Hoyt et al v. Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Steven B. Hoyt and Bradley A Hoyt |
Defendant: |
Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Inc., Ritz-Carlton Management Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C., The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Ritz-Carlton Sales Company, Inc., The and Ritz-Carlton Development Co., Inc., The |
Case Number: |
0:2012cv03093 |
Filed: |
December 11, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
County: |
Hennepin |
Presiding Judge: |
David S. Doty |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeffrey J. Keyes |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 107 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; the objections to the order granting in part the motion to compel discovery are sustained re 111 ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/6/2014. (PJM)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting in part consistent with this order 45 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part consistent with this order 51 Motion to Dismiss, (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/7/2014. (PJM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Hoyt et al v. Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Steven B. Hoyt |
Represented By: |
Charles S Zimmerman |
Represented By: |
Anne T Regan |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bradley A Hoyt |
Represented By: |
Charles S Zimmerman |
Represented By: |
Anne T Regan |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ritz-Carlton Management Co., LLC, The |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C., The |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ritz-Carlton Sales Company, Inc., The |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ritz-Carlton Development Co., Inc., The |
Represented By: |
Michael T Nilan |
Represented By: |
Courtney E Ward-Reichard |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?