Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ahmed et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Mohamud Abdi Ahmed and 2waytrading, LLC
Case Number: 0:2017cv01478
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Magnuson
Presiding Judge: Katherine M. Menendez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The SEC's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment 56 is GRANTED, and further directing. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 8/30/2018. (LLM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SEC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED 36 . (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 05/18/2017. (LLM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY GRANTED that the SEC's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 4 is GRANTED. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 05/09/2017. (LLM). cc: James Alexander on 5/9/2017 (KNK).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ahmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: James S Alexander
Represented By: Lynn M. Dean
Represented By: David J. Van Havermaat
Represented By: Brent W. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamud Abdi Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2waytrading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?