Dane Technologies, Inc. v. Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dane Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Dane Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2012cv02730
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 376 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 308 Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.'s First Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 313 Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 318 Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.'s Third Moti on for Summary Judgment; granting 323 Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.'s Fourth Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 327 Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.'s Fifth Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 338 Dane Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 09/29/2015. (TLU)
March 2, 2015 300 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Overruling 279 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION; Magistrate Judge Keyes January 20, 2015 Order 274 is AFFIRMED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03-02-15. (TLU)
October 17, 2014 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION; in interpreting the '379 Patent, the '836 Patent, and the '979 Patent the disputed terms will be construed in accordance with this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 10/17/2014. (TLU)
July 14, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that in interpreting the '379 Patent, the '836 Patent, and the '979 Patent the disputed terms will be construed in accordance with this Order (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 07/14/2014. (TLU)
August 20, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/20/2013. (TLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dane Technologies, Inc. v. Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David R Fairbairn
Represented By: Michael K. Friedland
Represented By: Catherine Shultz
Represented By: Nicholas M Zovko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David R Fairbairn
Represented By: Michael K. Friedland
Represented By: Catherine Shultz
Represented By: Nicholas M Zovko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dane Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?