Jackson et al v. Mike-Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Jackson, Joshua Jones, Shane Kringen, Marvin Franco-Morales, Mitchell Osterloh and Jesse Plentyhorse
Defendant: Sharlene Mike-Lopez, Diane Medchill, Kathy Ried, Bruce Rieser, David Rieshus, Tom Roy and Michelle Smith
Case Number: 0:2017cv04278
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Becky R. Thorson
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 118 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sharlene Mike-Lopez. Case Dismissed (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/13/2020. (HAZ)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER addressing 111 Response.(Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/27/2019. (TMM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: overruling Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 94 ; adopting the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation 92 ; granting in part and denying in part Defend ants' Motion to Dismiss 61 ; dismissing all claims against Defendants Medchill, Ried, Rieser, Rieshus, Roy, and Smith; dismissing Plaintiffs' Fourteenth Amendment and First Amendment claims against Defendant Mike-Lopez; and Plaintiffs' requests for declaratory relief, injunctive relief, and compensatory damages are DISMISSED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/4/2019. (JMK)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying 75 Motion for Spoliation; denying 84 Motion for Sanctions(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/20/2018. (TMM)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER in Response to 70 Letter to District Judge.(Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/2/2018. (TMM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/24/2018. (TMM)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/10/2018. (TMM)cc: all pro se plaintiffs. Modified text on 4/10/2018 (MMP).
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to refund Plaintiff Plentyhorse's payment of $20.00 32 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/15/2018. (JMK) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (ACH). cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs. Regenerated NEF to Financial 2/15/18 (ACH).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's November 3, 2017, Order 11 , December 6, 2017, Order 15 , and January 3, 2018, Order 27 are VACATED as moot; Plaintiffs' applications for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 , 12 , 13 , 26 are DENIED as moot; Plaintiffs' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's December 6, 2017, Order 21 and Report and Recommendation 19 and 22 are OVERRULED as moot; and The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 16 is REJECTED as moot. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to refund Plaintiff Morales's payment of $27.67 25 and Plaintiff Kringen's payment of $16.93 30 in partial satisfaction of their IFP-based filing fees. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/29/2018. (JMK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Mike-Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Kringen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Franco-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Osterloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Plentyhorse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharlene Mike-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Medchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Ried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Rieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rieshus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?