Luckey et al v. Alside, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Toop, Wendy Mackey, Cheryl Luckey, Christine Cole, Robert Squatrito and Elizabeth Welna
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC, Associated Materials Incorporated, Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside, Alside, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside and Associated Materials, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside
Case Number: 0:2015cv02512
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Anoka
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2018 Filing 102 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/10/2018. (HAZ)
May 7, 2018 Filing 100 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation for Dismissal #99 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Nelson, Alex)
May 7, 2018 Filing 99 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. Jointly Signed by Alside Inc dba Alside Windows & Doors dba Alside, Associated Materials LLC dba Alside Windows & Doors dba Alside, and Associated Materials Inc dba Alside Windows & Door dba Alside. (Nelson, Alex)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has reviewed the letter dated March 8, 2018 (ECF No. 97), submitted on behalf of both parties, informing the Court that the parties have reached a settlement in principle. The settlement conference scheduled for March 16, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED, and all remaining deadlines in this case are STAYED to allow the parties time to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint motion to dismiss. If the parties are unable to file their stipulation or joint motion within 60 days, they should e-mail a joint update letter to the chambers e-mail box on or before MAY 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/8/2018. (JMK)
March 8, 2018 Filing 97 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna re Joint Status Update. (Nelson, Alex)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/16/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/12/17. (AKL)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES: Discovery due by 7/2/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 7/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/25/17. (AKL)
October 25, 2017 Filing 94 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #93 Stipulation,. (Nelson, Alex)
October 25, 2017 Filing 93 STIPULATION re #92 Status Conference,,,, for Extension of Case Management Deadlines by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. Jointly Signed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC, and Associated Materials, Inc.. (Nelson, Alex)
October 18, 2017 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 10/18/2017. The Court and counsel discussed the parties progress in discovery and the need for an extension of time to complete both fact and expert discovery in view of unanticipated delays in obtaining documents. The parties will meet and confer and will file a joint motion seeking a modification of the Pretrial Scheduling Order. That motion will be filed no later than October 25, 2017. The Court will rule on the motion after consulting with the district judge. The Court and counsel also agreed upon a date for a settlement conference in January 2018, which will be scheduled by separate order. Counsel did not believe that a further status conference call with the Court prior to the settlement conference would be needed, but the Court encouraged them to contact the Court promptly to schedule another call if issues develop that could impede the parties anticipated readiness for the January 2018 settlement conference. (JDF)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/18/17. (JDF)
September 14, 2017 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 9/14/2017. The Court will hold another telephone status conference on October 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (JDF) Modified text on 9/20/2017 (JDF).
September 11, 2017 Filing 89 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna . (Nelson, Alex)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/5/17. (JDF)
May 5, 2017 Filing 87 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #86 Stipulation. (Procaccini, Karl)
May 5, 2017 Filing 86 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. Jointly Signed by Cheryl Luckey, Christine Cole, Elizabeth Welna, Eric Toop, and Robert Squatrito. (Procaccini, Karl)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2017. Discovery due by 2/1/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/3/17. (JDF)
May 1, 2017 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Pretrial Conference held on 5/1/2017. Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JDF)
April 25, 2017 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re FRE 502(D) AND (E) #82 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting,. (Nelson, Alex)
April 24, 2017 Filing 82 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. Jointly Signed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC, and Associated Materials, Inc.. PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED IN ERROR // (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Document Production Specification, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 4/25/2017 (LPH).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(ACH)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' #47 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. 1. The motion is GRANTED in all respects as to Defendant Alside, Inc. All claims against Defendant Alside, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. As to Defendants Associated Materials, LLC and Associated Materials, Inc., the motion is GRANTED as to Claims 1 (Negligent Product Design), 2 (Negligent Product Manufacture), 3 (Strict Product Liability Product Design), 4 (Strict Product Liability Product Manufacture), 6 (Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness for a Particular Purpose), 8 (Negligent Misrepresentation), 9 (Fraud, Misrepresentation, and Concealment), and 15 (Violation of the Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act), as alleged in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Docket No. 23]. These claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. 3. As to Defendants Associated Materials, LLC and Associated Materials, Inc., the motion is GRANTED as to Claims 10 (Unlawful Trade Practices pursuant to Minn. Stat. 325D.13), 11 (Deceptive Trade Practices pursuant to Minn. Stat. 325D.44), 12 (Unfair or Deceptive Trade Practices pursuant to N.H. Rev. Stat. 358-A:2), 13 (Unfair or Deceptive Trade Practices pursuant to Ohio Rev. Code 1345.02), and 14 (Unjust Enrichment) as alleged in Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [Docket No. 23]. These claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. 4. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on March 29, 2017. (DML)
March 22, 2017 Filing 79 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK)
February 10, 2017 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing held on 12/14/2016 before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (24 pages). Court Reporter: Kristine Mousseau. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 3/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2017. (KM)
February 10, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (KM)
January 30, 2017 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Procaccini, Karl)
January 24, 2017 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #74 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #60 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
January 17, 2017 Filing 74 Notice of Supplemental Authority on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Nelson, Alex) Modified on 1/18/2017 (AKL).
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Supplement Record. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on January 17, 2017. (HAZ)
January 9, 2017 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Supplement Record with Supplemental Authority re Motion to Dismiss filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Procaccini, Karl)
January 4, 2017 Filing 71 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #69 Motion to Supplement Record, filed by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. (Nelson, Alex)
January 3, 2017 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna re #69 MOTION to Supplement Record with Supplemental Authority re Motion to Dismiss (Nelson, Alex)
January 3, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Supplement Record with Supplemental Authority re Motion to Dismiss by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 1/4/2017 (LPH).
December 14, 2016 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC, Alside, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
December 13, 2016 Filing 67 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAZ)
December 8, 2016 Filing 66 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (HAZ)
November 18, 2016 Filing 65 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Procaccini, Karl)
November 18, 2016 Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron no longer assigned to the case.NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-2512 JRT/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
October 28, 2016 Filing 63 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2016 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 1, 2016 Filing 62 Reply to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Procaccini, Karl)
August 1, 2016 Filing 61 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #47 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Defendants. (Procaccini, Karl)
July 1, 2016 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Nelson, Alex)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER approving #57 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Eric Toop, Christine Cole, Robert Squatrito, Wendy Mackey, Cheryl Luckey. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on June 10, 2016. (HAZ)
June 8, 2016 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER re #57 Stipulation of Dismissal, Proposed Order by Alex M Nelson on behalf of Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. (Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 6/9/2016 (LPH).
June 8, 2016 Filing 57 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Asserted by Wendy Mackey, With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1)(A)(II) by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop. Jointly Signed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC, and Associated Materials, Inc.. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR // (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed order of dismissal of claims asserted by Wendy Mackey, with Prejudice)(Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 6/9/2016 (LPH).
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Responses due by 7/1/2016. Replies due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on June 2, 2016. (HAZ)
May 27, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna re #54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Nelson, Alex)
May 27, 2016 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Wendy Mackey, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna. (Nelson, Alex)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that the Pretrial Conference set for June 7, 2016 is stricken from the calendar and all other discovery and deadlines in this matter are hereby stayed until the Court rules on Defendants pending Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 5/24/16. (JDF)
May 23, 2016 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC re #51 Stipulation, to Stay Discovery and Related Deadlines (Procaccini, Karl)
May 23, 2016 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #45 Scheduling Order, TO STAY DISCOVERY AND RELATED DEADLINES by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. Jointly Signed by Cheryl Luckey, Christine Cole, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Elizabeth Welna, and Wendy Mackey. (Procaccini, Karl)
May 10, 2016 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Procaccini, Karl)
May 10, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Procaccini, Karl)
May 10, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : at date and time to be determined. (Procaccini, Karl)
May 10, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
May 2, 2016 Filing 46 ANSWER to Amended Complaint [PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 4/19/16. (JDF) Modified on 4/19/2016 (JDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2016: #1 Consent Form) (JDF).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #24 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on April 18, 2016. (DML)
February 4, 2016 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2016 re #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC, Alside, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (HAZ)
January 6, 2016 Filing 42 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Krueger, Bethany)
January 5, 2016 Filing 41 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2016 04:30 PM in Judge's Chambers 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Krueger, Bethany) Modified text von 1/6/2016 (lmb).
November 12, 2015 Filing 40 Second AFFIDAVIT of Dan Green in SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
November 12, 2015 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Anne Galehouse in SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
November 12, 2015 Filing 38 Reply to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Procaccini, Karl)
October 30, 2015 Filing 37 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Excerpted Federal Court Statistics by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Alex)
October 30, 2015 Filing 36 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Alex)
October 30, 2015 Filing 35 EXHIBIT re #34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Affidavit of Alex M. Nelson by All Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Alex)
October 29, 2015 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by All Plaintiffs. EXHIBITS FILED IN ERROR - TO BE REFILED // (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Alex M. Nelson, Esq., #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 - Excerpted Federal Court Statistics)(Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 10/30/2015 (LPH).
October 9, 2015 Filing 33 *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ)
October 8, 2015 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC re #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 31 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 30 Declaration of Dana Schindler in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 29 Declaration of Dana Mason in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 28 Declaration of Dan Green in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 27 Declaration of Erica Cofojohn in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER : at date and time to be determined. (Procaccini, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 31, 2015 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants. Filed by Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Elizabeth Welna, Wendy Mackey. No summons requested. (Nelson, Alex)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall have to and including August 31, 2015 in which to file their Second Amended Complaint. Thereafter, Defendants shall have to and including October 8, 2015 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/31/2015. (ALM)
August 26, 2015 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Cheryl Luckey re #20 Stipulation, (Second) for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and to Answer or Otherwise Responde to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Nelson, Alex)
August 26, 2015 Filing 20 STIPULATION (Second) for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cheryl Luckey. Jointly Signed by Luckey, Cole, Squatrito, Toop, Welna, Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC, and Associated Materials, Inc.. (Nelson, Alex)
August 19, 2015 Filing 19 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-WILL REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet upon Associated Materials, LLC served on Cindy Umbarger on 07-23-15, filed by Cheryl Luckey. (Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 8/20/2015 (lmb).
August 19, 2015 Filing 18 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-WILL REFILE. Return of Service Executed for s upon Associated Materials, Inc. served on Cindy Umbarger on 07-23-15, filed by Cheryl Luckey. (Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 8/20/2015 (lmb).
August 19, 2015 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-WILL REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet upon Alside, Inc. served on Cynthia Umbarger on 07-23-15, filed by Cheryl Luckey. (Nelson, Alex) Modified text on 8/20/2015 (lmb).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Stipulation, filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC, Alside, Inc. Plaintiffs shall have to and including August 17, 2015 in which to file their Second Amended Complaint. Thereafter, Defendants shall have to and including September 24, 2015 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/13/15. (JDF)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael K. Farrell for Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, and for Associated Materials, LLC; and granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel M. Kavouras for Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, and for Associated Materials, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 8/13/2015. (JLW)
August 13, 2015 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC re #13 Stipulation, for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. Jointly Signed by Cheryl Luckey, Christine Cole, Robert Squatrito, Eric Toop, and Elizabeth Welna. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel M. Kavouras. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4524845 by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael K. Farrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4524833 by Alside, Inc., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Associated Materials, Incorporated is a corporate parent of Defendants Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC. Associated Materials Group, Inc. is a corporate parent of Associated Materials, Incorporated. (Procaccini, Karl) Modified text on 8/13/2015 (LPH).
August 12, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl C Procaccini on behalf of All Defendants. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl C Procaccini on behalf of All Defendants. (Procaccini, Karl)
August 12, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl C Procaccini on behalf of All Defendants. (Procaccini, Karl)
July 17, 2015 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Christine Cole, Cheryl Luckey, Elizabeth Welna, Eric Toop, Robert Squatrito. No summons requested. (Nelson, Alex)
July 17, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC. (LPH)
July 17, 2015 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for All Defendants. (Nelson, Alex)
May 20, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC. (LPH)
May 20, 2015 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R Tunheim per Master list referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. Please use case number 15-cv-2512 JRT/JSM. (LPH)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alside, Inc., Associated Materials, Inc., Associated Materials, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4432236.) Filed by Cheryl Luckey, Christine Cole. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nelson, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckey et al v. Alside, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alside, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials Incorporated doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alside, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Alside Windows & Doors doing business as Alside
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Bethany D. Krueger
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Represented By: Karl C Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Toop
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mackey
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Luckey
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cole
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Squatrito
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Welna
Represented By: Alex M Nelson
Represented By: Michael J Lowder
Represented By: William James Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?