LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC v. Sachs et al
Plaintiff: LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC
Defendant: Daniel Sachs, DSC Products, Inc and DSC Products Holding, LLC
Counter_claimant: DSC Products, Inc
Counter_defendant: LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC
Cross_defendant: Bruce LeDuc, Jennea LeDuc, Marci LeDuc and 4brava
Cross_claimant: DSC Products, Inc
Case Number: 0:2015cv02743
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting the parties' Oral Motions to Dismiss and vacating the Courts Temporary Restraining Order Freezing Assets and dismissing this case with prejudice (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/13/2018. (HAZ)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (371 in 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS) Report and Recommendations and (399 in 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS) Report and Recommendations, OVERRULING objections (402 in 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS ) Sealed Document filed by Skolnick & Joyce, P.A. and (375 in 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS) Sealed Document filed by Skolnick & Joyce, P.A., and DENYING Counsel's Request to Stay the Proceedings Pending Appeal (363 in 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS) Lett er to Magistrate Judge filed by Skolnick & Joyce, P.A. and (392 in 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS) Letter to Magistrate Judge filed by Skolnick & Joyce, P.A.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/17/2018. Associated Cases: 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS, 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS(HAZ)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER: re 316 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counsel's Expedited Objection to the December 27, 2017 Order Denying the Motions to Withdraw [Case No. 15-2743, Docket No. 316; Case No. 15-2744, Docket No. 345] is OVERRULED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/17/2018. (JMK)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Docket No. 233 in 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS and Docket No. 241 in 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on July 24, 2017. Associated Cases: 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS, 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS(HAZ)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Signature's (100) Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims/Crossclaims; granting Signature's (105) Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaims; granting LeDucs' (108) Motion for Summary Judgment on the Crossclaims and Third Party Complaint; denying Signature's (112) Motion for Affirmative Summary Judgment; granting 4Brava's (121) Motion for Summary Judgment on the Crossclaims and Third Party Complaint; Reversing District Court Decision (138) ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge in case 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS; granting in part and denying in part 4Brava's(102) Motion for Affirmative Summary Judgment; Reversing District Court Decision (119) ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge in case 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on March 30, 2017. Associated Cases: 0:15-cv-02744-JRT-DTS, 0:15-cv-02743-JRT-DTS(DML)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC v. Sachs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC
Represented By: Adrianna Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sachs
Represented By: Malte L. L. Farnaes
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSC Products, Inc
Represented By: Malte L. L. Farnaes
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSC Products Holding, LLC
Represented By: Malte L. L. Farnaes
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DSC Products, Inc
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: LeDuc Gifts & Specialty Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bruce LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jennea LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Marci LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: 4brava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: DSC Products, Inc
Represented By: Malte L. L. Farnaes
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?