Smith v. Questar Capital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
James W. Smith, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Questar Capital Corporation, Yorktown Financial Companies, Inc. and Allianz Life Insurance Companies of North America |
Case Number: |
0:2012cv02669 |
Filed: |
October 18, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Tony N. Leung |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Richard Nelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 30, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting 75 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Directing Distribution of the Class Action Settlement Notice, Setting a Final Approval Hearing, and Preliminarily Enjoining Parallel Proceedings (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/30/15. (SMD)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion): 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 3, 6, and 8 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging violations of the Minnesota Securities Act is DENIED. 2. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 4 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligence is GRANTED. 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 5 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligent misrepresentation is DENIED. 4. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 7 of the First Amended Class Acton Complaint alleging common law breach of contract is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 06/06/2014. (SMD)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint [Doc. No. 16] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART consistent with this Order: 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 3, 6, and 7 of the Class Action Complaint alleging violations of the Minnesota Securities Act is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 4 of the Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligence is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE . 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 5 of the Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligent misrepresentation is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER HERBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/2/13. (LPH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?