Diocese of St. Cloud et al v. Arrowood Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Diocese of St. Cloud, Church of Saint Joseph, St. Joseph, Church of the Sacred Heart of Jesus, Dent, Church of Saint Anthony of Padua, St. Cloud, Church of Our Lady of Victory, Fergus Falls, Church of Saint Anne, Kimball, Church of Saint James, Randall, Church of Saint Louis Bertrand, Foreston, Church of Saint Boniface, Cold Spring, Church of the Assumption, Eden Valley, Church of Seven Dolors, Albany, Church of Saint Mary of the Presentation, Breckenridge, Church of the Holy Cross, Onamia, Church of Saint Gall, Tintah, Church of Saint Olaf, Elbow Lake, Church of the Immaculate Conception, Osakis, Church of Saint Peter, Dumont, Church of Ave Maria, Wheaton, Church of the Holy Spirit, St. Cloud, Church of the Holy Angels of St. Cloud, St. Cloud, The, Church of Saint Hedwig, Church of Immaculate Conception, New Munich, Church of Saint Paul, Sauk Centre, Church of Saint Joseph, Clarissa, Church of the Sacred Heart, Staples, Church of Saint Stanislaus, Sobieski, Church of Saint Peter, St. Cloud, Church of Saint Andrew, Elk River, Church of Saint Edward, Bowlus, Church of Saint Paul, St. Cloud and Church of St. Mary's Cathedral, of St. Cloud, St. Cloud
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company, Order of St. Benedict, The, Continental Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company and Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Counter_claimant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Church of the Sacred Heart of Jesus, Dent
Case Number: 0:2017cv02002
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Stearns
Presiding Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RULING; overruling 193 Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order; affirming the Magistrate Judge Order 192 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/2/2019. (JMK)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 123 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 140 Motion for Joinder; denying 142 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 153 Motion for Joinder(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/3/2018. (JMK)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 61 Defendant Arrowood's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Counts Five, Six, Seven, and Eight are dismissed without prejudice. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/6/2018. (JMK)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; granting 32 The Continental Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss; granting 43 The Order of St. Benedict's Motion to Dismiss; granting 52 Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company's Motion for Joinder of Continental Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's First Cause of Action against the Order of St. Benedict, The Continental Insurance Company, and Travelers Indemnity Company is dismissed without prejudice; denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/4/2018. (JMK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diocese of St. Cloud et al v. Arrowood Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diocese of St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Joseph, St. Joseph
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Sacred Heart of Jesus, Dent
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Anthony of Padua, St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Our Lady of Victory, Fergus Falls
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Anne, Kimball
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint James, Randall
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Louis Bertrand, Foreston
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Boniface, Cold Spring
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Assumption, Eden Valley
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Seven Dolors, Albany
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Mary of the Presentation, Breckenridge
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Holy Cross, Onamia
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Gall, Tintah
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Olaf, Elbow Lake
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Immaculate Conception, Osakis
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Peter, Dumont
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Ave Maria, Wheaton
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Holy Spirit, St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Holy Angels of St. Cloud, St. Cloud, The
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Hedwig
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Immaculate Conception, New Munich
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Paul, Sauk Centre
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Joseph, Clarissa
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Sacred Heart, Staples
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Stanislaus, Sobieski
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Peter, St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Andrew, Elk River
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Edward, Bowlus
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of Saint Paul, St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of St. Mary's Cathedral, of St. Cloud, St. Cloud
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert D Brownson
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Hart
Represented By: Aaron M Simon
Represented By: Dennis Neri Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order of St. Benedict, The
Represented By: James Sumter Carter, Jr
Represented By: James Richard Murray
Represented By: Stacey L Sever
Represented By: Jared Zola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy A Poetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance D Meyer
Represented By: Dale O. Thornsjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Lance D Meyer
Represented By: Dale O. Thornsjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kerri J Nelson
Represented By: Christian A Preus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Corinne O'Hayer Lane
Represented By: Robert L McCollum
Represented By: Joshua D Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kerri J Nelson
Represented By: Christian A Preus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Church of the Sacred Heart of Jesus, Dent
Represented By: John H Faricy, Jr
Represented By: Thomas A Janson
Represented By: Vadim Trifel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?