Scheffler v. Gurstel Chargo, P.A.
Plaintiff: Troy K. Scheffler
Defendant: Gurstel Chargo, P.A.
Case Number: 0:2015cv04436
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Anoka
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER striking 118 Motion to Reconsider; denying 120 Letter to District Judge Requesting Permission to File a Motion to Reconsider filed by Gurstel Chargo, P.A. (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/14/2017. (DLO)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Sanctions (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/2/2017. (DLO)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/19/2017. (DLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheffler v. Gurstel Chargo, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurstel Chargo, P.A.
Represented By: Amy M Goltz
Represented By: Manuel H Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy K. Scheffler
Represented By: Peter J Nickitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?