Harris et al v. Maplewood Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Harris and Francal Jackson
Defendant: Maplewood Police Department, John Doe, Menards, Jane Doe and Jim Doe
Case Number: 0:2017cv00392
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment 126 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/27/2019. (GRR)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 90 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint, all the claims stated therein, and all claims that could have been asserted by Plaintiff, including any claims against any of the Defendant John Doe officers, officers, agents, representatives, employees, or insurers (regardless of whether or not they were named Defendants in the above captioned matter) are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, and on the merits. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/28/2019. (GRR)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 118 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Maplewood Police Department's Motion to Dismiss as a Discovery Sanction Pursuant to Rule 37 83 is DENIED. Plaintiff is prohibited from introducing any requested discovery into evidence or using any of the requested discovery in his claims or defenses. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (GRR)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1.Plaintiff's Request to file a Motion for Reconsideration and for Appointment of Counsel 110 is DENIED; and 2. Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time 108 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: Plaintiff shall have sixty days from the date of this Order to file his opposition to the Defendant Maplewood Police Department's Motion for Summary Judgment 90 . Plaintiff's additional requests for extension are denied.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/16/2018. (GRR)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS IN PART the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau dated March 28, 2017 8 as follows: the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation as to Plaintiff Francal Jackson and DECLINES TO ADOPT the Report and Recommendation as to Plaintiff Anthony Harris. 2. The claims of Plaintiff Francal Jackson are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. 3. The claims of Plaintiff Anthony Harris remain and will proceed to screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/17. (GRR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Maplewood Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francal Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplewood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?