Peet et al v. Sidney et al
Plaintiff: John E. Peet, Cecily Williams, Idella Patrick, Demetrius Day, Joseth Harrop, Eva Holts, Emma Morrison and Cornell Watets
Defendant: Dexeter Sidney, Lendine Darden, Sue Morfit, Mark Jones, Mark Z Jones, Lynnette Chambers, Debbie Goettel and Michelle Luna
Case Number: 0:2017cv01870
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Presiding Judge: Tony N. Leung
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Sue Morfitt and Mark Jones's Motion for Summary Judgment 185 is GRANTED. Defendants Debbie Goettel and Michelle Luna's Motion for Summary Judgment 177 is GRANTED. Plaintiff John Peet's Amended Complaint 23 is DISMISSED. See Order for specifics. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/9/2020. (RMM)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation 203 is ACCEPTED; Plaintiff's Motion for Default for Failure to Comply with a Judge Order with Local Rule Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) and Rule 36 Admission Sue Morfit and Mark Jones 155 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/11/2020. (RMM)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 148 Motion for In Camera Review and Production of Documents. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/21/2020. (JRE)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 103 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion related to Witness Tampering and Fraudulent Documents; granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/18/2019. (JRE) cc: John E. Peet. Modified text on 9/18/2019 (MMP).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation 74 is ACCEPTED in full; the Courts February 11, 2019 Order Adopting Report And Recommendation 75 is VACATED; the Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report an d Recommendations 76 is DENIED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART; the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Debbie Goettel and Michelle Luna 33 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the motion for partial dismissal with prejudice filed by Defendants Mark Jones and Sue Morfitt 37 is GRANTED; the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Department of Housing and Urban Development Minneapolis Field Office Director Michele K. Smith and Department of Housing and Urban Development Investigator Lendine Darden 61 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff John E. Peets motion for summary judgment 52 is DENIED without prejudice. (See Order for specifics.) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/20/2019. (RMM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation 74 is ACCEPTED; the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Debbie Goettel and Michelle Luna 33 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the motion for partial dismissal with pre judice filed by Defendants Mark Jones and Sue Morfitt 37 is GRANTED; the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Department of Housing and Urban Development Minneapolis Field Office Director Michele K. Smith and Department of Housing and Urban Development Investigator Lendine Darden 61 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff John E. Peets motion for summary judgment 52 is DENIED without prejudice. (See Order for Specifics) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/11/19. (RMM)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 55 Request for Extension of Time for Court Hearing Motion. The Court shall hear Defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 33, 37) and Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 52) on November 1, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9W of the U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55415. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/13/2018. (EB) cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs. Modified text on 9/13/2018 (MMP).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 1. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung's November 9, 2017 Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 12 ) is ADOPTED.2. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Fed. R. Civ.P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/14/2017. (BJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peet et al v. Sidney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Peet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecily Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idella Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseth Harrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Holts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell Watets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexeter Sidney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendine Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Morfit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Z Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnette Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Goettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?