Stratasys Inc. v. Microboards Technology, LLC
Plaintiff: Stratasys Inc.
Defendant: Microboards Technology, LLC
Case Number: 0:2013cv03228
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Presiding Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER OPINION: 1. Afinia's Motion (ECF No. 110 ) is DENIED; 2. Because the Court finds this motion was substantially justified, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(B), each party shall bear its own costs and expenses in connection with this Motion ; 3. All prior consistent orders remain in full force and effect; and 4. Failure to comply with any provision of this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel, and/or the party such coun sel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions, and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony , exhibits, and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 06/23/2015. (MMP)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of the Asserted Patents (Doc. No. 120 ) is DENIED.3 This denial is without prejudice to a parties' ability renew the motion to stay the proceedings should the IPR Petitions be granted.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/10/2015. (BJS)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 46 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/22/2014. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stratasys Inc. v. Microboards Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stratasys Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E Grimsrud
Represented By: Kenneth A Liebman
Represented By: Lauren Marie Williams Steinhaeuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microboards Technology, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Burns
Represented By: William J Cass
Represented By: Nicholas A Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?