Munt v. MN Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Joel Marvin Munt
Defendant: MN Department of Corrections, Tom Roy, Gloria H. Andreachi, Bruce Julson, Steven Hammer and Bruce Reiser
Case Number: 0:2016cv01206
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 130 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/16/2018. (SMD)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; Adopting as Modified 115 Report and Recommendation.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/26/2018. (SMD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying as moot 92 Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's decision and denying as moot 95 Plaintiff's letter request for an extension (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 06/29/17. (MJC)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying without prejudice 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; adopting as modified 52 Report and Recommendation; denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO; denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Preliminary Relief; and overruling in part and sustaining in part 54 Plaintiff's Objections(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/29/17. (MJC)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER directing Defendants to file a supplemental affidavit within 10 days. See Order for details (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/06/17. (MJC) cc: Plaintiff. Modified on 3/6/2017 (lmb).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munt v. MN Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Marvin Munt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MN Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Roy
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria H. Andreachi
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Julson
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hammer
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Reiser
Represented By: Lindsay LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?