Schrammen v. ConAgra Foods, Inc
Plaintiff: Terrance Schrammen
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Inc.
Case Number: 0:2016cv02999
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M. Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 6/11/2018. (TJB)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 70 Motion. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/12/2018. (KMH)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 23 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 02/08/2017. (TJB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schrammen v. ConAgra Foods, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Inc.
Represented By: Katherine K Bruce
Represented By: Brittany Falkowski
Represented By: Josef S. Glynias
Represented By: Scott Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Kathlyn E Noecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Schrammen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?