In Re: RFC and RESCAP Liquidating Trust Litigation
Plaintiff: Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust
Defendant: PMC Bancorp, First Tennessee Bank, N.A., Pemm. Tek Mortgage Services, LLC, CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Mortgage Access Corp., PHH Mortgage Corp., Amnet Mortgage LLC, Circle Mortgage Corp., Guaranty Bank, MortgageIT, Inc., Edward Danielczyk, First Mariner Bank, Provident Funding Associates, L.P., Lenox Financial Mortgage Corp., Broadview Mortgage Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., SouthTrust Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Finance Corporation, Pulte Homes, Inc., Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc., Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC, Home Loan Center, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Terrace Mortgage Company, Branch Banking & Trust Co., Douglas Rohm, Ark-La-Tex Financial Services, LLC, Professional Mortgage Corp., Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc., T.J. Financial, Inc., Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, DB Structured Products, Inc., Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., Gateway Bank, F.S.B., Mortgage Capital Associates, Inc., Mortgage Advisory Group, Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, Stearns Lending, LLC, Equifirst Corporation, Summit Community Bank, Inc. as Successor to Shenandoah Valley Community Bank, PulteGroup, Inc., Americash, Honor Bank, ECF Holdings Corporation, Premier Financial Services, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Global Advisory Group, Inc., Fremont Bank, Impac Funding Corporation, E Trade Bank, PNC Bank, N.A., Synovus Mortgage Corp., Academy Mortgage Corporation, Rescue Mortgage, Inc., American Mortgage Network, LLC, RBC Mortgage Company, Mortgage Network, Inc., InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Financial Retail Credit, Inc., United Fidelity Funding Corp, Mid-Atlantic Financial Services, Inc., WMC Morgage, LLC, Capital One Home Loans, LLC, Community West Bank, N.A., Summit Lending Solutions, Inc., Freedom Mortgage Corporation, First Equity Mortgage Bankers, Inc., Primary Capital Advisors LLC, EFC Holdings Corporation, Central Pacific Bank, Origin Bank, Capital One, N.A., Central Pacific Homeloans, Inc., Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc., Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc., Mortgage Outlet, Inc., The, Monarch Bank, Central Pacific Financial Corp., Homestead Funding Corp., First California Mortgage Company, Golden Empire Mortgage, Inc., E-Loan, Inc., National Bank of Kansas City, Wallick & Volk, Inc., First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, CMG Mortgage, Inc, Colonial Savings, F.A. and iServe Residential Lending, LLC
Special Master: Arthur J. Boylan
Case Number: 0:2013cv03451
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 5204 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re status update in advance of PRMI September Case Management Conference. (Winter, Randi)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5203 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5202 STIPULATION Joint Agenda for September 17, 2019 Case Management Conference by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5201 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases that 19cv2360 JNE/ECW has been reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/29/2019 and Joan N. Ericksen on 8/30/2019. (MMG) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMG).
August 29, 2019 Filing 5200 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The October Case Management Conference, originally scheduled for October 22, will now be held on Friday, October 25, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5199 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. Responding to Plaintiff's Letter. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5198 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re PRMI Status Update. (Winter, Randi)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5197 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Case Management Conference scheduled for August 22, 2019 is CANCELED.(SMD)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5196 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Until further order of the Court, all pending filing deadlines related to the case of Residential Funding Company, LLC, et al. v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, et al., file number 16-cv-3024, are STAYED, as is the requirement that trial counsel in the InterLinc case appear at future Case Management Conferences. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/13/2019. (SMD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5195 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding InterLinc ESI Developments and Request for Phone Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7)(Winter, Randi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5194 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re Update on Outstanding Discovery Issues in the InterLinc matter. (Winter, Randi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5193 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC Regarding Discovery Update. (Schroeder, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5192 ORDER on #5190 Letter to District Judge Requesting Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports. The request is GRANTED. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/29/2019. (SMD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5191 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Requesting Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports #5190 Letter to District Judge. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5190 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. Requesting Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5189 ORDER Denying #5112 PRMI's Motion for a Jury Trial (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/25/2019. (ACT)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5188 ORDER granting #5183 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 5142, 5142-1, 5149, 5149-1. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 8/19/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/22/2019. (JMK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5187 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Home Loan Center, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Case Under Chapter 11 of the Federal Bankruptcy Code and of Automatic Stay (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5186 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5185 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust and PRMI providing update regarding use of Wave One expert reports. (Winter, Randi)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5184 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5150 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Home Loan Center's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Jessica)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5183 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #5149 Exhibit, #5142 Exhibit filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5182 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER as to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, et al., 16-cv-3024 (SRN/HB): Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2019. Motions (non-disp) due by 9/30/2019. Expert Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Motions (disp) due by 3/16/2020. Responses (disp) due by 4/6/2020. Replies (disp) due by 4/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Ready for trial on 6/15/2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/12/2019. (MJC) Modified deadline/text on 7/16/2019 (lmb).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5181 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5179 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel,, Status Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5180 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5179 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel,, Status Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5179 Minute Entry for Case Management Conference held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/11/2019: taking under advisement #5112 Defendant Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.'s Motion for Jury Trial; denying as moot #5156 Defendant Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.'s Motion to Compel. See minute entry for additional details and rulings. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (MJC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5178 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5177 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC re July 11, 2019 CMC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Schroeder, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5176 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Status Update for July 11, 2019 Case Management Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Winter, Randi) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (MMP).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5175 ORDER DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL CASE re #5170 Stipulation of Dismissal. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, as successor to United Residential Lending, LLC, No. 13-cv-3531. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/8/2019. (SMD)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5174 STIPULATION Joint Agenda for July 11, 2019 Case Management Conference by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., Douglas Rohm, and Edward Danielczyk. (Nelson, Jessica)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5173 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on June 25, 2019 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (43 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 7/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2019. (CRB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5172 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5171 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5170 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5170 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by iServe Residential Lending, LLC. (Heeman, Donald)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5169 ORDER granting #5108 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 5055, 5061, 5062, 5063, 5064, 5065, 5066, 5067, 5068. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/30/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/2/2019. (JMK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5168 ORDER granting #5038 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 4854, 4857, 4859, 4860, 4861, 4862, 4863, 4864, 4867, 4869, 4871, 4873, 4875, 4877, 4879, 4880, 4881, 4882, 4884, 4885, 4886, 4887, 4888, 4889, 4890, 4892, 4893, 4894, 4895, 4896, 4898, 4899, 4901, 4902, 4904, 4905, 4907, 4908, 4910, 4911, 4913, 4914, 4915, 4916, 4918, 4919, 4921, 4922, 4924, 4925, 4926, 4927, 4928, 4929, 4930, 4932, 4979, 4982, 4983, 4984, 4985, 4986, 4987, 4988, 4989, 4990, 4991, 4992, 4993, 4994, 4995, 4996, 4997, 5000, 5002, 5004, 5005, 5010, 5011, 5012, 5015, 5016, 5017. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/30/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/2/2019. (JMK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5167 BRIEFING ORDER re: #5150 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Response due by 7/12/2019. This document relates to:ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/2/2019. (SMD)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5166 Order Re: Scope of PRMI's Responses to ResCap's Expert Reports Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/2/2019. (ACT)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5165 ORDER on #5163 Stipulated Briefing Schedule re: #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents. Response due by 12:00 noon central time on 7/9/2019. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/1/2019. (SMD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5164 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5163 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5163 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Winter, Randi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5162 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5161 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5156 Motion to Compel filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5160 Declaration of D. Keith Clouser in Support of #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5159 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. re #5158 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5158 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5157 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents : Date and time to be determined. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5156 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5155 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5153 Motion Hearing,, Telephone Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5154 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5153 Motion Hearing,, Telephone Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Winter, Randi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5152 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5150 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5151 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5150 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Home Loan Center's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5150 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Home Loan Center's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5149 SEALED EXHIBIT Replacement Exhibits 2 and 3 re #5141 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 3)(Winter, Randi)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2019. The #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust was submitted, argued, and taken under advisement. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB) (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5148 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5147 REDACTED VERSION of #5132 SEALED ORDER granting #4852 Motion for Attorney Fees. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/12/2019. Redacted version approved by Judge Nelson filed on 6/21/19. (Written Opinion)(SMD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5146 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #5142 Sealed Document(s) - #5142 Sealed Exhibit 2, [5142-1] Sealed Exhibit 3 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5145 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5144 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5138 Motion for Protective Order filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5143 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #5142 Sealed Document(s) - #5142 Sealed Exhibit 2, [5142-1] Sealed Exhibit 3 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (kt).
June 19, 2019 Filing 5142 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #5141 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 3)(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5141 Declaration of Heather Christenson in Support of #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5140 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5139 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5138 MOTION for Protective Order as to the Scope of Expert Discovery in the PRMI matter filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5137 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #5134 , #5136 , #5135 Sealed Document(s) - Sealed Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Sealing of Memorandum Opinion and Order Re: Attorneys Fees #5134 , Declaration of Molly Stephens #5135 , and Proposed Redacted Memorandum and Opinion Re: Attorneys Fees #5136 . (Nelson, Jessica)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5136 SEALED PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Redacted Memorandum and Opinion Re: Attorneys Fees #5134 Sealed Document by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5135 SEALED Declaration of Molly Stephens re #5134 Sealed Document by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5134 SEALED Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Sealing of Memorandum Opinion and Order Re: Attorneys Fees re #5132 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5133 REPORT Plaintiff's Calculation of Postverdict Prejudgment Interest by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5132 SEALED ORDER granting #4852 Motion for Attorney Fees. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/12/2019. ** This document was emailed from Judge Nelson's chambers to Attorneys for Home Loan Center and ResCap Liquidating Trust.** (SMD) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (SMD).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5131 Omnibus Order Re: Rule 50(a) JMOL Motions in ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/12/2019. (MJC)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5130 ORDER on #5125 Stipulation regarding the expert reports of George Triantis and Justice Anthony Caprinello. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/11/2019. (SMD)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5129 ORDER on #5123 Stipulation regarding the expert report of Thomas F. Kaufman. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/11/2019. (SMD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5128 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5125 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5127 Redacted Document for #5126 Sealed Exhibit A . (Nelson, Jessica)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5126 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #5125 Stipulation by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5125 STIPULATION by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5124 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5123 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5123 STIPULATION by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5112 MOTION Jury Trial filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5121 ORDER on #5119 Stipulation to Amend Revised Case Management Order to Extend Fact Discovery Motions Deadline. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/7/2019. (SMD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5120 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5119 Stipulation. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5119 STIPULATION to Amend Revised Case Management Order to Extend Fact Discovery Motions Deadline by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. Jointly Signed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5118 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #5112 MOTION Jury Trial : Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5117 ORDER denying #5070 Defendant InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/3/2019. (MJC)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5116 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5112 MOTION Jury Trial filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5115 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5112 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5114 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5112 MOTION Jury Trial filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5113 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5112 MOTION Jury Trial : Date and time to be determined. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5112 MOTION Jury Trial filed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5111 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited Hourly Transcript (within 2 hours) of #5092 Status Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5110 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica J Nelson (Nelson, Jessica)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5109 ORDER re: Schedule for remaining case proceedings. See Order for details. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/17/2019. (SMD)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5108 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #5055 Exh D, #5061 Exh 1, #5062 Exh 2, #5063 Exh 3, #5064 Exh 4, #5065 Exh 5, #5066 Exh 6, #5067 Exh 7, #5068 Exh 8, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified text/links on 5/17/2019 (lmb).
May 16, 2019 Filing 5107 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Notice of Withdrawal Without Substitution (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5106 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #5105 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Schroeder, Mark)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5105 TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference and Motions Hearing held on May 9, 2019 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (73 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 6/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2019. (CRB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5104 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5103 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5102 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Plaintiff's Proposed Case Schedule in PRMI Action #5101 Letter to District Judge. (Winter, Randi)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5101 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Proposed Case Schedule in the Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. Action. (Winter, Randi)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5100 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5099 Letter to District Judge. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5099 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5098 ORDER Dismissing Individual Case, pursuant to #5096 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of PMC Bancorp, LLC. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. PMC Bancorp, LLC, No. 13-cv-3471. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/14/2019. (SMD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5097 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Plaintiff's Rule 41(a)(1) Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice #5096 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5096 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ResCap Liquidating Trust (Heeman, Donald)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5095 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Noorudin Mahmood Ahmad (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5094 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5092 Status Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (NAH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5093 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5092 Status Conference, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5091 Order re: 30(b)(6) Deposition Topics. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/10/2019. (ACT)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5092 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Case Management Conference held on 5/9/2019. Defendant InterLinc Mortgage Service's Motion to Bifurcate [Doc. No. #5070 ] was moved, argued, and taken under advisement. At this time, Plaintiff and InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC shall proceed with fact discovery on all issues. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5090 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5089 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC re May 7, 2019 CMC. (Supalla, Daniel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5088 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Edward Danielczyk, Douglas Rohm . (Pincus, Steven)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5087 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Re Status Update for May 9, 2019 Case Management Conference. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5086 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Jessica)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5085 STIPULATION JOINT AGENDA FOR MAY 9, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC, Douglas Rohm, Edward Danielczyk, and Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5084 RESPONSE re #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Edward Danielczyk, Douglas Rohm. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pincus, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5083 ORDER Dismissing Individual Case, re #5081 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. This document relates to:ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation, No. 14-cv-5101 (SRN/HB) . Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/1/2019. (SMD)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5082 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5081 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5081 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Heeman, Donald)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5080 ORDER on #5076 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate. Response due by 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/1/2019. (SMD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5079 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate : Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Schroeder, Mark)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5078 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation & Resetting of Hearing: a Case Management Conference as well as oral argument on #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate are now set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. NOTE: THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. InterLinc M ortgage Services, LLC, et al, file 16cv3024, and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., file 16cv4070 .(SMD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5077 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5076 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5076 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5075 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Palazzolo, Hilary)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5074 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5070 Motion to Bifurcate filed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC.(Supalla, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5073 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Bifiurcate #5070 Motion to Bifurcate. (Supalla, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5072 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Supalla, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5071 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5070 MOTION to Bifurcate : Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Supalla, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5070 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Supalla, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5069 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #5067 , #5064 , #5066 , #5063 , #5068 , #5062 , #5061 , #5065 Sealed Document(s) - #5061 Sealed Exhibit 1, #5062 Sealed Exhibit 2, #5063 Sealed Exhibit 3, #5064 Sealed Exhibit 4, #5065 Sealed Exhibit 5, #5066 Sealed Exhibit 7, #5067 Sealed Exhibit 8, #5068 Sealed Exhibit 9 to Letter Re Rule 30(b)(6) Topic Dispute Relating to PRMI. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5068 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5067 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5066 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5065 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5064 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5063 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5062 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5061 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #5060 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5060 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re Rule 30(b)(6) Topic Dispute Relating to PRMI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 6)(Nelson, Jessica) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (kt).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5059 ORDER on #5057 Stipulation to Amend Revised Case Management Order to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline. Fact Discovery Deadline now: 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/24/2019. (SMD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5058 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5057 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5057 STIPULATION TO AMEND REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (Winter, Randi)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5056 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #5054 Sealed Document(s) - #5055 Sealed Exhibits D and E to Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5055 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit D re #5054 Letter to Magistrate Judge by Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit E)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5054 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5053 ORDER in Response to #5051 Letter to District Judge Requesting Leave to Add Loans to Sample List. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/19/2019. (SMD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5052 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Requesting Leave to Add Loans to Sample List #5051 Letter to District Judge. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5051 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Requesting Leave to Add Loans to Sample List. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5050 ORDER on #5048 Stipulation on Briefing Schedule for PRMI's Motion to Compel 30(b)6) Deposition. Opening letter brief due by 4/19/2019. Responsive letter brief due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/18/2019. (SMD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5049 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5048 Stipulation. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5048 STIPULATION on Briefing Schedule for PRMI's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. and ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5047 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth V Kniffen on behalf of Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5046 ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/1/2019. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC, et al, file 16cv3024, and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., file 16cv4070. (SMD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5045 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Expert Disclosures Relating to PRMI. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5044 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Matthew A. Lee (Winter, Randi)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5043 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Matheson, Adam)
March 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5042 Order re: Bangerter Deposition. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/23/2019. (ACT)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5041 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Scheduling Bangerter Deposition. (Winter, Randi)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5040 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. re Bangerter Deposition. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5039 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4739 Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Interest (Written Opinion). This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/18/2019. (MJC) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (SMD).
March 14, 2019 Filing 5038 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #4882 Exhibit, #4867 Exhibit, #4930 Exhibit, #4987 Exhibit, #4919 Exhibit, #4879 Exhibit, #5017 Exhibit, #4991 Exhibit, #4986 Exhibit, #4863 Exhibit, #4885 Exhibit, #5004 Exhibit, #4984 Exhibit, #4911 Exhibit, #5016 Exhibit, #4880 Exhibit, #5015 Exhibit, #4910 Exhibit, #4877 Exhibit, #5000 Reply to Response to Motion, #4896 Exhibit, #4857 Declaration in Support, #4884 Exhibit, #4918 Exhibit, #4860 Exhibit, #4854 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4886 Exhibit, #4894 Exhibit, #4899 Exhibit, #4914 Exhibit, #4996 Exhibit, #4929 Exhibit, #4904 Exhibit, #4890 Exhibit, #4993 Exhibit, #4901 Exhibit, #4979 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #4888 Exhibit, #4871 Exhibit, #4875 Exhibit, #4926 Exhibit, #4932 Exhibit, #4893 Exhibit, #4988 Exhibit, #4908 Exhibit, #4895 Exhibit, #4905 Exhibit, #4915 Exhibit, #4992 Exhibit, #4989 Exhibit, #4889 Exhibit, #4907 Exhibit, #5002 Declaration in Support, #4985 Exhibit, #4928 Exhibit, #4859 Exhibit, #4887 Exhibit, #5010 Declaration in Support, #4862 Exhibit, #4922 Exhibit, #4983 Exhibit, #4869 Exhibit, #5012 Exhibit, #4902 Exhibit, #4861 Exhibit, #4881 Exhibit, #4927 Exhibit, #5005 Exhibit, #5011 Declaration in Support, #4990 Exhibit, #4913 Exhibit, #4898 Exhibit, #4921 Exhibit, #4924 Exhibit, #4997 Exhibit, #4994 Exhibit, #4916 Exhibit, #4892 Exhibit, #4864 Exhibit, #4982 Exhibit, #4925 Exhibit, #4995 Exhibit filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5037 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: HLC's 2016-2018 attorneys' fees and costs, as they related to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Doc. No. 4852]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Winter, Randi)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5036 Order re: Whealdon Deposition. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential, Mortg., Inc., Case No. 16-cv-4070 (SRN/HB) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/8/2019. (ACT) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (SMD).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5035 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SMD)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5034 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5033 Stipulation,. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5033 STIPULATION Joint Motion for Entry of Revised Case Management Order by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. Jointly Signed by ResCap Liquidating Trust and Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5032 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. for a COPY OF #5031 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5031 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) held on February 21, 2019 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (114 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 3/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (CRB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5030 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5029 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #5028 Sealed Exhibit F . (Winter, Randi)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5028 SEALED EXHIBIT F (Butler Dep.) re #5027 Letter to District Judge, by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5027 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Responding to PRMI's Letter Regarding the Deposition of Dorean Whealdon [Doc. No. 5020]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Lundsten Dep.), #2 Exhibit(s) B (Ruckdaschel Dep.), #3 Exhibit(s) C (Anderson Dep.), #4 Exhibit(s) D (Dallman Dep.), #5 Exhibit(s) E (Lenichek Dep.), #6 Exhibit(s) G (Whealdon Dep.))(Winter, Randi)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5026 ORDER on #5024 Stipulation of Dismissal. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Impac Funding Corp., No. 13-cv-3506. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/26/2019. (SMD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5025 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5024 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5024 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by Impac Funding Corp. (Heeman, Donald)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5023 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5021 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (NAH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5022 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #5021 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Winter, Randi)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2019 re #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. The motion was submitted, argued, and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD) This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5020 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. re Whealdon. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5019 Redacted Document for #4979 Home Loan Center's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees - REDACTED filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5018 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #5017 , #5004 , #5016 , #5015 , #5012 , #5005 , #5011 Exs 59 and 60, Heeman Declaration, Stephens Declaration, and Exhibits 65, 68, 69, and 70 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5017 SEALED EXHIBIT 70 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5016 SEALED EXHIBIT 69 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5015 SEALED EXHIBIT 68 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5014 EXHIBIT 67 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5013 EXHIBIT 66 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5012 SEALED EXHIBIT 65 re #5011 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5011 SEALED Declaration of Molly Stephens in Support of #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5010 SEALED Declaration of Donald G. Heeman in Support of #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5005 SEALED EXHIBIT 60 re #5002 Declaration in Support, #5003 Redacted Document filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5004 SEALED EXHIBIT 59 (Revised) re #5002 Declaration in Support, #5003 Redacted Document filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5003 Redacted Document for #5002 Sealed Supplemental Horner Declaration filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5002 SEALED Supplemental Declaration of Jill Horner in Support of #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5001 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #5000 Sealed Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5000 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion re #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4999 Order re: Dispute Over Defendant Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.'s Proposed "Revised Case Management Order". Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/12/2019. (ACT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4998 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4988 , #4987 , #4991 , #4986 , #4984 , #4996 , #4993 , #4992 , #4989 , #4985 , #4983 , #4990 , #4997 , #4994 , #4982 , #4995 Sealed Exhibits 1-16 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4997 SEALED EXHIBIT 16 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4996 SEALED EXHIBIT 15 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4995 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4994 SEALED EXHIBIT 13 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4993 SEALED EXHIBIT 12 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4992 SEALED EXHIBIT 11 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4991 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4990 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4989 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4988 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4987 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4986 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4985 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4984 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4983 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4982 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4981 Declaration in Opposition filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4981 DECLARATION of Jesse T. Smallwood in Opposition to #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4980 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4979 Sealed Memorandum filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4979 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4978 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #4976 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (NAH)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4977 ORDER regarding discovery related to attorneys' fees in response to #4966 Plaintiff's January 28, 2019 Letter and #4970 Home Loan Center's January 30, 2019 Sealed Letter. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/4/2019. (MJC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4976 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on January 31, 2019 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (54 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 2/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (CRB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4975 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4974 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #4973 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Winter, Randi)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4973 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2019 re #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. The motion was submitted, argued, and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4972 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Kannon Shanmugam (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4971 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4970 Sealed Letter . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4970 SEALED LETTER to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4969 ORDER granting #4965 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 4771, 4773, 4774, 4775, 4776, 4789, 4811, 4816, 4820, 4823, 4826, 4827, 4828, 4829, 4830, 4831, 4832, 4834, 4835, 4840, 4843, 4844, 4845, 4846, 4847, 4848, 4849, 4850.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 4767, 4821, 4824, 4825. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 2/26/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/29/2019. (JMK)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4968 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Lifting Stay of Discovery Relating to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage. (Winter, Randi)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4967 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4966 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Discovery Sought by HLC Relating to Reasonableness of Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees. (Winter, Randi)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4965 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #4821 Exhibit, #4774 Exhibit, #4826 Exhibit, #4830 Exhibit, #4831 Exhibit, #4843 Exhibit, #4820 Exhibit, #4776 Exhibit, #4844 Exhibit, #4834 Exhibit, #4849 Exhibit, #4824 Exhibit, #4775 Exhibit, #4827 Exhibit, #4823 Exhibit, #4840 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #4832 Exhibit, #4845 Exhibit, #4789 Exhibit, #4767 Exhibit, #4846 Exhibit, #4811 Response in Opposition to Motion, #4825 Exhibit, #4771 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing Evidence or Argument re Other Originators' Loan Samples, #4773 Exhibit, #4816 Response in Opposition to Motion, #4828 Exhibit, #4835 Exhibit, #4829 Exhibit, #4848 Exhibit, #4850 Exhibit, #4847 Exhibit filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Swenson, Katherine)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4964 ORDER in Response to #4962 Letter to District Judge, #4961 Letter to Magistrate Judge, #4852 Motion for Attorney Fees. Response due by 2/11/2019. Reply due by 2/18/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/23/2019. (SMD)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4963 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fee Motion against HLC #4962 Letter to District Judge. (Winter, Randi)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4962 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees Motion against HLC. (Winter, Randi)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4961 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. re Attorney Fee Motion. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4960 ORDER DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL CASE, re #4958 Stipulation of Dismissal. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, No. 14-cv-1710. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/22/2019. (SMD)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4959 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4958 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4958 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC. (Heeman, Donald)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4957 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Until further order of the Court, all pending filing deadlines related to the case of ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation, file number 14-cv-5101, are STAYED, as is the requirement that trial counsel in the Freedom Mortgage case appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/17/2019. (SMD)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4956 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust responding to Freedom's 1-15-19 Letter [Doc. No. 4954]. (Winter, Randi)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4955 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Until further order of the Court, all pending filing deadlines related to the case of ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending LLC, file number 13-cv-3531, are STAYED, as is the requirement that trial counsel in the iServe case appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/15/2019. (SMD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4954 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation Re Pretrial Disclosures. (Swenson, Katherine)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4953 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4949 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Strauch for Freedom Mortgage Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/14/2019. (NAH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4952 (Text-only) ORDER directing Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corp. to file a letter in response to #4950 Plaintiff's Letter to District Judge, no later than 4:00pm on January 15, 2019. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/14/2019. (MJC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4951 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Plaintiff's Jan. 11, 2019 #4950 Letter to District Judge. (Winter, Randi)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4950 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Re: Several Disputes with Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corp. Relevant to February 25 Trial. (Winter, Randi)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4949 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Strauch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6602829 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Swenson, Katherine)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4948 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re #4945 Exhibit, #4942 Exhibit, #4943 Exhibit Conventionally filed documents (Winter, Randi)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4947 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Re: Felhaber Larson Attorneys and Update of Service Information for Spencer Fane Attorneys (Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4946 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4941 , #4945 , #4942 , #4944 , #4943 Sealed Exhibits 9, 10, 15, 18, and 19 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4945 SEALED EXHIBIT 19 (Placeholder - Confidential Excel Spreadsheet Filed Conventionally) re #4940 Declaration in Support,, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi) Conventional Doc received on 1/9/2019 (NAH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4944 SEALED EXHIBIT 18 re #4940 Declaration in Support,, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4943 SEALED EXHIBIT 15 (Placeholder - Confidential Excel Spreadsheet Filed Conventionally) re #4940 Declaration in Support,, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi) Conventional Doc received on 1/9/2019 (NAH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4942 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 (Placeholder - Confidential Excel Spreadsheet Filed Conventionally) re #4940 Declaration in Support,, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi) Conventional Doc received on 1/9/2019 (NAH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4941 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4940 Declaration in Support,, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4940 Declaration of Isaac Nesser in Support of #4938 MOTION in Limine No. 19 against Freedom to Exclude Certain Categories of Evidence Prohibited under the Court's Summary Judgment and Other Decisions filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 11, #11 Exhibit(s) 12, #12 Exhibit(s) 13, #13 Exhibit(s) 14, #14 Exhibit(s) 16, #15 Exhibit(s) 17)(Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4939 MEMORANDUM re #3421 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3245 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Freedom's Experts filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Jessica)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4938 MOTION in Limine No. 19 against Freedom to Exclude Certain Categories of Evidence Prohibited under the Court's Summary Judgment and Other Decisions filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4937 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3419 Supplemental MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Defendants' Expert Brian Lin filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Duvall, Kenneth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4936 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Gene A. Hoff (Minenko, Michael)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4935 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4934 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4852 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4933 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4932 , #4882 , #4867 , #4930 , #4919 , #4879 , #4863 , #4885 , #4911 , #4880 , #4910 , #4877 , #4896 , #4884 , #4918 , #4860 , #4886 , #4894 , #4899 , #4914 , #4929 , #4904 , #4890 , #4901 , #4888 , #4871 , #4875 , #4926 , #4893 , #4908 , #4895 , #4905 , #4915 , #4889 , #4907 , #4928 , #4859 , #4887 , #4862 , #4922 , #4873 , #4869 , #4902 , #4861 , #4881 , #4927 , #4913 , #4898 , #4921 , #4924 , #4916 , #4892 , #4864 , #4925 Horner Declaration Exhibits filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4932 SEALED EXHIBIT 59 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4930 SEALED EXHIBIT 57 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4929 SEALED EXHIBIT 56 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4928 SEALED EXHIBIT 55 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4927 SEALED EXHIBIT 54-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4926 SEALED EXHIBIT 54-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4925 SEALED EXHIBIT 53-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4924 SEALED EXHIBIT 53A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4922 SEALED EXHIBIT 51-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4921 SEALED EXHIBIT 51-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4919 SEALED EXHIBIT 49-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4918 SEALED EXHIBIT 49-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4916 SEALED EXHIBIT 47-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4915 SEALED EXHIBIT 47-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4914 SEALED EXHIBIT 46 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4913 SEALED EXHIBIT 45 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4911 SEALED EXHIBIT 43-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4910 SEALED EXHIBIT 43A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Res.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4908 SEALED EXHIBIT 41-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4907 SEALED EXHIBIT 41-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4905 SEALED EXHIBIT 39-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4904 SEALED EXHIBIT 39-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4902 SEALED EXHIBIT 37-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4901 SEALED EXHIBIT 37-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4899 SEALED EXHIBIT 35-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4898 SEALED EXHIBIT 35-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4896 SEALED EXHIBIT 33B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4895 SEALED EXHIBIT 33-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4894 SEALED EXHIBIT 32-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4893 SEALED EXHIBIT 32-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4892 SEALED EXHIBIT 31 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4890 SEALED EXHIBIT 29-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4889 SEALED EXHIBIT 29A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4888 SEALED EXHIBIT 28 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4887 SEALED EXHIBIT 27-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4886 SEALED EXHIBIT 27-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4885 SEALED EXHIBIT 26-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4884 SEALED EXHIBIT 26-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4882 SEALED EXHIBIT 24-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4881 SEALED EXHIBIT 24-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4880 SEALED EXHIBIT 23 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4879 SEALED EXHIBIT 22 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4877 SEALED EXHIBIT 20 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4875 SEALED EXHIBIT 18 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4873 SEALED EXHIBIT 16 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4871 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4869 SEALED EXHIBIT 12 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4867 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4863 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4862 SEALED EXHIBIT 5-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4861 SEALED EXHIBIT 5-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4860 SEALED EXHIBIT 4-B re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4859 SEALED EXHIBIT 4-A re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4858 Redacted Document for #4857 Sealed Horner Declaration filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4857 SEALED Declaration of Jill Horner in Support of #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4856 Declaration of Isaac Nesser in Support of #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4855 Redacted Document for #4854 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4854 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4853 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. : Date and time to be determined. (Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4864 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4858 Redacted Document, #4857 Declaration in Support filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4852 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Defendant Home Loan Center, Inc. filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4851 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4846 , #4843 , #4844 , #4849 , #4845 , #4848 , #4850 , #4847 Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, and 9 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4850 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4849 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4848 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4847 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by Rescap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4846 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4845 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4844 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4843 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4842 Declaration in Opposition filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4842 DECLARATION of Johanna Ong in Opposition to #4765 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding End of RFC/Freedom Relationship; filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4841 Redacted Document for #4840 Sealed Plaintiff's Opposition to Freedom Motion in Limine filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4840 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4765 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding End of RFC/Freedom Relationship; filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4839 DECLARATION of Molly Stephens re #4838 Response in Opposition to Motion, by ResCap Liquidating Trust . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4838 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4771 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing Evidence or Argument re Other Originators' Loan Samples filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4837 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4103 MOTION in Limine, #4063 MOTION in Limine, #4109 MOTION in Limine filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4836 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4821 , #4826 , #4830 , #4831 , #4820 , #4834 , #4824 , #4825 , #4828 , #4827 , #4823 , #4832 , #4835 , #4829 Sealed C, D, F-O, Q and R filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4835 SEALED EXHIBIT R re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4834 SEALED EXHIBIT Q re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4833 EXHIBIT P re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4832 SEALED EXHIBIT O re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4831 SEALED EXHIBIT N re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4830 SEALED EXHIBIT M re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4829 SEALED EXHIBIT L re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4828 SEALED EXHIBIT K re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4827 SEALED EXHIBIT J re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4826 SEALED EXHIBIT I re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4825 EXHIBIT H re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4824 EXHIBIT G re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4823 SEALED EXHIBIT F re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4822 EXHIBIT E re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4821 EXHIBIT D re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine) Modified restriction and text on 2/28/2019 (JME).
January 4, 2019 Filing 4820 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #4819 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4819 DECLARATION of Katherine M. Swenson in Opposition to #4787 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Undisclosed Subjective Intent or Purported Agreements to Modify Underwriting Criteria, #4786 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence or Argument Concerning the Purported Causes of Borrower Defaults and Securitization Losses, #4784 MOTION in Limine No. 15, #4783 MOTION in Limine No. 14, #4791 MOTION in Limine No. 18 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4818 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4791 MOTION in Limine No. 18 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4817 Redacted Document for #4816 Sealed Response to Motion in Limine No. 17 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4816 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #4787 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Undisclosed Subjective Intent or Purported Agreements to Modify Underwriting Criteria filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4815 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4786 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence or Argument Concerning the Purported Causes of Borrower Defaults and Securitization Losses filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4814 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4784 MOTION in Limine No. 15 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4813 DECLARATION of Shalia Sakona in Opposition to #4783 MOTION in Limine No. 14 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4812 Redacted Document for #4811 Sealed Response to Motion in Limine No. 14 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4811 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #4783 MOTION in Limine No. 14 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4810 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4782 MOTION in Limine No. 13 filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4809 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4781 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 [Omnibus] filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4808 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Until further order of the Court, all pending filing deadlines related to the case of ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file number 14-cv-1710, are STAYED, as is the requirement that trial counsel in the CTX case appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for January 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/4/2019. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB) (SMD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4807 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Krista Anderson (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4806 ORDER in Response to #4797 Plaintiff's Letter regarding briefing schedules and summary judgment motions (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/2/2019. (MJC)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4805 ORDER on #4802 Stipulation Modifying Defendant-Specific Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 1/18/2019. Responses due by 2/1/2019. Replies due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/2/2019. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, as successor to United Residential Lending, LLC, No. 13-cv-3531(SMD)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4804 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust replying to Freedom's 12/26/18 letter [Doc. No. 4801] concerning Plaintiff's request to seek targeted summary judgment rulings [Doc. No. 4797]. (Winter, Randi)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4803 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4802 Stipulation,. (Winter, Randi)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4802 STIPULATION for Modifying Defendant-Specific Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Briefing Schedule by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by iServe Residential Lending, LLC, as successor to United Residential Lending, LLC. (Winter, Randi)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4801 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation responding to Plaintiffs letter of December 20, 2018 (Doc. No. 4797). (Swenson, Katherine)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4800 Reply to Response to Motion re #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4799 ORDER re #4752 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust and iServe Residential regarding the parties' jury waiver dispute. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC as successor to United Residential Lending LLC, Case No. 13-cv-3531 (SRN/HB) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/20/2018. (SMD)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4798 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Pre-Conference Briefing Schedule #4797 Letter to District Judge. (Winter, Randi)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4797 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Pre-Conference Briefing Schedule. (Winter, Randi)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4796 ORDER re-scheduling the Case Management Conference in this matter to Thursday, January 31, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and to submit a proposed agenda and accompanying submissions no later than 12:00 noon central time on Friday, January 25, 2019. All motions in limine will be heard at the Case Management Conference. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Freedom Mortgage Corp., file no. 13-cv-3490 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, file no. 13-cv-3531 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/19/2018. (SMD)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4795 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4739 MOTION for Prejudgment Interest : Motion Hearing is now set for 1/31/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. NOTE: This is a change in time only. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/19/2018. (SMD)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4794 ORDER on #4779 Stipulation to Resolve and Withdraw as Moot Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 11 and 12. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, No. 14-cv-1710. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/17/2018. (SMD)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4793 Declaration of Matthew A. Lee in Support of #4784 MOTION in Limine No. 15 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4792 Declaration of Matthew A. Lee in Support of #4791 MOTION in Limine No. 18 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4791 MOTION in Limine No. 18 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4790 Redacted Document for #4789 Exhibit 1 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4789 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 re #4788 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiff.(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4788 Declaration of Dawn Utsumi in Support of #4787 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Undisclosed Subjective Intent or Purported Agreements to Modify Underwriting Criteria filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 5)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4787 MOTION in Limine No. 17 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Undisclosed Subjective Intent or Purported Agreements to Modify Underwriting Criteria filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4786 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence or Argument Concerning the Purported Causes of Borrower Defaults and Securitization Losses filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4785 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-Declaration of Matthew A. Lee in Support of #4784 MOTION in Limine No. 15 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Winter, Randi) Modified text on 12/17/2018 (AKL).
December 14, 2018 Filing 4784 MOTION in Limine No. 15 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4783 MOTION in Limine No. 14 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4782 MOTION in Limine No. 13 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4781 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-9 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4780 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4779 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4779 STIPULATION to Resolve and Withdraw as Moot Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 11 and 12 by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by CTX Mortgage Company. (Winter, Randi)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4778 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4777 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4774 , #4776 , #4773 , #4775 Sealed Exhibits A-D filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4776 SEALED EXHIBIT D re #4772 Declaration in Support, filed by CTX Mortgage Co. and Freedom Mortgage Corp.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4775 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #4772 Declaration in Support, filed by CTX Mortgage Co. and Freedom Mortgage Corp.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4774 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #4772 Declaration in Support, filed by CTX Mortgage Co. and Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4773 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #4772 Declaration in Support, filed by CTX Mortgage Co. and Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4772 Declaration of Kristin K. Zinsmaster in Support of #4771 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing Evidence or Argument re Other Originators' Loan Samples filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E, #2 Exhibit(s) F, #3 Exhibit(s) G, #4 Exhibit(s) H, #5 Exhibit(s) I)(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4771 SEALED MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing Evidence or Argument re Other Originators' Loan Samples filed by CTX Mortgage Co. and Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4770 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4765 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding End of RFC/Freedom Relationship; filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4769 NOTICE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation re #4103 MOTION in Limine, #4063 MOTION in Limine, #4109 MOTION in Limine Notice of Joinder (Swenson, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4768 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4767 Sealed Exhibit A filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4767 EXHIBIT A re #4766 Declaration in Support filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine) Modified restriction and text on 2/28/2019 (JME).
December 14, 2018 Filing 4766 Declaration of Katherine M. Swenson in Support of #4765 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding End of RFC/Freedom Relationship; filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Swenson, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4765 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding End of RFC/Freedom Relationship; filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4764 ORDER on #4758 Stipulation Modifying Amended Jury Trial Notice and Defendant-Specific Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Schedule. See Order for deadlines, and note: Motion Hearing set on Defendant-Specific Summary Judgment and Daubert motions for 2/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, as successor to United Residential Lending, LLC, No. 13-cv-3531. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4763 ORDER on #4760 Stipulation to Substitute ResCap Liquidating Trust as Sole Plaintiff. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, as successor to United Residential Lending, LLC, No. 13-cv-3531. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4762 ORDER on #4756 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for #4739 MOTION FOR Prejudgment Interest. Response due by 12/14/2018. Reply due by 12/21/2018. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4761 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4760 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4760 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Substitute ResCap Liquidating Trust as Sole Plaintiff by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by iServe Residential Lending, LLC. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4759 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4758 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4758 STIPULATION for Modifying Amended Jury Trial Notice and Defendant-Specific Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Schedule by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by iServe Residential Lending, LLC. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4757 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4756 Stipulation. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4756 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Home Loan Center, Inc. (Winter, Randi)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4755 ORDER in Response to #4745 Letter to District Judge, #4751 Letter to District Judge regarding Motions in Limine. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB); ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Freedom Mortgage Corp., file no. 13-cv-3490 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4754 ORDER setting Case Management Conference for Tuesday, January 22, 2019. See Order for additional deadlines. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Freedom Mortgage Corp., file no. 13-cv-3490 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, file no. 13-cv-3531 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4753 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Maclin, Alan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4752 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust and iServe Residential regarding the parties' jury waiver dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Winter, Randi)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4751 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC in response to ECF 4745 Letter. (Laudon, Kelly)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4750 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Nelson, Jessica)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4749 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Erin Sindberg Porter for iServe Residential Lending (Bazis, Jeanette)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4748 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Erin Sindberg Porter for Impac Funding (Swenson, Katherine)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4747 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Erin Sindberg Porter (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4746 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Freedom Mortgage Corporation for a COPY OF #4738 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Duvall, Kenneth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4745 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Requesting Leave to File Additional Motions in Limine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nelson, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4744 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Prejudgment Interest #4739 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Nelson, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4743 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4739 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4742 Declaration of Donald Heeman in Support of #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4741 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Jessica)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4740 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest : Date and time to be determined. (Nelson, Jessica)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4739 MOTION Prejudgment Interest filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4738 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on November 16, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (51 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019. (CRB)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4737 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4736 ORDER on #4734 Stipulation Regarding Attorney Fee Claims.This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, No. 14-cv-1710, and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation, No. 14-cv-5101. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/3/2018. (SMD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4735 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4734 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4734 STIPULATION Regarding Attorney Fee Claims by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by CTX Mortgage Company and Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4733 REVISED Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716(SMD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4732 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Swenson on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Swenson, Katherine)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4731 ORDER in Response to #4730 Letter to District Judge, Lifting the stay of discovery, effective December 6, 2018. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC in its own capacity, and as successor to Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc., Douglas Rohm, and Edward Danielczyk, No. 16-cv-3024. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/28/2018. (SMD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4730 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Re Notice of Lifting of Stay in Interlinc Action. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified on 11/26/2018 (kt).
November 16, 2018 Filing 4729 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Freedom Mortgage Corporation for a COPY OF #4714 , #4722 , #4726 , #4712 , #4721 , #4719 , #4717 , #4711 , #4720 , #4716 , #4710 , #4725 , #4723 , #4727 , #4709 , #4718 , #4724 , #4715 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Duvall, Kenneth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4728 AMENDED JURY TRIAL NOTICE. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. See Notice for Additional Deadlines and Requirements. This document applies to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Freedom Mortgage Corp., file no. 13-cv-3490 (SRN/HB); Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. iServe Residential Lending, LLC, file no. 13-cv-3531. (SMD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4727 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XVII held on November 8, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (6 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4726 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XVI held on November 7, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (164 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4725 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XV held on November 6, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (163 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4724 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XIV held on November 5, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (237 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4723 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XIII held on November 2, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (94 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4722 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XII held on November 1, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (256 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4721 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume XI held on October 31, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (175 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4720 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume X held on October 30, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (212 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4719 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume IX held on October 29, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (310 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4718 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume VIII held on October 25, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (275 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4717 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume VII held on October 24, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (253 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4716 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume VI held on October 23, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (281 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4715 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume V held on October 22, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (313 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4714 CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT #4713 Jury Trial Volume IV held on October 18, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (149 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4713 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, corrected version filed, see #4714 . TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume IV held on October 18, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (212 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (kt). Modified text on 2/12/2019 (kt).
November 14, 2018 Filing 4712 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume III held on October 17, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (212 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4711 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume II held on October 16, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (243 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4710 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume I held on October 15, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (74 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4709 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Voir Dire Proceedings held on October 15, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (194 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents. (CRB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4708 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 18 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4707 REDACTED JURY NOTE No. 2. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Original Jury Question(s)) This document relates to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, case no. 14-cv-1716.(KNK) Document QC'd on 1/17/2019 (CLK).
November 9, 2018 Filing 4706 REDACTED JURY NOTE No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Original Jury Question(s)) This document relates to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, case no. 14-cv-1716.(KNK) Document QC'd on 1/17/2019 (CLK).
November 9, 2018 Filing 4705 REDACTED JURY VERDICT for ResCap Liquidating Trust against Home Loan Center, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, unredacted version of this document is filed under seal. This document relates to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, case no. 14-cv-1716. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Original Jury Verdict)(KNK) Document QC'd on 1/17/2019 (CLK).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4704 ORDER in Response to #4698 Letter to District Judge. Staying for 30 days all party-specific deadlines in the case of Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Impac Funding Corp. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Impac Funding Corp., No. 13-cv-3506. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/8/2018. (SMD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4703 Defendant Home Loan Center's Trial Exhibit List.This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SMD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4702 Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716(SMD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4700 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY SEVENTEEN OF TRIAL held on 11/8/2018. Verdict received at 10:23 a.m. for Plaintiff. Damages in the amount of $28,700,000.00 Clerk to file verdict. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4701 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716. (SMD)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4699 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY SIXTEEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 11/7/2018. Charge conference held. Closing arguments by Mr. Johnson for Defendant, and Mr. Price for Plaintiff. Jury received case at 4:12 p.m. Jury sent out a note at 4:25 p.m. announcing that it would end deliberations for the day at 4:30 p.m., returning to resume deliberations on November 8, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center,No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4698 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Impac Funding Corporation re settlement. (Sindberg Porter, Erin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4697 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4696 Amended Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified on 11/7/2018 (kt).
November 7, 2018 Filing 4694 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Final Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Special Verdict Form)(Winter, Randi)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4693 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4692 Proposed Special Verdict Form by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4695 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY FIFTEEN of JURY TRIAL held on 11/6/2018. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witnesses: Karl Snow testifies in person. Conference with attorneys held. The Court heard oral argument on Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and issued the following rulings: - Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the Allocation of the MBIA settlement [Doc. No. 4606] is DENIED; - Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Client Guide Governs HLC's At-Issue Loans [Doc. No. 4689] is DENIED; - Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Assetwise Direct Criteria Agreement Does Not Supersede the Client Guide [Doc. No. 4690] is GRANTED; and - Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Dismissing HLC's Affirmative Defense of Estoppel (and Waiver) [Doc. No. 4691] is GRANTED.Written order to follow on these motions. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4691 MEMORANDUM Hand-Up in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Dismissing HLCs Affirmative Defense of Equitable Estoppel (and Waiver) filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4690 MEMORANDUM Hand-Up in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law that the Assetwise Direct Criteria Agreement Does Not Supersede the Client Guide filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4689 MEMORANDUM Hand-Up in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law that the Client Guide Governs Defendant Home Loan Center's At-Issue Loans filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4688 MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AS TO AIDING AND ABETTING AND OTHER "JOINT LIABILITY" ALLEGATIONS filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4687 MEMORANDUM Home Loan Center's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4686 MEMORANDUM Home Loan Center's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Plaintiff's Failure to Prove a Non-Speculative Allocation of the MBIA and FGIC Settlements filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4685 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY FOURTEEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 11/5/2018. Conference with attorneys held before jury arrives. Plaintiff's oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Doc. Nos. 4673, 4674] was GRANTED. Written order to follow. Defendant's witnesses Chad Smith and Rian Furey testify in person. Defendant rests. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
November 4, 2018 Filing 4684 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 4, 2018 Filing 4683 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 4, 2018 Filing 4682 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding the Rebuttal Testimony of Dr. Snow. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4681 Text-Only Order: The Court will meet with the parties at 8:00 AM this coming Monday, November 5.. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/3/2018. (ACT)
November 3, 2018 Filing 4680 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
November 3, 2018 Filing 4679 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re Smith and Furey Exhibits. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4678 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY THIRTEEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 11/2/2018. Conference with attorneys held. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law was submitted, argued, and taken under advisement. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4675 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as Matter of Law by Home Loan Center, Inc. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/2/2018 (kt).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4674 MEMORANDUM Hand-Up in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Causation filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4673 MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the Reasonableness and Good Faith of RFC's Bankruptcy Settlements and The Allowance and Allocation of Servicing Claims filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4677 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY TWELVE OF JURY TRIAL held on 11/1/2018. Defendant's witnesses: Justin McCrary testifies in person. Tammy Hamzehpour and Robert Major testify by video deposition. Conferences with attorneys held both before jury arrives and during the jury's lunch recess. Trial continued to Monday, November 5, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Conference with attorneys scheduled for 11:15 a.m. on Friday, November 2, for oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and other trial-related matters. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4676 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY ELEVEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/31/2018. Defendant's witnesses: Phillip Burnaman testifies in person. Conferences with attorneys held both before jury arrives and during the jury's lunch recess. Trial continued to Thursday, November 1, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4672 Text-Only Order: The Court SUSTAINS Plaintiff's objection to lines 135:16-18 of Robert Major's deposition testimony.. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/31/2018. (ACT)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4671 ORDER DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL CASE. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc., Case No. 13-cv-3526 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/31/2018. (SMD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4670 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4669 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4668 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4667 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding HLC's Demonstrative and Summary Exhibits for Dr. McCrary. (Winter, Randi)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4666 Order re: Hamzehpour Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/30/2018. (ACT) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (kt).
October 30, 2018 Filing 4665 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY TEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/30/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses: Karl Snow continues to testify in person. Plaintiff rests. Defendant's oral motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is DENIED. Defendant's witnesses: the video depositions of Jeffrey Cancelliere and Lewis Kruger are played. Trial continued to Wednesday, October 31, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4664 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY NINE OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/29/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses Steve Butler and Karl Snow testify in person. Conferences with attorneys held both before jury arrives and after jury is dismissed for the day. Trial continued to Tuesday, October 30, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4663 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Deposition Designations of Cornell and Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4662 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4660 , #4661 Sealed Exhibits 1, 2 . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4661 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4659 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4660 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4659 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4659 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4658 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding HLC's Disclosures relating to Mr. Broeksmit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Winter, Randi)
October 28, 2018 Filing 4657 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding HLC's 10-30-18 Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4656 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4655 EXHIBIT A and Exhibit Index re #4654 Memorandum filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4654 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Closing Jury Instructions filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY EIGHT OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/25/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses Donald Hawthorne, Richard Payne, and Louis Dudney all testify in person. Trial continued to Monday, October 29, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center,No. 14-cv-1716 (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4652 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY SEVEN OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/24/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses: The video deposition of Allen Pfeiffer is played; Donald Hawthorne testifies in person. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4651 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4650 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Dorian Whealdon Transcripts. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4649 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding resolution of Ally dispute. (Winter, Randi)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4648 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY SIX OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/23/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses: Jeffrey Lipps testifies in person; the video depositions of Timothy Weiler, Lewis Kruger, and Frank Sillman are played. Trial continued to 9:00 am on Wednesday, October 24, 2018. Conference with attorneys scheduled for 8:00 am on Wednesday, October 24, 2018. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4646 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Unopposed Proposed Jury Instruction to read before the testimony of Richard W. Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Jury Instruction)(Winter, Randi)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4645 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4644 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Payne and Hawthorne Disclosures. (Winter, Randi)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4647 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY FIVE OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/22/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses Martha Forget and Lisa Lundsten testify in person. The video deposition of Brenda Phillips is played. Trial continued to Tuesday, October 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4643 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Trial Testimony of Mr. John Collins. (Winter, Randi)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4642 Order re: Admissibility of Sillman, Pfeiffer, and Kruger Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/22/2018. (ACT)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4641 Order re: Admissibility of HLC's "RFC Sole Responsibility" Argument and Related Evidence. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/22/2018. (ACT)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4640 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust in Response to HLC Sole Cause Disclosure. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4639 NOTICE by Home Loan Center, Inc. Defendant Home Loan Center's Disclosure of Evidence Relating to RFC's Sole Responsibility for the Trial Date of October 22, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4638 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4637 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding John Ruckdaschel exhibits. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4636 Text-Only Order: The Court will meet with the parties at 8:00 AM tomorrow, Monday October 22, to discuss the week's trial schedule and other pending matters.. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/21/2018. (ACT)
October 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4635 Order re: Admissibility of Timothy Weiler and Brenda Phillips Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/21/2018. (ACT)
October 20, 2018 Filing 4634 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kniffen, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/22/2018 (kt).
October 20, 2018 Filing 4633 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding status of the parties' meet-and-confer regarding Martha Forget exhibit. (Winter, Randi)
October 20, 2018 Filing 4632 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Lisa Lundsten testimony and exhibits. (Winter, Randi)
October 20, 2018 Filing 4631 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Jeffrey Lipps testimony and exhibits. (Winter, Randi)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4630 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust with the parties' update regarding closing jury instructions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Joint Proposed Closing Jury Instructions 1-3 and 5-6)(Winter, Randi)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4629 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY FOUR of JURY TRIAL held on 10/18/2018. Plaintiff's witnesses: Excerpts from the video depositions of James Svinth and Bill Cleary are played for the jury. John Collins testified in person. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4627 NOTICE by Home Loan Center, Inc. Defendant Home Loan Center's Disclosure of Evidence Relating to RFC's Sole Responsibility for the Trial Date of October 18, 2018 (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4628 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY THREE of JURY TRIAL held on 10/17/2018. The video deposition of Rebecca Barton continues. Renee Bangerter testifies in person. The video deposition of Angela Beeman is played. Trial continued to Thursday, October 18, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD) Modified text on 10/18/2018 (lmb).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4626 Order re: Admissibility of Bill Cleary Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/17/2018. (ACT)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4625 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4624 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY TWO OF JURY TRIAL held on 10/16/2018. Opening statements by Mr. Price for Plaintiff and Mr. Johnson for Defendant. Plaintiff's witnesses: Don Russell testifies in person. The video deposition of Rebecca Barton is played. Trial Continued to Wednesday, October 17, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4622 ORDER granting #4608 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 4444, 4446, 4491. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/13/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/16/2018. (JMK)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4621 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC regarding Testimony of Bill Cleary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4620 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4623 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: DAY ONE of JURY TRIAL held on 10/15/2018, Jury Selection and Conference with Attorneys. Trial continued to Tuesday, October 16, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, No. 14-cv-1716 (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4619 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4618 ORDER granting #4522 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 4351, 4353, 4354, 4355, 4356, 4357, 4358, 4359, 4360, 4361, 4362, 4363, 4364, 4365, 4366, 4367, 4368, 4369, 4370, 4371, 4372, 4373, 4374, 4375, 4376, 4377, 4379, 4380, 4381, 4382, 4383, 4385, 4386, 4387, 4389, 4391, 4392, 4393, 4394, 4396, 4397, 4398, 4399, 4400, 4401, 4402, 4403, 4404, 4405, 4406, 4407, 4408, 4409, 4410, 4411, 4412, 4413, 4414, 4415, 4416, 4417, 4418, 4419, 4420, 4421, 4422, 4423, 4424, 4425, 4426, 4427, 4428, 4431, 4435, 4436, 4437, 4438, 4439, 4440, 4441, 4442, 4466, 4485, 4486, 4487, 4488, 4489, 4501, 4509, 4510. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/13/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/15/2018. (JMK)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4617 ORDER RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF JEFFREY LIPPS TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/15/2018. (KL)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4616 ORDER on #4605 Stipulation Regarding the Use of Nonpublic Personal Information. This document relates to:ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/15/2018. (SMD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4615 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 14, 2018 Filing 4614 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4613 ORDER RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF REBECCA BARTON, ANGELA BEEMAN, AND JAMES SVINTH DEPOSITION TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/14/2018. (KL)
October 14, 2018 Filing 4612 AMENDED Witness List by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/15/2018 (kt).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4611 (Text-Only) ORDER: On Monday, October 15, 2018, the Court will meet with trial counsel in Courtroom 7B at 9:00 a.m., prior to jury selection. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/12/2018. (SMD)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4610 TRANSCRIPT of Interim Pretrial Conference held on October 9, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (165 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 11/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2019. (CRB)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4609 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4608 MOTION to SEAL #4491 Exhibit, #4446 Exhibit, #4444 Exhibit filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified on 10/16/2018 (kt).
October 12, 2018 Filing 4607 Second Amended Witness List by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified on 10/15/2018 (kt).
October 12, 2018 Filing 4606 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4605 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4605 STIPULATION REGARDING THE USE OF NONPUBLIC PERSONAL INFORMATION by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Home Loan Center, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4604 REAL-TIME FEED & EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4603 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4580 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4602 Redacted Document for #4601 Sealed Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Letter regarding Deposition Designations . (Winter, Randi)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4601 SEALED EXHIBIT E re #4600 Letter to District Judge, by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4600 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Winter, Randi)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4599 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Opening Demonstratives. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4598 Defendant Home Loan Center's Objections to the Court's Preliminary Jury Instructions by Home Loan Center, Inc. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/12/2018 (AKL).
October 12, 2018 Filing 4597 NOTICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Proposed Joint Agenda for October 15, 2018 Pretrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Joint Agenda)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4596 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4595 EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4594 Text-Only Order: After carefully considering HLC's proffer regarding "sole responsibility" at the October 9 hearing, in addition to the subsequent letters submitted by the parties (see HLC's Oct. 10, 2018 Letter [Doc. No. 4572] and ResCap's Oct. 11, 2018 Letter [Doc. No. 4582]), the Court has determined that it will likely entirely foreclose HLC's "sole responsibility" line of argument due to a lack of non-speculative, competent fact evidence, and no competent expert evidence, to support its position. Accordingly, HLC shall refrain from referencing "sole responsibility" or "RFC-only liability" in its opening statement and accompanying demonstratives. The Court will issue a more detailed Order forthwith.. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/12/2018. (ACT)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4593 ORDER RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN EVIDENCE CONCERNING MBIA'S PROOFS OF CLAIM AGAINST GMAC MORTGAGE AND RESCAP(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/11/2018. (Tuggle, Anderson)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4592 ORDER: RE ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN EVIDENCE AVAILABLE TO RFC AT THE TIME OF SETTLEMENT(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/11/2018. (Tuggle, Anderson)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4591 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust re Hawthorne Deposition Testimony Regarding Assured. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4590 Redacted Document for #4589 Sealed Exhibit 5 . (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4589 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4582 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4588 Redacted Document for #4587 Sealed Exhibit 4 . (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4587 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #4582 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4586 Redacted Document for #4585 Exhibit 3 . (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4585 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 3 re #4582 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4584 Redacted Document for #4583 Sealed Exhibit 1 . (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4583 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4582 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4582 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Responding to HLC's 10/10 Letter Regarding Sole Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2)(Winter, Randi)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4581 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #4580 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4579 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding evidence relating to Ally. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4578 ORDER on #4570 Stipulation REGARDING ATTORNEY FEE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/10/2018. (SMD)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4577 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4573 , #4574 , #4576 , #4575 Sealed Exhibits A, B, C, H . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4576 SEALED EXHIBIT H re #4572 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4575 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #4572 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4574 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #4572 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4573 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #4572 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4572 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) D, #2 Exhibit(s) E, #3 Exhibit(s) F, #4 Exhibit(s) G)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4571 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4570 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4570 STIPULATION REGARDING ATTORNEY FEE CLAIMS by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Home Loan Center, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4569 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding hearing date. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4580 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/2018. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4568 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4567 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4566 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4565 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4559 , #4564 , #4560 , #4563 , #4562 , #4561 , #4558 Sealed Exhibits A-G . (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4564 SEALED EXHIBIT G re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4563 SEALED EXHIBIT F re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4562 SEALED EXHIBIT E re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4561 SEALED EXHIBIT D re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4560 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4559 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4558 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #4557 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4557 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust addressing the admissibility of certain HLC exhibits. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4556 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding impasse on two categories of documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4555 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding witness sequestration. (Winter, Randi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4554 EXHIBIT 3 re #4553 Letter to District Judge. (Winter, Randi) Modified on 10/9/2018 (kt).
October 9, 2018 Filing 4553 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Opening Demonstrative Objections. (Winter, Randi)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4552 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Client Guide section A202(II). (Nelson, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4551 OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). 1. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 1, to exclude certain arguments and evidence regarding the value of Allowed Claims, the Identity of Unit Holders, and the Mechanics of Bankruptcy Plan Distribution [Doc. No. 4015], is GRANTED. 2. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 2, to preclude HLC from offering unproven assertions of RFC's alleged misconduct [Doc. No. 4017], is GRANTED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. 3. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 3, to exclude evidence of attorney representation [Doc. No. 4019], is GRANTED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. 4. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 4, to exclude evidence and argument that highlights or disparages the confidentiality of the mediation in RFC's bankruptcy case [Doc. No. 4021], is GRANTED.5. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 5, to exclude previously undisclosed evidence and argument in opposition to re-underwriting findings [Doc. No. 4023], is DENIED AS MOOT. 6. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 6, to exclude certain evidence and argument concerning ResCap's AVM expert [Doc. No. 4024], is DENIED AS MOOT. 7. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 7, to exclude evidence and argument concerning the feasibility of re-underwriting every at-issue loan [Doc. No. 4028], is GRANTED. 8. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 8, to exclude evidence and argument regarding Homecomings' practices [Doc. No. 4029], is DEFERRED. 9. ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 9, to preclude HLC from referencing non-bankruptcy-related proceedings against RFC, Ocwen, or their affiliates [Doc. No. 4031], is GRANTED. 10.ResCap's Motion in Limine No. 10, to exclude evidence and argument inconsistent with forthcoming orders concerning the parties' summary judgment and Daubert motions [Doc. No. 4032], is DENIED AS MOOT. 11.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 1, to exclude the Bankruptcy Court's findings and approval of the settlements [Doc. No. 3962], is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 12.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 2, to preclude ResCap from arguing or presenting evidence about its valuation of claims, pre-mediation statements, or the fact of mediation [Doc. No. 3968], is DENIED. 13.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 3, to exclude certain arguments and evidence regarding RFC's bankruptcy creditors [Doc. No. 3979], is DENIED. 14.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 4, to exclude arguments and evidence regarding identities of investors in the RMBS trusts [Doc. No. 3984], is DENIED AS MOOT. 15.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 5, to exclude certain arguments and evidence regarding the financial crisis and RFC's loss of business [Doc. No. 3989], is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. 16.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 6, to preclude ResCap from using information from post-settlement employer subpoenas to allocate the settlements [Doc. No. 3995], is DENIED. 17.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 7, to exclude evidence or argument regarding appraiser-specific research [Doc. No. 3998], is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 18.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 8, to preclude ResCap's experts from improperly vouching for other experts [Doc. No. 4003], is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 19.HLC's Motion in Limine No. 9, to exclude the Bankruptcy Court's findings regarding the settlements of the Trusts' servicing claims [Doc. No. 4010], is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/8/2018. (SMD)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4550 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4547 , #4548 , #4549 Sealed Exhibits 2, 3, 5 . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4549 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4546 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4548 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #4546 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4547 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4546 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4546 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 4)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4545 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust in response to HLCs objections to testimony of Ruckdaschel and Hawthorne. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4544 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4542 , #4543 Sealed Exhibit 1 and 2 . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4543 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4540 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4542 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4540 Letter to District Judge by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4541 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust regarding Ivanhoe Rule. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4540 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4539 TRANSCRIPT of Interim Pretrial Conference held on October 4, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (105 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 10/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (CRB)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4538 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4537 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Objections to Preliminary Instruction No. 2 and Closing Instruction No. 3. (Winter, Randi)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4536 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4535 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Scheck re #4534 Brief by ResCap Liquidating Trust . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Winter, Randi)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4534 BRIEF in Support of the Trial Testimony of Jeffrey A. Lipps filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4533 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Voir Dire. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4532 TRIAL BRIEF by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4531 Exhibit List by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4530 List of Deposition Testimony submitted by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4529 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4528 TRIAL BRIEF by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4527 NOTICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Proposed Joint Agenda for October 9, 2018 Pretrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Joint Agenda)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4526 List of Deposition Testimony submitted by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4525 Redacted Document for #4524 Sealed Plaintiff's Second List of Trial Exhibits . (Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4524 SEALED Plaintiff's Second List of Trial Exhibits by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4523 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4516 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4522 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #4441 Exhibit, #4363 Exhibit, #4436 Exhibit, #4435 Exhibit, #4367 Exhibit, #4446 Exhibit, #4357 Exhibit, #4374 Exhibit, #4389 Brief, #4364 Exhibit, #4355 Exhibit, #4375 Exhibit, #4372 Exhibit, #4376 Exhibit, #4365 Exhibit, #4440 Brief, #4383 Exhibit, #4356 Exhibit, #4381 Exhibit, #4439 Exhibit, #4351 Brief, #4358 Exhibit, #4431 Brief, #4466 Sealed Document, #4386 Exhibit, #4353 Exhibit, #4382 Exhibit, #4438 Exhibit, #4373 Exhibit, #4444 Exhibit, #4387 Exhibit, #4501 Sealed Document, #4361 Exhibit, #4385 Exhibit, #4354 Exhibit, #4360 Exhibit, #4370 Exhibit, #4442 Exhibit, #4369 Exhibit, #4380 Exhibit, #4437 Exhibit, #4379 Exhibit, #4377 Exhibit, #4366 Exhibit, #4371 Exhibit, #4362 Exhibit, #4359 Exhibit, #4368 Exhibit filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4521 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4516 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4520 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4519 EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4518 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4517 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #4516 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4516 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2018. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4515 ORDER on #4513 Stipulation for Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action. This document relates to ALL ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/4/2018. (SMD)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4514 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4513 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4513 STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by All Defendants. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4512 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Voir Dire. (Heeman, Donald)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4511 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4509 , #4510 Sealed Exhibits A and B to to Plaintiff's letter responding to HLC's October 2, 2018 letter regarding hearsay objections . (Winter, Randi)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4510 SEALED EXHIBIT B to Plaintiff's letter responding to HLC's October 2, 2018 letter regarding hearsay objections re #4508 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4509 SEALED EXHIBIT A to Plaintiff's letter responding to HLC's October 2, 2018 letter regarding hearsay objections re #4508 Letter to District Judge by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4508 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust responding to HLC's October 2, 2018 letter regarding hearsay objections. (Winter, Randi)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4507 Exhibit List by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4506 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4505 Proposed Special Verdict Form by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4504 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4503 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4502 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4501 Sealed Plaintiff's First List of 200 Trial Exhibits . (Nelson, Jessica)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4501 SEALED Plaintiff's First List of 200 Trial Exhibits by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4500 NOTICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Proposed Joint Agenda for October 4, 2018 Pretrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Joint Agenda)(Nelson, Jessica)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4499 (Text-only) ORDER granting the joint request of ResCap and Home Loan Center for an extension in which to submit their proposed jury instructions and proposed special verdict form. The documents shall be filed by noon (CDT), on October 2, 2018. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2018. (MJC)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4498 Proposed Voir Dire by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4497 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER in Response to #4351 and #4440 , Letters to District Judge, concerning certain categories of evidence that Home Loan Center ("HLC") seeks to introduce at trial. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., Case No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2018. (SMD)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4496 Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4495 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Joint Voir Dire. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4494 Joint STATEMENT OF CASE as to Home Loan Center, Inc., ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4493 JURY TRIAL NOTICE Jury Trial set for 2/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. See Notice for Additional Deadlines and Requirements. This document applies to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Standard Pacific Mortgage, n/k/a CalAtlantic Financial Services, Inc., file no. 13-cv-3526 (SRN/HB); ResCap Liquidating Trust v. CTX Mortgage Co., file no. 14-cv-1710 (SRN/HB); and Residential Funding Company, LLC v.Freedom Mortgage Corp., file no. 13-cv-3490 (SRN/HB). (SMD)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4492 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4491 Corrected Exhibit B . (Nelson, Jessica)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4491 SEALED EXHIBIT Corrected Exhibit B re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4490 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4488 , #4485 , #4486 , #4489 , #4487 Exhibits A-E . (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4489 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit E re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4488 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit D re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4487 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit C re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4486 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit B re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4485 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit A re #4484 Letter to District Judge by Plaintiff. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4484 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust Regarding Deposition Transcripts of HLCs Fact Witnesses. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4483 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4480 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4482 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. . (Stein, Philip)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4481 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4480 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4479 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Vandelist, Jacob)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4478 EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4477 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4480 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Pretrial Conference held on 9/21/2018. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4476 ORDER on #4472 Second Stipulation for Modifying Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order. Deposition Designations due 10/5/2018. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/20/2018. (SMD)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4475 Exhibit List Corrected by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4474 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4473 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4472 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4472 STIPULATION For Modifying Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order (Second) by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Home Loan Center. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4471 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and denying as moot in part #3192 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part, denying in part, and denying as moot in part #3245 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/19/2018. (MJC)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4470 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Status Conference held on September 14, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (108 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 10/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2018. (CRB)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4469 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4468 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4466 Exhibit List . (Winter, Randi)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4467 Witness List by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4466 SEALED Plaintiff's Exhibit List by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Winter, Randi)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4465 Witness List by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4464 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4463 Exhibit List by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4462 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4461 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Regarding Items on Joint Agenda for September 21, 2018 Pretrial Conference. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4460 NOTICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Joint Agenda for September 21, 2018 Pretrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Joint Agenda)(Nelson, Jessica)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4459 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4455 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4458 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Regarding Determination of Reasonableness (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/18/2018. (MJC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4457 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4455 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. Requested by Jake Perkowski. (SAE)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4456 ORDER SETTING ADDITIONAL HEARINGS. This document relates to ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB): This Court has determined that additional hearings are needed to resolve evidentiary issues before this trial commences on October 15, 2018. Accordingly, the Court sets the following hearing dates, which are mandatory for trial counsel: Thursday, October 4, 2018 at 9:30 a.m., and Tuesday, October 9, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/18/2018. (SMD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4454 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #4453 Pretrial Conference - Interim, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Vandelist, Jacob)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4452 EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4455 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB) -- Pretrial Hearing held on 9/14/2018 to address evidentiary issues in anticipation of October 15, 2018 Trial. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4453 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Pretrial Hearing held on 9/14/2018 address evidentiary issues in anticipation of the October 15, 2018 Trial. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD) Modified on 9/18/2018 (kt).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4451 ORDER on #4448 Stipulation for Modifying Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order. This document relates to : ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716 (SRN/HB). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/14/2018. (SMD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4450 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4449 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4448 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4448 STIPULATION For Modifying Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order (Second) by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Home Loan Center. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4447 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4446 , #4444 , #4440 Sealed Letter Brief and Exhibits B-C filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4446 SEALED EXHIBIT C re #4440 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4445 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4441 , #4436 , #4431 , #4435 , #4438 , #4442 , #4437 , #4439 Statement filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4444 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #4440 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4443 EXHIBIT A re #4440 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4442 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit J re #4431 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4441 SEALED EXHIBIT I re #4389 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4440 SEALED BRIEF Sealed Letter Brief Responding to HLC's Letter Brief re Categorical Objections filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4439 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit H re #4431 Brief filed by Plaintiff.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4438 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit F re #4431 Brief filed by Plaintiff.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4437 SEALED EXHIBIT G re #4431 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4436 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit E re #4431 Brief filed by Plaintiff.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4435 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit D re #4431 Brief filed by Plaintiff.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4434 EXHIBIT Exhibit C re #4431 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4433 EXHIBIT Exhibit B re #4431 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4432 EXHIBIT Exhibit A re #4431 Brief filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4431 SEALED BRIEF Sealed Letter Brief filed by Plaintiff.(Nelson, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4430 (Text-only) ORDER granting extension until 12:00 a.m. (CDT), September 13, 2018, for Plaintiffs to file reply letter briefs in response to Defendants' September 11, 2018 letter briefs. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/12/2018. (MJC)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4429 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4416 , #4428 , #4425 , #4427 , #4396 , #4410 , #4398 , #4393 , #4405 , #4411 , #4419 , #4408 , #4401 , #4420 , #4394 , #4413 , #4414 , #4418 , #4399 , #4415 , #4422 , #4402 , #4424 , #4426 , #4392 , #4423 , #4406 , #4403 , #4404 , #4409 , #4407 , #4397 , #4400 , #4417 , #4412 , #4421 , #4391 Sealed Exhibits to Declaration of Kristin K. Zinsmaster. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4428 SEALED EXHIBIT 31 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4427 SEALED EXHIBIT 32 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4426 SEALED EXHIBIT 30 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4425 SEALED EXHIBIT 33 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4424 SEALED EXHIBIT 29 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4423 SEALED EXHIBIT 34 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4422 SEALED EXHIBIT 28 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4421 SEALED EXHIBIT 35 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4420 SEALED EXHIBIT 27 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4419 SEALED EXHIBIT 36 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4418 SEALED EXHIBIT 37 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4417 SEALED EXHIBIT 26 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4416 SEALED EXHIBIT 25 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4415 SEALED EXHIBIT 24 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4414 SEALED EXHIBIT 23 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4413 SEALED EXHIBIT 22 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4412 SEALED EXHIBIT 21 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4411 SEALED EXHIBIT 20 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4410 SEALED EXHIBIT 19 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4409 SEALED EXHIBIT 18 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4408 SEALED EXHIBIT 17 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4407 SEALED EXHIBIT 16 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4406 SEALED EXHIBIT 15 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4405 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4404 SEALED EXHIBIT 13 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4403 SEALED EXHIBIT 12 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4402 SEALED EXHIBIT 11 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4401 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4400 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4399 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4398 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4397 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4396 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4395 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4389 Sealed Letter Brief filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Luger, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4394 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4393 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4392 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific and CTX. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4391 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4390 Declaration by Standard Pacific and CTX. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4390 DECLARATION of Kristin K. Zinsmaster re #4389 Brief by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. . (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4389 SEALED BRIEF (Letter) filed by Defendant Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. and Defendant CTX Mortgage Company, LLC.(Luger, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4388 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4363 , #4367 , #4357 , #4374 , #4364 , #4355 , #4375 , #4372 , #4376 , #4365 , #4383 , #4356 , #4381 , #4358 , #4386 , #4353 , #4382 , #4373 , #4387 , #4361 , #4385 , #4354 , #4360 , #4370 , #4369 , #4380 , #4379 , #4377 , #4366 , #4371 , #4362 , #4359 , #4368 Sealed Exhibits 1-25, 27-31, 33-35 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4387 SEALED EXHIBIT 35 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4386 SEALED EXHIBIT 34 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4385 SEALED EXHIBIT 33 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4384 EXHIBIT 32 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4383 SEALED EXHIBIT 31 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4382 SEALED EXHIBIT 30 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4381 SEALED EXHIBIT 29 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4380 SEALED EXHIBIT 28 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4379 SEALED EXHIBIT 27 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4378 EXHIBIT 26 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4377 SEALED EXHIBIT 25 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4376 SEALED EXHIBIT 24 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4375 SEALED EXHIBIT 23 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4374 SEALED EXHIBIT 22 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4373 SEALED EXHIBIT 21 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4372 SEALED EXHIBIT 20 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4371 SEALED EXHIBIT 19 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4370 SEALED EXHIBIT 18 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4369 SEALED EXHIBIT 17 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4368 SEALED EXHIBIT 16 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4367 SEALED EXHIBIT 15 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4366 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4365 SEALED EXHIBIT 13 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4364 SEALED EXHIBIT 12 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4363 SEALED EXHIBIT 11 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4362 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4361 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4360 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4359 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4358 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4357 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4356 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4355 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4354 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4353 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #4351 Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4352 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #4351 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4351 SEALED BRIEF Sealed Letter Brief filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4350 ORDER on #4344 Stipulation to Substitute ResCap Liquidating Trust as Sole Plaintiff. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc., No. 13-cv-3526; Residential Funding Company, LLC v. CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, No. 14-cv-1710; Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Home Loan Center, Inc., No. 14-cv-1716. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/6/2018. (SMD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4349 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. Re: Trial. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4348 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. in Response to Doc 4346. (Laudon, Kelly)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4346 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Regarding Trial. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4347 ORDER granting #4342 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 3962, 3965, 3966, 3968, 3971, 3972, 3973, 3974, 3975, 3976, 3977, 3979, 3982, 3984, 3987, 3989, 3992, 3993, 3995, 3998, 4001, 4003, 4006, 4007, 4008, 4010, 4013, 4015, 4017, 4019, 4021, 4024, 4025, 4026, 4027, 4029, 4031, 4034, 4035, 4036, 4037, 4038, 4039, 4040, 4041, 4042, 4043, 4044, 4045, 4046, 4047, 4048, 4066, 4068, 4070, 4074, 4076, 4078, 4081, 4083, 4084, 4087, 4088, 4092, 4093, 4094, 4096, 4097, 4098, 4099, 4100, 4105, 4106, 4107, 4111, 4112, 4113, 4114, 4115, 4116, 4117, 4118, 4166, 4167, 4169, 4170, 4173, 4178, 4179, 4180, 4182, 4185, 4187, 4189, 4191, 4192, 4196, 4197, 4198, 4200, 4201, 4202, 4203, 4205, 4206, 4207, 4209, 4211, 4213, 4214, 4215, 4218, 4221, 4222, 4223, 4224, 4226, 4227, 4229, 4230, 4234, 4237, 4238, 4239, 4240, 4241, 4242, 4244, 4246, 4250, 4251, 4252, 4254, 4255, 4257, 4258, 4260, 4262, 4264, 4267, 4268, 4269, 4273, 4274, 4281, 4282, 4285, 4287, 4290, 4291, 4292, 4293, 4294, 4295.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 4079, 4085, 4256, 4270, 4271. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 10/3/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/5/2018. (JMK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4345 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4344 Stipulation,. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4344 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE RESCAP LIQUIDATING TRUST AS SOLE PLAINTIFF by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc., CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, and Home Loan Center, Inc. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4343 ORDER in Response to #4336 Letter from Standard Pacific Mortgage and CTX Mortgage Company to District Judge, #4340 Home Loan Center's Letter to District Judge, #4333 Plaintiffs' Letter to District Judge. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/4/2018. (MJC)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4342 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #4251 Response, #4230 Response, #4207 Response, #4211 Response, #4291 Exhibit, #4273 Response, #3968 Brief, #3979 Brief, #4169 Response, #4066 Exhibit, #4166 Exhibit, #4222 Response, #4201 Response, #4187 Response, #4260 Response, #4167 Exhibit, #4087 Memorandum, #4203 Response, #4010 Brief, #4209 Response, #4234 Response, #4025 Sealed Document, #4264 Response, #4293 Exhibit, #4019 Memorandum, #4282 Response, #4031 Memorandum, #4189 Exhibit, #4287 Response, #4192 Response, #4292 Exhibit, #4015 Memorandum, #4290 Exhibit, #4170 Response, #4024 Memorandum, #4003 Brief, #4295 Exhibit, #3995 Brief, #4021 Memorandum, #4244 Response, #3962 Brief, #4191 Response, #4099 Memorandum, #4242 Response, #4262 Response, #4173 Exhibit, #3984 Brief, #4196 Response, #3989 Brief, #4281 Response, #3998 Brief, #4229 Response, #4185 Response, #4029 Memorandum, #4017 Memorandum, #4246 Response, #4218 Response, #4294 Exhibit, #4285 Response, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4341 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4335 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (JGK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4340 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4339 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4335 Pretrial Conference - Interim to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4338 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference and Motions Hearing held on August 23, 2018 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (249 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 9/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2018. (CRB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4337 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4336 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. re Requesting Telephonic Hearing. (Laudon, Kelly)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4334 (Text-only) ORDER granting extension until 5:00 pm (CDT) today, August 29, 2018, for parties in the first trial queue to submit letters to the Court. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/29/2018. (MJC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4333 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Requesting Telephonic Hearing. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4332 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by Home Loan Center, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4331 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4330 EXPEDITED HOURLY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Heeman, Donald)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/23/2018. Motions in Limine taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4329 Redacted Document for #4262 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 9 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4328 Redacted Document for #4246 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 8 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4327 Redacted Document for #4234 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 7 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4326 Redacted Document for #4229 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4325 Redacted Document for #4218 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 5 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4324 Redacted Document for #4191 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 4 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4323 Redacted Document for #4209 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 3 (No Redactions) filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4322 Redacted Document for #4185 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4321 Redacted Document for #4170 Sealed Response Defendant Home Loan Center's Opposition to RFC's Motion in Limine No. 1 filed by Home Loan Center, Inc..(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4320 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc. . (Laudon, Kelly)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4319 ORDER granting #4312 Motion to Stay Discovery in Case 16-cv-3024 Residential Funding Company, LLC, and ResCap Liquidating Trust v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC, in its own capacity, and as successor to Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc., Douglas Rohm, and Edward Danielczyk. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/21/2018. (SMD)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4318 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4317 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #4316 Letter to District Judge: Mr. Butswinkas is excused from attending the August 23 pretrial conference, but is required to attend the September 21 pretrial conference. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/21/2018. (SMD)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4316 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Home Loan Center, Inc. . (Kniffen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2018 (kt).
August 21, 2018 Filing 4315 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC re Position Letter on Joint Agenda Topics. (Winter, Randi)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4314 NOTICE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC Proposed Joint Agenda for August 23, 2018 Pretrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Joint Agenda)(Nelson, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4313 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stay Discovery in Interlinc matter #4312 Motion to Stay. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4312 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery (also filed by Interlinc) filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4311 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #4154 Telephone Conference to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. Requested by Angela Scorese. (HMH) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/27/2018 (KMH).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4310 ORDER on #4308 Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Schedule filed by Plaintiffs and Defendants Impac Funding Corp. and iServe Residential Lending, LLC. The parties' request is granted. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/16/2018. (MJC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4309 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4308 Stipulation. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4308 STIPULATION TO AMEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. Jointly Signed by Impac Funding Corp. and iServe Residential Lending, LLC. (Nelson, Jessica)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4307 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and denying without prejudice in part #3241 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Common Issues; granting in part and denying in part #3247 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Common Issues. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/15/2018. (SMD)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4306 Redacted Document for #4099 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 13 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4305 Redacted Document for #4090 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 12 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4304 Redacted Document for #4087 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4303 Redacted Document for #4029 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 8 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4302 Redacted Document for #4024 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4301 Redacted Document for #4019 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4300 Redacted Document for #4088 Ninth Motion in Limine Regarding Vouching Testimony filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4299 Redacted Document for #4081 Eighth Motion in Limine Regarding Appraiser-Specific Research filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC.(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4298 Redacted Document for #4068 Fourth Motion in Limine Regarding the Impact of RFC's Bankruptcy on Local Economy and/or Residents filed by CTX Mortgage Company, LLC, Standard Pacific Mortgage, Inc..(Zinsmaster, Kristin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4297 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Loan Center, Inc. re #4223 Exhibit Certificate of Service of Conventionally Filed Document (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4296 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4292 , #4290 , #4291 , #4295 , #4293 , #4294 Stephens Decl. Exs 2, 7, 9, 10, 11, 14 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4295 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by RFC and RESCAP.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4294 SEALED EXHIBIT 11 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4293 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4292 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by RFC and RESCAP.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4291 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4290 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #4289 Declaration in Support, filed by Residential Funding Company, LLC.(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4288 Redacted Document for #4287 Sealed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine 8 re Appraiser-Specific Research filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4287 SEALED RESPONSE re #4076 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Opposition to Eighth Motion in Limine Regarding Appraiser-Specific Research filed by Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4289 Declaration of Molly Stephens in Support of #4062 MOTION in Limine, #4063 MOTION in Limine, #4076 MOTION in Limine filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 5, #5 Exhibit(s) 6, #6 Exhibit(s) 8, #7 Exhibit(s) 12, #8 Exhibit(s) 13)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4286 Redacted Document for #4285 Sealed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9 filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4285 SEALED RESPONSE re #4088 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Standard Pacific's and CTX's Motion in Limine No. 9 regarding Vouching Testimony filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4284 Redacted Document for #4281 Sealed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Standard Pacific's and CTX's Seventh Motion in Limine filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4283 Redacted Document for #4072 Brief Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fifth Motion in Limine Regarding Third-Party Loan Originators filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4282 SEALED RESPONSE re #4072 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fifth Motion in Limine Regarding Third-Party Loan Originators filed by Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4281 SEALED RESPONSE re #4063 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Standard Pacific's and CTX's Seventh Motion in Limine Regarding the Use of Bank of America's Settlement with the DOJ filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4280 RESPONSE re #4062 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Standard Pacifics And CTXs Sixth Motion In Limine To Exclude References To Government Investigations filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4279 RESPONSE re #4068 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fourth Motion in Limine Regarding The Impact of RFC's Bankruptcy on Local Economy and/or Residents filed by ResCap Liquidating Trust, ResCap Liquidating Trust, Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winter, Randi)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4278 BRIEF Defendants' Supplemental Brief Regarding the Right to a Jury Trial on the Issue of Settlement Reasonableness filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4277 RESPONSE re #4032 Memorandum, filed by Home Loan Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4276 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #4271 , #4269 , #4274 , #4270 , #4268 , #4267 Sealed Exhibits 1-6 . (Kniffen, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2018