Dicken,et al. v. Northwest Eye Center, P.A., et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel. and Robert A. Dicken
Defendant: Northwest Eye Center, P.A., Christopher J. Borgen, Eric M. Tjelle and Sanford Health Network
Case Number: 0:2013cv02691
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Joan N. Ericksen
Presiding Judge: Katherine M. Menendez
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Compel; denying 112 Motion for Sanctions(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/14/2018. (LCC)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: (1) Plaintiff Robert A. Dicken's motion to vacate and for leave to amend [Dkt. No. 77 ] is GRANTED IN PART, to the extent Plaintiff Robert A. Dicken requests the Court to vacate the February 28, 2017 Judgment and grant leave to amend. (2 ) The February 28, 2017 Judgment [Dkt. No. 76 ] is VACATED. (3) Plaintiff Robert A. Dicken is GRANTED leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within ten days of this Order. The Second Amended Complaint must comply with this Order and be in substantially the same form as the one proposed at Dkt. No. [80-1], together with any incorporated exhibits. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 30, 2017. (CBC)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: (1) Defendants Northwest Eye Center, P.A., Dr. Christopher J. Borgen, and Dr. Eric M. Tjelle's joint Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 49 ] is GRANTED for the reasons stated in this Order. (2) Defendant Sanford Health Network's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 60 ] is GRANTED for the reasons stated in this Order. (3) Count III of the Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (4) Counts I, II, IV, V, VI, and VII of the Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on February 27, 2017. (CBC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicken,et al. v. Northwest Eye Center, P.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel.
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Dicken
Represented By: Frederick L Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Eye Center, P.A.
Represented By: Kirsten J Hansen
Represented By: Garth J Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Borgen
Represented By: Kirsten J Hansen
Represented By: Garth J Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M. Tjelle
Represented By: Kirsten J Hansen
Represented By: Garth J Unke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Health Network
Represented By: Amy Slusser Conners
Represented By: Sarah E. Crippen
Represented By: Jennifer L Olson
Represented By: Joel P Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?