Naca v. Macalester College
Plaintiff: Kristin Naca
Defendant: Macalester College
Movant: Jane Doe
Case Number: 0:2016cv03263
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
Presiding Judge: Becky R. Thorson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's motion to supplement the record 238 is DENIED. 2. Defendant's motion for summary judgment 175 is GRANTED. 3. Plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND ON THE MERITS. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/20/2018. (CLG)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to refile her objection 109 is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's objection 147 to the October 25, 2017 order of Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson 141 is OVERRULED and the ord er is AFFIRMED. 3. No later than Friday, January 12, 2018, plaintiff's counsel, Peter Nickitas, must file a memorandum of no more than 2,000 words showing cause why he should not be ordered to pay attorney's fees in the amount of $1,000 to defendant to compensate defendant for incurring fees relating to his violation of D. Minn. L.R. 72.2(a)(1) and (c).(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on December 28, 2017. (CLG)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER overruling 66 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on September 18, 2017. (CLG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naca v. Macalester College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Naca
Represented By: Peter J Nickitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macalester College
Represented By: Terran C Chambers
Represented By: Kathlyn E Noecker
Represented By: Sean R Somermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Joel P Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?