Riverside Church v. City of St. Michael
Plaintiff: Riverside Church
Defendant: City of St. Michael
Case Number: 0:2015cv01575
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Sherburne
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Presiding Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SECOND AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT. 1. Consistent with this Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law, Riverside Church is entitled to judgment in the total amount of $1,354,595. 2. PREJUDGME NT INTEREST: The Court awards Plaintiff prejudgment interest from March 23, 2015, until May 22, 2017. The interest rate will be an annualized simple rate of 4%. Thus, the Court awards Plaintiff $117,274.53 in prejudgment interest. 3. POST-J UDGMENT INTEREST: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1621, the Court awards Plaintiff post-judgment interest at an interest rate of 1.1% from May 22, 2017, until the judgment is satisfied by Defendant. The post-judgment interest will compound annually . 4. Attorney Fees. In light of the Court's decision, the Court respectfully directs that the parties meet and confer and agree on a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for reasonable attorney fees and costs. Once the briefs have been submitted and reviewed by the Court, the Court reserves the right to set oral argument. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/16/2017. (BJS)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT. 1. Consistent with this Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law, Riverside Church is entitled to judgment in the total amount of $1,354,595. 2. PREJUDGMENT INTER EST: The Court awards Plaintiff prejudgment interest from March 23, 2014, until May 22, 2017. The interest rate will be an annualized simple rate of 4%. Thus, the Court awards Plaintiff $171,606.77 in prejudgment interest. 3. POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1621, the Court awards Plaintiff post-judgment interest at an interest rate of 1.1% from May 22, 2017, until the judgment is satisfied by Defendant. The post-judgment interest will compound annually. 4. Att orney Fees. In light of the Court's decision, the Court respectfully directs that the parties meet and confer and agree on a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs motion for reasonable attorney fees and costs. Once the briefs have been submitted and reviewed by the Court, the Court reserves the right to set oral argument. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/14/2017. (BJS)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT. 1. Consistent with this Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law, Riverside Church is entitled to judgment in the total amount of $1,354,595. 2. Attorney Fees. In light o f the Court's decision, the Court respectfully directs that the parties meet and confer and agree on a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for reasonable attorney fees and costs. Once the briefs have been submitted and reviewed by the Court, the Court reserves the right to set oral argument. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/22/2017. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverside Church v. City of St. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverside Church
Represented By: Samuel W Diehl
Represented By: Jacob R Grassel
Represented By: G Craig Howse
Represented By: Dean A LeDoux
Represented By: Matthew P Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Michael
Represented By: George C Hoff
Represented By: Jared D Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?