Arctic Cat, Inc. et al v. Polaris Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arctic Cat, Inc. and Arctic Cat Sales Inc.
Defendant: Polaris Industries Inc.
Case Number: 0:2013cv03579
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 77 Motion to Compel filed by Arctic Cat Sales Inc., Arctic Cat, Inc (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on June 11, 2015. (HAZ)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER MODIFYING THE REPORT AND ADOPTING THE RECOMMENDATION for 49 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Arctic Cat Sales Inc., Arctic Cat, Inc., and 68 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes is GRANTED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on May 12, 2015. (HAZ)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting in part and denying in part Polaris' (15) Motion to Dismiss in case 0:13-cv-03579-JRT-FLN. (a)The motion is denied to the extent it seeks discretionary dismissal of A rctic Cat's claims for declaratory judgment (Counts I, II, and III). (b) The motion is also denied with respect to Arctic Cat's claim for breach of contract (Count IV). (c) The motion is granted with respect to Arctic Cat's claims f or fraud (Count V), unenforceability of the '220 Patent (Count VI), unenforceability of the '125 and '405 Patents (Count VII), Walker Process fraud (Count VIII), and sham litigation (Count IX). These claims are dismissed with prejudic e. (2) Granting in part and denying in part Arctic Cat's (17) Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases in case 0:13-cv-03595-JRT-FLN. (a) The motion is denied to the extent it seeks dismissal of Polaris compla int. (b) The motion is granted to the extent it seeks consolidation of the above-captioned cases. All documents will be filed in civil case number 13-3579. The caption of civil case number 13-3579 will remain unchanged: Arctic Cat, Inc. and Arcti c Cat Sales, Inc. will remain listed as Plaintiffs and Polaris Industries, Inc., both the Minnesota and Delaware corporations, will remain listed as Defendants. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on October 20, 2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-cv-03579-JRT-FLN, 0:13-cv-03595-JRT-FLN(DML)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arctic Cat, Inc. et al v. Polaris Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Cat, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Okerlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Cat Sales Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Okerlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?