Lindsay et al v. Clear Wireless LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Owens and Kenneth Lindsay
Defendant: ABE Services, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc., Workforce Logic LLC, ABE Services doing business as Workforce Logic, Workforce Logic LLC a Zero Chaos Company doing business as Workforce Logic and APC Workforce Solutions, LLC doing business as Zero Chaos
Case Number: 0:2013cv00834
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Aitkin
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Franklin L Noel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #481 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The motion for review of taxation of costs [ECF No. 481] is granted; and 2. The cost judgments [ECF Nos. 477, 478, 479] are reversed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/31/2016. (DLO) Modified docket text on 5/31/2016 (TSS).
May 31, 2016 Filing 490 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeDoux, Dean)
May 27, 2016 Filing 489 RESPONSE re #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
May 24, 2016 Filing 488 RESPONSE re #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lassetter, John)
May 18, 2016 Filing 487 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs (Jones, Jarvis)
May 18, 2016 Filing 486 Declaration of Kenneth Lindsay in Support of #483 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 18, 2016 Filing 485 Declaration of Jesse Owens in Support of #483 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 18, 2016 Filing 484 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #481 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 18, 2016 Filing 483 MEMORANDUM in Support re #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 18, 2016 Filing 482 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs: No Hearing Requested. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/18/2016 (lmb).
May 18, 2016 Filing 481 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 17, 2016 Filing 480 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENTS. MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Declaration of Kenneth Lindsay, #3 Declaration of Jesse Owens)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/18/2016 (lmb).
May 4, 2016 Filing 479 COST JUDGMENT in favor of APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC against Jesse Owens, Kenneth Lindsay (Attachments: #1 Taxation of Costs Summary)(TP)
May 4, 2016 Filing 478 COST JUDGMENT in favor of ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. against Jesse Owens, Kenneth Lindsay (Attachments: #1 Taxation of Costs Summary)(TP)
May 4, 2016 Filing 477 COST JUDGMENT in favor of Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation against Jesse Owens, Kenneth Lindsay (Attachments: #1 Taxation of Costs Summary)(TP)
April 28, 2016 Filing 476 Response to Objection to Bill of Costss re #473 Objection to Bill of Costs, by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
April 28, 2016 Filing 475 RESPONSE re #473 Objection to Bill of Costs, filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 27, 2016 Filing 474 Response to Objection to Bill of Costs re #473 by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Lassetter, John) Modified text on 4/28/2016 (LEG).
April 21, 2016 Filing 473 OBJECTION to Bill of Costs re #471 Bill of Costs, #469 Bill of Costs, #467 Bill of Costs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exh. 1-4, #2 Attorney's Affidavit of Record)(Jones, Jarvis)
April 7, 2016 Filing 472 DECLARATION of Dean A. LeDoux re #471 Bill of Costs by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(LeDoux, Dean)
April 7, 2016 Filing 471 BILL OF COSTS and Itemization by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
April 6, 2016 Filing 470 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox re #469 Bill of Costs, by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 6, 2016 Filing 469 BILL OF COSTS by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Itemization and Documentation of Fees of the Court Reporters, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Itemization of Costs for Copies)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 1, 2016 Filing 468 DECLARATION of John H. Lassetter re #467 Bill of Costs by Clear Wireless LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Lassetter, John)
April 1, 2016 Filing 467 BILL OF COSTS by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Itemization and Documentation)(Lassetter, John)
March 10, 2016 Filing 466 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal). (lmb)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER granting #410 Motion to Decertify the Class; granting #413 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #416 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #419 Motion to Decertify the Class; granting #422 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #427 Motion to Decertify the Class.(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/10/2016. (DLO)
December 18, 2015 Filing 464 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Jarvis Jones for plaintiffs; Kerry Middleton; Dean LeDoux; Joyce Ackerbaum Cox for defendants; Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2015 re #413 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clearwire Corporation, Clear Wireless LLC, #419 MOTION for Decertification filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc., #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, #427 MOTION to Decertify the Conditional Class filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, #410 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Clearwire Corporation, Clear Wireless LLC & #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. - argued and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (CLB)
December 17, 2015 Filing 463 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE Re: Hearing set 12/18/2015 at 9:00 a.m. for a total of 45 minutes. The summary judgment and decertification motions shall be argued together. Defendants have a total of 30 minutes, including rebuttal, to be divided as they see fit. Plaintiff shall have a total of 15 minutes. (CLB)
December 11, 2015 Filing 462 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #461 Reply filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-G)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
December 11, 2015 Filing 461 REPLY re #444 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Decertification filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
December 11, 2015 Filing 460 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #459 Reply, filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
December 11, 2015 Filing 459 REPLY re #445 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #441 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Summary Judgment filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
December 11, 2015 Filing 458 REPLY re #411 Memorandum in Support of Motion, to DeCertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-in Plaintiffs filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Middleton, Kerry)
December 11, 2015 Filing 457 REPLY re #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Middleton, Kerry)
December 11, 2015 Filing 456 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #454 Reply to Response to Motion. (LeDoux, Dean)
December 11, 2015 Filing 455 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #453 Reply to Response to Motion. (LeDoux, Dean)
December 11, 2015 Filing 454 Reply to Response to Motion re #419 MOTION for Decertification filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeDoux, Dean)
December 11, 2015 Filing 453 Reply to Response to Motion re #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeDoux, Dean)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting requests for extension re #450 Letter to District Judge filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc., #449 Letter to District Judge filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/2/2015. (DLO)
December 2, 2015 Filing 451 DECLARATION of Jarvis Jones, re #448 Placeholder for Exhibits 1- 147 (Served on 11-27-15) in Opposition to #444 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #443 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #445 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text, link on 12/2/2015 (lmb).
December 1, 2015 Filing 450 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. . (LeDoux, Dean)
December 1, 2015 Filing 449 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Knoblauch, Mary)
December 1, 2015 Filing 448 EXHIBIT re #444 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #443 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #445 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Placeholder for Exhibits 1-147 in Support of Plaintiffs' Collective Response Memorandums in Opposition to Defendants' Collective Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions for Decertification by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
December 1, 2015 Filing 447 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Kenneth Lindsay re #444 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Jones, Jarvis)
December 1, 2015 Filing 446 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Kenneth Lindsay re #445 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Jones, Jarvis)
November 30, 2015 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Joint Response Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' GDNA/WFL and Zerochaos/WFL Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
November 30, 2015 Filing 444 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #419 MOTION for Decertification, #427 MOTION to Decertify the Conditional Class , #410 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs Joint Response Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Collective Motions for Decertification filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
November 30, 2015 Filing 443 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #413 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response Memorandum in Opposition to Clearwire and Clear Wireless' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
November 25, 2015 Filing 442 DECLARATION of Kerry L. Middleton re #441 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-15)(Middleton, Kerry)
November 25, 2015 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Middleton, Kerry)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER Overruling re #439 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Kenneth Lindsay (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/25/2015. (DLO)
November 16, 2015 Filing 439 OBJECTION TO COURT ORDER, ECF DOC. NO. #430 by Kenneth Lindsay filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 11/17/2015 (LEG). Modified event on 11/18/15. (LEG).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING re #437 Letter to District Judge filed by Kenneth Lindsay. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/16/2015. (DLO)
November 13, 2015 Filing 437 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay . (Jones, Jarvis)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER Denying re #431 Letter to District Judge filed by Kenneth Lindsay (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/5/2015. (DLO)
November 4, 2015 Filing 435 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay . (Jones, Jarvis)
November 4, 2015 Filing 434 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. . (LeDoux, Dean)
November 4, 2015 Filing 433 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation . (Middleton, Kerry)
November 4, 2015 Filing 432 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Workforce Logic LLC . (Knoblauch, Mary)
November 3, 2015 Filing 431 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay Dispositive Motion: Word Limit. (Jones, Jarvis)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #387 Motion to Compel and #393 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/2/15. (LPH)
October 30, 2015 Filing 429 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #427 MOTION to Decertify the Conditional Class filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-EE, #2 Exhibit(s) FF-FFF)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 428 MEMORANDUM in Support re #427 MOTION to Decertify the Conditional Class filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 427 MOTION to Decertify the Conditional Class by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 426 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 425 Declaration in Support of #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 424 AFFIDAVIT in SUPPORT OF #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-26)(LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 423 MEMORANDUM in Support re #422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #419 MOTION for Decertification of Class (LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM in Support re #419 MOTION for Decertification of Class filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 419 MOTION for Decertification by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
October 30, 2015 Filing 418 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-P)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM in Support re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 416 MOTION for Summary Judgment by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
October 30, 2015 Filing 415 Declaration of Kerry L. Middleton in Support of #413 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-14, #2 Exhibit(s))(Middleton, Kerry)
October 30, 2015 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in Support re #413 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Middleton, Kerry)
October 30, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Middleton, Kerry)
October 30, 2015 Filing 412 Declaration of John H. Lassetter in Support of #410 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-15, #2 Exhibit(s) 16-23, #3 Exhibit(s) 24-32, #4 Exhibit(s) 33-49, #5 Exhibit(s) 50-51)(Lassetter, John)
October 30, 2015 Filing 411 MEMORANDUM in Support re #410 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lassetter, John)
October 30, 2015 Filing 410 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action and Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Lassetter, John)
October 19, 2015 Filing 409 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2015 re #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs filed by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. Order to issue. (LPH)
October 14, 2015 Filing 408 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION of Defendants Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc., and ABE Services on Motions for Class Decertification and Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (LeDoux, Dean)
October 6, 2015 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Lassetter on behalf of Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Middleton, Kerry) Modified text on 10/7/2015 (LEG).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #349 Motion for Protective Order. ABE Services/GDNAs motion for a protective order [#359] and APC Workforce Solutions/Workforce Logic's motion for a protective order [#367] are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 10/2/15. (LPH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 405 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2015 re #349 . ABE Services/GDNAs motion for a protective order [#359] and APC Workforce Solutions/Workforce Logic's motion for a protective order [#367] are both moot. See ECF No. 404. Order to issue. (LPH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 404 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay. (LPH)
September 9, 2015 Filing 403 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION for Decertification and Summary Judgment brought by Defendants Workforce Logic LLC, d/b/a Workforce Logic and APC Workforce Solutions, LLC d/b/a ZeroChaos Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 9/10/2015 (LEG).
September 8, 2015 Filing 402 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C Jones in OPPOSITION TO #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms, #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Lindsay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 8, 2015 Filing 401 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms, #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Lindsay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 4, 2015 Filing 400 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Motion for Decertification and Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Laws, Stephanie) Modified text on 9/4/2015 (lmb).
September 4, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION for Decertification and Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Laws, Stephanie)
September 1, 2015 Filing 398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC re #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 397 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #393 Motion to Compel filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 396 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 395 MEMORANDUM in Support re #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 393 MOTION to Compel Discovery of Tax-Related Documents, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiffs to Execute IRS Tax Release Forms by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 1, 2015 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs (LeDoux, Dean)
September 1, 2015 Filing 391 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #389 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (LeDoux, Dean)
September 1, 2015 Filing 390 AFFIDAVIT in SUPPORT OF #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs filed by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(LeDoux, Dean)
September 1, 2015 Filing 389 MEMORANDUM in Support re #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs filed by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
September 1, 2015 Filing 388 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (LeDoux, Dean)
September 1, 2015 Filing 387 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs by Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
August 25, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens (Jones, Jarvis)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #343 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/21/15. (LPH)
August 11, 2015 Filing 384 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
August 10, 2015 Filing 383 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Jones, Jarvis)
August 10, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION: #349 MOTION for Protective Order , #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions, #367 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing continued to 9/21/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (LPH)
August 10, 2015 Filing 381 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2015 re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Order to issue. (LPH)
August 4, 2015 Filing 380 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Hall, Daniel)
July 24, 2015 Filing 379 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in OPPOSITION TO #367 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 24, 2015 Filing 378 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #367 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 23, 2015 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless CORRECTED filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
July 23, 2015 Filing 376 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #375 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
July 23, 2015 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
July 21, 2015 Filing 374 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in OPPOSITION TO #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 21, 2015 Filing 373 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 17, 2015 Filing 372 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC re #367 MOTION for Protective Order (Hall, Daniel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 371 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #367 Motion for Protective Order filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 370 Declaration of Daniel R. Hall in Support of #367 MOTION for Protective Order filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Hall, Daniel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM in Support re #367 MOTION for Protective Order filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 368 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #367 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Hall, Daniel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 367 MOTION for Protective Order by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
July 15, 2015 Filing 366 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in OPPOSITION TO #349 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Placeholder for Exhibit 7, #8 Placeholder for Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Placeholder for Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit(s) 24)(Jones, Jarvis) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE on 7/16/2015 (las).
July 14, 2015 Filing 365 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #349 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 14, 2015 Filing 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (LeDoux, Dean)
July 14, 2015 Filing 363 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. re #361 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
July 14, 2015 Filing 362 AFFIDAVIT in SUPPORT OF #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(LeDoux, Dean)
July 14, 2015 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM in Support re #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
July 14, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (LeDoux, Dean)
July 14, 2015 Filing 359 MOTION for Protective Order on Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.. (LeDoux, Dean)
July 13, 2015 Filing 358 Declaration of Stephanie M. Laws in Support of #357 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-J)(Laws, Stephanie)
July 13, 2015 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Laws, Stephanie)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER re: #355 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants response to Plaintiffs motion to compel is due on or before July 23, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/8/15. (JDF) Modified text on 7/9/2015 (JDF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 355 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
July 7, 2015 Filing 354 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Hall, Daniel)
July 7, 2015 Filing 353 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #349 Motion for Protective Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Laws, Stephanie)
July 7, 2015 Filing 352 AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie M. Laws in SUPPORT OF #349 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Laws, Stephanie)
July 7, 2015 Filing 351 MEMORANDUM in Support re #349 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Laws, Stephanie)
July 7, 2015 Filing 350 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #349 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Laws, Stephanie)
July 7, 2015 Filing 349 MOTION for Protective Order by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Laws, Stephanie)
July 4, 2015 Filing 348 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless (Jones, Jarvis)
July 4, 2015 Filing 347 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #343 Motion to Compel filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
July 4, 2015 Filing 346 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in SUPPORT OF #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Placeholder for Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 14, #14 Exhibit(s) 15, #15 Exhibit(s) 16, #16 Exhibit(s) 17, #17 Exhibit(s) 18, #18 Exhibit(s) 19, #19 Exhibit(s) 20, #20 Exhibit(s) 21, #21 Exhibit(s) 22, #22 Exhibit(s) 24, #23 Exhibit(s) 25, #24 Exhibit(s) 26, #25 Exhibit(s) 27, #26 Exhibit(s) 28)(Jones, Jarvis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 7/9/15. (kt)
July 4, 2015 Filing 345 MEMORANDUM in Support re #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
July 4, 2015 Filing 344 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Jones, Jarvis)
July 4, 2015 Filing 343 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Workforce Logic and Clear Wireless by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 9, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Select Opt-In Plaintiffs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 6/10/2015 (LEG).
May 15, 2015 Filing 341 AMENDED NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Select Opt-In Plaintiffs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/18/2015 (LEG).
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #324 Motion to Compel as set forth in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/14/15. (LPH)
May 8, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Select Opt-In Plaintiffs by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/11/2015 (LEG).
April 27, 2015 Filing 338 EXHIBIT re #336 Memorandum, Supplemental Filing in Support of Motion to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
April 24, 2015 Filing 337 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Regarding Defendant WorkForce Logic's Motion to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions. (Jones, Jarvis)
April 24, 2015 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM by Workforce Logic LLC re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. ATTACHMENT ATTACHED IN ERROR, WILL BE RE-FILED AS ITS OWN ENTY ON THE DOCKET.)(Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 4/27/2015 (LEG).
April 24, 2015 Filing 335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2015 re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC. Order to issue. (LPH)
April 15, 2015 Filing 334 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Purusant to the request, Ms. Joyce Ackerbaum Cox has permission to appear via telephone for the motion hearing scheduled for April 24. Ms. Cox should provide the Court with a telephone number by emailing chambers noel_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov (TMA)
April 14, 2015 Filing 333 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
April 14, 2015 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions (Jones, Jarvis)
April 14, 2015 Filing 331 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in OPPOSITION TO #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Jones, Jarvis)
April 13, 2015 Filing 330 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 4/14/2015 (LEG).
April 8, 2015 Filing 329 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 7, 2015 Filing 328 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #324 Motion to Compel filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 7, 2015 Filing 327 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 7, 2015 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM in Support re #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 7, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions : Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 7, 2015 Filing 324 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admissions by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #296 Motion to Compel as set forth in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/3/15. (LPH)
March 6, 2015 Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2015 re #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC. Order to issue. (LPH)
March 5, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of OPT-INS by Kenneth Lindsay (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 3/6/2015 (LEG).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER: 1. Defendant Clear Wireless's motion to compel (ECF No. #306 ) is GRANTED. Asure must provide Clear Wireless with the information requested in the subpoena within 30 days of the date of this Order. 2. Defendant Clear Wireless must reimburse Asure for its actual costs in complying with the subpoena, not to exceed $19,150. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 02/26/2015. (lmb)
February 24, 2015 Filing 319 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: MOTION to Compel Discovery : The Motion Hearing that was set for 3/2/2015 is cancelled. The new date and time is 3/6/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (TMA) Modified text on 2/24/2015 (LEG).
February 9, 2015 Filing 318 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2015 re #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena filed by Clear Wireless LLC. Order to issue. (LPH)
February 2, 2015 Filing 317 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Defendant Workforce Logic LLC's request for Joyce Ackerbaum Cox to appear via telephone [ECF # 312] is GRANTED. Ms. Ackerbaum Cox should call into Magistrate Judge Noel's chambers at 10:59 a.m. 612-664-5110. (TMA)
February 2, 2015 Filing 316 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Kaeterle in OPPOSITION TO #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena filed by Asure Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cancellation Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Subpoena, #3 Exhibit(s) Statement of Work)(Penny Sayler, Amie)
February 2, 2015 Filing 315 MEMOARANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by Asure Software, Inc., to #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena . (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Penny Sayler, Amie) Modified text on 2/3/2015 (LEG).
January 30, 2015 Filing 314 AFFIDAVIT of Eric D. Satre in OPPOSITION TO #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Satre, Eric)
January 30, 2015 Filing 313 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Satre, Eric)
January 29, 2015 Filing 312 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Workforce Logic LLC . (Hall, Daniel)
January 27, 2015 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clear Wireless LLC re #308 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #309 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #310 Meet and Confer Statement, #307 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena (Laws, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 310 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #306 Motion to Compel filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Laws, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 309 AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie M. Laws in SUPPORT OF #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Laws, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM in Support re #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Laws, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 307 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Laws, Stephanie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 306 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Subpoena by Clear Wireless LLC. (Laws, Stephanie)
January 23, 2015 Filing 305 EXHIBITS G-Q re #299 Declaration in Support by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) G-Q)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified on 1/23/2015 (kt).
January 22, 2015 Filing 304 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #296 Motion to Compel filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
January 22, 2015 Filing 303 EXHIBIT F (Part 2) re #299 Declaration in Support by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) F (Part 2))(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified on 1/23/2015 (kt).
January 22, 2015 Filing 302 EXHIBIT F (Part 1) re #299 Declaration in Support by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) F (Part 1))(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified text on 1/23/2015 (kt).
January 22, 2015 Filing 301 EXHIBIT E re #299 Declaration in Support by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified on 1/23/2015 (kt).
January 22, 2015 Filing 300 EXHIBIT D re #299 Declaration in Support by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) Modified on 1/23/2015 (kt).
January 22, 2015 Filing 299 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B, #2 Exhibit(s) C)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
January 22, 2015 Filing 298 MEMORANDUM in Support re #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
January 22, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #296 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
January 22, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION to Compel Discovery by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
November 10, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Middleton, Kerry)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #293 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian L Mosby for Clear Wireless LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 10/24/14. (AKL)
October 23, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian L. Mosby. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4174198 by Clear Wireless LLC. (Middleton, Kerry)
September 29, 2014 Filing 292 Joint ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended) by ABE Services, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc. (LeDoux, Dean) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (LEG).
September 4, 2014 Filing 291 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended) by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
September 3, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Strauss, Lindsay)
September 3, 2014 Filing 289 JOINT ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Plaintiffs' Second) by Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation. (Middleton, Kerry)
August 22, 2014 Filing 288 Amended Summons Issued as to ABE Services, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Clear Wireless LLC, Clearwire Corporation, Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc., Workforce Logic LLC. (AKL)
August 21, 2014 Filing 287 AMENDED COMPLAINT against APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC, Clearwire Corporation, Gary D. Nelson & Associates (aka Nelson), ABE Services. Filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Filer requests summons issued. (Jones, Jarvis)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER re #283 Letter to Magistrate Judge filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/19/14. (LPH)
August 13, 2014 Filing 285 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC . (Middleton, Kerry)
August 12, 2014 Filing 284 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Workforce Logic LLC . (Hall, Daniel)
August 7, 2014 Filing 283 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER denying #138 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/18/2014. (PJM)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint (ECF No. 261) for a second time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows: 1. To the extent Plaintiffs seek to name 11 of the current opt-in Plaintiffs to state a minimum wage claim, the motion is DENIED. 2. To the extent Plaintiffs seek to add Defendants GDNA, ABE and Clear, the motion is GRANTED. 3. To the extent Plaintiffs seek to add Sprint as a Defendant, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/14/14. (LPH)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #215 Motion to Compel, as set forth in the order. Denying without prejudice #250 Plaintiffs' Motion to compel discovery, for spoliation, and for sanctions against Defendant Clear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/10/14. (LPH)
July 1, 2014 Filing 279 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Workforce Logic LLC . (Hall, Daniel)
June 23, 2014 Filing 278 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox re #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
June 23, 2014 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint filed by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
June 23, 2014 Filing 276 Declaration of Stefan I. Schnopp in Support of #274 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Middleton, Kerry)
June 23, 2014 Filing 275 AFFIDAVIT of Kerry L. Middleton in OPPOSITION TO #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-4)(Middleton, Kerry)
June 23, 2014 Filing 274 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Middleton, Kerry)
June 20, 2014 Filing 273 Defendant APC Workforce Solutions, LLC d/b/a ZeroChaos's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by APC Workforce Solutions, LLC. (Knoblauch, Mary)
June 20, 2014 Filing 272 Defendant Workforce Logic LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Workforce Logic LLC. (Knoblauch, Mary)
June 20, 2014 Filing 271 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Clear Wireless LLC. (Middleton, Kerry)
June 19, 2014 Filing 270 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #261 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 19, 2014 Filing 269 EXHIBIT re #264 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Exhibit 21 Substituted for Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2 by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 19, 2014 Filing 268 EXHIBIT re #264 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Exhibit 20 Substituted for Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1 by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2014 re Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendants' compliance with the Courts order on conditional certification (ECF No. 215) and Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery, for spoliation, and for sanctions against Clear Wireless (ECF No. 250) were taken under advisement at the hearing. (JAM)
June 16, 2014 Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint (Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 265 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #261 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 264 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in SUPPORT OF #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19)(Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Support re #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 261 MOTION Seeking Leave to FIle a Second Amended Complaint by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 16, 2014 Filing 260 Corrected AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in SUPPORT OF #250 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Spoliation MOTION for Sanctions Against Clear Wireless filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 12, 2014 Filing 259 AMENDED MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #250 Motion to Compel, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion for Sanctions filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 6/13/2014 (MMP).
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying #235 Motion for Leave to File a supplemental brief. (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/12/2014. (PJM)
June 11, 2014 Filing 257 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC . (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
June 11, 2014 Filing 256 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
June 9, 2014 Filing 255 AFFIDAVIT of Rhiannon C. Beckendorf in OPPOSITION TO #250 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Spoliation MOTION for Sanctions Against Clear Wireless filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
June 9, 2014 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #250 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Spoliation MOTION for Sanctions Against Clear Wireless filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
June 6, 2014 Filing 253 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Opposition to #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Hall, Daniel)
June 6, 2014 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
June 3, 2014 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #250 MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Spoliation MOTION for Sanctions Against Clear Wireless (Jones, Jarvis)
June 3, 2014 Filing 250 MOTION to Compel Discovery, MOTION for Spoliation , MOTION for Sanctions Against Clear Wireless by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 3, 2014 Filing 249 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #245 Motion to Compel filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 3, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #245 MOTION to Compel and Regarding Spoliation : Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Jones, Jarvis)
June 2, 2014 Filing 247 ATTORNEY JARVIS JONES' AFFIDAVIT OF RECORD filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 46, #2 Exhibit(s) 47, #3 Exhibit(s) 48, #4 Exhibit(s) 49, #5 Exhibit(s) 50, #6 Exhibit(s) 51 Placeholder). (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 6/3/2014 (lmb).SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 6/4/14LGL Modified on 6/4/2014 (LGL).
June 2, 2014 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Support re #245 MOTION to Compel and Regarding Spoliation and Sanctions against Clear Wireless filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
June 2, 2014 Filing 245 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. MOTION to Compel and Regarding Spoliation by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 6/3/2014 (lmb).
May 30, 2014 Filing 244 Summons Issued as to APC Workforce Solutions, LLC, Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (JAM)
May 30, 2014 Filing 243 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC, APC Workforce Solutions, LLC. Filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Filer requests summons issued. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 30, 2014 Filing 242 MEMORANDUM in Support re #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 30, 2014 Filing 241 JUDGMENT in re #234 Order. (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JAM)
May 29, 2014 Filing 240 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence (Jones, Jarvis)
May 29, 2014 Filing 239 EXHIBIT by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 29, 2014 Filing 238 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in SUPPORT OF #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 29, 2014 Filing 237 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. MEMORANDUM in Support re #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/30/2014 (lmb).
May 29, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence : at date and time to be determined. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 29, 2014 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Supplement Brief in Opposition to Defendant Workforce Logic's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Newly Acquired Evidence by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Adopting #222 Report and Recommendation & granting #190 Defendants' motion to enforce agreement to dismiss plaintiffs' minimum wage claim. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/29/2014. (CLB)
May 29, 2014 Filing 233 CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #232 Motions Hearing held on 4/11/2014 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (34 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert (E-mail: Staci_Heichert@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). Redaction Request due 6/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (SAH)
May 29, 2014 Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/11/2014 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (34 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert (E-mail: Staci_Heichert@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). Redaction Request due 6/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (SAH)
May 29, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (SAH)
May 28, 2014 Filing 230 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
May 23, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Appearance (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
May 21, 2014 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Opposition to #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Knoblauch, Mary)
May 21, 2014 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knoblauch, Mary)
May 21, 2014 Filing 226 Declaration of Allen Lamb in Support of #225 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
May 21, 2014 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
May 20, 2014 Filing 224 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER that 1. Plaintiffs motion (ECF No. 156) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent Plaintiffs seek leave to add Workforce Solutions (d/b/a Zero Chaos) as a Defendant in this action on all non-minimum wage claims, the motion isGRANTED.1 In all other respects, the motion is DENIED.2. Both sides agree that a clawback order should be adopted in this case, but cannot agree on what it should say. Defendants motion (ECF No. 170) is GRANTED tothe extent that the Court will separately enter a clawback order (see ECF No. 221), the terms of which will govern the parties clawback obligations with respect to discovery in this case. In all other respects, Defendants motion is DENIED. 3. Defendants motion to strike Plaintiffs minimum wage claim (ECF No. 190) is addressed in a separate Report and Recommendation. See ECF No. 222. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/16/14. (kt)
May 16, 2014 Filing 222 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Clear Wireless LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 05/16/2014. (lmb)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 CLAWBACK ORDER granting #170 Motion for Protective Order/Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 05/16/2014. (lmb)
May 14, 2014 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification (Jones, Jarvis)
May 14, 2014 Filing 219 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #215 Motion to Compel filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 14, 2014 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in SUPPORT OF #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibit 1, #2 Placeholder for Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Placeholder for Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Placeholder for Exhibit 7, #8 Placeholder for Exhibit 8, #9 Placeholder for Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Placeholder for Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Exhibit(s) 23, #24 Exhibit(s) 24, #25 Exhibit(s) 25, #26 Exhibit(s) 26, #27 Exhibit(s) 27, #28 Exhibit(s) 28, #29 Exhibit(s) 29, #30 Exhibit(s) 30, #31 Exhibit(s) 31, #32 Exhibit(s) 32, #33 Exhibit(s) 33, #34 Exhibit(s) 34, #35 Exhibit(s) 35, #36 Placeholder for Exhibit 36, #37 Placeholder for Exhibit 37, #38 Placeholder for Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit(s) 39, #40 Exhibit(s) 40, #41 Exhibit(s) 41, #42 Exhibit(s) 42, #43 Exhibit(s) 43, #44 Exhibit(s) 44, #45 Exhibit(s) 45)(Jones, Jarvis) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 5/19/14. (KT)
May 14, 2014 Filing 217 MEMORANDUM in Support re #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 14, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification : Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 14, 2014 Filing 215 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Order on Conditional Certification by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 6, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
May 6, 2014 Filing 213 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/23/2013 before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (88 pages). Transcriber: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 5/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (RJM)
May 6, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RJM)
May 5, 2014 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, Judicial Notice, Putative Class Names and Addresses, and to Supplement Motion [Docket No. 99] held on November 12, 2013 before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (52 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette (E-mail: Tim_Willette@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5108). Redaction Request due 5/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. (TJW)
May 5, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (TJW)
May 2, 2014 Filing 209 PLAINTIFFS 29 U.S.C. SECTION 216(b)CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 5/5/2014 (MMP).
April 25, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2014. Discovery due by 9/1/2015. Motions (non-disp) due 9/1/2015. Motions (disp) due by 11/1/2015. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 04/24/2014. (JZ)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER On April 2, 2014 the Court signed a Scheduling Order in the above referenced case. Some confusion regarding the Court's intent with respect to the May 6 date set forth in numbered Paragraph 1. a. has been called to the Court's attention. The Court intended by this language to simply restate the May 6, 2014 deadline for all opt-in plaintiffs to file their "Consent to Join" forms, as set forth in a previously issued Order, [Docket Entry # 134]. To correct the confusion the Court created, an Amended Scheduling Order will be entered. The Court apologizes for having created the confusion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 04/24/2014. (JZ)
April 21, 2014 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2014 re #156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens, #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC, #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Clear Wireless LLC. Motions taken under advisement as of April 21, 2014. Order to be issued. (JZ)
April 21, 2014 Filing 204 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
April 18, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER 1. The parties requested Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 04/14/2014. (JZ)
April 14, 2014 Filing 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim (Jones, Jarvis)
April 14, 2014 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis C. Jones in OPPOSITION TO #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 4/15/2014 (kt).
April 14, 2014 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count)(Jones, Jarvis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
April 11, 2014 Filing 197 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Jarvis Jones, Eric Satre for plaintiffs; Joyce Ackerbaum Cox, Mary Knoblauch for defendants; Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2014 re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC-argued, submitted and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (CLB)
April 8, 2014 Filing 196 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC . (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
April 8, 2014 Filing 195 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Satre, Eric)
April 7, 2014 Filing 194 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #190 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 Filing 193 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Timmerman in Support of #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-7)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Support re #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 Filing 190 MOTION Motion to Enforce Agreement to Dismiss Minimum Wage Claim by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 Filing 189 STIPULATION for Proposed Protective Order by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Jointly Signed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens, Clear Wireless, LLC, and Workforce Logic, LLC. (Satre, Eric)
April 4, 2014 Filing 188 PLAINTIFFS' 29 U.S.C. SECTION 216(b) CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 4/7/2014 (MMP).
April 3, 2014 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order (Satre, Eric)
April 3, 2014 Filing 186 DECLARATION of Eric D. Satre in Opposition to #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redline Copy, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Clawback Language). (Satre, Eric) Modified text on 4/4/2014 (lmb).
April 3, 2014 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Satre, Eric)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2014. Discovery due by 9/1/2015. Motions (non-disp) due 9/1/2015. Motions (disp) due by 11/1/2015. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 04/02/2014. (lmb)
April 1, 2014 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Opposition to #156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to J)(Hall, Daniel)
April 1, 2014 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
March 31, 2014 Filing 180 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT TITLE-WILL CORRECT AND REFILE. STIPULATION for Proposed Order by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Jointly Signed by Clear Wireless, LLC, and Workforce Logic, LLC. (Satre, Eric) Modified text on 3/31/2014 (lmb).
March 28, 2014 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/28/2014. (lmb)
March 28, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
March 28, 2014 Filing 178 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: The Hearing for Defendant's Motion for Protective Order will begin at 9:00 a.m. on April 21, 2014 rather than 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 9W before Magistrate Judge Noel (TMA)
March 28, 2014 Filing 177 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - C)(Hall, Daniel)
March 28, 2014 Filing 176 Supplemental Declaration of Charles Faigle in Support of #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - B)(Hall, Daniel)
March 28, 2014 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
March 27, 2014 Filing 174 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #170 Motion for Protective Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 27, 2014 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT of Rhiannon C. Beckendorf in SUPPORT OF #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 27, 2014 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in Support re #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 27, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 27, 2014 Filing 170 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion for a Rule 502(d) Clawback Order by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR WORKFORCE LOGIC TO RESPOND that the Stipulation (ECF No. 168) is ADOPTED. Workforce Logic LLC shall have until April 1, 2014, to file its opposition to the Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (ECF No. 151.) The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion will remain scheduled for April 21, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 03/27/2014. (jz)
March 25, 2014 Filing 168 STIPULATION Extending Time for Workforce Logic LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. Jointly Signed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 3/26/2014 (lmb).
March 24, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Jones, Jarvis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 165 Declaration of Eric D. Satre in Opposition to #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 3/24/2014 (kt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 164 EXHIBITS 18-25 re #161 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 18, #2 Exhibit(s) 19, #3 Exhibit(s) 20, #4 Exhibit(s) 21, #5 Exhibit(s) 22, #6 Exhibit(s) 23, #7 Exhibit(s) 24, #8 Exhibit(s) 25)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 3/24/2014 (kt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 163 EXHIBIT 12-17 re #161 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 12, #2 Exhibit(s) 13, #3 Exhibit(s) 14, #4 Exhibit(s) 15, #5 Exhibit(s) 16, #6 Exhibit(s) 17)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 3/24/2014 (kt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 162 EXHIBITS 6-11 re #161 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 6, #2 Exhibit(s) 7, #3 Exhibit(s) 8, #4 Exhibit(s) 9, #5 Exhibit(s) 10, #6 Exhibit(s) 11)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 3/24/2014 (kt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis Jones in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 3/24/2014 (kt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Rhiannon C. Beckendorf in Opposition to #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - C)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 21, 2014 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
March 20, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Jones, Jarvis)
March 20, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
March 20, 2014 Filing 155 EXHIBIT re #156 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Redline Version)). (Jones, Jarvis) Modified link on 3/26/2014 (lmb).
March 19, 2014 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #151 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint (Jones, Jarvis)
March 19, 2014 Filing 153 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #151 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
March 19, 2014 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Support re #151 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
March 19, 2014 Filing 151 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE - MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Amend Complaint by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (MMP).
March 18, 2014 Filing 150 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting WITH ATTACHMENT. Filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Jointly Signed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens, Clear Wireless, LLC, and Workforce Logic LLC.(Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 3/19/2014 (MMP).
March 14, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
March 7, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #136 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Consent Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
March 4, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #136 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
March 4, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE A Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (jz)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Overruling #119 and #121 ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge; Overruling #129 ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 3/3/2014. (PJM)
February 28, 2014 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Workforce Logic LLC re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Knoblauch, Mary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 143 Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Support of #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D-J)(Knoblauch, Mary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 142 Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #136 (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 3/3/2014 (MMP).
February 28, 2014 Filing 141 Declaration of Doug Goin in Support of #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Knoblauch, Mary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 140 Declaration of Keisha Stephens in Support of #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Knoblauch, Mary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM in Support re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knoblauch, Mary)
February 28, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Workforce Logic LLC. (Knoblauch, Mary)
February 25, 2014 Filing 137 Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #136 (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (MMP).
February 21, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens Plaintiffs' Consent to Join Forms (Jones, Jarvis)
February 14, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Hall, Daniel)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER in re: Conditional Certification and Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/4/14. (jam)
January 31, 2014 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #121 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Satre, Eric) Modified text on 2/3/2014 (MMP).
January 31, 2014 Filing 132 RESPONSE re #124 Memorandum, (Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Boylan's January 3, 2014 Order [ECF Doc. 101]) filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knoblauch, Mary)
January 30, 2014 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM by Clear Wireless LLC re #122 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel,, #124 Memorandum, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
January 27, 2014 Filing 130 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC . (Knoblauch, Mary)
January 22, 2014 Filing 129 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, (Jones, Jarvis)
January 21, 2014 Filing 128 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay . (Satre, Eric)
January 21, 2014 Filing 127 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Middleton, Kerry)
January 21, 2014 Filing 126 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE CANCELING THE HEARING ON FEBRUARY 7, 2014: #122 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 1/21/2014 (MMP).
January 17, 2014 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay re #122 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, (Jones, Jarvis)
January 17, 2014 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Lindsay re #122 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
January 17, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #122 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Judge's Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 1/21/2014 (MMP).
January 17, 2014 Filing 122 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE - APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 1/21/2014 (MMP).
January 17, 2014 Filing 121 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 1/21/2014 (MMP).
January 17, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF LAWSUIT (Judicial Notice) - Defendants' Proposed Judicial Notice and Consent Form by Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon) Modified text on 1/21/2014 (lmb).
January 17, 2014 Filing 119 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon) Modified text on 1/21/2014 (MMP).
January 17, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF LAWSUIT (Judicial Notice) by Kenneth Lindsay (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 1/17/2014 (MMP).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: the Defendants' Motions to Stay the Magistrate Judge's Orders [Docket Entries 105; 111] are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 01/16/2014. (MMP)
January 16, 2014 Filing 116 EXHIBIT LIST re #111 MOTION to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order by Workforce Logic LLC filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 1/16/2014 (MMP).
January 15, 2014 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Workforce Logic LLC re #111 MOTION to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order (Hall, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 114 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #111 Motion to Stay filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Support re #111 MOTION to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 1/16/2014 (MMP).
January 15, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE OF #111 MOTION by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel) Modified text on 1/15/2014 (MMP).
January 15, 2014 Filing 111 MOTION to Stay Pending a Ruling on Defendant's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE/ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel 1/15/14. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(jam)
January 15, 2014 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2014. (akl)
January 14, 2014 Filing 108 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #105 Motion to Stay, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
January 14, 2014 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM in Support re #105 MOTION to Stay re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion to Stay Orders Compelling Production of Putatuve Class Member List - EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
January 14, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #105 MOTION to Stay re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion to Stay Orders Compelling Production of Putatuve Class Member List - EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED at date and time to be determined. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
January 14, 2014 Filing 105 MOTION to Stay re #101 Order on Motion to Compel, #100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Defendant Clear Wireless LLC's Motion to Stay Orders Compelling Production of Putatuve Class Member List - EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
January 8, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE A Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2014 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 01/08/2014. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(jz)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER In Re: Dispositive-Motion Practice. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/8/2014. (CLB)
January 6, 2014 Filing 102 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Boylan, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 13-cv-834 (DSD/FLN). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (TSS)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery [Docket No. 38] is denied in part and granted in part as further provided herein. (See text of Order for Further Detials). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 01/03/2014. (jz)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ON PLAINTFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND JUDICIAL NOTICE granting #53 Motion for Judicial Notice; granting #76 Motion to Certify Conditional Class. (See text of Order for Further Details). Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 01/03/2014. (jz) Modified on 1/3/2014 (jz).
November 12, 2013 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2013 re Hearing on plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, Judicial Notice, Putative Class' Names and Addresses, and to Supplement Motion [Docket No. #76 ]. Motions taken under advisement as of: November 12, 2013. Order to be issued.(jz)
November 6, 2013 Filing 98 Reply to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
November 1, 2013 Filing 97 Supplemental Declaration of Erin Manuel in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 96 Declaration of Erin Manuel in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 95 Declaration of Mick Pfeil in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 94 Declaration of Tanema Foster in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 93 Declaration of Mike Burns-Richie in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 92 Declaration of Gina Goodrich in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 91 Declaration of Allan Lamb in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 90 Declaration of Jeffrey Timmerman in Support of #88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C-D)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Charles Faigle in Opposition to #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class , #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Knoblauch, Mary)
November 1, 2013 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class , #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, Defendant Clear Wireless Combined Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs': 1. Motion for Conditional Certification, Judicial Notice, Putative Class Names and Addresses, and to Supplement Motion and 2. Motion for Judicial Notice filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2013 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Karen Maarouf in Opposition to #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class , #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Knoblauch, Mary)
November 1, 2013 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Declaration of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Opposition to #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class , #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Exhibit(s) D-G)(Knoblauch, Mary)
November 1, 2013 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class , #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knoblauch, Mary)
October 24, 2013 Filing 84 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Pursuant to the agreement, Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be filed on November 6, 2013. (HAM)
October 22, 2013 Filing 83 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class : Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 10/22/2013 (GMW).
October 2, 2013 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (lmb).
October 2, 2013 Filing 81 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #76 filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
October 2, 2013 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of of the Record re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class by Kenneth Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 9, #2 Exhibit(s) 11, #3 Exhibit(s) 12, #4 Exhibit(s) 13, #5 Exhibit(s) 14, #6 Exhibit(s) 15, #7 Exhibit(s) 16, #8 Exhibit(s) 17). (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (lmb).
October 2, 2013 Filing 79 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Kenneth Lindsay re #78 Memorandum filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
October 2, 2013 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Lindsay re #76 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class filed by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis)
October 2, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #76 MOTION for Conditional Certification, Judicial Notice, Putative Class' Names and Addresses; MOTION to Supplement Motion: at date and time to be determined. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (lmb).
October 2, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION for Conditional Certification, Judicial Notice, Putative Class' Names and Addresses; MOTION to Supplement Motion, by Kenneth Lindsay. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (lmb).
September 27, 2013 Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: In response to Plaintiff's September 25, 2013 letter seeking guidance on Plaintiff's stay request (Docket No. 25), the Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's request for a stay of the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's motion for conditional certification is DENIED. (JMG)
September 25, 2013 Filing 74 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay . (Satre, Eric)
September 25, 2013 Filing 73 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC . (Middleton, Kerry)
September 24, 2013 Filing 72 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay . (Satre, Eric)
September 24, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay (Attachments: #1 Consent Form Richardo Santana)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 23, 2013 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2013 re #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Motions taken under advisement as of: September 23, 2013. Order to be issued. (jz)
September 23, 2013 Filing 69 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing is now set for 9/23/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. TIME CHANGE ONLY.(HAM)
September 19, 2013 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Joyce Ackerbaum Cox in Opposition to #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit(s) D, #3 Exhibit(s) E, #4 Exhibit(s) F, #5 Exhibit(s) G, #6 Exhibit(s) H, #7 Exhibit(s) I)(Knoblauch, Mary)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 9/19/13 LGL Modified on 9/20/2013 (LGL).
September 19, 2013 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery , Sanctions, and for an Amended Scheduling Order filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Knoblauch, Mary)
September 19, 2013 Filing 66 Declaration of Kerry L. Middleton in Support of #65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-11)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2013 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Clear Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2013 Filing 64 LETTER from Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan regarding direction on due date. (jz)
September 18, 2013 Filing 63 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens . (Jones, Jarvis)
September 18, 2013 Filing 62 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Clear Wireless LLC . ATTACHMENT included in this filing. (Timmerman, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/18/2013 (GMW).
September 17, 2013 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Clearwire Communications LLC is the parent corporation of Defendant Clear Wireless, LLC. (Middleton, Kerry) Modified on 9/17/2013 (GMW).
September 16, 2013 Filing 60 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Workforce Logic LLC . (Knoblauch, Mary)
September 13, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #1 Complaint, Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, (Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 57 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #53 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of of the Record re #55 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, : at date and time to be determined. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 13, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #1 Complaint, by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 11, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 11, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #1 Complaint, Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 50 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, of the Record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 55, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 56)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 49 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, of the Record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 49, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 50, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 51, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 52, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 53)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 48 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, of the Record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 47 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, of the record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 46 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, of the Record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 45 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 43, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 45, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 46)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 44 EXHIBIT re #43 Affidavit,, by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Record re #39 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Placeholder for Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Placeholder for Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30)(Jones, Jarvis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 9/10/13 LGL Modified on 9/11/2013 (LGL).
September 10, 2013 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER re #38 MOTION to Compel by Jarvis C Jones on behalf of Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 9/10/2013 (kt).
September 10, 2013 Filing 41 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #38 Motion to Compel filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 40 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-WILL REFILE. NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 9/11/2013 (lmb).
September 10, 2013 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Compel Discovery , Sanctions, and for an Amended Scheduling Order filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
September 10, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
September 9, 2013 Filing 37 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION to Compel Discovery, Sanctions, and for an Amended Scheduling Order by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 9/10/2013 (jam).
September 4, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #1 Complaint, Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Satre, Eric)
August 12, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Satre on behalf of Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Satre, Eric)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY PROTOCOL. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 8/7/13. (jam)
August 7, 2013 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Niloy Ray for Clear Wireless LLC. Approved by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 08/07/2013. (KMM)
August 7, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Niloy Ray. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3653798 by Clear Wireless LLC. (Middleton, Kerry)
August 2, 2013 Filing 31 CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #1 Complaint. (Jones, Jarvis) Modified on 8/5/2013 (kt).
July 2, 2013 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Oral ORDER - The parties seek clarification of the Pretrial Scheduling Order [Docket No. 29]. The parties are not limited to conducting similarly situated discovery. The Court has limited the period of discovery, but not the scope of discovery. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 7/2/13. (kat)
July 1, 2013 Filing 29 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2013. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 06/28/2013. (jz)
June 26, 2013 Filing 28 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan held on 6/26/2013. Scheduling order to be issued. (MMP)
June 19, 2013 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Clear Wireless LLC, Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens, Workforce Logic LLC.(Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
June 13, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #1 Complaint, Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Consent Form)(Jones, Jarvis)
June 3, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Timmerman on behalf of Clear Wireless LLC. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE A Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 05/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(jz)
May 14, 2013 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Workforce Logic shall have until May 16, 2013, to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint, and that, notwithstanding this extension, Workforce Logic has not waived its right to assert any defenses, including defenses provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Moreover, in light of this Stipulation, WorkForce Logic's Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint [Docket No. #9 ] is denied as moot and the hearing on the same set for May 16, 2013, is cancelled. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 05/10/2013. (jz)
May 10, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens, Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
May 7, 2013 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Jones, Jarvis)
May 7, 2013 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Record re #17 Memorandum, Affidavit of the Record by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 7, 2013 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Jarvis Jones re #17 Memorandum, Affidavit of Jarvis Jones by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Jones, Jarvis)
May 7, 2013 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Extend Time filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Jones, Jarvis)
May 7, 2013 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. APC Workforce Solutions, LLC d/b/a Zero Chaos is a corporate parent of Defendant Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 1. Clearwire Communications LLC is the parent corporation of Defendant. 2. Defendant states that the following publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock: Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon) Modified text on 4/30/2013 (MMP).
April 30, 2013 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Defendant Clear Wireless LLC by Clear Wireless LLC. (Beckendorf, Rhiannon)
April 30, 2013 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Workforce Logic LLC re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Workforce Logic LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, : Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joyce Ackerbaum Cox for Workforce Logic LLC. Approved by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 4/30/2013. (MAP)
April 30, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joyce Ackerbaum Cox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3539294 by Workforce Logic LLC. (Knoblauch, Mary)
April 30, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Hall on behalf of Workforce Logic LLC. (Hall, Daniel)
April 17, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Workforce Logic LLC served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Jones, Jarvis)
April 17, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Clear Wireless LLC served on 4/9/2013, answer due 4/30/2013. (Jones, Jarvis)
April 9, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. (JMH)
April 9, 2013 Filing 2 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Please use case number 13-cv-834 (DSD/AJB). (JMH) Modified text on 4/9/2013 (lmb).
April 9, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clear Wireless LLC, Workforce Logic LLC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0864-3511549.) Filed by Kenneth Lindsay, Jesse Owens. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jones, Jarvis) Modified text on 4/9/2013 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay et al v. Clear Wireless LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABE Services
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Represented By: Matthew Paul Webster
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Dean A LeDoux
Represented By: Meghann F Kantke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APC Workforce Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Wireless LLC
Represented By: Niloy Ray
Represented By: Lindsay Strauss
Represented By: Brian L Mosby
Represented By: Kerry L Middleton
Represented By: Rhiannon C Beckendorf
Represented By: Jeffrey A Timmerman
Represented By: John H Lassetter
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwire Corporation
Represented By: Kerry L Middleton
Represented By: Rhiannon C Beckendorf
Represented By: John H Lassetter
Represented By: Stephanie M Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Nelson and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Represented By: Matthew Paul Webster
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Dean A LeDoux
Represented By: Meghann F Kantke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workforce Logic LLC
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABE Services doing business as Workforce Logic
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Represented By: Matthew Paul Webster
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Dean A LeDoux
Represented By: Meghann F Kantke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workforce Logic LLC a Zero Chaos Company doing business as Workforce Logic
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APC Workforce Solutions, LLC doing business as Zero Chaos
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Owens
Represented By: Eric D Satre
Represented By: Jarvis C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lindsay
Represented By: Eric D Satre
Represented By: Jarvis C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?