Tatum et al v National Football League et al
Plaintiff: John L. Outlaw, Artis Houston, Horace Copeland, Rodney McSwain, Delton D. Hall, Edward R. Zeman, John Gilmore, Jonathan T. Carter, Benito Recardo, Erik G. Williams, William D. Andrews, Fred H. Cook, III, Tom G. Newberry, Reginald J. Gipson, Calvin J. Williams, Jr., Hanford L. Dixon, Renard Young, Todd Kalis, James T. Cannida, II, William A. Bartee, Donald Bessillieu, Keith Lee, Paul Laaveg, Johnny Rembert, Ernest Kellerman, Roosevelt Potts, Jonathan Staggers, Ray A. Jacobs, Clarence T. Jones, Harry M. Crump, Willie L. Broughton, Mark S. Murphy, Jeffrey A. Christy, Mario Fatafehi, Raion Y. Hill, Mark McCants, Peter J. Cronan, Michael W. McKibben, John McDaniel, Steve Baack, Doug Van Horn, Gloster Richardson, Jeffrey Burris, Brian Glasgow, Anthony Bass, Brian C. DeRoo, James Bowden, Louis J. Giammona, Julian Douglas Cunningham, Philip M. Pozderac, William T. Taylor, James R. Jones, Eric D. Johnson, Damon Pieri, Robert P. Brunet, Michael D. Carter, Rickey L. Brady, Alfred J. Jenkins, Lorenzo Hampton, Steven W. Schubert, Michael Schneck, Frederick R. Banks, A. D. Whitfield, Jr., Chidi Ahanotu, Samual Germinaro, Robert E. Taylor, Hugh Green, Kevin Scott, William Schultz, Stacey Dillard, Alphonso Taylor, Adrian Dingle, Michael R. Baldassin, Charles E. Miller, Ronald A. Johnson, Bradford J. Ford, Jeff McIntyre, Percell M. Gaskins, Ralph L. Jecha, Earthwind Moreland, Marvin Marshall, Paul Flatley, Laurie Finnie, James A. Baker, Anthoney C. Dickerson, Kirk Cameron Jones, Harvey Clayton, Christian Hanburger, Jr., Thomas C. Randolph, Patrick Cunningham, Michael K. Bankston, Sr., Lloyd Harrison, Edward Martin, Larry M. Mallory, Terry Brown, Clarence LeBlanc, Phil Clarke, Dwight Johnson, Kenneth Davidson, Frank G. Mestnik, Roger T. Craig, Darrell Gill, James P. Van Wagner, Donald F. Smerek, Frank D. Lewis, David Gibson, Raymond T. Chester, Renee Turner, Barry Foster, Brian Jones, Robert A. Howard, Terrell Jurineack, James W. Kelley, Jr., James Morrissey, Ifeanyi Ohalete, Frank Reed, James H. Brown, Ryan Stewart, Zachary Crockett, Lonnie Ford, Robert Kuechenberg, Tom Herter, Reginald Moore, Marcus J. Anderson, Oliver Ross, Brandon W. Christenson, Council Rudolph, Donald Norton, Isaac Hagins, Melvin Renfro, Pete Koch, Delvic Philyaw, Marty Carter, Anthony Marshall, Stephen G. Doig, Ray E. McElroy, Horatio Blades, Cedric W. Brown, Melvin Jenkins, Doug H. Dieken, Nathaniel Hemsley, Hugh McElheny, Adam B. Schreiber, Forrest Gregg, Ascotti Fields and Curtis Shearer
Case Number: 0:2014cv01265
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Franklin L Noel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2016 Filing 57 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiffs' claims, and the claims of all other Plaintiffs in the cases listed in Attachment A to this Order, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or disbursements to any party. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/5/16. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kt)
November 30, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by National Football League re #53 MOTION to Show Cause (Connolly, Daniel)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Show Cause is GRANTED #53 . Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 10/03/2016. (LLM)
September 30, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Show Cause by NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C.. (Connolly, Daniel)
December 18, 2014 Filing 52 **TEXT ONLY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Status Conference held on 12/15/2014. Attorneys present: Jason Luckasevic, Jason Shipp, Daniel Connolly, Aaron D. Van Oort, and by phone Michael Schaper. (JEP)
November 21, 2014 Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Associated Cases: 0:14-cv-01265-PAM-FLN et al.(JEP)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Civil No. 14cv04700 PJS/TNL be assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, nunc pro tunc, by use of a space on the appropriate list of the automated case assignment system, and the Clerk of Court is directed to void and reuse a card on the same list pursuant to this Court's Assignment of Cases Order filed December 19, 2008. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a copy of this order shall be filed in each of the above respective files. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 11/12/2014. (las)
October 10, 2014 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. Filed by Denise Tatum. No summons requested. (Luckasevic, Jason)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 09/03/2014. (LLM)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 08/21/2014. (LLM)
August 21, 2014 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. Filed by Bobby E. Abrams, Jr, Stefon L. Adams, Chidi Ahanotu, Theodore C. Albrecht, Vince Albritton, Michael D. Alford, James D. Allen, Alfred A. Anderson, Eddie L. Anderson, Jr, Fred Anderson, Kim Anderson, Marcus J. Anderson, William D. Andrews, William L. Andrews, Charles Anthony, Joseph P. Aska, Jr, George H. Atkinson, Ocie M. Austin, Steve Baack, Elmer F. Bailey, Mario Bailey, Stacey Bailey, Thomas A. Bailey, James A. Baker, Jeffrey S. Baker, Michael R. Baldassin, Lester Baldwin, Peter A. Banaszak, Estes M. Banks, Frederick R. Banks, Michael K. Bankston, Sr, Warren Bankston, William A. Bartee, Anthony Bass, Patrick Batteaux, Douglas L. Beaudoin, Aubrey Beavers, Rogers Beckett, Thomas Beer, Grantis Bell, Mitchell Benson, Donald Bessillieu, Keith Biggers, Jeff Blackshear, Horatio Blades, Michael Blair, Carl N. Bland, Phillip Bobo, Michael J. Boryla, William Keith Bostic, Tony Bouie, James Bowden, Charles Bowser, Henry A. Bradley, Kyle Brady, Rickey L. Brady, John W. Brandes, Solomon E. Brannan, Christopher J. Brewer, Sean Brewer, Timothy W. Broady, Willie L. Broughton, Anthony Q. Brown, Cedric W. Brown, Clifford Brown, James H. Brown, Lawrence Brown, Jr, Raymond M. Brown, Reginald V. Brown, Robert Lee Brown, Terry Brown, Joey M. Browner, William G. Brundige, Robert P. Brunet, Maurice Bryant, Warren Bryant, Vince L. Buck, Douglas Buffone, Daniel Buggs, Rudolph A. Bukich, Ronald D. Bull, John S. Bunting, John A. Burch, III, Scott Burk, Lem Burnham, Jeffrey Burris, Dexter M. Bussey, Bobby Butler, Hillary Butler, William F. Butler, Brian D. Cabral, Kenneth Callicutt, Christopher Calloway, Gary K. Campbell, Joseph Campbell, Jr, LaMar C. Campbell, James T. Cannida, II, Alphonso Carreker, Ahmad R. Carroll, Jonathan T. Carter, Marty Carter, Michael D. Carter, Pat Carter, Shante Carver, Tom Cavallo, Lindsey Chapman, Albert Chesley, Raymond T. Chester, Gene A. Chilton, Brandon W. Christenson, Jeffrey A. Christy, Darryl Clack, Jamal Clark, Phil Clarke, Raymond Clayborn, Harvey Clayton, Jonathan Clinkscale, Daniel M. Colchico, Robin Cole, Fredrick D. Coleman, Lincoln C. Coleman, Jr, Anthony A. Collins, Ron Collins, Fred H. Cook, III, Robert Coons, Obadiah Cooper, Horace Copeland, Lou A. Cordileone, Tony Covington, Aaron Cox, Claude Crabb, Francisco Craig, Roger T. Craig, Zachary Crockett, Peter J. Cronan, Corey V. Croom, Cleveland Crosby, Harry M. Crump, Robert J. Cryder, George E. Cumby, Julian Douglas Cunningham, Patrick Cunningham, Eric F. Curry, George J. Curry, Jr, Matt Darby, Kenneth Davidson, Benjamin F. Davis, Darrell O. Davis, Ennis R. Davis, II, John H. Davis, Kenneth E. Davis, Michael R. Davis, Oliver Davis, Robert E. Davis, Jr, Thabiti Davis, Joe DeLamielleure, Brian C. DeRoo, Dennis DeVaughn, Kevin DeVine, Vernon W. Dean, Anthoney C. Dickerson, Doug H. Dieken, Stacey Dillard, Adrian Dingle, Hanford L. Dixon, Ronald Dixon, Stephen G. Doig, Rome Douglas, Edward Drummond, Elbert Dubenion, Bobby R. Duckworth, Mark S. Duper, John Ebersole, Bobby J. Edmonds, Jr, Joyce Edwards, Kelvin Edwards, Larry Edwards, Tyrone Edwards, Ronald Egloff, Kolas D. Elion, Allan D. Ellis, Sr, James Elrod, Aaron Emanuel, Phillip E. Epps, Alex A. Espinoza, Gregory Evans, Mario Fatafehi, Marlon Favorite, Keith T. Ferguson, Howard Fest, Ascotti Fields, Laurie Finnie, James M. Flanigan, Sr, Paul Flatley, Bernard Ford, Bradford J. Ford, Darryl D. Ford, Lonnie Ford, Barry Foster, Larry Foster, Timothy R. Fox, Donald Frank, Robert J. Fredrickson, Dominic Furio, John B. Galvin, Jr, Mike Gann, Talman Gardner, Percell M. Gaskins, Samual Germinaro, Louis J. Giammona, Antonio Gibson, David Gibson, Jon Giesler, Oscar Giles, Darrell Gill, John Gilmore, Reginald J. Gipson, Brian Glasgow, Glenn Glass, William S. Glass, George Goeddeke, Derrel Gofourth, Jon G. Goldsberry, Chris Goode, Cornell Gowdy, William Graham, Darryl Grant, Marsharne Graves, Rory Graves, Terry Gray, David L. Grayson, Sr, David L. Grayson, Jr, Hugh Green, Roy Green, Forrest Gregg, Jeff Griffin, James Grigsby, Eric Guliford, Isaac Hagins, Delton D. Hall, Lynell Hamilton, Malcolm Hamilton, Gary A. Hammond, Jermaine Hampton, Lorenzo Hampton, Rodney Hampton, Christian Hanburger, Jr, Terrence H. Hanretty, William Hardison, Cedric W. Hardman, Anthony Hargain, Ed Hargrove, James C. Harrell, Jr, Duriel Harris, Elroy Harris, Jr, Joe Harris, Kymara Harris, Dwight Harrison, Lloyd Harrison, James W. Hart, Wayne A. Hawkins, Gregory Hawthorne, Frederick R. Hayes, Thomas Hayes, Jr, Patrick D. Heenan, Nathaniel Hemsley, Keith Henderson, Thomas E. Hendricks, III, Terry A. Hermeling, Kenneth B. Herock, Tom Herter, Jessie Lee Hester, Dallas Hickman, Victor L. Hicks, J. D. Hill, LonZell Hill, Lovel Hill, Raion Y. Hill, Richard Himes, Bryan Hinkle, Lee E. Hitt, Floyd Hodge, Joseph Holmes, Bryan Hooks, Melvin Hoover, Samual W. Horner, III, Artis Houston, Robert A. Howard, Garry W. Howe, David A. Hughes, III, David H. Humm, Patrick Hunter, Gaylon Hyder, Robert L. Hyland, Sedrick M. Irvin, Raghib R. Ismail, Eddie Lee Ivery, Harold L. Jackson, Jabari Jackson, Jeffrey P. Jackson, Patrick Jackson, Richard S. Jackson, Stephan F. Jackson, Tyoka Jackson, William C. Jaco, Ray A. Jacobs, Roland James, George Jamison, John Janata, Leon R. Jarvis, Ralph L. Jecha, Alfred J. Jenkins, Melvin Jenkins, Ronney Jenkins, James C. Jenson, Akili Johnson, Dirk Johnson, Dwight Johnson, Eric D. Johnson, Troy D. Johnson, William W. Johnson, Aaron D. Jones, II, Anthony A. Jones, Brian Jones, Broderick Jones, Clarence T. Jones, James R. Jones, Kirk Cameron Jones, William T. Judson, Terrell Jurineack, Kevin Kaesviharn, John Kaiser, Larry M. Kaminski, Ernest Kellerman, James W. Kelley, Jr, Kareem Kelly, Derek Kennard, Rex W. Kern, Wade Key, Emanuel King, Horace E. King, Stephen G. King, Kelly Kirchbaum, Louis Kirouac, Joseph Klopfenstein, Thomas L. Knight, Mary Lee Kocourek, Robert H. Kohrs, Steve Korte, Kent Kramer, Robert Kuechenberg, Ralph Kurek, Paul Laaveg, Charles W. Lamson, Sean E. Landeta, Kareem M. Larrimore, Henry Lawrence, Clarence LeBlanc, Edward P. Lee, Keith Lee, Dorsey Levens, David Lewis, Frank D. Lewis, Ronnie Lippett, Louis Lipps, Eugene Lockhart, Jr, Kristie Long, Duval L. Love, Dominic G. Lowery, Chad Lucas, Michael Lush, Larry M. Mallory, Van Malone, Henry Dejhown Mandley, William H. Mandley, Anthony Marshall, Leonard A. Marshall, Marvin Marshall, Edward Martin, Emanuel Martin, Eric W. Martin, Patrick W. Matson, Eric Matthews, Ira R. Matthews, III, Vernon Maxwell, Deems May, Alonzo Mayes, Corey Mayfield, Corey Mays, Mark McCants, Dewey L. McClain, Brent McClanahan, Kenneth McClendon, John McDaniel, Ramos McDonald, Hugh McElheny, Ray E. McElroy, Jeff McIntyre, Michael W. McKibben, Kevin McLeod, Bruce McNorton, Rodney McSwain, Michael L. Meade, Richard Mercier, Frank G. Mestnik, Carl Miller, Charles E. Miller, Danny Miller, Eric Mitchel, Derrell Mitchell, Lyvonia Mitchell, Singor Mobley, Christopher G. Mohr, Joe Montgomery, Alvin Moore, Reginald Moore, Earthwind Moreland, Stanley D. Morgan, Byron Morris, James Morrissey, Mark S. Murphy, Leon C. Murray, Frank Myers, Craig M. Nall, Terna Nande, Steve Nelson, Kendall M. Newson, Cameron L. Newton, Karl P. Noonan, Erik Norgard, Donald Norton, Don Nottingham, Brent H. Novoselsky, Ifeanyi Ohalete, Chris Oldham, John L. Outlaw, Jerry L. Overton, Loren Owens, Marvin D. Owens, Morris Owens, Richard Palmer, Richard M. Palmer, Chris Pane, Bernard P. Parrish, Edward Payton, Dave Pear, Marion Todd Peat, Christopher Penn, Antonio Perkins, Calvin E. Peterson, Charles Pharms, III, Delvic Philyaw, Robert J. Pickens, Damon Pieri, Myron Pottios, Roosevelt Potts, Philip M. Pozderac, Eugene N. Prebola, Andre President, Shawn Price, Anthony E. Prior, James Pruitt, Jethro Pugh, Jr, William Rademacher, Thomas C. Randolph, Darrol Ray, Terry Ray, Rick Razzano, Sr, John Reaves, Benito Recardo, K. Anthony Redman, Daniel L. Reece, Sr, Frank Reed, Oscar Reed, Johnny Rembert, Melvin Renfro, Thomas L. Rentzel, Derrick S. Reynolds, Randy W. Rich, Gloster Richardson, Willie Richardson, Tina Ricks, John G. Roach, James E. Robbins, Randy Robbins, William Roberts, Bernard H. Robertson, III, Isiah Robertson, Rob Robertson, Mark L. Robinson, Melvin D. Robinson, Shelton D. Robinson, Mark T. Rodenhauser, Kendrick D. Rogers, Reginald Rogers, Sr, Juan A. Roque, Oliver Ross, Council Rudolph, Reynard Rutherford, John J. Saldi, Greg Sampson, Clarence Sanders, Justin Sandy, Richard F. Sanford, Terry R. Schmidt, Michael Schneck, Robert E. Schobel, Adam B. Schreiber, Larry Schreiber, Steven W. Schubert, William Schultz, Willard Scissum, Kevin Scott, Leon Seals, Robert S. Selby, Adam Seward, Curtis Shearer, Jason Shelley, Sanders Shiver, Les Shy, Antuan Simmons, David B. Sims, Daryle Skaugstad, Thomas E. Skladany, Donald F. Smerek, Antowain D. Smith, Derek Smith, Edward M. Smith, JeMone Smith, John T. Smith, John H. Smith, Lance Smith, Omar Smith, Philip Smith, Reginald L. Smith, Robert L. Smith, Ronnie B. Smith, Trent Smith, James Spencer, Rich Stephens, Curt Stephenson, James P. Stewart, Ryan Stewart, Arthur B. Still, Walter Stith, Ralph Stockemer, Dwight Stone, Michael Strachan, Eric Sutton, Steven P. Sylvester, John A. Tarver, Denise Tatum, Alphonso Taylor, Eugene Y. Taylor, Robert E. Taylor, William T. Taylor, Mark A. Thomas, Arthur W. Thoms, Lewis D. Tillman, Gregory D. Tolver, Jr, Stephen D. Towle, Wendell Tucker, Greg Turner, Odessa Turner, Renee Turner, Maurice Tyler, Wendell A. Tyler, Timothy G. Tyrrell, Richard Van Druten, Doug Van Horn, James P. Van Wagner, Patrick Venzke, Clarence Verdin, George Visger, Mark Walczak, William S. Walik, Bruce Walker, Charles D. Walker, Anthony Wallace, Charles Wesley Walls, William Ward Walsh, Gayle Ward, Derek G. Ware, Paul D. Warfield, Charles T. Waters, Robert A. Watkins, Richard J. Watters, Robert Weathers, Jonathan Welsh, Theodore Wheeler, III, David M. White, Russell White, Sherman White, A. D. Whitfield, Jr, David Widell, Paul A. Wiggins, James David Wilkins, II, Calvin J. Williams, Jr, Darryl E. Williams, Delvin Williams, Dudley Williams, Eric Williams, Erik G. Williams, James E. Williams, John A. Wil
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: 1. Plaintiffs may file the Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the parties' stipulation #44 ; and 2. Defendants need not respond to the Amended Complaint, but may rely on their previously filed Answer #31 . Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 08/21/2014. (LLM)
August 20, 2014 Filing 44 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Amend Complaint by Bobby E. Abrams, Jr, Stefon L. Adams, Chidi Ahanotu, Theodore C. Albrecht, Vince Albritton, Michael D. Alford, James D. Allen, Alfred A. Anderson, Eddie L. Anderson, Jr, Fred Anderson, Kim Anderson, Marcus J. Anderson, William D. Andrews, William L. Andrews, Charles Anthony, Joseph P. Aska, Jr, George H. Atkinson, Ocie M. Austin, Steve Baack, Elmer F. Bailey, Mario Bailey, Stacey Bailey, Thomas A. Bailey, James A. Baker, Jeffrey S. Baker, Michael R. Baldassin, Lester Baldwin, Peter A. Banaszak, Estes M. Banks, Frederick R. Banks, Michael K. Bankston, Sr, Warren Bankston, William A. Bartee, Anthony Bass, Patrick Batteaux, Douglas L. Beaudoin, Aubrey Beavers, Rogers Beckett, Thomas Beer, Grantis Bell, Mitchell Benson, Donald Bessillieu, Keith Biggers, Jeff Blackshear, Horatio Blades, Michael Blair, Carl N. Bland, Phillip Bobo, Michael J. Boryla, William Keith Bostic, Tony Bouie, James Bowden, Charles Bowser, Henry A. Bradley, Kyle Brady, Rickey L. Brady, John W. Brandes, Solomon E. Brannan, Christopher J. Brewer, Sean Brewer, Timothy W. Broady, Willie L. Broughton, Anthony Q. Brown, Cedric W. Brown, Clifford Brown, James H. Brown, Lawrence Brown, Jr, Raymond M. Brown, Reginald V. Brown, Robert Lee Brown, Terry Brown, Joey M. Browner, William G. Brundige, Robert P. Brunet, Maurice Bryant, Warren Bryant, Vince L. Buck, Douglas Buffone, Daniel Buggs, Rudolph A. Bukich, Ronald D. Bull, John S. Bunting, John A. Burch, III, Scott Burk, Lem Burnham, Jeffrey Burris, Dexter M. Bussey, Bobby Butler, Hillary Butler, William F. Butler, Brian D. Cabral, Kenneth Callicutt, Christopher Calloway, Gary K. Campbell, Joseph Campbell, Jr, LaMar C. Campbell, James T. Cannida, II, Alphonso Carreker, Ahmad R. Carroll, Jonathan T. Carter, Marty Carter, Michael D. Carter, Pat Carter, Shante Carver, Tom Cavallo, Lindsey Chapman, Albert Chesley, Raymond T. Chester, Gene A. Chilton, Brandon W. Christenson, Jeffrey A. Christy, Darryl Clack, Jamal Clark, Phil Clarke, Raymond Clayborn, Harvey Clayton, Jonathan Clinkscale, Daniel M. Colchico, Robin Cole, Fredrick D. Coleman, Lincoln C. Coleman, Jr, Anthony A. Collins, Ron Collins, Fred H. Cook, III, Robert Coons, Obadiah Cooper, Horace Copeland, Lou A. Cordileone, Tony Covington, Aaron Cox, Claude Crabb, Francisco Craig, Roger T. Craig, Zachary Crockett, Peter J. Cronan, Corey V. Croom, Cleveland Crosby, Harry M. Crump, Robert J. Cryder, George E. Cumby, Julian Douglas Cunningham, Patrick Cunningham, Eric F. Curry, George J. Curry, Jr, Matt Darby, Kenneth Davidson, Benjamin F. Davis, Darrell O. Davis, Ennis R. Davis, II, John H. Davis, Kenneth E. Davis, Michael R. Davis, Oliver Davis, Robert E. Davis, Jr, Thabiti Davis, Joe DeLamielleure, Brian C. DeRoo, Dennis DeVaughn, Kevin DeVine, Vernon W. Dean, Anthoney C. Dickerson, Doug H. Dieken, Stacey Dillard, Adrian Dingle, Hanford L. Dixon, Ronald Dixon, Stephen G. Doig, Rome Douglas, Edward Drummond, Elbert Dubenion, Bobby R. Duckworth, Mark S. Duper, John Ebersole, Bobby J. Edmonds, Jr, Joyce Edwards, Kelvin Edwards, Larry Edwards, Tyrone Edwards, Ronald Egloff, Kolas D. Elion, Allan D. Ellis, Sr, James Elrod, Aaron Emanuel, Phillip E. Epps, Alex A. Espinoza, Gregory Evans, Mario Fatafehi, Marlon Favorite, Keith T. Ferguson, Howard Fest, Ascotti Fields, Laurie Finnie, James M. Flanigan, Sr, Paul Flatley, Bernard Ford, Bradford J. Ford, Darryl D. Ford, Lonnie Ford, Barry Foster, Larry Foster, Timothy R. Fox, Donald Frank, Robert J. Fredrickson, Dominic Furio, John B. Galvin, Jr, Mike Gann, Talman Gardner, Percell M. Gaskins, Samual Germinaro, Louis J. Giammona, Antonio Gibson, David Gibson, Jon Giesler, Oscar Giles, Darrell Gill, John Gilmore, Reginald J. Gipson, Brian Glasgow, Glenn Glass, William S. Glass, George Goeddeke, Derrel Gofourth, Jon G. Goldsberry, Chris Goode, Cornell Gowdy, William Graham, Darryl Grant, Marsharne Graves, Rory Graves, Terry Gray, David L. Grayson, Sr, David L. Grayson, Jr, Hugh Green, Roy Green, Forrest Gregg, Jeff Griffin, James Grigsby, Eric Guliford, Isaac Hagins, Delton D. Hall, Lynell Hamilton, Malcolm Hamilton, Gary A. Hammond, Jermaine Hampton, Lorenzo Hampton, Rodney Hampton, Christian Hanburger, Jr, Terrence H. Hanretty, William Hardison, Cedric W. Hardman, Anthony Hargain, Ed Hargrove, James C. Harrell, Jr, Duriel Harris, Elroy Harris, Jr, Joe Harris, Kymara Harris, Dwight Harrison, Lloyd Harrison, James W. Hart, Wayne A. Hawkins, Gregory Hawthorne, Frederick R. Hayes, Thomas Hayes, Jr, Patrick D. Heenan, Nathaniel Hemsley, Keith Henderson, Thomas E. Hendricks, III, Terry A. Hermeling, Kenneth B. Herock, Tom Herter, Jessie Lee Hester, Dallas Hickman, Victor L. Hicks, J. D. Hill, LonZell Hill, Lovel Hill, Raion Y. Hill, Richard Himes, Bryan Hinkle, Lee E. Hitt, Floyd Hodge, Joseph Holmes, Bryan Hooks, Melvin Hoover, Samual W. Horner, III, Artis Houston, Robert A. Howard, Garry W. Howe, David A. Hughes, III, David H. Humm, Patrick Hunter, Gaylon Hyder, Robert L. Hyland, Sedrick M. Irvin, Raghib R. Ismail, Eddie Lee Ivery, Harold L. Jackson, Jabari Jackson, Jeffrey P. Jackson, Patrick Jackson, Richard S. Jackson, Stephan F. Jackson, Tyoka Jackson, William C. Jaco, Ray A. Jacobs, Roland James, George Jamison, John Janata, Leon R. Jarvis, Ralph L. Jecha, Alfred J. Jenkins, Melvin Jenkins, Ronney Jenkins, James C. Jenson, Akili Johnson, Dirk Johnson, Dwight Johnson, Eric D. Johnson, Troy D. Johnson, William W. Johnson, Aaron D. Jones, II, Anthony A. Jones, Brian Jones, Broderick Jones, Clarence T. Jones, James R. Jones, Kirk Cameron Jones, William T. Judson, Terrell Jurineack, Kevin Kaesviharn, John Kaiser, Larry M. Kaminski, Ernest Kellerman, James W. Kelley, Jr, Kareem Kelly, Derek Kennard, Rex W. Kern, Wade Key, Emanuel King, Horace E. King, Stephen G. King, Kelly Kirchbaum, Louis Kirouac, Joseph Klopfenstein, Thomas L. Knight, Mary Lee Kocourek, Robert H. Kohrs, Steve Korte, Kent Kramer, Robert Kuechenberg, Ralph Kurek, Paul Laaveg, Charles W. Lamson, Sean E. Landeta, Kareem M. Larrimore, Henry Lawrence, Clarence LeBlanc, Edward P. Lee, Keith Lee, Dorsey Levens, David Lewis, Frank D. Lewis, Ronnie Lippett, Louis Lipps, Eugene Lockhart, Jr, Kristie Long, Duval L. Love, Dominic G. Lowery, Chad Lucas, Michael Lush, Larry M. Mallory, Van Malone, Henry Dejhown Mandley, William H. Mandley, Anthony Marshall, Leonard A. Marshall, Marvin Marshall, Edward Martin, Emanuel Martin, Eric W. Martin, Patrick W. Matson, Eric Matthews, Ira R. Matthews, III, Vernon Maxwell, Deems May, Alonzo Mayes, Corey Mayfield, Corey Mays, Mark McCants, Dewey L. McClain, Brent McClanahan, Kenneth McClendon, John McDaniel, Ramos McDonald, Hugh McElheny, Ray E. McElroy, Jeff McIntyre, Michael W. McKibben, Kevin McLeod, Bruce McNorton, Rodney McSwain, Michael L. Meade, Richard Mercier, Frank G. Mestnik, Carl Miller, Charles E. Miller, Danny Miller, Eric Mitchel, Derrell Mitchell, Lyvonia Mitchell, Singor Mobley, Christopher G. Mohr, Joe Montgomery, Alvin Moore, Reginald Moore, Earthwind Moreland, Stanley D. Morgan, Byron Morris, James Morrissey, Mark S. Murphy, Leon C. Murray, Frank Myers, Craig M. Nall, Terna Nande, Steve Nelson, Kendall M. Newson, Cameron L. Newton, Karl P. Noonan, Erik Norgard, Donald Norton, Don Nottingham, Brent H. Novoselsky, Ifeanyi Ohalete, Chris Oldham, John L. Outlaw, Jerry L. Overton, Loren Owens, Marvin D. Owens, Morris Owens, Richard Palmer, Richard M. Palmer, Chris Pane, Bernard P. Parrish, Edward Payton, Dave Pear, Marion Todd Peat, Christopher Penn, Antonio Perkins, Calvin E. Peterson, Charles Pharms, III, Delvic Philyaw, Robert J. Pickens, Damon Pieri, Myron Pottios, Roosevelt Potts, Philip M. Pozderac, Eugene N. Prebola, Andre President, Shawn Price, Anthony E. Prior, James Pruitt, Jethro Pugh, Jr, William Rademacher, Thomas C. Randolph, Darrol Ray, Terry Ray, Rick Razzano, Sr, John Reaves, Benito Recardo, K. Anthony Redman, Daniel L. Reece, Sr, Frank Reed, Oscar Reed, Johnny Rembert, Melvin Renfro, Thomas L. Rentzel, Derrick S. Reynolds, Randy W. Rich, Gloster Richardson, Willie Richardson, Tina Ricks, John G. Roach, James E. Robbins, Randy Robbins, William Roberts, Bernard H. Robertson, III, Isiah Robertson, Rob Robertson, Mark L. Robinson, Melvin D. Robinson, Shelton D. Robinson, Mark T. Rodenhauser, Kendrick D. Rogers, Reginald Rogers, Sr, Juan A. Roque, Oliver Ross, Council Rudolph, Reynard Rutherford, John J. Saldi, Greg Sampson, Clarence Sanders, Justin Sandy, Richard F. Sanford, Terry R. Schmidt, Michael Schneck, Robert E. Schobel, Adam B. Schreiber, Larry Schreiber, Steven W. Schubert, William Schultz, Willard Scissum, Kevin Scott, Leon Seals, Robert S. Selby, Adam Seward, Curtis Shearer, Jason Shelley, Sanders Shiver, Les Shy, Antuan Simmons, David B. Sims, Daryle Skaugstad, Thomas E. Skladany, Donald F. Smerek, Antowain D. Smith, Derek Smith, Edward M. Smith, JeMone Smith, John T. Smith, John H. Smith, Lance Smith, Omar Smith, Philip Smith, Reginald L. Smith, Robert L. Smith, Ronnie B. Smith, Trent Smith, James Spencer, Rich Stephens, Curt Stephenson, James P. Stewart, Ryan Stewart, Arthur B. Still, Walter Stith, Ralph Stockemer, Dwight Stone, Michael Strachan, Eric Sutton, Steven P. Sylvester, John A. Tarver, Denise Tatum, Alphonso Taylor, Eugene Y. Taylor, Robert E. Taylor, William T. Taylor, Mark A. Thomas, Arthur W. Thoms, Lewis D. Tillman, Gregory D. Tolver, Jr, Stephen D. Towle, Wendell Tucker, Greg Turner, Odessa Turner, Renee Turner, Maurice Tyler, Wendell A. Tyler, Timothy G. Tyrrell, Richard Van Druten, Doug Van Horn, James P. Van Wagner, Patrick Venzke, Clarence Verdin, George Visger, Mark Walczak, William S. Walik, Bruce Walker, Charles D. Walker, Anthony Wallace, Charles Wesley Walls, William Ward Walsh, Gayle Ward, Derek G. Ware, Paul D. Warfield, Charles T. Waters, Robert A. Watkins, Richard J. Watters, Robert Weathers, Jonathan Welsh, Theodore Wheeler, III, David M. White, Russell White, Sherman White, A. D. Whitfield, Jr, David Widell, Paul A. Wiggins, James David Wilkins, II, Calvin J. Williams, Jr, Darryl E. Williams, Delvin Williams, Dudley Williams, Eric Williams, Erik G. Williams, James E. Williams, John A. Williams, John L. Williams, Kendall Wi
August 20, 2014 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Willard Scissum. (Shipp, Jason)
August 13, 2014 Filing 42 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 02/01/2015; Discovery due by 09/01/2015; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 09/01/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 10/01/2015; Ready For Trial by 12/01/2015. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 08/13/2014. (LLM)
August 12, 2014 ***TEXT ONLY**Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Pretrial Conference held on 8/12/2014. (SMR)
August 5, 2014 Filing 41 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League.(Connolly, Daniel)
July 1, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE OF RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2014 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (SMR)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David B Rodes for DENISE TATUM. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/13/2014. (MAP)
June 11, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Rodes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4012628 by Denise Tatum. (Iverson, Blake)
May 30, 2014 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. NOTE: the new case number is 14-cv-1265 PAM/FLN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (LJG)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Schaper for NFL FILMS, INC., NFL Productions, L.L.C., and National Football League; granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bruce P Keller for NFL FILMS, INC., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. Approved by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 5/22/14. (AKL)
May 21, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bruce P. Keller. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3986379 by NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 21, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Schaper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3986310 by NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - In re dispositive-motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on August 13, 2012. (SMR)
May 15, 2014 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Bruce P. Keller; Michael Schaper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
May 15, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by NFL Films, Inc., NFL Productions, L.L.C., National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason E Luckasevic for all Plaintiffs. Approved by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 5/15/14. (AKL)
May 14, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason E. Luckasevic. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3978288 by Denise Tatum. (Iverson, Blake)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason T Shipp for all plaintiffs. Approved by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 5/14/14. (KMM)
May 13, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason T. Shipp. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3977135 by Denise Tatum. (Iverson, Blake)
May 13, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake G Iverson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Iverson, Blake)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson for all further proceedings. Judge Ann D. Montgomery no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 14cv1265 PAM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 4/29/14. (AKL)
April 25, 2014 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason E. Luckasevic, Jason T. Shipp, Brian H. Simmons, Charles B. Gibbons, Erin Lucas Hamilton as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)CC: Jason E. Luckasevic, Jason T. Shipp, Brian H. Simmons, Charles B. Gibbons, Erin Lucas Hamilton.
April 25, 2014 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:13-cv-01814. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham per Master List.
April 25, 2014 Case electronically transferred to District of Minnesota. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this action to the District of Minnesota for all further proceedings FORTHWITH, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), for convenience of the parties and witnesses, and in the interest of justice and judicial economy. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 4/24/14. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C., NFL FILMS, INC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 4/24/14. (clh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #16 Brief in Opposition to #12 Motion to Transfer, filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER that the Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer (ECF No. #18 ) is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court is directed to file Attachment A of this motion as Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 03/06/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Hamilton, Erin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #12 Motion to Transfer by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Erin) Modified to link to appropriate document on 3/6/2014. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING the #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. The Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint no later than twenty-one (21) days after this Court rules on the pending Motion to Transfer. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 02/19/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Brief in Opposition to Motion, to Transfer by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS
February 18, 2014 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition re #12 Motion to Transfer Case filed by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS, LES
February 17, 2014 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N-1, #15 Exhibit N-2, #16 Exhibit N-3, #17 Exhibit N-4, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P-1, #20 Exhibit P-2, #21 Exhibit Q-1, #22 Exhibit Q-2, #23 Exhibit Q-3, #24 Exhibit R-1, #25 Exhibit R-2, #26 Exhibit S, #27 Exhibit T, #28 Exhibit U, #29 Exhibit V, #30 Exhibit W, #31 Exhibit X) (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Transfer Case filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that should all parties wish to consent before a Magistrate Judge, they shall file a joint stipulation to that effect with the Clerk of Court no later than February 7, 2014. The Court notes that ALL parties must consent before the document is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party DOES NOT wish to consent, the parties shall file a joint stipulation to that effect no later than February 7, 2014, requesting a District Judge be assigned and that the case be returned to that District Judge upon completion of pretrial matters. This stipulation SHOULD NOT indicate which parties wished to consent and which did not. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/31/2014. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 30, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Lucas Hamilton on behalf of NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Hamilton, Erin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C. (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Simmons on behalf of NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C. (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Gibbons on behalf of NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.. (Gibbons, Charles) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Shipp on behalf of BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS, LESTER J. W
January 24, 2014 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS, LESTER J. WILLIAMS, MARC
January 24, 2014 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS, LESTER J. WILLIAMS, MARC
January 24, 2014 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIAMS, ERIC WILLIAMS, ERIK G. WILLIAMS, JAMES E. WILLIAMS, JOHN A. WILLIAMS, JOHN L. WILLIAMS, KENDALL WILLIAMS, LESTER J. WILLIAMS, MARC
December 23, 2013 Summons Issued as to *NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C.* (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/25/2014.]
December 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NFL FILMS, INC., NFL PRODUCTIONS, L.L.C. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-3038232), filed by BOBBY E. ABRAMS, JR, STEFON L. ADAMS, CHIDI AHANOTU, THEODORE C. ALBRECHT, VINCE ALBRITTON, MICHAEL D. ALFORD, JAMES D. ALLEN, ALFRED A. ANDERSON, EDDIE L. ANDERSON, JR, FRED ANDERSON, KIM ANDERSON, MARCUS J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM D. ANDREWS, WILLIAM L. ANDREWS, CHARLES ANTHONY, JOSEPH P. ASKA, JR, GEORGE H. ATKINSON, OCIE M. AUSTIN, STEVE BAACK, ELMER F. BAILEY, MARIO BAILEY, STACEY BAILEY, THOMAS A. BAILEY, JAMES A. BAKER, JEFFREY S. BAKER, MICHAEL R. BALDASSIN, LESTER BALDWIN, PETER A. BANASZAK, ESTES M. BANKS, FREDERICK R. BANKS, MICHAEL K. BANKSTON, SR, WARREN BANKSTON, WILLIAM A. BARTEE, ANTHONY BASS, PATRICK BATTEAUX, DOUGLAS L. BEAUDOIN, AUBREY BEAVERS, ROGERS BECKETT, THOMAS BEER, GRANTIS BELL, MITCHELL BENSON, DONALD BESSILLIEU, KEITH BIGGERS, JEFF BLACKSHEAR, HORATIO BLADES, MICHAEL BLAIR, CARL N. BLAND, PHILLIP BOBO, MICHAEL J. BORYLA, WILLIAM KEITH BOSTIC, TONY BOUIE, JAMES BOWDEN, CHARLES BOWSER, HENRY A. BRADLEY, KYLE BRADY, RICKY L. BRADY, JOHN W. BRANDES, SOLOMON E. BRANNAN, CHRISTOPHER J. BREWER, SEAN BREWER, TIMOTHY W. BROADY, WILLIE L. BROUGHTON, ANTHONY Q. BROWN, CEDRIC W. BROWN, CLIFFORD BROWN, JAMES H. BROWN, LAWRENCE BROWN, JR, RAYMOND M. BROWN, REGINALD V. BROWN, ROBERT LEE BROWN, TERRY BROWN, JOEY M. BROWNER, WILLIAM G. BRUNDIGE, ROBERT P. BRUNET, MAURICE BRYANT, WARREN BRYANT, VINCE L. BUCK, DOUGLAS BUFFONE, DANIEL BUGGS, RUDOLPH A. BUKICH, RONALD D. BULL, JOHN S. BUNTING, JOHN A. BURCH, III, SCOTT BURK, LEM BURNHAM, JEFFREY BURRIS, DEXTER M. BUSSEY, BOBBY BUTLER, HILLARY BUTLER, WILLIAM F. BUTLER, BRIAN D. CABRAL, KENNETH CALLICUTT, CHRISTOPHER CALLOWAY, GARY K. CAMPBELL, JOSEPH CAMPBELL, JR, LAMAR C. CAMPBELL, JAMES T. CANNIDA, II, ALPHONSO CARREKER, AHMAD R. CARROLL, JONATHAN T. CARTER, MARTY CARTER, MICHAEL D. CARTER, PAT CARTER, SHANTE CARVER, TOM CAVALLO, LINDSEY CHAPMAN, ALBERT CHESLEY, RAYMOND T. CHESTER, GENE A. CHILTON, BRANDON W. CHRISTENSON, JEFFREY A. CHRISTY, DARRYL CLACK, JAMAL CLARK, PHIL CLARKE, RAYMOND CLAYBORN, HARVEY CLAYTON, JONATHAN CLINKSCALE, DANIEL M. COLCHICO, ROBIN COLE, FREDRICK D. COLEMAN, LINCOLN C. COLEMAN, JR, ANTHONY A. COLLINS, RON COLLINS, FRED H. COOK, III, ROBERT COONS, OBADIAH COOPER, HORACE COPELAND, LOU A. CORDILEONE, TONY COVINGTON, AARON COX, CLAUDE CRABB, FRANCISCO CRAIG, ROGER T. CRAIG, ZACHARY CROCKETT, PETER J. CRONAN, COREY V. CROOM, CLEVELAND CROSBY, HARRY M. CRUMP, ROBERT J. CRYDER, GEORGE E. CUMBY, JULIAN DOUGLAS CUNNINGHAM, PATRICK CUNNINGHAM, ERIC F. CURRY, GEORGE J. CURRY, JR, MATT DARBY, KENNETH DAVIDSON, BENJAMIN F. DAVIS, DARRELL O. DAVIS, ENNIS R. DAVIS, II, JOHN H. DAVIS, KENNETH E. DAVIS, MICHAEL R. DAVIS, OLIVER DAVIS, ROBERT E. DAVIS, JR, THABITI DAVIS, VERNON W. DEAN, JOE DELAMIELLEURE, BRIAN C. DEROO, DENNIS DEVAUGHN, KEVIN DEVINE, ANTHONEY C. DICKERSON, DOUG H. DIEKEN, STACEY DILLARD, ADRIAN DINGLE, HANFORD L. DIXON, RONALD DIXON, STEPHEN G. DOIG, ROME DOUGLAS, EDWARD DRUMMOND, ELBERT DUBENION, BOBBY R. DUCKWORTH, MARK S. DUPER, JOHN EBERSOLE, BOBBY J. EDMONDS, JR, JOYCE EDWARDS, KELVIN EDWARDS, LARRY EDWARDS, TYRONE EDWARDS, RONALD EGLOFF, KOLOS D. ELION, ALLAN D. ELLIS, SR, JAMES ELROD, AARON EMANUEL, PHILLIP E. EPPS, ALEX A. ESPINOZA, GREGORY EVANS, MARIO FATAFEHI, MARLON FAVORITE, KEITH T. FERGUSON, HOWARD FEST, ASCOTTI FIELDS, LAURIE FINNIE, JAMES M. FLANIGAN, SR, PAUL FLATLEY, BERNARD FORD, BRADFORD J. FORD, DARRYL D. FORD, LONNIE FORD, BARRY FOSTER, LARRY FOSTER, TIMOTHY R. FOX, DONALD FRANK, ROBERT J. FREDRICKSON, DOMINIC FURIO, JOHN BLAKE GALVIN, JR, MIKE GANN, TALMAN GARDNER, PERCELL M. GASKINS, SAMUAL GERMINARO, LOUIS J. GIAMMONA, ANTONIO GIBSON, DAVID GIBSON, JON GIESLER, OSCAR GILES, DARRELL GILL, JOHN GILMORE, REGINALD J. GIPSON, BRIAN GLASGOW, GLEN GLASS, WILLIAM S. GLASS, GEORGE GOEDDEKE, DERREL GOFOURTH, JON G. GOLDSBERRY, CHRIS GOODE, CORNELL GOWDY, WILLIAM GRAHAM, DARRYL GRANT, MARSHARNE GRAVES, RORY GRAVES, TERRY GRAY, DAVID L. GRAYSON, SR, DAVID L. GRAYSON, JR, HUGH GREEN, ROY GREEN, FORREST GREGG, JEFF GRIFFIN, JAMES GRIGSBY, ERIC GULIFORD, ISAAC HAGINS, DELTON D. HALL, LYNELL HAMILTON, MALCOLM HAMILTON, GARY A. HAMMOND, JERMAINE HAMPTON, LORENZO HAMPTON, RODNEY HAMPTON, CHRISTIAN HANBURGER, JR, TERRENCE H. HANRETTY, WILLIAM HARDISON, CEDRIC W. HARDMAN, ANTHONY HARGAIN, ED HARGROVE, JAMES C. HARRELL, JR, DURIEL HARRIS, ELROY HARRIS, JR, JOE HARRIS, KYMARA HARRIS, DWIGHT HARRISON, LLOYD HARRISON, JAMES W. HART, WAYNE A. HAWKINS, GREGORY HAWTHORNE, FREDERICK R. HAYES, THOMAS HAYES, JR, PATRICK D. HEENAN, NATHANIEL HEMSLEY, KEITH HENDERSON, THOMAS E. HENDRICKS, III, TERRY A. HERMELING, KENNETH B. HEROCK, TOM HERTER, JESSIE LEE HESTER, DALLAS HICKMAN, VICTOR L. HICKS, J.D. HILL, LONZELL HILL, LOVEL HILL, RAION Y. HILL, RICHARD HIMES, BRYAN HINKLE, LEE E. HITT, FLOYD HODGE, JOSEPH HOLMES, BRYAN HOOKS, MELVIN HOOVER, SAMUAL W. HORNER, III, ARTIS HOUSTON, ROBERT A. HOWARD, GARRY W. HOWE, DAVID A. HUGHES, III, DAVID H. HUMM, PATRICK HUNTER, GAYLON HYDER, ROBERT L. HYLAND, SEDRICK M. IRVIN, RAGHIB R. ISMAIL, EDDIE LEE IVERY, HAROLD L. JACKSON, JABARI JACKSON, JEFF P. JACKSON, PATRICK JACKSON, RICHARD S. JACKSON, STEPHAN F. JACKSON, TYOKA JACKSON, WILLIAM C. JACO, RAY A. JACOBS, ROLAND JAMES, GEORGE JAMISON, JOHN JANATA, LEON R. JARVIS, RALPH L. JECKA, ALFRED` J. JENKINS, MELVIN JENKINS, RONNEY JENKINS, JAMES C. JENSON, AKILI JOHNSON, DIRK JOHNSON, DWIGHT JOHNSON, ERIC D. JOHNSON, TROY D. JOHNSON, WILLIAM W. JOHNSON, AARON D. JONES, II, ANTHONY A. JONES, BRIAN JONES, BRODERICK JONES, CLARENCE T. JONES, JAMES R. JONES, KIRK CAMERON JONES, WILLIAM T. JUDSON, TERRELL JURINEACK, KEVIN KAESVIHARN, JOHN KAISER, LARRY M. KAMINSKI, ERNEST KELLERMAN, JAMES W. KELLEY, JR, KAREEM KELLY, DEREK KENNARD, REX W. KERN, WADE KEY, EMANUAL KING, HORACE E. KING, STEPHEN G. KING, KELLY KIRCHBAUM, LOUIS KIROUAC, JOSEPH KLOPFENSTEIN, THOMAS L. KNIGHT, MARY LEE KOCOUREK, ROBERT H. KOHRS, STEVE KORTE, KENT KRAMER, ROBERT KUECHENBERG, RALPH KUREK, PAUL LAAVEG, CHARLES W. LAMSON, SEAN E. LANDETA, KAREEM M. LARRIMORE, HENRY LAWRENCE, CLARENCE LEBLANC, EDWARD P. LEE, KEITH LEE, DORSEY LEVENS, DAVID LEWIS, FRANK D. LEWIS, RONNIE LIPPETT, LOUIS LIPPS, EUGENE LOCKHART, JR, KRISTIE LONG, DUVAL L. LOVE, DOMINIC G. LOWERY, CHAD LUCAS, MICHAEL LUSH, LARRY M. MALLORY, VAN MALONE, HENRY DEJHOWN MANDLEY, WILLIAM H. MANDLEY, ANTHONY MARSHALL, LEONARD A. MARSHALL, MARVIN MARSHALL, EDWARD MARTIN, EMANUEL MARTIN, ERIC W. MARTIN, PATRICK W. MATSON, ERIC MATTHEWS, IRA R. MATTHEWS, III, VERNON MAXWELL, DEEMS MAY, ALONZO MAYES, COREY MAYFIELD, COREY MAYS, MARK MCCANTS, DEWEY L. MCCLAIN, BRENT MCCLANAHAN, KENNETH MCCLENDON, JOHN MCDANIEL, RAMOS MCDONALD, HUGH MCELHENY, RAY E. MCELROY, JEFF MCINTYRE, MICHAEL W. MCKIBBEN, KEVIN MCLEOD, BRUCE MCNORTON, RODNEY MCSWAIN, MICHAEL L. MEADE, RICHARD MERCIER, FRANK G. MESTNIK, CARL MILLER, CHARLES E. MILLER, DANNY MILLER, DERRELL MITCHELL, ERIC MITCHELL, LYVONIA MITCHELL, SINGER MOBLEY, CHRISTOPHER G. MOHR, JOE MONTGOMERY, ALVIN MOORE, REGINALD MOORE, EARTHLAND MORELAND, STANLEY D. MORGAN, BYRON MORRIS, JAMES MORRISSEY, MARK S. MURPHY, LEON C. MURRAY, FRANK MYERS, CRAIG M. NALL, TERNA NANDE, STEVE NELSON, KENDALL M. NEWSON, CAMERON L. NEWTON, KARL P. NOONAN, ERIK NORGARD, DONALD NORTON, DON NOTTINGHAM, BRENT NOVOSELSKY, IFEANYI OHALETE, CHRIS OLDHAM, JOHN L. OUTLAW, JERRY L. OVERTON, LOREN OWENS, MARVIN D. OWENS, MORRIS OWENS, RICHARD PALMER, RICHARD M. PALMER, CHRIS PANE, BERNARD P. PARRISH, EDWARD PAYTON, DAVE PEAR, MARION TODD PEAT, CHRISTOPHER PENN, ANTONIO PERKINS, CALVIN E. PETERSON, CHARLES PHARMS, III, DELVIC PHILYAW, ROBERT J. PICKENS, DAMON PIERI, MYRON POTTIOS, ROOSEVELT POTTS, PHILIP M. POZDERAC, EUGENE N. PREBOLA, ANDRE PRESIDENT, SHAWN PRICE, ANTHONY E. PRIOR, JAMES PRUITT, JETHRO PUGH, JR, WILLIAM RADEMACHER, THOMAS C. RANDOLPH, DARROL RAY, TERRY RAY, RICK RAZZANO, SR, JOHN REAVES, BENITO RECARDO, K. ANTHONY REDMAN, DONALD L. REECE, SR, FRANK REED, OSCAR REED, JOHNNY REMBERT, MELVIN RENFRO, THOMAS L. RENTZEL, DERRICK S. REYNOLDS, RANDY W. RICH, GLOSTER RICHARDSON, WILLIE RICHARDSON, TINA RICKS, JOHN G. ROACH, JAMES E. ROBBINS, RANDY ROBBINS, WILLIAM ROBERTS, BERNARD H. ROBERTSON, III, ISIAH ROBERTSON, ROB ROBERTSON, MARK L. ROBINSON, MELVIN D. ROBINSON, SHELTON D. ROBINSON, MARK T. RODENHAUSER, KENDRICK D. ROGERS, REGINALD ROGERS, SR, JUAN A. ROQUE, OLIVER ROSS, COUNCIL RUDOLPH, REYNARD RUTHERFORD, JOHN J. SALDI, GREG SAMPSON, CLARENCE SANDERS, JUSTIN SANDY, RICHARD F. SANFORD, TERRY R. SCHMIDT, MICHAEL SCHNECK, ROBERT E. SCHOBEL, ADAM B. SCHREIBER, LARRY SCHREIBER, STEVEN W. SCHUBERT, WILLIAM SCHULTZ, WILLIARD SCISSUM, KEVIN SCOTT, LEON SEALS, ROBERT S. SELBY, ADAM SEWARD, CURTIS SHEARER, JASON SHELLEY, SANDERS SHIVER, LES SHY, ANTUAN SIMMONS, DAVID B. SIMS, DARYLE SKAUGSTAD, THOMAS E. SKLADANY, DONALD F. SMEREK, ANTOWAIN D. SMITH, DEREK SMITH, EDWARD M. SMITH, JEMONE SMITH, JOHN T. SMITH, JOHN H. SMITH, LANCE SMITH, OMAR SMITH, PHILIP SMITH, REGINALD L. SMITH, ROBERT L. SMITH, RONNIE B. SMITH, TRENT SMITH, JAMES SPENCER, RICH STEPHENS, CURT STEPHENSON, JAMES P. STEWART, RYAN STEWART, ARTHUR B. STILL, WALTER STITH, RALPH STOCKEMER, DWIGHT STONE, MICHAEL STRACHAN, ERIC SUTTON, STEVEN P. SYLVESTER, JOHN A. TARVER, DENISE TATUM, ALPHONSO TAYLOR, EUGENE Y. TAYLOR, ROBERT E. TAYLOR, WILLIAM T. TAYLOR, MARK A. THOMAS, ARTHUR W. THOMS, LEWIS D. TILLMAN, GREGORY D. TOLVER, JR, STEPHEN D. TOWLE, WENDELL TUCKER, GREG TURNER, ODESSA TURNER, RENEE TURNER, MAURICE TYLER, WENDELL A. TYLER, TIMOTHY G. TYRRELL, RICHARD VAN DRUTON, DOUG VAN HORN, JAMES P. VAN WAGNER, PATRICK VENZKE, CLARENCE VERDIN, GEORGE VISGER, MARK WALCZAK, WILLIAM S. WALIK, BRUCE WALKER, CHARLES D. WALKER, ANTHONY WALLACE, CHARLES WESLEY WALLS, WILLIAM WARD WALSH, GAYLE WARD, DEREK G. WARE, PAUL D. WARFIELD, CHARLES T. WATERS, ROBERT A. WATKINS, RICHARD J. WATTERS, ROBERT WEATHERS, JONATHAN WELSH, THEODORE WHEELER, III, DAVID M. WHITE, RUSSELL WHITE, SHERMAN WHITE, A. D. WHITFIELD, JR, DAVID WIDELL, PAUL A. WIGGINS, JAMES DAVID WILKINS, II, CALVIN J. WILLIAMS, JR, DARRYL E. WILLIAMS, DELVIN WILLIAMS, DUDLEY WILLIA

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum et al v National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Outlaw
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artis Houston
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Copeland
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney McSwain
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delton D. Hall
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Zeman
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gilmore
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan T. Carter
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Recardo
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik G. Williams
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Andrews
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred H. Cook, III
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom G. Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald J. Gipson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin J. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanford L. Dixon
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renard Young
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Kalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Cannida, II
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Bartee
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bessillieu
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lee
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Laaveg
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Rembert
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Kellerman
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Potts
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Staggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray A. Jacobs
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence T. Jones
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry M. Crump
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L. Broughton
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Murphy
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Christy
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Fatafehi
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raion Y. Hill
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McCants
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. Cronan
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. McKibben
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McDaniel
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Baack
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Van Horn
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloster Richardson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Burris
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Glasgow
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bass
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. DeRoo
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bowden
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J. Giammona
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Douglas Cunningham
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip M. Pozderac
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Taylor
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Jones
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D. Johnson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Pieri
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Brunet
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Carter
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey L. Brady
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred J. Jenkins
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Hampton
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W. Schubert
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schneck
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick R. Banks
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. D. Whitfield, Jr.
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chidi Ahanotu
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samual Germinaro
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Taylor
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Green
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Scott
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schultz
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Dillard
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Taylor
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Dingle
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Baldassin
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Miller
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford J. Ford
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff McIntyre
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percell M. Gaskins
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph L. Jecha
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthwind Moreland
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Marshall
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Flatley
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Finnie
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Baker
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthoney C. Dickerson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Cameron Jones
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Clayton
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hanburger, Jr.
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Randolph
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cunningham
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael K. Bankston, Sr.
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Harrison
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Martin
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry M. Mallory
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Brown
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence LeBlanc
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Clarke
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Johnson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davidson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank G. Mestnik
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger T. Craig
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Gill
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Van Wagner
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F. Smerek
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D. Lewis
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gibson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond T. Chester
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Turner
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Foster
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Howard
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Jurineack
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Kelley, Jr.
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Morrissey
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ifeanyi Ohalete
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Reed
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Brown
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Stewart
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Crockett
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Ford
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kuechenberg
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Herter
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Moore
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus J. Anderson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Ross
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon W. Christenson
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council Rudolph
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Norton
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Hagins
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Renfro
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delvic Philyaw
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Carter
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Marshall
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Doig
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray E. McElroy
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horatio Blades
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric W. Brown
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jenkins
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug H. Dieken
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hemsley
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh McElheny
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam B. Schreiber
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Gregg
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascotti Fields
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Represented By: Blake G Iverson
Represented By: Jason E Luckasevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Shearer
Represented By: Jason T Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?