, #12 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 26, #13 EXHIBIT 27, #14 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 28, #15 EXHIBIT 29)(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2015 (JAM). Exhibit 29 Filed Under Seal per Judge Nelson. Modified on 11/5/2015 (TSS).
October 13, 2015 Filing 234 EXHIBIT re #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Exhibit Index Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 4, #5 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 EXHIBIT 7, #8 EXHIBIT 8, #9 EXHIBIT 9, #10 Placeholder for EXHIBIT 10, #11 EXHIBIT 11, #12 EXHIBIT 12, #13 EXHIBIT 13, #14 EXHIBIT 14)(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 10/14/2015 (JAM). Sealed documents received on 10/16/2015 (JGK).
October 13, 2015 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Mary S. O'Neill re #229 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer . (O'Neill, Mary)
October 13, 2015 Filing 232 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Murray re #231 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Kari Sue Kramer . (Murray, Thomas)
October 13, 2015 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas) Sealed document received on 10/16/2015 (JGK). Sealed document received on 11/09/2015 (SAE).
October 13, 2015 Filing 230 EXHIBIT re #229 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit Index Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT 1, #2 EXHIBIT 2, #3 EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 4, #5 EXHIBIT 5, #6 EXHIBIT 6, #7 EXHIBIT 7, #8 EXHIBIT 8)(O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 10/14/2015 (JAM).
October 13, 2015 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
October 13, 2015 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Mary S. O'Neill by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer . (O'Neill, Mary)
October 13, 2015 Filing 227 EXHIBIT re #226 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion ... Exhibit Index Page... by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Placeholder - Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9)(O'Neill, Mary) Sealed document received on 10/16/2015 (JGK).
October 13, 2015 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary) Sealed document received on 10/16/2015 (JGK).
October 13, 2015 Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas) Sealed document received on 10/16/2015 (JGK).
October 12, 2015 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #221 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek, #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg, #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann. Responses due by 10/13/2015. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/30/2015. (SMD)
September 30, 2015 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #221 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg, #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek, and #208 MOTION to Preserve Confidential Designation Pursuant to Protective Order. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 30, 2015 Filing 221 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg, #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek, #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 25, 2015 Filing 220 AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2015 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 09/25/2015. (MMP)
September 17, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2015 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/17/15. (kt)
September 16, 2015 Filing 218 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #202 Meet and Confer Statement, #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg, #201 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #200 Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s))(Carey, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation (Carey, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg (Carey, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg (Carey, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann (Carey, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 212 Declaration of James Engle in Support #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2015 (lmb).
September 15, 2015 Filing 211 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #208 Motion for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM in Support re #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 209 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation : Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 208 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 207 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #206 Meet and Confer Statement, #204 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #205 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E). (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2015 (lmb).
September 15, 2015 Filing 206 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #203 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 205 MEMORANDUM in Support re #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2015 (lmb).
September 15, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek: Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2015 (lmb).
September 15, 2015 Filing 203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of David Bilek by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2015 (lmb).
September 15, 2015 Filing 202 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #199 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM in Support re #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg : Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of William Berg by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 198 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #195 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann, #196 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #194 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #197 Meet and Confer Statement filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Carey, Michael) Sealed documents received on 9/15/2015 (JGK).
September 15, 2015 Filing 197 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #193 Motion in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 196 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Ford Motor Company re #195 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support re #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael) Sealed documents received on 9/15/2015 (JGK).
September 15, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann : Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 192 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #190 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #191 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s))(Carey, Michael) Sealed documents received on 9/15/2015 (JGK).
September 15, 2015 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM in Support re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) Sealed document received on 9/15/2015 (JGK).
September 15, 2015 Filing 190 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
August 11, 2015 Filing 188 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karl Stopschinski by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Murray, Thomas)
August 10, 2015 Filing 187 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Ford Motor Company (Wichelman, Jennifer)
July 9, 2015 Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karl Stopschinski by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Murray, Thomas)
July 1, 2015 Filing 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Engle by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Murray, Thomas)
March 31, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas J. Murray, Jr (Murray, Thomas)
March 31, 2015 Filing 183 DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Plaintiff's Suppemental Expert Witness Designation by Kari Sue Kramer.(Kestner, Peter)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #136 Motion to Appoint Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order, as set forth in the Order. The deadlines in the scheduling order are amended as follows: (a). If Plaintiffs decide to amend the expert report of Neil Hannemann as allowed herein, full disclosure of the substance of his amended testimony shall be made by Plaintiffs on or before March 31, 2015. If Defendant decides to amend the report of any of its expert witnesses in response, full disclosure of the substance of the testimony to be offered by those witnesses shall be made by Defendant on or before June 1, 2015. (b). If Defendant decides to re-depose Mr. Hannemann, it shall do so on or before June 1, 2015. If Defendant submits an amended report of any of its experts, Plaintiffs may re-depose those witnesses on or before July 31, 2015. (c). All motions for summary judgment and motions to exclude expert testimony shall be filed and served on or before September 15, 2015. (d). This case shall be ready for trial on and after January 15, 2016, at which time it will be placed on the Court's jury trial calendar. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/29/15. (SMD)
November 21, 2014 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company re #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 10, 2014 Filing 179 EXHIBIT re #178 Exhibit,, by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibit 8)(Murray, Thomas)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 11/17/14LGL Modified on 11/18/2014 (LGL).
November 7, 2014 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Settlement Conference held on 11/7/2014. No settlement reached- A follow up settlement conference will be scheduled in early 2015. (kt)
November 6, 2014 Filing 178 EXHIBIT re #177 Memorandum in Support of Motion, for the Appointment of Dr. Todd Hubing by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, p. 1-25, #3 Exhibit(s) No. 2, p. 26-50, #4 Exhibit(s) No. 3, p. 1-13, #5 Exhibit(s) No. 3, 14-26, #6 Exhibit(s) No. 4, #7 Exhibit(s) No. 5, #8 Exhibit(s) No. 6, #9 Exhibit(s) No. 7, Exhibit 8 FILED IN ERROR-DOCUMENT RESTRICTED AS DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED UNDER SEAL: #10 Exhibit(s) No. 8)(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 11/7/2014 (TSS).
November 6, 2014 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in Support re #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
October 29, 2014 Filing 176 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: The settlement conference that is scheduled for November 7, 2014 will begin at 9:30 a.m.rather than 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Noel, courtroom 9W. (TMA)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER setting schedule for supplemental briefing re:Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 #136 . See order for details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/24/2014. (SMD)
October 16, 2014 Filing 174 REPORT Clemson University's Dr. Todd Hubing's October 6, 2014 Technical Report filed per instruction of Judge Nelson by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 25, 2014 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on September 12, 2014, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (104 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 10/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
September 25, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
September 17, 2014 Filing 171 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ford Motor Company . (Carey, Michael)
September 12, 2014 Filing 170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2014 re #136 Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
September 10, 2014 Filing 169 AMENDED NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/10/14. (kt)
August 25, 2014 Filing 168 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ford Motor Company regarding attendance at settlement conference. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
August 21, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2014 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/21/14. (kt)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying without prejudice #64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice #69 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying without prejudice #75 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying without prejudice #81 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying as moot and without prejudice #117 Motion for Protective Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 08/20/2014. (SMD)
July 31, 2014 Filing 165 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ford Motor Company re settlement discussion. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying as moot #149 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/23/14. (kt)
May 19, 2014 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2014 re #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (kt)
May 14, 2014 Filing 162 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Murray re #159 Reply, by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer . (Murray, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 Filing 161 EXHIBIT re #160 Exhibit, Placeholder for Exhibit No. 3 - previously filed under seal as Exhibit 3 to ECF Docket #137 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
May 14, 2014 Filing 160 EXHIBIT re #159 Reply, Exhibit Index Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), EXHIBIT #3 FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Murray, Thomas) Modified on 5/14/2014 (JAM).
May 14, 2014 Filing 159 REPLY re #157 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Reply to Ford Motor Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Appointment of Todd H. Hubing as Rule 706 Expert filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas)
May 7, 2014 Filing 158 DECLARATION of Michael R. Carey in Opposition to #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Carey, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
April 17, 2014 Filing 155 EXHIBIT re #154 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit No. 3)(O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Support re #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses (O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 152 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #149 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 151 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses : Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (O'Neill, Mary)
April 17, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Trial Depositions of Other Similar Incident Witnesses by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
April 15, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Charles Bennett (O'Neill, Mary)
April 15, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ed Beegle (O'Neill, Mary)
April 15, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Kathleen A. Vasinko (O'Neill, Mary)
April 15, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of June Clark (O'Neill, Mary)
April 15, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Stan Clark (O'Neill, Mary)
April 11, 2014 Filing 143 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Rescheduling of Hearing: The Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson on #136 MOTION to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706, is now rescheduled to 9/12/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (LPH)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #136 MOTION to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the trial- ready date is GRANTED. The amended trial-ready date is November 1, 2014. See order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/26/14. (LPH)
March 20, 2014 Filing 141 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #136 Motion to Appoint Expert filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
March 20, 2014 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Service of Proposed Orders by Thomas J. Murray, Jr on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
March 20, 2014 Filing 139 EXHIBIT re #137 Memorandum in Support of Motion, to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, #3 Placeholder for Exhibit No. 3 - filed under seal, #4 Exhibit(s) No. 4-A, #5 Exhibit(s) No. 4-B, #6 Exhibit(s) No. 4-C, #7 Exhibit(s) No. 4-D, #8 Exhibit(s) No. 5, #9 Exhibit(s) No. 6, #10 Exhibit(s) No. 7)(Murray, Thomas)
March 20, 2014 Filing 138 Declaration of Thomas J. Murray in Support of #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas)
March 20, 2014 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM in Support re #136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Motion to Appoint Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Murray, Thomas)
March 20, 2014 Filing 136 MOTION to Appoint Expert Professor Todd H. Hubing as an Expert Pursuant to Federal Evidence Rule 706 and to Amend the Scheduling Order by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Murray, Thomas) Modified on 3/20/2014 (jam).
March 17, 2014 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Supplemental Answers to Defendant's First Interrogatories by Mary S. O'Neill on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 3/18/2014 (jam).
March 17, 2014 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production by Mary S. O'Neill on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 3/18/2014 (jam).
March 12, 2014 Filing 133 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 2/28/14 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Court Reporter: Ronald J. Moen. (67pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY UNDER SEAL. (kt)
March 11, 2014 Filing 132 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT (Excerpt) of Motions Hearing held on 2/28/2014 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (57 pages). Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 4/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (RJM)
March 11, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RJM)
February 28, 2014 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2014 re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company, #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company, #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company, #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company, #117 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (LPH)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #128 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James L Murray for Kari Sue Kramer and Paul Kramer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/26/2014. (KMM)
February 24, 2014 Filing 128 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James L. Murray. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3877571 by Kari Sue Kramer. (McEwen, Gregory) Modified event on 2/26/2014 (MGV).
February 14, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Edgar F. Heiskell, III Withdrawal (O'Neill, Mary)
February 13, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiffs (Atkinson, Nathan)
February 6, 2014 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #122 Response in Opposition to Motion, Certificate of Service of Conventionally Filed/Sealed Documents (Murray, Thomas)
February 6, 2014 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Murray by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Preserve Confidentiality. (Murray, Thomas)
February 6, 2014 Filing 123 EXHIBIT re #122 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit List Page by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s))(Murray, Thomas)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 2/10/14LGL Modified on 2/13/2014 (LGL).
February 6, 2014 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation Placeholder - Filed Under Seal filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 2/10/14LGL Modified on 2/13/2014 (LGL).
January 29, 2014 Filing 121 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #117 Motion for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 29, 2014 Filing 120 Declaration of Jennifer K. Huelskoetter in Support of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 29, 2014 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Support re #117 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 29, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #117 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 29, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Confidential Designation by Ford Motor Company. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 29, 2014 Filing 116 Declaration of Thomas J. Murray in Support of #93 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 29, 2014 Filing 115 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #91 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 29, 2014 Filing 114 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #89 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 29, 2014 Filing 113 Declaration of Mary S. O'Neill in Support of #87 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
January 24, 2014 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek AMENDED filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Amended)(O'Neill, Mary)
January 24, 2014 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann AMENDED filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Amended)(O'Neill, Mary)
January 24, 2014 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg AMENDED filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Amended)(O'Neill, Mary)
January 24, 2014 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment AMENDED filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 1/27/14LGL Modified on 1/27/2014 (LGL).
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re #106 Stipulation. Ford Motor Company must file its Motion for Confidential Designation and Protective Order as to Exhibit 1 of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before January 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/23/14. (LPH)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Order dated July 5, 2012 (Doc. 16) be amended in the following particulars: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 01/17/2014. (MMP)
January 22, 2014 Filing 106 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY TO FILE MOTION FOR CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Ford Motor Company. Jointly Signed by Kari Sue Kramer and Paul Kramer. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 18, 2014 Filing 105 AMENDED REPLY re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2014 (kt).
January 18, 2014 Filing 104 AMENDED REPLY re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2014 (kt).
January 18, 2014 Filing 103 REPLY re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 18, 2014 Filing 102 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED. REPLY re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2014 (kt).
January 18, 2014 Filing 101 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED. REPLY re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2014 (kt).
January 18, 2014 Filing 100 REPLY re #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that Ford Motor Company must file its reply memoranda in support of its summary judgment motion and motions in limine to exclude testimony and opinions of Neil Hannemann, David Bilek and William Berg on or before January 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/3/14. (kt)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re #96 Stipulation. Ford Motor Company must file its reply memoranda in support of its summary judgment motion and motions in limine to exclude testimony and opinions of Neil Hannemann, David Bilek and William Berg on or before January 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/2/14. (LPH)
December 31, 2013 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #96 Stipulation, to Extend Deadline for Ford Motor Company to File Reply Memoranda in Support of its Summary Judgment Motion and Motions In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann, David Bilek and William Berg (Carey, Michael)
December 31, 2013 Filing 96 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Ford Motor Company to File a Reply Memoranda in Support of its Summary Judgment Motion and Motions In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Neil Hannemann, David Bilek and William Berg by Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs. (Carey, Michael)
December 23, 2013 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #94 Exhibit, #93 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Murray, Thomas)
December 23, 2013 Filing 94 EXHIBIT re #93 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, #3 Exhibit(s) No. 3, #4 Exhibit(s) No. 4, #5 Exhibit(s) No. 5, #6 Exhibit(s) No. 6, #7 Exhibit(s) No. 7, #8 Exhibit(s) No. 8)(Murray, Thomas)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/26/13 LGL Modified on 12/26/2013 (LGL).SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/26/13 LGL Modified on 12/26/2013 (LGL).
December 23, 2013 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Murray, Thomas) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/26/13 LGLModified on 12/26/2013 (LGL).
December 23, 2013 Filing 92 EXHIBIT re #91 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, #3 Exhibit(s) No. 3, #4 Exhibit(s) No. 4, #5 Exhibit(s) No. 5, #6 Exhibit(s) No. 6, #7 Exhibit(s) No. 7, #8 Exhibit(s) No. 8, #9 Exhibit(s) No. 9)(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2013 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2013 Filing 90 EXHIBIT re #89 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, #3 Exhibit(s) No. 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for No. 4, #5 Exhibit(s) No. 5)(O'Neill, Mary)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/26/13 LGL Modified on 12/26/2013 (LGL).
December 23, 2013 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2013 Filing 88 EXHIBIT re #87 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Ford's Motion to Exclude William Berg by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) No. 1, #2 Exhibit(s) No. 2, #3 Exhibit(s) No. 3, #4 Exhibit(s) No. 4)(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2013 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Neill, Mary)
November 27, 2013 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 85 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #81 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 84 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 81 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Berg by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 79 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #75 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 78 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support re #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Bilek by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 73 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #69 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 72 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Placeholder for Exhibit B, #3 Placeholder for Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Carey, Michael)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/2/13 LGL Modified on 12/4/2013 (LGL).
November 27, 2013 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/2/13 LGL Modified on 12/4/2013 (LGL).
November 27, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 69 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Neil Hannemann by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Ford Motor Company re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 67 Declaration of Michael R. Carey in Support of #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Placeholder for Exhibit D, #5 Placeholder for Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Carey, Michael)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/3/13 LGL Modified on 12/4/2013 (LGL).
November 27, 2013 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carey, Michael) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/2/13 LGL Modified on 12/4/2013 (LGL).
November 27, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 63 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (LPH) Modified on 11/4/2013 (las).
October 14, 2013 Filing 62 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
September 30, 2013 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against Ford Motor Company. Filed by Paul Kramer, Kari Sue Kramer. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (O'Neill, Mary)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) that the Complaint be amended to reflect (1) the dismissal with prejudice of defendant Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc. and (2) the dismissal of Counts Seven and Eight against defendant Ford Motor Company relating to an alleged seatback defect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/23/13. (kt)
September 20, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint by Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(O'Neill, Mary)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Niall A Paul for Kari Sue Kramer,Paul Kramer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 09/18/2013. (MAP)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan B Atkinson for Kari Sue Kramer,Paul Kramer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 09/18/2013. (MAP)
September 18, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Niall A. Paul. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3700468 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (McEwen, Gregory)
September 18, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan B. Atkinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3700447 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (McEwen, Gregory)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #53 Stipulation of Dismissal of Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/22/13. (LPH)
July 19, 2013 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc. by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S LIFE CARE PLANNER DISCLOSURE DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/3/13. (kt)
July 1, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #27 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, #50 Order by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Carey, Michael)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/29/13. (kt)
May 29, 2013 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company re #48 Stipulation Motion for Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
May 29, 2013 Filing 48 STIPULATION Motion for Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
May 8, 2013 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #46 Witness List (O'Neill, Mary)
May 8, 2013 Filing 46 Witness List by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
May 1, 2013 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Service re #44 Witness List by Mary S. O'Neill on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 5/2/2013 (akl).
May 1, 2013 Filing 44 Witness List by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
April 30, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Third Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) (O'Neill, Mary)
April 11, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE to Take Deposition of defendant Ford Motor Company by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(O'Neill, Mary)
March 28, 2013 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer For Plaintiffs' Answers to Ford Motor Company's Third Set of Requests for Admission (O'Neill, Mary)
March 28, 2013 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer For Plaintiffs' Answers to Ford Motor Company's Third Set of Interrogatories (O'Neill, Mary)
March 28, 2013 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer For Plaintiffs' Answers to Ford Motor Company's Fourth Request for Production (O'Neill, Mary)
March 11, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) (O'Neill, Mary)
March 8, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative of Ford Motor Company by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(O'Neill, Mary) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DOCUMENT SEALED. (kt)
March 8, 2013 Filing 36 EXHIBIT re #32 Witness List Revised Exhibits H - V to Plaintiffs Expert Witness Designations (Doc #32) by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary)
March 6, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc. by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(O'Neill, Mary)
March 5, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc. by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(O'Neill, Mary)
March 1, 2013 Filing 33 Certificate of Service by Mary S. O'Neill on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #32 Witness List . (O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 3/4/2013 (akl).
March 1, 2013 Filing 32 Witness List by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), ATTACHMENT #2 FILED IN ERROR-PAGES MISSING-WILL REFILE. #2 Exhibit(s)). (O'Neill, Mary) Modified text on 3/8/2013 (lmb).
February 25, 2013 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Requests by Mary S. O'Neill on behalf of Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 2/26/2013 (akl).
February 20, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Second Subpoena for Production of Documents to Sprint Nextel (Carey, Michael)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/5/13. (akl)
February 4, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company. (Wikoff, David)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery due by 4/1/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/17/13. (akl)
January 17, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Subpoena for Production of Documents to Sprint Nextel (Carey, Michael)
January 16, 2013 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer re #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (O'Neill, Mary)
January 16, 2013 Filing 24 Stipulation in Support of Amendment of Scheduling Order by Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-(Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(O'Neill, Mary) Modified on 1/16/2013 (akl).
December 7, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) witness by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/12/12. (akl)
September 6, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order by Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO PRESERVE THE SUBJECT VEHICLE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/2/12. (akl)
August 1, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Preserve Subject Vehicle by Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
August 1, 2012 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari Sue Kramer of Discovery Requests (O'Neill, Mary)
July 23, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kari Sue Kramer of Filing Discovery Requests (O'Neill, Mary)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2012. Discovery due by 2/1/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 10/1/2013. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2013. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/3/2012. (JME)
July 3, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Service of Subpoena on National Casualty Insurance and Scottsdale Insurance Company (Carey, Michael)
July 3, 2012 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/3/2012. (akl)
June 26, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Edgar F. Heiskell III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3221983 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Kestner, Peter)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY-ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edgar F. Heiskell, III for Kari Sue Kramer,Paul Kramer. Fee paid; receipt number 0864-3221983. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/26/2012. (MAP)
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company, Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Huelskoetter, Jennifer)
June 22, 2012 Filing 11 DISCLOSURES Rule 26(a)(1) by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer.(Kestner, Peter)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY-ORDER granting #9 #10 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Thomas J. Murray, Jr,Mary S. O'Neill for Kari Sue Kramer,for Paul Kramer. Fees paid; receipt numbers 0864-3202342, 0864-3202358. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/7/2012. (MAP)
June 5, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mary (Molly) S. O'Neill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3202358 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Kestner, Peter)
June 5, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Murray. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3202342 by Kari Sue Kramer, Paul Kramer. (Kestner, Peter)
May 22, 2012 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ENTRY-ORDER granting #6 #7 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Elizabeth B. Wright,Jennifer Mingus Mountcastle for Ford Motor Company. Fees paid; receipt number 4-65052. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/21/2012. (MAP)
May 18, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Mingus Mountcastle by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
May 18, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth B. Wright by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
May 16, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/16/12. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(RLR)
May 15, 2012 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Carey, Michael)
May 11, 2012 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal. (MMP)
May 11, 2012 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Ford Motor Company hereby states that it has no parent corporation and that there are publicly-traded corporations that may, from time to time, own more than 10% of Ford's stock as trustee or independent fiduciary for various employee plans. The most recent trustee owner in this capacity is State Street Corporation.(MMP)
May 11, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-64873) assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel. Filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint with Attached Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Sue Kramer
Represented By: Brooke D Anthony
Represented By: James L Murray
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Represented By: Mary S. O'Neill
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Gregory N McEwen
Represented By: Nathan B Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A Paul
Represented By: Peter J Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kramer
Represented By: Brooke D Anthony
Represented By: James L Murray
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Represented By: Mary S. O'Neill
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Edgar F. Heiskell, III
Represented By: Gregory N McEwen
Represented By: Nathan B Atkinson
Represented By: Niall A Paul
Represented By: Peter J Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Alina Alonso Rodriguez
Represented By: Jodi Munn Schebel
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wright
Represented By: Jennifer K Wichelman
Represented By: Michael R Carey
Represented By: David R Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer Mingus Mountcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomington Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wright
Represented By: Jennifer K Wichelman
Represented By: Michael R Carey
Represented By: David R Kelly
Represented By: David A Wikoff
Represented By: Jennifer Mingus Mountcastle
Represented By: Michael W McNee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?