Clark v. Roy et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Bernard Clark
Defendant: Tom Roy, Nate Drevlow, Lisa Staber, Steven Klapmeier, James Wischer and Head Corizon Doctors
Case Number: 0:2013cv02849
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Rice
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 204 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 02/10/2017. (SMD) cc: Courtney Bernard Clark. Modified text on 2/10/2017 (ACH).
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Objections to the Corrected Report and Recommendation 193 are OVERRULED; the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 160 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant [Doc. No. 7] is DISMISSED with prejudice.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/23/2016. (JRT) cc: Courtney Bernard Clark. Modified text on 12/23/2016 (ACH).
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Joint Motion of Dr. Steven Klapmeier, Dr. Lisa Staber and Dr. James Wichser for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) 86 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/24/15. (GRR)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS IN PART and MODIFIES IN PART the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer dated November 10, 2014 70 as set forth above. 2. Defendants D r. Steven Klapmeier and Dr. Lisa Staber's Motion to Dismiss 36 is GRANTED. 3. Defendant Dr. James Wichser's Motion to Dismiss 40 is GRANTED. 4. Plaintiff's Motion for Legal Assistance 57 is DENIED. 5. Plaintiff's Mot ion for Subpoena 58 is DENIED. 6. Defendants Commissioner Tom Roy and Officer Nate Drevlow's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 17 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Plaintiff's § 1983 Eighth Amendment claim aga inst Drevlow in his individual capacity based on the April 26, 2013 incident REMAINS; all other claims against Drevlow are DISMISSED; and all claims against Roy are DISMISSED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/13/15. (GRR)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 70 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants Dr. Steven Klapmeier and Dr. Lisa Staber's Motion to Dismiss 36 is GRANTED; 2. Defendant Dr. James Wichser's Motion to Dismiss 40 is GRANTE D; 3. Plaintiff's Motion for Legal Assistance 57 is DENIED; 4. Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena 58 is DENIED; 5. Defendants Commissioner Tom Roy and Officer Nate Drevlow's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 17 is GRANTED for the reasons stated above; and6. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY.Dated:(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/26/15. (GRR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Roy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Bernard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Drevlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Staber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Klapmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Corizon Doctors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?