Carlson v. Dooly et al
Plaintiff: |
David R Carlson |
Defendant: |
Johnson, Holt and Becky Dooly |
Case Number: |
0:2013cv00241 |
Filed: |
January 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
County: |
Carlton |
Presiding Judge: |
Joan N. Ericksen |
Presiding Judge: |
Jeanne J. Graham |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 2, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER: Plaintiff is assessed the $455 appellate filing fees. The prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated shall pay the $12.00 initial partial appellate filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Co urt. The prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated shall pay the remaining balance of his appellate filing fees, $443.00, from his account to the Clerk of Court in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP on appeal [Docket No. 15] is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall send copies of this Order to Plaintiff, to the prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated, and to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 1, 2013. (CBC)
|
June 27, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on June 27, 2013. (CBC)
|
April 24, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 8 - Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 2 , is DENIED. This action is summarily DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff is required to pay the unpai d balance of the Court filing fee, namely the sum of $338.00, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel and discovery, 4 , are DENIED. The dismissal of this action shall be counted as a "strike" against Plaintiff for purposes of 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g).(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 24, 2013. (CBC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?