Hutar v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Judy Hutar
Defendant: Wilcox Automotive, LLC, City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Fifth Third Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Capital One Financial Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation doing business as Capital One and Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. doing business as Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Case Number: 0:2015cv02100
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Anoka
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2016 Filing 141 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #139 Judgment, #109 Judgment by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Winter, Todd)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER ON EXETER FINANCE CORP.'S MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT TO ADD PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Exeter's Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest #121 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/13/16. (GRR)
September 13, 2016 Filing 139 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(LEG)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER ON EXETER FINANCE CORP.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. 1. Exeter's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. #110 ) is GRANTED; 2. Wilcox Automotive, LLC must pay Exeter the amount of $25,628.00 in attorney's fees in addition to the $7,145.50 judgment entered on May 17, 2016; and 3. The attached Memorandum is incorporated by reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/13/16. (LEG)
September 1, 2016 Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2016 re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion taken under advisement as of 9/1/16. Order to be issued. (LEG)
September 1, 2016 Filing 136 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE RE-FILED. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2016 re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion taken under advisement as of 9/1/16. Order to be issued.(LEG) Modified text on 9/1/2016 (LEG).
July 26, 2016 Filing 135 TEXT ENTRY ONLY RE: NOTICE OF HEARING: The hearing on Exeter Finance Corps Motion for Attorneys Fees (Doc. No. 110)is hereby reset from August 30, 2016, to September 1, 2016, at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson in Courtroom 6A in St. Paul. (MSK)
June 28, 2016 Filing 134 DECLARATION of Gregory J. Johnson in Opposition to #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
June 28, 2016 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
June 27, 2016 Filing 132 CORRECTED TEXT ENTRY ONLY RE: NOTICE OF HEARING: A hearing on Exeter Finance Corps Motion for Attorneys Fees (Doc. No. 110) (Doc No. 121 was incorrectly noted in the Text Entry Notice at Doc. No. 131) is hereby set for August 30, 2016, at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson in Courtroom 6A in St. Paul. (MSK)
June 23, 2016 Filing 131 TEXT ENTRY ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING: A hearing on Exeter Finance Corps Motion for Attorneys Fees (Doc. No. 110) and Motion to Amend Judgment to Add PreJudgment Interest (Doc. No. 121) is hereby set for August 30, 2016, at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson in Courtroom 3A in St. Paul. (MSK)
June 22, 2016 Filing 130 REPLY re #126 Reply Sur-Reply filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TEXT ENTRLY ONLY ORDER: The letter request at Docket No. 128 is granted. The sur-reply is due on Wednesday, June 22, 2016, and should be no longer than six pages. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.
June 19, 2016 Filing 128 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wilcox Automotive, LLC requesting leave to file sur-reply. (Johnson, Gregory)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER for Briefing Schedule re #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/17/16. (KMW)
June 15, 2016 Filing 126 REPLY re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
June 14, 2016 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Exeter Finance Corporation re #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest (Kluz, Steven)
June 14, 2016 Filing 124 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #121 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
June 14, 2016 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Support re #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
June 14, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest : at date and time to be determined. (Kluz, Steven)
June 14, 2016 Filing 121 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TEXT ENTRY ONLY ORDER: In response to the letter request at Docket No. 118, a reply of no more than 6 pages is allowed. The Reply is due by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, June 15, 2016. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
June 9, 2016 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Exeter Finance Corporation re #118 Letter to Magistrate Judge requesting permission to file reply in support of Exeter's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. 110) (Kluz, Steven) Modified text on 6/9/2016 (lmb).
June 9, 2016 Filing 118 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Exeter Finance Corporation requesting permission to file reply in support of Exeter's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. 110). (Kluz, Steven)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REFERRING #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Exeter Finance Corporation to Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/8/16. (KMW)
June 7, 2016 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
May 31, 2016 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Exeter Finance Corporation re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Kluz, Steven)
May 31, 2016 Filing 114 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #110 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
May 31, 2016 Filing 113 Declaration of Steven R. Kluz in Support of #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3)(Kluz, Steven)
May 31, 2016 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Support re #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
May 31, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #110 MOTION for Attorney Fees : at date and time to be determined. (Kluz, Steven)
May 31, 2016 Filing 110 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
May 17, 2016 Filing 109 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON CO-DEFENDANT MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. The Court will Adopt the Report and Recommendation #103 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Cross-Claimant Exeter's motion for judgment on the pleadings #83 is GRANTED, and Wilcox is hereby ordered to indemnify Exeter in the amount of $7,145.50 in attorney's fees; and 2. Cross-Defendant Wilcox's motion for judgment on the pleadings #91 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/16/16. (GRR)
May 2, 2016 Filing 107 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #105 Report and Recommendation filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
April 21, 2016 Filing 106 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Keyes, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-2100 (MJD/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (lmb)
April 18, 2016 Filing 105 OBJECTION to #103 Report and Recommendations filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
April 18, 2016 Filing 104 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #95 Order Referring Motion (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 1. Cross-Claimant Exeter's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. No. #83 ) should be GRANTED, and Wilcox should be ordered to indemnify Exeter in the amount of $7,145.50 in attorneys fees; and 2. Cross-Defendant Wilcox's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. No. #91 ) should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 4/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 4/6/16. (LEG)
February 23, 2016 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Telephone Conference regarding settlement held on 2/23/2016. NO ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (LEG)
February 23, 2016 Filing 100 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Hearing on cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings scheduled for Friday, February 26, 2016, at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, Courtroom 6A, St. Paul Federal Courthouse is HEREBY CANCELLED. The motions will be decided on the papers and without a hearing. (WMT)
February 19, 2016 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Telephone Conference regarding motion held on 2/19/2016. NO ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (LEG)
February 2, 2016 Filing 99 Reply to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
January 19, 2016 Filing 98 Second Declaration of Steven R. Kluz in Support of #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Kluz, Steven)
January 19, 2016 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim and REPLY in Support re #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
January 4, 2016 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Exeter Financial Corp. filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Gregory)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REFERRING #91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC to Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/31/15. (KMW)
December 29, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Johnson, Gregory)
December 29, 2015 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
December 29, 2015 Filing 92 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #91 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
December 29, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Exeter Cross Claim by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
December 23, 2015 Filing 90 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Kluz, Steven)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REFERRING #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation to Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/22/15. (KMW)
December 11, 2015 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Exeter Finance Corporation re #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Kluz, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 87 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #83 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 86 Declaration of Steven R. Kluz in Support of #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Kluz, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kluz, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Kluz, Steven)
December 11, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING PARTY: Defendant Wilcox Automotive LLC re #80 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Judy Hutar. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/13/15. (KMW)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED - ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/13/15. (KMW) Modified on 10/13/2015 (JAM).
October 12, 2015 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Judy Hutar. Jointly Signed by Wilcox Automotive LLC. (Lyons, Thomas)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES: Regional Acceptance Corporation and Exeter Finance Corporation re #78 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Exeter Finance Corporation and Regional Acceptance Corporation. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/15/15. (KMW)
September 11, 2015 Filing 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Exeter Finance Corporation, Regional Acceptance Corporation. Jointly Signed by Judy Hutar. (Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 9/11/2015 (lmb).
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #76 Report and Recommendation(Written Opinion). The motions to dismiss the Complaint against the moving defendants Wells Fargo, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, City & County Credit Union, and Capital One #33 #40 are GRANTED. The plaintff's motion to amend #57 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/12/15. (KMW)
July 27, 2015 Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that: 1. The motions to dismiss the Complaint against the moving defendants Wells Fargo, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, City & County Credit Union, and Capital One (Doc. Nos. #33 , #40 ) be GRANTED; and 2. The plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. No. #57 ) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/27/15. (LEG) Modified text on 7/27/2015 (LEG).
July 21, 2015 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2015. HEARING ON: Motion to Dismiss By Fifth Third Bank, City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corp., Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A, Capital One Finance Corp., and JPMorgan Chase Bank (Doc. No. #33 ); Capital One's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #40 ); Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Doc. No. #57 ). R&R to be submitted by: Court. Motions taken under advisement as of 7/21/15.(LEG)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Stipulation #65 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/16/15. (LEG)
July 14, 2015 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Ryan Benning in OPPOSITION TO #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
July 14, 2015 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint with attached Certificate of Compliance filed by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory) Modified text on 7/15/2015 (MMP).
July 14, 2015 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, Joinder to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend her Complaint - Docket #66 filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
July 14, 2015 Filing 70 Declaration of Thomas Coulter in Support of #66 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
July 14, 2015 Filing 69 Declaration of Mike Henslee in Support of #66 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
July 14, 2015 Filing 68 Declaration of Roger Casper in Support of #67 Declaration in Support, filed by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
July 14, 2015 Filing 67 Declaration of James T. Boyle in Support of #66 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
July 14, 2015 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, filed by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
July 13, 2015 Filing 65 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation. Jointly Signed by Judy Hutar, Wilcox Automotive, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Services, and Capital One Financial Corporation d/b/a Capital One. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 8, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Raiter on behalf of Regional Acceptance Corporation. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 7, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Newman, Patrick)
July 7, 2015 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Judy Hutar re #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2015 Filing 61 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #57 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Judy Hutar. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2015 Filing 60 Declaration of Thomas J. Lyons Jr. in Support of #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, filed by Judy Hutar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2015 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, filed by Judy Hutar. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, : Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint,, by Judy Hutar. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 18, 2015 Filing 56 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Exeter Finance Corporation by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
June 15, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Raiter on behalf of City & County Credit Union. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Morris, Christopher)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2015. Discovery due by 2/1/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 2/1/2016. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/11/15. (LEG)
June 11, 2015 Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: As stated at the Pretrial Conference, the Motions to Dismiss will be heard on July 21, 2015, at 2:00 pm, before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, Courtroom 6A, St. Paul, MN 55101. Plaintiff's response papers DUE JULY 7, 2015. Defendants' reply DUE JULY 14, 2015. (WMT)
June 10, 2015 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/10/2015. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (LEG)
June 10, 2015 Filing 50 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against Wilcox Automotive, LLC. by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 10, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Raiter on behalf of Exeter Finance Corporation. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 5, 2015 Filing 48 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Judy Hutar. Jointly Signed by Capital One Financial Corporation, d/b/a Capital One, Fifth Third Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc., d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Services, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, and Wilcox Automotive, LLC.(Lyons, Thomas)
June 4, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M Raiter on behalf of Fifth Third Bank. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 3, 2015 Filing 46 First NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Schoenwetter, C)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REFERRING #33 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City & County Credit Union, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, #40 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Capital One Financial Corporation to Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/2/15. (KMW)
June 1, 2015 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Capital One Financial Corporation re #40 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Stromquist, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 43 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #40 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #40 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Stromquist, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss/General by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
June 1, 2015 Filing 38 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wells Fargo & Company is a corporate parent of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. Wells Fargo & Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. re #33 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 36 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #33 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by City & County Credit Union, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City & County Credit Union, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #33 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss/General by City & County Credit Union, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Savran, Jessica)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #27 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Wilcox Automotive LLC is granted an extension of time until and including June 1, 2015 to answer the Summons and Complaint in the above-entitled matter.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/29/15. (LEG)
June 1, 2015 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Fifth Third Bancorp. is a corporate parent of Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Schoenwetter, C)
June 1, 2015 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. is a wholly owned subsidiary of JPMorgan Chase & Co., a publicly held bank holding company, the stock of which is publicly traded under the symbol JPM. (Morris, Christopher) Modified text on 6/1/2015 (MMP).
June 1, 2015 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher)
May 31, 2015 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
May 29, 2015 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Wilcox Automotive, LLC. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff and Wilcox Automotive LLC. (Johnson, Gregory)
May 28, 2015 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2015 AT 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes is HEREBY CANCELED. The motion to extend time [Doc. No. 18] is MOOT.
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #23 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Services is granted an extension of time until and including June 1, 2015, to answer or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint in the above-entitled matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/26/15. (LEG)
May 26, 2015 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. re #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Defend (Savran, Jessica)
May 26, 2015 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Defend by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Judy Hutar. (Savran, Jessica)
May 21, 2015 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plalintiff's Complaint (Savran, Jessica)
May 21, 2015 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion for Extension of Time (General) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Savran, Jessica)
May 21, 2015 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plalintiff's Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Savran, Jessica)
May 21, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION for Extension of Time for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plalintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Savran, Jessica) Modified text on 5/22/2015 (MMP).
May 21, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plalintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.. (Savran, Jessica)
May 20, 2015 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Blackstone Group is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
May 20, 2015 Filing 16 Exeter Finance Corp. ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Exeter Finance Corporation. (Kluz, Steven)
May 20, 2015 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew O. Stromquist for Capital One Financial Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/19/2015. (JLW)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Pursuant to the parties' stipulation [Doc. No. #9 ], Defendant Capital One Financial Corporations deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint [Doc. No. #1 ] is extended to June 1, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/18/15. (LEG)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Defendant City & County Credit Union shall be granted an extension in which to respond to the above-captioned Complaint up to and including June 1, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/18/15. (LEG)
May 18, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LEG)
May 18, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Stromquist. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4428601 by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Snyder, Chad)
May 18, 2015 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, extending date to answer or otherwise plead by Capital One Financial Corporation. Jointly Signed by Judy Hutar. (Snyder, Chad)
May 18, 2015 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by City & County Credit Union. (Morris, Christopher)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION FOR FIFTH THIRD BANK TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Pursuant to the Stipulation to Extend Time for Fifth Third Bank to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. No. #4 ), and in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), it is hereby ordered that Defendant Fifth Third Bank may have until June 1, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/1/15. (LEG)
May 15, 2015 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. BB&T Corporation is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Regional Acceptance Corporation. (Newman, Patrick)
May 15, 2015 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Regional Acceptance Corporation. (Newman, Patrick)
May 15, 2015 Filing 4 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Fifth Third Bank to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fifth Third Bank. (Carey, Michael)
April 23, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc., Wilcox Automotive, LLC. (MMP)
April 23, 2015 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Please use case number 15-cv-2100 (MJD/JJK). (MMP)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Capital One Financial Corporation d/b/a Capital One, City & County Credit Union, Exeter Finance Corporation, Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Regional Acceptance Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. d/b/a Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Wilcox Automotive, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4397791.) Filed by Judy Hutar. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutar v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcox Automotive, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County Credit Union
Represented By: Christopher R Morris
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Represented By: Uzodima F Aba-Onu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance Corporation
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Represented By: Todd Winter
Represented By: Steven R Kluz
Represented By: Sean C Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Christopher R Morris
Represented By: Uzodima F Aba-Onu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: C J Schoenwetter
Represented By: Michael R Carey
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Represented By: Patrick D Newman
Represented By: Michael S Poncin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation doing business as Capital One
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Inc. doing business as Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hutar
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?