Hudock et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hudock, Scott Poppen, Gerald DeLoss, Breann Hudock, Benjamin Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara, Brian Fleishman and Piakanae Carpenter
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc, BestBuy.com, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Case Number: 0:2016cv01220
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Franklin L Noel
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 314 Corrected Declaration of David M. Cialkowski in Support of #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - 16, #2 Exhibit(s) - 81, #3 Exhibit(s) - 82, #4 Exhibit(s) - 83, #5 Exhibit(s) - 84, #6 Exhibit(s) - 87, #7 Exhibit(s) - 88, #8 Exhibit(s) - 89, #9 Exhibit(s) - 90)(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 313 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 312 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #223 Motion to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 311 Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund in Support of #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - A)(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 310 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #235 , #275 , #286 , #242 , #237 , #288 , #259 , #295 , #308 , #244 , #251 , #230 , #306 , #238 , #236 , #304 , #272 , #292 , #240 , #270 , #298 , #285 , #293 , #257 , #283 , #249 , #253 , #299 , #305 , #300 , #239 , #234 , #309 , #268 , #247 , #273 , #297 , #278 , #255 , #289 , #233 , #266 , #261 , #290 , #279 , #250 , #301 , #262 , #271 , #231 , #294 , #282 , #248 , #269 , #241 , #267 , #284 , #246 , #274 , #296 , #265 , #243 , #260 , #258 , #291 , #281 , #287 , #264 , #252 , #256 , #254 , #276 , #302 , #303 , #245 , #280 , #228 , #263 , #229 , #277 , #232 Sealed Document(s) - filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 309 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 86 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 308 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 85 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 307 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 82 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 306 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 80 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 305 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 79 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 304 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 78 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 303 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 77 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 302 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 76 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 301 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 75 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 300 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 74 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 299 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 73 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 298 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 72 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 297 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 71 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 296 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 70 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 295 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 69 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 294 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 68 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 293 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 67 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 292 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 66 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 291 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 65 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 290 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 64 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 289 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 63 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 288 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 62 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 287 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 61 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 286 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 60 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 285 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 59 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 284 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 58 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 283 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 57 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 282 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 56 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 281 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 55 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 280 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 54 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 279 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 53 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 278 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 52 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 277 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 51 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 276 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 50 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 275 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 49 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 274 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 48 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 273 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 47 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 272 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 46 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 271 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 45 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 270 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 44 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 269 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 43 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 268 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 42 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 267 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 41 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 266 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 40 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 265 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 39 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 264 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 38 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 263 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 37 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 262 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 36 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 261 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 35 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 260 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 34 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 259 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 33 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 258 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 32 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 257 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 31 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 256 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 30 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 255 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 29 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 254 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 28 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 253 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 27 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 252 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 26 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 251 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 25 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 250 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 24 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 249 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 23 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 248 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 22 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 247 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 21 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 246 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 20 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 245 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 19 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 244 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 18 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 243 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 17 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 242 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 15 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 241 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 14 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 240 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 13 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 239 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 12 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 238 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 11 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 237 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 10 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 236 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 9 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 235 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 8 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 234 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 7 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 233 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 6 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 232 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 5 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 231 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 4 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 230 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 3 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 229 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 2 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 228 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 re #314 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Cialkowski, David) Modified text and link on 8/7/2019 (MMG).
August 6, 2019 Filing 227 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - Declaration of David M. Cialkowski in Support of #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - 16, #2 Exhibit(s) - 81, #3 Exhibit(s) - 82, #4 Exhibit(s) - 83, #5 Exhibit(s) - 84, #6 Exhibit(s) - 87, #7 Exhibit(s) - 88, #8 Exhibit(s) - 89, #9 Exhibit(s) - 90)(Cialkowski, David) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (KNK).
August 6, 2019 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM in Support re #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 225 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #223 MOTION to Certify Class : Date and time to be determined. (Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 223 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Cialkowski, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 222 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint) filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
August 6, 2019 Filing 221 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint) filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #219 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Permission granted. The parties have up to 18,000 words for briefing Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to by filed on 8/6/2019. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/31/2019. (HAZ)
July 30, 2019 Filing 219 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Borrelli, Raina)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to an E-mail dated 7/25/19, requesting an extension of time to submit letter briefs to the Court. The Request is GRANTED. Counsel shall email their letter briefs clarifying the issues (see ECF No. 215) on or before 8/9/19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/25/2019. (KAT)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint is grantted in part and denied in part #151 . SEE ORDER FOR MORE SPECIFICS (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/17/2019. (JMK)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to E-mail requesting deadline for an extension of time to submit letter briefs to the Court. The Request is GRANTED. Counsel shall email their letter briefs clarifying the issues (see ECF No. 215) on or before 7/26/19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/16/2019. (KAT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 7/3/2019. See minutes for details. (BJP)
July 2, 2019 Filing 214 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The conference call concerning the plaintiffs' motion to compel on 7/3/2019 at 9:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED. The conference call will commence at 8:30 AM on 7/3/2019. **THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY** (KAT)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: The conference call concerning the plaintiffs' motion to compel that was originally scheduled for 6/27/2019 in this matter [see Minutes of Hr'g, ECF 205] is hereby rescheduled. Magistrate Judge Menendez will hold the conference call on 7/3/2019 at 9:00 AM. Instructions for joining the call have been sent to counsel by separate email. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/26/2019. (BJP)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER on #210 Stipulation to Modify Expert and Class Certification Deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/24/2019. (KAT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 211 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #210 Stipulation,. (Wolinsky, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 210 STIPULATION to Modify Expert and Class Certification Deadlines by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Breann Hudock, Ivan Villa Lara, Brian Fleishman, and Eugene Mannacio. (Wolinsky, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 209 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #191 Exhibit,, #201 Declaration in Opposition, #207 Exhibit, #188 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #199 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Borrelli, Raina)
June 17, 2019 Filing 208 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #207 Sealed Document(s) - #207 Sealed Exhibit BB filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
June 17, 2019 Filing 207 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit BB re #206 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Resch, Brittany)
June 17, 2019 Filing 206 Second Declaration of Brittany N. Resch in Support of #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
June 13, 2019 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2019 re #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara, Breann Hudock. (BJP)
June 4, 2019 Filing 204 EXHIBIT Exhibit H Corrected Exhibits H and I re #190 Declaration in Support, filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) I)(Resch, Brittany)
May 31, 2019 Filing 203 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #202 Sealed Document(s) - [201-1] Sealed Exhibit 1, [201-2] Sealed Exhibit 2 filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Robert Wolinsky in Opposition to #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 201 SEALED DECLARATION of Robert Wolinsky in Opposition to #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and BestBuy.Com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 199 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.Com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wolinsky, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER approving #179 Stipulation of Dismissal OF PLAINTIFF PIAKANAE CARPENTER WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/30/2019. (HAZ)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER on #195 Stipulation regarding #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged. Responses due by 5/31/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/24/2019. (KAT)
May 24, 2019 Filing 196 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #195 Stipulation,. (Wolinsky, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 195 STIPULATION to Modify Deadline for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Breann Hudock, Ivan Villa Lara, Eugene Mannacio, Piakanae Carpenter, and Brian Fleishman. (Wolinsky, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 194 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 193 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #186 Motion to Compel filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 192 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #191 Sealed Document(s) - #191 Sealed Exhibit E, [191-1] Sealed Exhibit J, [191-2] Sealed Exhibit K, [191-3] Sealed Exhibit L, [191-4] Sealed Exhibit O, [191-5] Sealed Exhibit P, [191-6] Sealed Exhibit R, [191-7] Sealed Exhibit S, [191-8] Sealed Exhibit T, [191-9] Sealed Exhibit U, [191-10] Sealed Exhibit V, [191-11] Sealed Exhibit W, [191-12] Sealed Exhibit X, [191-13] Sealed Exhibit Y, [191-14] Sealed Exhibit Z, [191-15] Sealed Exhibit AA filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 191 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit E re #190 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit R, #7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit S, #8 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit T, #9 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit U, #10 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit V, #11 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit W, #12 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit X, #13 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit Y, #14 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit Z, #15 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit AA)(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 190 Declaration of Brittany N. Resch in Support of #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - D, #2 Exhibit(s) G - I, #3 Exhibit(s) M - N, #4 Exhibit(s) Q)(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 189 Redacted Document for #188 Sealed Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara.(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 188 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Resch, Brittany)
May 22, 2019 Filing 186 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. (Resch, Brittany)
May 16, 2019 Filing 185 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim is CANCELED. (HAZ)
May 16, 2019 Filing 184 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Regarding Upcoming Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER on #181 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/16/2019. (KAT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 182 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #181 Stipulation,. (Wolinsky, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 181 STIPULATION re #144 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders, #174 Order on Stipulation by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Breann Hudock, Ivan Villa Lara, Brian Fleishman, and Eugene Mannacio. (Wolinsky, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 180 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #179 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 15, 2019 Filing 179 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Piakanae Carpenter by Piakanae Carpenter, Brian Fleishman, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #165 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/10/2019. (HAZ)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #167 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/10/2019. (HAZ)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #169 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/10/2019. (HAZ)
May 1, 2019 Filing 175 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. filed by Gerald DeLoss, Ivan Villa Lara, Eugene Mannacio, Breann Hudock, Benjamin Hudock, Scott Poppen, Brian Fleishman, Piakanae Carpenter. No summons requested. (Hedlund, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER on #171 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/1/2019. (KAT)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER on #163 Stipulation Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/1/2019. (KAT)
May 1, 2019 Filing 172 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #171 Stipulation,. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 171 STIPULATION re #144 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders to Modify Scheduling Order by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 170 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #169 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 169 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Scott Poppen With Prejudice by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 168 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #167 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 167 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Gerald DeLoss With Prejudice by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 166 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #165 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Borrelli, Raina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Benjamin Hudock With Prejudice by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
April 30, 2019 Filing 164 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #163 Stipulation,. (Borrelli, Raina)
April 30, 2019 Filing 163 STIPULATION Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Consolidated Second Amended Complaint by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Borrelli, Raina)
April 22, 2019 Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 4/22/2019. (KAT)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Each side shall email a letter to the Court outlining the discovery issue no later than 3:00 PM on 4/19/19. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/18/2019. (KAT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 160 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #158 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alex Phillips for Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, and for Ivan Villa Lara. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/1/2019. (NAH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 158 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex Phillips. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6773423 filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. (Leary, Alyssa)
March 28, 2019 Filing 157 REPLY re #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilkinson, Phoebe)
March 14, 2019 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Eugene Mannacio, Scott Poppen, Ivan Villa Lara. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leary, Alyssa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 155 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 28, 2019 Filing 154 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #151 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 28, 2019 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 28, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 28, 2019 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss/General Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 20, 2019 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 2/20/2019. (KAT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 149 Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (MMP)
February 7, 2019 Filing 148 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. filed by Gerald DeLoss, Breann Hudock, Benjamin Hudock, Ivan Villa Lara, Scott Poppen, Eugene Mannacio. Filer requests summons issued. (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER approving (78 in 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM) Stipulation, (145 in 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM) Stipulation. Single consolidated complaint due by 2/7/2019. Any Answer or Motion due by 2/28/2019. Replies due by 3/28/2019. Responses due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/6/2019. Associated Cases: 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM, 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM(HAZ)
February 4, 2019 Filing 146 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #145 Stipulation. (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 4, 2019 Filing 145 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Consolidating Related Actions by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and BESTBUY.COM, LLC. (Hedlund, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/15/2019. (LCC)
January 7, 2019 Filing 143 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2019 re #136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (LCC)
January 2, 2019 Filing 142 (Text-Only) NOTICE to Attorneys. Request for all counsel to appear by telephone has been GRANTED for the Motion Hearing on 1/7/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. (KAT)
December 21, 2018 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilkinson, Phoebe)
December 14, 2018 Filing 140 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock.(Resch, Brittany)
December 14, 2018 Filing 139 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #136 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock.(Resch, Brittany)
December 14, 2018 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Support re #136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Resch, Brittany)
December 14, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Resch, Brittany)
December 14, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Resch, Brittany)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/15/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM, 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM(KAT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 11/15/2018. (KAT)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #132 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel J Strauss for Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock and for Breann Hudock. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/15/2018. (JGK)
November 9, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel J. Strauss. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6487857 filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Leary, Alyssa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 131 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel J. Strauss. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6473776 filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Leary, Alyssa) Modified on 11/7/2018 (JGK).
October 29, 2018 Filing 130 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 08:30 AM is RESCHEDULED. The Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/15/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Counsel should use the call-in instructions previously emailed. (KAT)
October 18, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Raina Borrelli on behalf of Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Borrelli, Raina)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/22/2018. Associated Cases: 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM, 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM(KAT)
August 21, 2018 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 8/21/2018. (KAT)
August 7, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Joseph C. Bourne (Hedlund, Daniel)
July 6, 2018 Filing 125 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. . (Wolinsky, Robert)
July 6, 2018 Filing 124 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock . (Resch, Brittany)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #121 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Benjamin Wolinsky for Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, and for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/29/2018. (JGK)
June 28, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendants (Korchin, A.)
June 28, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert B. Wolinsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6198369 filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Walsh, Peter)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 3/15/2019. Motions (disp) due by 1/10/2020. Ready for trial due by 4/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/8/2018. Associated Cases: 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM, 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM(KAT) Modified on 6/11/2018 (MMP).
June 4, 2018 Filing 119 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B - [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Walsh, Peter)
June 4, 2018 Filing 118 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bourne, Joseph)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/21/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-KMM, 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM(KAT)
May 21, 2018 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 5/21/2018. (KAT)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/8/2018. (KAT)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER on (43 in 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-FLN) Stipulation Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information and Hardcopy Documents, (110 in 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM) Stipulation Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information and Hardcopy Documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/4/2018. Associated Cases: 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM, 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-FLN(KAT) Modified text on 5/4/2018 (kt).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/4/2018. Associated Cases: 0:16-cv-01220-JRT-KMM, 0:17-cv-05222-JRT-FLN(KAT)
May 4, 2018 Filing 112 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-1220 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
May 3, 2018 Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #110 Stipulation,. (Bourne, Joseph)
May 3, 2018 Filing 110 STIPULATION Regarding Production Format of Electronically Stored Information and Hardcopy Documents by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics, U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L. P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Bourne, Joseph)
May 3, 2018 Filing 109 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #108 Stipulation. (Bourne, Joseph)
May 3, 2018 Filing 108 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Jointly Signed by LG Electronics, U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC. (Bourne, Joseph)
April 24, 2018 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2018. (CJP)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #105 Letter to Magistrate Judge, #103 Letter to Magistrate Judge.A telephone conference is scheduled for Tuesday, April 24, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. The parties were provided call-in instructions via email. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/18/2018. (TMA)
April 16, 2018 Filing 105 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock Regarding Defendants' Letter to the Court (Doc. No. 104). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Bourne, Joseph)
April 13, 2018 Filing 104 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Requesting that the Court Strike Plaintiffs' Premature Discovery Motion (ECF No. 103). (Korchin, A.)
April 11, 2018 Filing 103 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock Regarding Protective Order and ESI Protocol. (Bourne, Joseph)
March 13, 2018 Filing 102 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
March 13, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 20, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany N Resch on behalf of Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Resch, Brittany)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWERS re #97 Stipulation. Upon consideration of the Parties Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension to File Answers [CM/ECF No. 97], and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants deadline to file their Answers shall be extended to March 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/13/2018. (ACH)
February 13, 2018 Filing 98 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #97 Stipulation. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 13, 2018 Filing 97 STIPULATION Regarding Extension To File Answers by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, and Gerald DeLoss. (Wilkinson, Phoebe)
February 12, 2018 Filing 96 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Walsh, Peter) Modified on 2/12/2018 (KNK).
February 5, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendants (Zamoff, Mitchell)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Defendant LG's Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint #65 is DENIED; Defendant Best Buy's Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint #70 is DENIED.(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 01/30/2018. (JMK)
December 20, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2017 re #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC, Best Buy Stores, L.P. Motions taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
December 11, 2017 Filing 92 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint, #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. **LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. (HAZ)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 17-cv-5222 (DWF/FLN) has been reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/1/2017. (lmb)
November 15, 2017 Filing 90 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Paller, Alicia)
November 15, 2017 Filing 89 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Paller, Alicia)
October 31, 2017 Filing 88 AMENDED REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF BEST BUY CO., INC., BEST BUY STORES, L.P., AND BESTBUY.COM, LLC'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Paller, Alicia) Modified text on 10/31/2017 (MMP).
October 30, 2017 Filing 87 AMENDED REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC'S re #65 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Paller, Alicia) Modified text on 10/31/2017 (MMP).
October 30, 2017 Filing 86 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT #88 . REPLY re #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Paller, Alicia) Modified text on 10/31/2017 (lmb).
October 30, 2017 Filing 85 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT #87 . REPLY re #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Paller, Alicia) Modified text on 10/31/2017 (lmb).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER approving #82 Stipulation, filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P.. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on October 5, 2017. (HAZ)
September 29, 2017 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #82 Stipulation,. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 29, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION Regarding Extension for Replies in Further Support of Defendants' Partial Motions to Dismiss by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, and Gerald DeLoss. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PRE-DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE EXTENSION: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint CM/ECF No. #78 , and good cause appearing, the Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' deadline to serve their Pre-Discovery Disclosures shall be extended to a date to be agreed upon by the Parties at the conclusion of their mediation efforts with Judge Keyes, or to October 18, 2017, whichever is sooner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 9/19/2017. (MMP)
September 18, 2017 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint, #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cialkowski, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #78 Stipulation,. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 15, 2017 Filing 78 STIPULATION [JOINT] REGARDING PRE-DISCOVERY DISCLOSURE EXTENSION by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, and Gerald Deloss. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2018. Discovery due by 8/1/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 11/1/2018. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/19/2017. (ACH)
June 13, 2017 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/13/2017. (ACH) Modified text and file date on 6/20/2017 (ACH).
June 12, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H Walsh on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Walsh, Peter)
June 5, 2017 Filing 74 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC.(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 73 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #70 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC.(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support re #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint : at date and time to be determined. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 68 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #65 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support re #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint : at date and time to be determined. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
June 5, 2017 Filing 64 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Gerald DeLoss, Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Jointly Signed by LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., BEST BUY CO., INC., BEST BUY STORES, L.P., and BESTBUY.COM, LLC.(Cialkowski, David)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re #58 Stipulation. 1. Plaintiffs may file the proposed amended complaint no later than May 5, 2017. 2. Defendants shall answer, file a motion, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by June 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/17/17. (JDF) Modified text on 5/23/2017 (JDF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendants (Mitchell, John)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED NOTICE/ORDER OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2017 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/10/2017. (MMP)
May 5, 2017 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., BestBuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, Gerald DeLoss. No summons requested. (Cialkowski, David) Modified on 5/8/2017 (MMP).
May 4, 2017 Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #58 Stipulation. (Mitchell, John)
May 4, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock and Breann Hudock. (Mitchell, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #56 Stipulation. (Mitchell, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 56 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint and Initial Pretrial Conference by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock and Breann Hudock. (Mitchell, John)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWER: that Defendants LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and Bestbuy.com, LLC shall have through and including April 20, 2017 to file their answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/10/2017. (MMP)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE/ORDER OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2017 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MMP) Modified text on 4/10/2017 (lmb).
April 6, 2017 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #52 Stipulation. (Mitchell, John)
April 6, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION Regarding Extension to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock and Breann Hudock. (Mitchell, John) Modified on 4/7/2017 (MMP).
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1) Granting in part and denying in part defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s #18 Motion to Dismiss. (a) The motion is GRANTED with respect to the New Jersey Consumer Fraud Act [Count IV]. Count IV is DISMISSED without prejudice. (b) The motion is GRANTED with respect to the breach of contract claim [Count VIII]. Count VIII is DISMISSED with prejudice. (c) The motion is DENIED in all other respects. 2) Granting in part and denying in part Best Buy Co., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and BestBuy.com, LLC's #22 Motion to Dismiss. (a)The motion is GRANTED in its entirety with respect to the claims against Best Buy Co., Inc. and Best Buy Stores, L.P. Best Buy Co., Inc. and Best Buy Stores, L.P. are DISMISSED without prejudice from this case. (b) The motion is GRANTED with respect to the New Jersey Consumer Fraud Act claim [Count IV] against BestBuy.com. Count IV is DISMISSED without prejudice. (c) The motion is DENIED in all other respects. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on March 27, 2017. (DML)
January 5, 2017 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2017 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Bestbuy.com, LLC, Best Buy Stores, L.P., #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Motions taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HAZ)
December 22, 2016 Filing 49 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. . (Zamoff, Mitchell)
November 22, 2016 Filing 48 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Mitchell, John)
November 22, 2016 Filing 47 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Mitchell, John)
November 14, 2016 Filing 46 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock (regarding Supplemental Authority). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - 1, #2 Exhibit(s) - 2, #3 Exhibit(s) - 3, #4 Exhibit(s) - 4)(Cialkowski, David)
November 14, 2016 Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Plaintiffs' request to submit supplemental authority regarding the pending motions to dismiss #44 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on November 14, 2016. (HAZ)
November 7, 2016 Filing 44 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock . (Cialkowski, David)
September 15, 2016 Filing 43 Declaration of J. Christopher Mitchell in Support of #41 Reply, #42 Reply filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 6, #2 Exhibit(s) 7)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 15, 2016 Filing 42 REPLY re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 15, 2016 Filing 41 REPLY re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
September 15, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Paller on behalf of All Defendants. (Paller, Alicia)
August 22, 2016 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cialkowski, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 38 Declaration of David M. Cialkowski in Support of #37 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - 1)(Cialkowski, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cialkowski, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Lee, Jason)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall have through and including August 22, 2016, to respond to each of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Defendants shall have through and including September 15, 2016, to reply to Plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/21/16. (LEG)
July 19, 2016 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock re #33 Stipulation, (Cialkowski, David)
July 19, 2016 Filing 33 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss) by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Jointly Signed by LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC, BEST BUY CO., INC., BEST BUY STORES, L.P., and BESTBUY.COM, LLC. (Cialkowski, David)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Phoebe A Wilkinson for Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/14/16. (AKL)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney A. Elizabeth Korchin for Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/13/16. (AKL)
July 13, 2016 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Alicia Paller as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
July 12, 2016 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: BestBuy.com LLC discloses that it is a subsidiary of Best Buy Stores, L.P. Best Buy Stores, L.P. discloses that it is a subsidiary of BBC Property Co. and BBC Investment Co. which are subsidiaries of Best Buy Co., Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. has no parent corporation and based solely on the filings made by its shareholders, there is no publicly owned corporation holding more than 10% of its stock as of March 31, 2016.(Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 12, 2016 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. hereby discloses that it is a wholly-owned subsidiary of LG Electronics, Inc., which is a publicly traded corporation listed on the Korea Stock Exchange, organized and existing under the laws of the Republic of Korea, and has shares listed in the form of global depositary receipts listed on the London Stock Exchange.(Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 12, 2016 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 26 Declaration of J. Christopher Mitchell in Support of #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #20 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 12, 2016 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #22 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #22 MOTION to Dismiss/General : at date and time to be determined. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss/General by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 12, 2016 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 12, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION to Dismiss/General : at date and time to be determined. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
July 12, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss/General by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Zamoff, Mitchell) Modified on 7/13/2016 (MMP).
July 11, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney A. Elizabeth Korchin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5013134 by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Mitchell, John)
July 11, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phoebe A. Wilkinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5013104 by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Mitchell, John)
July 11, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Mitchell on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Mitchell, John)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Luke Hudock for Benjamin Hudock and for Breann Hudock. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/31/2016. (JLW)
May 31, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Luke Hudock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4952055 by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. (Cialkowski, David)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT the Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P. and Bestbuy.com, LLC shall have through and including July 12, 2016 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 5/2/16. (LEG)
May 27, 2016 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Luke P. Hudock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
May 26, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #9 Stipulation, Joint (Zamoff, Mitchell)
May 26, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION JOINT by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., and Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
May 26, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Zamoff on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Zamoff, Mitchell)
May 17, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Bestbuy.com, LLC served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Best Buy Stores, L.P. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Cialkowski, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/17/2016, answer due 6/7/2016. (Cialkowski, David)
May 10, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (kt)
May 10, 2016 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 16-cv-1220 JRT/FLN. (kt)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best Buy Co. Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4919108.) Filed by Benjamin Hudock, Breann Hudock. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cialkowski, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudock et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BestBuy.com, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell Zamoff
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Wolinsky
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Represented By: Alicia Paller
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Korchin
Represented By: John C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Zamoff
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Wolinsky
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Represented By: Alicia Paller
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Korchin
Represented By: John C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Zamoff
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Wolinsky
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Represented By: Alicia Paller
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Korchin
Represented By: John C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Mitchell Zamoff
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Wolinsky
Represented By: Peter H Walsh
Represented By: Alicia Paller
Represented By: Phoebe Anne Wilkinson
Represented By: A. Elizabeth Korchin
Represented By: John C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Poppen
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald DeLoss
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breann Hudock
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Jason R Lee
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Hudock
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Jason R Lee
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Mannacio
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Villa Lara
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: Luke Hudock
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Represented By: Alyssa Leary
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Alex Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fleishman
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Brittany N Resch
Represented By: David M Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piakanae Carpenter
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?