Shoots v. iQor Holdings US, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paris Shoots
Defendant: iQor Holdings US, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2015cv00563
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting 464 Motion for Approval of Settlement (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/19/2018. (MJC)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER denying 440 Defendant's Motion to Certify Interlocutory Appeal (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/25/2018. (MJC)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER unsealed April 10, 2018, public version of 430 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 347 Defendant's Motion for Decertification; denying 353 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Under Rule 23; and directing the parties to show cause as to why the Order should remain under seal (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/27/2018. (SMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoots v. iQor Holdings US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Shoots
Represented By: Douglas L Micko
Represented By: Timothy C Selander
Represented By: Rachhana T Srey
Represented By: Vildan A Teske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iQor Holdings US, Inc.
Represented By: Sari M Alamuddin
Represented By: Brian T Benkstein
Represented By: Kevin F Gaffney
Represented By: Gina K Janeiro
Represented By: Stephanie L Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?