Hines v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Fredrick Dewayne Hines
Defendant: Michelle Smith, Tammy Wherely, David Rhesuis, Shar Mike, Sherilinda Wheeler, Unknown Magadanz and Dan Meyer
Case Number: 0:2016cv03797
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 151 Motion to Dismiss/General; denying 164 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; adopting Report and Recommendations re 181 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/16/2019. (DLO) cc: Fredrick Dewayne Hines. Modified text on 1/16/2019 (JLB).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Declining to Adopt Report and Recommendation 139 Report and Recommendation; granting 143 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/15/2018. (DLO)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 121 Motion for TRO; denying 121 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 130 Report and Recommendation.(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/20/2018. (DLO)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 104 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 108 Report and Recommendation (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/27/2017. (DLO)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying as moot 49 Motion to Dismiss; granting 80 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; granting 97 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; denying 99 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 103 Report and Recommendation; denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/17/2017. (DLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Dewayne Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Smith
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Wherely
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rhesuis
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shar Mike
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherilinda Wheeler
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Magadanz
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Meyer
Represented By: Kelly S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?