Shank v. Carleton College
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M Shank
Defendant: Carleton College
Case Number: 0:2016cv01154
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 OPINION AND ORDER: Carleton's Motion for Summary Judgment 237 is GRANTED, and Shank's request to supplement the record 315 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/22/2019. (RMM)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 229 Objection is OVERRULED and 221 Order is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/7/2019. (RMM)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings(Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/15/2018. (JMK)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss/General(Written Opinion). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendant's motion to dismiss 13 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 2. The motion is GRANTED with respect to th e following claims: a. Count I to the extent that it alleges that, by condoning underage and excessive drinking, defendant was deliberately indifferent to an increased risk of sexual assault. b. Count IV to the extent that it alleges negligence p er se. c. Count V, except to the extent that it rests on defendant's alleged conduct in coercing plaintiff to meet one-on-one with Student One. d. Counts VI and VII. 3. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on January 9, 2017. (CLG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shank v. Carleton College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M Shank
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Represented By: Carrie L Zochert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carleton College
Represented By: Jacqueline A Mrachek
Represented By: Sean R Somermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?