Vang v. Prataya et al
Plaintiff: Panyia Vang
Defendant: Thiawachu Prataya, Chong Neng Xiong, ABC Companies 1-10, DEF Companies 1-10, DEF Corporations 1-10, ABC Corporations 1-10 and Asian Community Special Services, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Chong Neng Xiong and Thiawachu Prataya
Counter_defendant: Panyia Vang
Case Number: 0:2012cv01847
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Joan N. Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER: Prataya's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial [Docket No. 339 ] is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on August 29, 2017. (CBC)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER: (1) Vang's Motion to Allow Renewal of the Parties' Dispositive Motions, Reversal of Stay Order and for a Scheduling Order [Docket No. 251 ] and Prataya's Responsive Motion to Plaintiff's Motion to Renew [Docket No. 260 ] are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motions are granted with respect to lifting the stay and renewing the parties' dispositive motions. The motions are otherwise denied. (2) The stay [Docket No. 244 ] is lifted. The requirement to f ile quarterly status reports is set aside. (3) Vang's motion for summary judgment [Docket No. 204 ] is DENIED. (4) Prataya's motion for judgment on the pleadings and for summary judgment [Docket No. 206 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (5) Vang's claims under § 2255 for violations of § 2241, § 2422, § 2423(a), § 2423(b), and § 2423(d) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (6) The Court will notify the parties of the placement of this action on a trial calendar in due course. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 30, 2017. (CBC)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on November 29, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on November 21, 2012. (CBC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vang v. Prataya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panyia Vang
Represented By: Linda A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thiawachu Prataya
Represented By: Der Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong Neng Xiong
Represented By: Der Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Community Special Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chong Neng Xiong
Represented By: Der Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Thiawachu Prataya
Represented By: Der Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Panyia Vang
Represented By: Linda A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?