Solutran, Inc. v. U.S. Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: |
Solutran, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Elavon, Inc. and U.S. Bancorp |
Case Number: |
0:2013cv02637 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Hennepin |
Presiding Judge: |
Steven E. Rau |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Richard Nelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 145 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 19, 2018 |
Filing
456
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Defendants' Expedited Motion for Partial Stay of Permanent Injunction Pending Appeal [Doc. No. 449] is GRANTED IN PART. The portion of the Court's injunction described in its December 11, 2018 Order [Doc. No. 447], applicable to both Defendants' current and future customers for the ECS-OSI product, is STAYED UNTIL MARCH 31, 2019. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/19/2018. (SMD)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Filing
330
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 314 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 to exclude evidence, testimony, exhibits, and argument regarding the Randle prior-art reference, part of 228 Mot ion in Limine filed by Solutran, Inc.; denying Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence and argument relating to 35 U.S.C. s. 103, part of 228 Motion in Limine filed by Solutran, Inc.; and deferring ruling on 234 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of the Patent Office's Covered Business Method Review. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/12/2018. (SMD)
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
299
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and deferring in part Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2, to exclude evidence of testimony, exhibits, and arguments related to BankServ, part of 228 MOTION in Limine filed by Solutran, Inc. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/28/2018. (SMD)
|
February 26, 2018 |
Filing
295
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 to redesignate as "confidential" any "attorneys' eyes only" exhibits and permit party representatives to remain in courtroom during testimon y about those topics [Doc. No. 228 ]; denying as moot 231 Defendant U.S. Bank's Motion in Limine to Preclude Calling Defendants' Legal Assistant Providing Bank Litigation Support as a Witness or Eliciting Similar Evidence; and granting 235 Defendant U.S. Bank's Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument that Defendants' Infringement was Willful. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/26/2018. (SMD)
|
February 23, 2018 |
Filing
291
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6 to require US Bank to update its financial information through the end of 2017 [Doc. No. 228 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. 2. Defendant U.S. Bank's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Defendants' Infringement [Doc. No. 233 ] is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART as outlined herein. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/23/2018. (SMD)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
216
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 170 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 183 Motion for Summary Judgment. The remaining issues are set for trial on March 6, 2018. A pretrial order will follow. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/27/2017. (SMD)
|
May 24, 2017 |
Filing
168
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 05/24/2017. (SMD)
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
162
ORDER denying 148 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. The Magistrate Judge's November 30, 2016 Text Only Order [Doc. No. 145] is AFFIRMED.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/10/2017. (JRT)
|
December 20, 2016 |
Filing
151
ORDER denying 125 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. The Magistrate Judge's October 3, 2016 Text Only Order 115 is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/20/2016. (SMD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?