Williams v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: |
Dale A. Williams, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Nancy Johnston, Paul Mayfield, Shelley Rorvick, Thom Lundquist, Courtney Menten, Joe Mullen and Jannine Hebert |
Case Number: |
0:2014cv00369 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
Carlton |
Presiding Judge: |
Donovan W. Frank |
Presiding Judge: |
Franklin L. Noel |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 30, 2017 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(A) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/30/2017. (BJS) Modified text on 11/30/2017 (ACH). cc: Williams
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
25
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 1. Defendants Nancy Johnston, Paul Mayfield, Shelley Rorvick, Thom Lundquist, Courtney Menten, Joe Mullen, and Jannine Hbert's objections (Doc. No. 20 ) to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel' s Jan uary 28, 2015 Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED. 2. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel's January 28, 2015 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 19 ) is ADOPTED. 3. To the extent Defendants seek to dismiss all claims against the named Defenda nts in their official capacities for monetary damages, Defendants' motion (Doc. No. 9 ) is GRANTED. 4. To the extent Defendants seek to dismiss all claims against Defendants Johnston, Rorvick, and Mullen in both their individual and official ca pacities, Defendants motion (Doc. No. 9 ) is GRANTED and Defendants Johnston, Rorvick, and Mullen are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 5. To the extent Defendants seek to dismiss all claims against Defendants Hbert, Mayfield, Lundquist, and Menten in their individual capacities, Defendants' motion (Doc. No. 9 ) is DENIED. 6. All discovery is STAYED until the Courts Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Memorandum Opinion and Order is released in the matter of Karsjens v. Jesson, Civ. No. 11-3659 (D. Minn.). (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/25/2015. (BJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?