In Re: Wells Fargo ERISA 401(k) Litigation

Plaintiff: Francesca Allen, Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Plaintiff's Executive Committee, John Sterling Ross and Mary Lou Shank
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Director of Human Resources, Wells Fargo Director of Compensation and Benefits, Wells Fargo Employee Benefits Review Committee, Lloyd H. Dean, John S. Chen, Susan E. Engel, Donald M. James, Stephen W. Sanger, John Does, John G. Stumpf, Hope A. Hardison, Justin C. Thornton, Greatbanc Trust Company, Richard Roes, Hope Hardison, Timothy J. Sloan, David A. Hoyt, Michael J. Heid, Frank Codel, John Shrewsberry, Kevin Oden, Patricia Callahan, Stanhope Kelly, Dawn Martin Harp, Suzanne Ramos, James Steiner, George Wick, Martin Davis and Thomas Wolfe
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2016cv03405
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
Presiding Judge: Becky R. Thorson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 196 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/19/2018. (CLG)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 113 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint 113 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, except that plainti ffs' claim that defendants breached their duty of loyalty under ERISA is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 3. Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint by Friday, October 27, 2017, in which they may replead their loyalty claim. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on September 21, 2017. (CLG)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER OVERRULING 134 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge and AFFIRMING Order 129 .(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 6/21/2017. (ECW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Wells Fargo ERISA 401(k) Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Allen
Represented By: Carolyn G Anderson
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Michael Brian Ershowsky
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel R. Ferri
Represented By: Rebecca D Gilliland
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: June Pineda Hoidal
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Tamara M. Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel
Represented By: Daniel R. Ferri
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff's Executive Committee
Represented By: Samuel E. Bonderoff
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Michael Brian Ershowsky
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Rebecca D Gilliland
Represented By: Edward H. Glenn, Jr
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Justin Sauerwald
Represented By: Tamara M. Spicer
Represented By: Jacob H. Zamansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sterling Ross
Represented By: Carolyn G Anderson
Represented By: Samuel E. Bonderoff
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Michael Brian Ershowsky
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Edward H. Glenn, Jr
Represented By: June Pineda Hoidal
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Justin Sauerwald
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Jacob H. Zamansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Shank
Represented By: Carolyn G Anderson
Represented By: Richard M. Elias
Represented By: Michael Brian Ershowsky
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: June Pineda Hoidal
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Douglas J Nill
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Director of Human Resources
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Director of Compensation and Benefits
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Employee Benefits Review Committee
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd H. Dean
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Chen
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. James
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Sanger
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope A. Hardison
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin C. Thornton
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatbanc Trust Company
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roes
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Hardison
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sloan
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Hoyt
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Heid
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Codel
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shrewsberry
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Oden
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Callahan
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanhope Kelly
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Martin Harp
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Ramos
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Steiner
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wick
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Davis
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wolfe
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bullard
Represented By: Lindsey H. Chopin
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Clark
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Stephen P Lucke
Represented By: Madeline Chimento Rea
Represented By: Kirsten E Schubert
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?