Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Fur-Ever Wild et al
Plaintiff: Lockwood Animal Rescue Center and Animal Legal Defense Fund
Defendant: Wolves, Woods & Wildlife, Fur-Ever Wild and Teresa Lynn Petter
Case Number: 0:2017cv04496
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/17/2019. (CBC)
December 17, 2019 Filing 293 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #292 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Berry, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 Filing 292 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Jointly Signed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, and Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Berry, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order (Text-Only) ORDER denying as moot #285 Motion to Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/13/2019. (DCW) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (CLK).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a settlement in this matter. The trial scheduled to begin on Monday, December 16, 2019, is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/13/2019. (DCW)
December 13, 2019 Filing 290 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #285 MOTION Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel re #280 Notice of Appearance filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 289 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #285 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 288 Declaration of Gary R. Leistico in Support of #285 MOTION Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel re #280 Notice of Appearance filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM in Support re #285 MOTION Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel re #280 Notice of Appearance filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 286 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #285 MOTION Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel re #280 Notice of Appearance : Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Filing 285 MOTION Exclude Tessa Mansfield Hirte as Local Counsel re #280 Notice of Appearance filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #282 Pretrial Memorandum: Plaintiffs' request to excuse Mr. Walden from the trial is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/13/2019. (DCW)
December 13, 2019 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Mark Walden re #282 Pretrial Memorandum by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center . (Berry, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Filing 282 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #276 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alene Georgia Anello for Animal Legal Defense Fund and for Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Approved by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/11/2019. (NAH) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (NAH).
December 12, 2019 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by Tessa A. Mansfield on behalf of Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Mansfield, Tessa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2019 before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (82 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and the #Transcripts under NextGen ECF Reference Guides. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 12/19/2019. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (MVW)
December 12, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW)
December 11, 2019 Filing 277 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2019. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (CBC)
December 9, 2019 Filing 276 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alene Anello. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7326814 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Eliseuson, Anthony)
December 2, 2019 Filing 275 DECLARATION of Christopher Berry in Opposition to #248 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Berry, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 274 RESPONSE in Opposition re #248 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berry, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 273 DECLARATION of Jayne E. Esch in Opposition to #256 MOTION in Limine filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1)(Leistico, Gary)
December 2, 2019 Filing 272 RESPONSE in Opposition re #256 MOTION in Limine filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER denying #264 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/2/2019. (ERE)
November 27, 2019 Filing 270 Witness List by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 27, 2019 Filing 269 Joint STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Parties. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 27, 2019 Filing 268 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Granting Defendants' Motion to Supplement Defendants' Answer #264 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. Defendants' Supplemental Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Leistico, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 267 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #264 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings, filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM in Support re #264 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #29 Answer to Complaint filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 265 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #264 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #29 Answer to Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Leistico, Gary)
November 27, 2019 Filing 264 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #29 Answer to Complaint filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. Defendants' Supplemental Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 263 Proposed Findings of Fact by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 262 TRIAL BRIEF by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 261 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #256 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 260 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #256 Motion in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 259 Declaration of Alexandra J. Monson in Support of #256 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 258 MEMORANDUM in Support re #256 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen (Monson, Alexandra) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (CLK).
November 25, 2019 Filing 256 MOTION in Limine filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 255 List of Deposition Testimony Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations submitted by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 254 Witness List by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 253 Exhibit List by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 252 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Granting Defendants' Motions in Limine #248 Motion in Limine. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 251 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #248 Motion in Limine filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 250 BRIEF re #248 MOTION in Limine filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #248 MOTION in Limine : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION in Limine filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 247 Proposed Findings of Fact by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 246 List of Deposition Testimony Defendants' Deposition Designations submitted by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 245 TRIAL BRIEF by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 244 Witness List by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 243 Exhibit List by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #240 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Allow Additional Discovery Before Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/25/2019. (JMK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 241 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #240 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders #41 Scheduling Order, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Monson, Alexandra)
November 22, 2019 Filing 240 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders #41 Scheduling Order, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Monson, Alexandra)
November 7, 2019 Filing 239 Minute Entry for telephone Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/7/2019. The Court, counsel, and defendant Teresa Petter discussed the status of settlement discussions. (JMK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 238 BENCH TRIAL NOTICE AND FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Bench Trial set for 12/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. See Order for other dates and deadlines.(CBC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 237 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation: The pretrial conference on September 17, 2019, and the trial starting on September 23, 2019, are CANCELLED. The Court will contact the parties to reschedule the trial and will issue an amended trial notice and final pretrial order. (MAH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 236 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #235 Stipulation. (Leistico, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 235 STIPULATION to reschedule trial by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. Jointly Signed by Animal Legal Defense Fund and Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Leistico, Gary)
August 29, 2019 Filing 234 Minute Entry for telephone status conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/29/2019. The Court and counsel discussed the status of settlement discussions. (Restricted document) (JMK)
August 22, 2019 Filing 233 Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/22/2019. No final settlement reached, but the parties made substantial progress toward a framework for settlement and will diligently pursue that during the coming week. (JMK)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TEXT ONLY ORDER The Court has reviewed #231 the unopposed motion of Animal Legal Defense fund on several issues relating to the upcoming settlement conference. The motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/9/2019. (KLL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 231 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders #219 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Christopher)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #228 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica L Blome for Animal Legal Defense Fund and for Lockwood Animal Rescue Center; granting #229 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra Monson for Animal Legal Defense Fund and for Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 8/1/2019. (NAH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 229 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexandra Monson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7025816 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Eliseuson, Anthony)
July 29, 2019 Filing 228 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jessica Blome. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7025777 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Eliseuson, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 Filing 227 CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT 226 Motions Hearing held on 06/13/19 before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (38 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (MVW)
July 15, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW)
July 15, 2019 Filing 224 EXHIBIT Redacted Exhibit E to Declaration of Jayne E. Esch (D. 171) previously filed under Seal (172) and now filed as redacted pursuant to Court Order (Docket 223) re #171 Declaration in Support, filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #197 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 172.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 169, 173, 175, 176, 177, 178, 179, 180. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/31/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. The parties shall file a public version of ECF No. 172 that redacts lines 1-2 on transcript page 196 (CM/ECF page 50) within 10 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/3/2019. (JMK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #196 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 189, 192. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/30/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/2/2019. (JMK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #166 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 149, 152, 154, 156. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/30/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/2/2019. (JMK) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (JMK).
June 28, 2019 Filing 220 BENCH TRIAL NOTICE AND FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Bench Trial set for 9/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. See Order for other dates and deadlines. (CBC)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 8/15/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/12/2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/25/2019. (JMK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 218 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Anello, Alene)
June 17, 2019 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #216 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Berry, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Motion Hearing held 06/13/2019. For the reasons stated on the record (1) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts [Dkt No. #182 ] is DENIED. The Court finds that Plaintiffs' experts are admissible under Rule 702. (2) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. #167 ] is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. #187 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court found that Plaintiffs have standing; the notice requirement of the Endangered Species Act ("ESA") has been met; Defendants' canines are protected by the ESA; and there is a genuine dispute of fact as to whether Defendants' "take" their canines under the ESA. (3) The Court directs the parties to submit supplemental briefing in connection with their trial briefs and motions in limine on the issue of whether wolves in captivity at the time of re-listing on December 19, 2014 are covered by the ESA under 16 U.S.C. 1539(f) and 50 C.F.R. 17.4. (Court Reporter Maria V. Weinbeck) (CBC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 215 Declaration of Christopher Berry in Support of #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, New Copy of Petter 2012 Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit(s) B, Defs. State Court Mem. (Dec. 31, 2015), #3 Exhibit(s) C, FEW Original and Amended 2013 DNR Reports, #4 Exhibit(s) D, Pls. Third Set Reqs. Prod.)(Anello, Alene)
April 26, 2019 Filing 214 Reply to Response to Motion re #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anello, Alene)
April 26, 2019 Filing 213 Reply to Response to Motion re #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
April 26, 2019 Filing 212 Declaration of Gary R. Leistico in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
April 26, 2019 Filing 211 Second Declaration of Teresa Lynn Petter in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
April 26, 2019 Filing 210 Reply to Response to Motion re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
April 13, 2019 Filing 209 DECLARATION of DR. ADAM H. FREEDMAN, PH.D. in Opposition to #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Freedman-Ex 1 Freedman Expert Rep., #2 Exhibit(s) Freedman-Ex 2 Freedman Supp. Expert Rep.)(Anello, Alene)
April 13, 2019 Filing 208 DECLARATION of DR. BRIDGETT VONHOLDT, PH.D. in Opposition to #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) vonHoldt-Ex 1 vonHoldt Expert Rep., #2 Exhibit(s) vonHoldt-Ex 2 vonHoldt Supp. Expert Rep.)(Anello, Alene)
April 13, 2019 Filing 207 DECLARATION of DR. JENNIFER CONRAD, DVM in Opposition to #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Conrad-Ex 1: Conrad Expert Rep., #2 Exhibit(s) Conrad-Ex 2: Conrad Supp. Expert Rep.)(Anello, Alene)
April 13, 2019 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Alene Anello in Opposition to #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Eureka v Petter., #2 Exhibit(s) B Storlie Dep Tr., #3 Exhibit(s) C Dreifus Dep Tr., #4 Exhibit(s) D Hansen Dep Tr., #5 Exhibit(s) E Petter Aff., #6 Exhibit(s) F Storlie Aff., #7 Exhibit(s) G Eureka Board Min., #8 Exhibit(s) H Petter 2012 Dep Tr., #9 Exhibit(s) I Long Dep Tr., #10 Exhibit(s) J Long Receipt., #11 Exhibit(s) K Wolf Hides and Sculls., #12 Exhibit(s) L Shimp Dep., #13 Exhibit(s) M Competition Quality., #14 Exhibit(s) N Wolf Pelt Photos., #15 Exhibit(s) O Defs Responses., #16 Exhibit(s) P Simmons Decl., #17 Exhibit(s) Q Petter 2018 Dep., #18 Exhibit(s) R FEW 2012., #19 Exhibit(s) S WWW 2012., #20 Exhibit(s) T FEW 2013., #21 Exhibit(s) U WWW 2013., #22 Exhibit(s) V WWW 2014., #23 Exhibit(s) W FEW 2015., #24 Exhibit(s) X WWW 2015., #25 Exhibit(s) Y FEW 2016., #26 Exhibit(s) Z WWW 2016., #27 Exhibit(s) AA FEW 2017., #28 Exhibit(s) BB WWW 2017., #29 Exhibit(s) CC FEW 2018., #30 Exhibit(s) DD WWW 2018.pdf., #31 Exhibit(s) EE Defs Wolf Dispos List., #32 Exhibit(s) FF Root Dep Tr., #33 Exhibit(s) GG Roy Dep Tr., #34 Exhibit(s) HH Pacotti Dep Tr., #35 Exhibit(s) II, Defs Initial Disclosures., #36 Exhibit(s) JJ Map., #37 Exhibit(s) KK Petter Facebook Post., #38 Exhibit(s) LL Walden Decl., #39 Exhibit(s) MM ALDF Letter to USDA., #40 Exhibit(s) NN Nasser Letter., #41 Exhibit(s) OO UC Davis Rep., #42 Exhibit(s) PP Eureka Planning Min., #43 Exhibit(s) QQ Defs Answers Interrogs., #44 Exhibit(s) RR Ranch Raised Pure White.)(Anello, Alene)
April 12, 2019 Filing 205 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anello, Alene)
April 12, 2019 Filing 204 DECLARATION of Jennifer Conrad re #200 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Conrad Expert Report, #2 Exhibit(s) Conrad Suppl. Expert Report)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Adam Freedman re #200 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Freedman Expert Report, #2 Exhibit(s) Freedman Suppl. Expert Report)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Bridgett vonHoldt re #200 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) vonHoldt Expert Report, #2 Exhibit(s) vonHoldt Suppl Expert Report)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 201 DECLARATION of Christopher Berry re #200 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2018 Petter Dep. Tr.)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 199 DECLARATION of Jayne E. Esch in Opposition to #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) AA Storlie Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit(s) BB Ps Response to Second Request for Admissions and Exhibits)(Leistico, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 197 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #172 Exhibit, #169 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #170 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #176 Exhibit, #180 Exhibit, #175 Exhibit, #177 Exhibit, #178 Exhibit, #179 Exhibit, #173 Exhibit filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 196 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #190 Redacted Document, #193 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #192 Exhibit, #189 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
March 28, 2019 Filing 195 EXHIBIT JJ CORRECTED Exhibit JJ - Excerpt of Dreifus Dep. - re #191 Declaration in Support,,,, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
March 23, 2019 Filing 194 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
March 23, 2019 Filing 193 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #192 Exhibit F filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
March 23, 2019 Filing 192 SEALED EXHIBIT F re #191 Declaration in Support,,,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
March 23, 2019 Filing 191 Declaration of Alene Anello in Support of #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) G, #7 Exhibit(s) H, #8 Exhibit(s) I, #9 Exhibit(s) J, #10 Exhibit(s) K, #11 Exhibit(s) L, #12 Exhibit(s) M, #13 Exhibit(s) N, #14 Exhibit(s) O, #15 Exhibit(s) P, #16 Exhibit(s) Q, #17 Exhibit(s) R, #18 Exhibit(s) S, #19 Exhibit(s) T, #20 Exhibit(s) U, #21 Exhibit(s) V, #22 Exhibit(s) W and W-1, #23 Exhibit(s) X, #24 Exhibit(s) Y, #25 Exhibit(s) Z, #26 Exhibit(s) AA, #27 Exhibit(s) BB, #28 Exhibit(s) CC, #29 Exhibit(s) DD, #30 Exhibit(s) EE, #31 Exhibit(s) FF, #32 Exhibit(s) GG, #33 Exhibit(s) HH and HH-1, #34 Exhibit(s) II and II-1; (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR WILL BE REFILED CORRECTLY AND SEPARATELY #35 Exhibit(s) JJ), #36 Exhibit(s) KK, #37 Exhibit(s) LL, #38 Exhibit(s) MM)(Anello, Alene) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (KNK).
March 23, 2019 Filing 190 Redacted Document for #189 Redacted version of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
March 22, 2019 Filing 189 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
March 22, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Anello, Alene)
March 22, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
March 22, 2019 Filing 186 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 185 Declaration of Jayne E. Esch in Support of #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Support re #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts : Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 181 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 180 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 179 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 178 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 177 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 176 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 175 SEALED EXHIBIT 174 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Teresa Petter re #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 174 Declaration of Teresa Lynn Petter in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 10)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 173 SEALED EXHIBIT 171 Exhibit O to Declaration of Jayne E. Esch re #171 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 172 SEALED EXHIBIT 171 Exhibit E to Declaration of Jayne E. Esch re #171 Declaration in Support, filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al..(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 171 Declaration of Jayne E. Esch in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - D, #2 Exhibit(s) F - N, #3 Exhibit(s) P - Z)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Support re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted Version filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 169 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment : by Defendants Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Leistico, Gary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 166 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #156 Exhibit, #152 Exhibit, #154 Exhibit, #149 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
March 15, 2019 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2019 re #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Motion DENIED without prejudice as premature. See minute entry for details. (BDB)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 (Text-only) ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #163 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits by 3,000 words. The request is granted as to both parties. Ordered by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 3/15/2019. (CBC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 163 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Leistico, Gary)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Unopposed Letter Requesting a Telephonic Hearing, dated March 6, 2019 (ECF No. 161), on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Errata Sheet (ECF No. 147). The Court GRANTS the request to conduct the motion hearing scheduled for March 15, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. CDT, by Conference Bridge. Call-in instructions will be provided to counsel by separate e-mail prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/7/2019. (JMK)
March 6, 2019 Filing 161 Consent MOTION : UNOPPOSED LETTER REQUESTING A TELEPHONIC HEARING re #148 Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
March 5, 2019 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 159 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 158 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #147 Motion to Strike Pleading filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 157 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #156 Sealed Exhibit C: Am. Errata Sheet filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 156 SEALED EXHIBIT C : Am. Errata Sheet, re #151 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 155 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #154 Sealed Exhibit B: Orig. Errata Sheet filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 154 SEALED EXHIBIT B : Orig. Errata Sheet, re #151 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 153 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #152 Sealed Exhibit A: Shimp Dep. Tr. filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 152 SEALED EXHIBIT A : Shimp Dep. Tr., re #151 Declaration in Support, filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 151 Declaration of Alene Anello in Support of #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D: Cham v. McNeilus)(Anello, Alene)
February 26, 2019 Filing 150 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #149 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Errata Sheet filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
February 26, 2019 Filing 149 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Plaintiffs.(Anello, Alene)
February 26, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET : Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Anello, Alene)
February 26, 2019 Filing 147 MOTION to Strike Pleading MOTION TO STRIKE ERRATA SHEET filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #111 Motion to Compel. See the order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/20/2019. (JMK)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER on #143 Joint Stipulation Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline. Motions (disp) due 30 days after ruling on pending Motion to Compel. Ready for trial due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/31/2019. (JMK)
January 24, 2019 Filing 144 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #143 Stipulation. (Anello, Alene)
January 24, 2019 Filing 143 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Dispositive Motion Deadline by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs and Defendants. (Anello, Alene)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER on Joint Stipulation for Entry of Order as to Taking Deposition and Extending Deadlines (ECF No. 140): Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/19/2018. (JMK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 141 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #140 Stipulation. (Leistico, Gary)
November 16, 2018 Filing 140 STIPULATION for Taking Deposition and Extension of Deadlines by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. Jointly Signed by Animal Legal Defense Fund and Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Leistico, Gary)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: (1) Defendants' objections to the Magistrate Judge's order [ECF No. #109 ] are DENIED. (2) The Magistrate Judge's ruling on September 24, 2018 granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' motion to compel [ECF No. #100 ] is AFFIRMED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 11/8/2018. (CBC)
October 29, 2018 Filing 138 Declaration of Jayne E. Esch in Support of #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 137 Declaration of Teresa Lynn Petter in Support of #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 136 REPLY re #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,,, #131 Response in Support of Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed #132 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' #131 Response re #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel. The Reply is due by October 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 10/24/2018. (CBC)
October 23, 2018 Filing 134 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #132 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 133 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #109 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge, #132 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
October 22, 2018 Filing 131 RESPONSE re #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
October 22, 2018 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center re #127 Reply (Berry, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions (Berry, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 128 Second Declaration of Christopher Berry in Support of #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Berry, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 127 REPLY re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Berry, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER on #119 Joint Stipulation for Entry of Order Resolving Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Attendance and Sanctions (As to Adam Shimp Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/16/2018. (JMK)
October 15, 2018 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Teresa Lynn Petter by Teresa Lynn Petter pursuant to Court Minutes/Order (Doc. 100). (Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Jayne E. Esch in Opposition to #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Teresa Lynn Petter in Opposition to #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 122 Redacted Document for #121 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 121 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 120 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #119 Stipulation,. (Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 119 STIPULATION re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions as to Adam Shimp Only by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. Jointly Signed by Animal Legal Defense Fund and Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Leistico, Gary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 118 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #111 Motion to Compel filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #104 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: (a) All dispositive motions and supporting pleadings (notice of motion, motion, memorandum of law, affidavits and proposed order), shall be filed and served on or before November 30, 2018. (b) This case shall be ready for a bench trial on March 26, 2019. All other deadlines in the Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 41), as amended (ECF No. 74, 80), will remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/15/2018. (JMK)
October 8, 2018 Filing 116 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 115 SEALED EXHIBIT E Petter 2018 Transcript Deposition re #114 Declaration in Support,, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund.(Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 114 Declaration of Christopher Berry in Support of #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Shimp Dep. Notice (April 2018), #2 Exhibit(s) Storlie Dep. Notice (April 2018), #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Non Service, #4 Exhibit(s) Emails (May 2018), #5 Exhibit(s) Petter 2018 Dep. Tr. (Redacted Excerpts), #6 Exhibit(s) Emails (June 2018), #7 Exhibit(s) Shimp Dep. Notice (June 2018), #8 Exhibit(s) Storlie Dep. Notice (June 2018), #9 Exhibit(s) Storlie 2018 Game Farm Application)(Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Support re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions (Redacted Version) filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 112 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund.(Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION to Compel Attendance and for Sanctions filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Jayne E. Esch re #109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Leistico, Gary)
October 8, 2018 Filing 109 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
October 8, 2018 Filing 108 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife Joint Letter Submission as Requested by Judge's Order/Court Minutes(Doc. 100). (Leistico, Gary)
October 4, 2018 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 09/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (96 pages). Transcriber: Lynne Krenz. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 10/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2019. (LMK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LMK)
October 1, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anello, Alene)
September 28, 2018 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Contract Court Reporter. (Anello, Alene)
September 26, 2018 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: informal dispute resolution conference held on 9/26/2018. See minute entry for details. (BDB)
September 26, 2018 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #100 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Contract Court Reporter. (Leistico, Gary)
September 24, 2018 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: granting in part and denying in part #81 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2018 re #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Magistrate Judge Bowbeer ruled from the bench on the motion and no additional order will be issued. See minute entry for details. (BDB)
September 24, 2018 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: informal dispute resolution conference held on 9/24/2018. See minute entry for details. (BDB)
September 18, 2018 Filing 98 Declaration of Alene Anello in Support of #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: Defendants' Supplemental Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit(s) B: Dr. Conrad's Expert Report)(Anello, Alene)
September 17, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY re #91 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories, #83 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply. Plaintiffs may file a Reply in the form attached to the Motion, on or before September 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/17/2018. (JMK)
September 14, 2018 Filing 95 Declaration of Alene Anello in Support of #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories, #94 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #81 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: Defendants' Supplemental Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit(s) B: Dr. Conrad's Expert Report)(Anello, Alene)
September 14, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #81 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Proposed Order)(Anello, Alene)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ORDER TIME CHANGE ONLY: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the starting time of the motion hearing/Informal Dispute Resolution conference, currently set for September 24, 2018, is being changed. The motion hearing/Informal Dispute Resolution conference will now begin at 8:30 a.m. before the undersigned on September 24, 2018 in Courtroom 6B, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, SAINT PAUL, Minnesota. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/10/2018. (JMK)
August 30, 2018 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Jayne Esch in Opposition to #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5)(Leistico, Gary)
August 30, 2018 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ONLY ORDER in Response to #89 Letter to Magistrate Judge, #81 Motion to Compel: The Court has reviewed the letter request from Defendants' counsel dated August 27, 2018 (ECF No. 89), seeking an extension of time to file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs Requests for Production and Interrogatories (ECF No. 81). Defendants may file their response brief and supporting documentation on or before August 30, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/29/2018. (JMK)
August 28, 2018 Filing 89 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife for extension to file response to motion to compel (unopposed). (Leistico, Gary)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to a schedule conflict for defense counsel, the hearing on the Motion to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (ECF No. 81) is being rescheduled. The hearing, followed by an informal dispute resolution conference, will be conducted by the undersigned on September 24, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. CDT in STP Courtroom 6B. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/21/2018. (JMK)
August 21, 2018 Filing 87 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
August 21, 2018 Filing 86 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #81 Motion to Compel filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Anello, Alene)
August 20, 2018 Filing 85 Declaration of Anello in Support of #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A: Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B: Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C: Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D: Defendants Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E: Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F: Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G: Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H: Defendants Answers to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I: Plaintiffs Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J: Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K: Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit L: Defendants Answers to Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M: March 15, 2018 Letter from Defendants, via Counsel, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit N: Petter 2018 Deposition Transcript (Redacted Version), #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit O: Wolves Woods & Wildlife Minnesota Department of Natural Resources Commercial License Application (Feb. 21, 2014), #16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit P: Petter May 12, 2016 Facebook Post, #17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Q: Petter Closed Group Facebook Posts, #18 Exhibit(s) Exhibit R: Anthony Salzer Deposition Transcript, #19 Exhibit(s) Exhibit S: Michael Pendzima Deposition Transcript, #20 Exhibit(s) Exhibit T: David Long Deposition Transcript, #21 Exhibit(s) Exhibit U: David Long Receipt, #22 Exhibit(s) Exhibit V: Eureka Board Minutes, Sept 8, 2008, #23 Exhibit(s) Exhibit W: Petter Aff., Eureka v. Petter, 19HA-CV-15-2725 (Filed 12/31/2015), #24 Exhibit(s) Exhibit X: Storlie Aff., Eureka v. Petter, 19HA-CV-15-2725 (Filed 12/31/15), #25 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Y: Dawn Root Deposition Transcript, #26 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Z: James Roy Deposition Transcript, #27 Exhibit(s) Exhibit AA: Satia Pacotti Deposition Transcript, #28 Exhibit(s) Exhibit BB: List of Wolves, #29 Exhibit(s) Exhibit CC: Berry Email, March 15, 2018 at 6:06 AM, #30 Exhibit(s) Exhibit DD: Fur-Ever Wild 2018 Minnesota Department of Natural Resources Report, #31 Exhibit(s) Exhibit EE: Wolves Woods and Wildlife 2018 Minnesota Department of Natural Resources Report, #32 Exhibit(s) Exhibit FF: Hand-Written List, #33 Exhibit(s) Exhibit GG: Berry Letter, March 26, 2018)(Anello, Alene)
August 20, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Anello, Alene)
August 20, 2018 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anello, Alene)
August 20, 2018 Filing 82 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE ENTRY-NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Anello, Alene) Modified on 8/21/2018 (AKL).
August 20, 2018 Filing 81 First MOTION to Compel Further Responses by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint letter dated July 19, 2018 (ECF No. 79). The Court is advised that the parties are in agreement that an extension of the deadline for non-dispositive motions would be of assistance in their efforts to continue their settlement discussions. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the deadline by which non-dispositive motions must be filed is extended to and including AUGUST 20, 2018. All other deadlines in the Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 41), as amended (ECF No. 74), will remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/19/2018. (JMK)
July 20, 2018 Filing 79 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife parties joint request to extend non-dispostive motions deadline. (Leistico, Gary)
July 18, 2018 Filing 78 Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/18/2018. No settlement reached. The parties will continue to discuss a possible framework for settlement. Plaintiffs' counsel will prepare a draft relating to one part of that framework which the parties agree is critical to whether agreement can be reached overall. That draft will be circulated to Defendants' counsel by Friday, July 27, 2018. Counsel will also discuss whether any pending deadlines, particularly the deadline for non-dispositive motions, should be extended to allow the parties to focus on settlement negotiations. Counsel will email a joint update letter to the Court by Friday, August 3, 2018. (JMK)
June 14, 2018 Filing 77 Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/14/2018. (JMK)
June 12, 2018 Filing 76 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Anello, Alene)
June 7, 2018 Filing 75 TEXT ONLY NOTICE DATE CHANGE re #47 Order Setting Settlement conference: The settlement conference, currently scheduled for July 16, 2018 (ECF No. 47), is being moved one day. The conference will now take place on July 17, 2018, starting at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer in STP Courtroom 6B. (JMK)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery procedures must be commenced in time to be completed on or before July 9, 2018. Non-dispositive motions and supporting documents, other than those seeking to amend or supplement the pleadings or relating to expert discovery, shall be filed and served on or before July 22, 2018. No other modifications are being made to the Courts Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. 41) filed on December 15, 2018, and all other deadlines shall remain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/25/2018. (JMK)
May 25, 2018 Filing 73 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and file non-dispostive motions (Unopposed) filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
May 25, 2018 Filing 72 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
May 25, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and file non-dispostive motions (Unopposed) filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/18/2018. (JMK)
May 16, 2018 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #68 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
May 16, 2018 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by all parties. (Berry, Christopher) Modified on 5/17/2018 (AKL).
May 11, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW)
May 11, 2018 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 04/13/18 before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (29 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 6/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2018. (MVW)
April 20, 2018 Filing 65 Redacted Document for #64 Letter to District Judge Joan N. Ericksen pursuant to Order (Doc. 63). (Leistico, Gary)
April 20, 2018 Filing 64 SEALED LETTER to District Judge Joan N. Ericksen pursuant to Order (Doc. 63) by Defendants Fur-Ever Wild, et al.. (Leistico, Gary)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Court Order and for Emergency Injunctive Relief [ECF No. #49 ] is DENIED. (2) The Court's January 8, 2018 Order [ECF No. #45 ] is MODIFIED as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/13/2018. (CBC)
April 13, 2018 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center for a 30-Day Transcript of #60 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Anello, Alene)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Court Order and for Emergency Injunctive Relief [ECF No. #49 ] is DENIED. (2) The Court's January 8, 2018 Order [ECF No. #45 ] is MODIFIED as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/13/2018. (CBC) Modified on 4/17/2018 (AKL).
April 13, 2018 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Motion Hearing (Teleconference) held on 4/13/2018 re #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Court Reporter Maria V. Weinbeck) (CBC)
April 13, 2018 Filing 59 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE OF TELEPHONE HEARING re #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining at 3:00 PM on April 13, 2018. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. (CBC)
April 13, 2018 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Gary R. Leistico in Opposition to #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 and 2)(Leistico, Gary)
April 13, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Sharon Dreifus, DVM in Opposition to #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife.(Leistico, Gary)
April 13, 2018 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Terri Petter in Opposition to #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Leistico, Gary)
April 13, 2018 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
April 12, 2018 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca Walser in SUPPORT OF #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Walser CV)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Filing 52 Declaration of Matthew Simmons in Support of #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Offers of Gray Wolf Sale)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Filing 51 Declaration of Alene Anello in Support of #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Gray Wolf DNA Report)(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
April 12, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
April 9, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayne Esch on behalf of All Defendants. (Esch, Jayne)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Setting Telephone Conference for 6/14/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer and Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/9/2018. (JMK)
March 9, 2018 Filing 46 Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/9/2018. See minutes for details. (JMK)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, or Alternatively for Preliminary Injunction. The Motion is denied as moot. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 8, 2018. (CBC)
December 29, 2017 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 Stipulation,. (Berry, Christopher)
December 29, 2017 Filing 43 JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER RESOLVING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Jointly Signed by Fur-Ever Wild, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife, and Teresa Lynn Petter. (Berry, Christopher) Modified text on 1/2/2018 (JDF).
December 21, 2017 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 12/21/2017. (ACH)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2018. Discovery due by 6/1/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 6/22/2018. Motions (disp) due by 10/26/2018. Ready for trial due by 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/15/17. (JDF) Modified file date on 12/18/2017 (JDF).
December 6, 2017 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/6/2017. Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JDF)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alene Georgia Anello for Animal Legal Defense Fund and Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/6/17. (AKL)
December 5, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alene Anello. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5849818 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Eliseuson, Anthony)
November 30, 2017 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY NOTICE re #32 Order: The pretrial scheduling conference scheduled for December 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. CST will be conducted in person before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer in St. Paul Courtroom 6B. (JMK)
November 29, 2017 Filing 36 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Jointly Signed by Fur-Ever Wild, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife, and Teresa Petter.(Berry, Christopher)
November 29, 2017 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
November 20, 2017 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held by telephone on 11/20/2017. (lmb)
November 20, 2017 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held by telephone on 11/20/2017. (lmb)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (CONFERENCE BRIDGE): Pretrial Conference by Conference Bridge set for 12/6/2017 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form). (lmb)
October 30, 2017 Filing 31 EXHIBIT Reply Exhibit Index re #30 Reply, #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Reply Exhibit A: Eureka Planning Commission Minutes)(Berry, Christopher)
October 30, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY with attached LR 7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher) Modified on 10/31/2017 (AKL).
October 30, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
October 26, 2017 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Teresa Lynn Petter in Opposition to #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Leistico, Gary)
October 26, 2017 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Leistico, Gary)
October 26, 2017 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary)
October 26, 2017 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Fur-Ever Wild. (Leistico, Gary)
October 24, 2017 Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadlines #22 . The Stipulation is approved. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #9 is due October 26, 2017. Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' response is October 30, 2017. (CBC)
October 24, 2017 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Leistico, Gary)
October 24, 2017 Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE filed by Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (Leistico, Gary) Modified text on 10/24/2017 (LEG).
October 24, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary R Leistico on behalf of All Defendants. (Leistico, Gary)
October 17, 2017 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Matthew Liebman in SUPPORT OF #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petter Dep., #2 Exhibit(s) ALDF Letter to USDA, #3 Exhibit(s) Nasser Letter, #4 Exhibit(s) Wolf Pelts, #5 Exhibit(s) Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit(s) Minnesota Court of Appeals Opinion in Eureka Township v. Petter, A17-0020, #7 Exhibit(s) Minnesota District Court Order in Eureka Township v. Petter, 19HA-CV-15-2725, #8 Exhibit(s) USDA Inspection Report (August 29, 2017), #9 Exhibit(s) USDA Inspection Report (April 3, 2017), #10 Exhibit(s) USDA Inspection Report (June 21, 2016), #11 Exhibit(s) USDA Inspection Report (November 4, 2015), #12 Exhibit(s) USDA Inspection Report (June 3, 2015), #13 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2011), #14 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2012), #15 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2013), #16 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2015), #17 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2016), #18 Exhibit(s) FEW Game Farm Report (2017), #19 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2011), #20 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2012), #21 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2013), #22 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2014), #23 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2015), #24 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2016), #25 Exhibit(s) WWW Game Farm Report (2017))(Berry, Christopher) Modified on 10/18/2017 (AKL).
October 17, 2017 Filing 19 Declaration of Matthew Simmons in Support of #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' First Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Docket No. #9 ]. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion is due October 24, 2017. Plaintiffs' reply is due October 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 16, 2017. (CBC)
October 12, 2017 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center re #16 Letter to District Judge, (Berry, Christopher) Modified text on 10/13/2017 (JDF).
October 12, 2017 Filing 16 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE from Plaintiffs re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email Correspondence between Plaintiffs' Counsel and Ms. Petter, #2 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service)(Berry, Christopher) Modified text on 10/13/2017 (JDF).
October 12, 2017 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center RE: #1 Complaint; #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Berry; #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested; #10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION; #11 MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; #12 EXHIBIT; #13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE; #14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Berry, Christopher) Modified text and links on 10/13/2017 (JDF).
October 6, 2017 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center re #10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #8 Order on Motion for Non-Resident Pro Hac Vice Admission, #12 Exhibit,,,,,,, #1 Complaint, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, #2 Certificate of Counsel, #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Berry. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5744635, #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Summons Issued (Berry, Christopher)
October 6, 2017 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher)
October 6, 2017 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE SEPARATELY - EXHIBIT Ex. A through Ex. B-25 re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, Simmons Decl., #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, Liebman Decl., #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-1, Petter Dep., #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-2, ALDF Letter to USDA, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-3, Nasser Letter, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-4, Wolf Pelts, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-5, Notice Letter, #8 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-6, Minnesota Court of Appeals Opinion in Eureka Township v. Petter, A17-0020 (Sept. 5, 2017), #9 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-7, Minnesota District Court Order in Eureka Township v. Petter, 19HA-CV-15-2725 (Sept. 13, 2017), #10 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-8, USDA Inspection Report (Aug. 29, 2017), #11 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-9, USDA Inspection Report (Apr. 3, 2017), #12 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-10, USDA Inspection Report (June 21, 2016), #13 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-11, USDA Inspection Report (Nov. 4, 2015), #14 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-12, USDA Inspection Report (June 3, 2015), #15 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-13, FEW Game Farm Report (2011), #16 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-14, FEW Game Farm Report (2012), #17 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-15, FEW Game Farm Report (2013), #18 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-16, FEW Game Farm Report (2015), #19 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-17, FEW Game Farm Report (2016), #20 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-18, FEW Game Farm Report (2017), #21 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-19, WWW Game Farm Report (2011), #22 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-20, WWW Game Farm Report (2012), #23 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-21, WWW Game Farm Report (2013), #24 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-22, WWW Game Farm Report (2014), #25 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-23, WWW Game Farm Report (2015), #26 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-24, WWW Game Farm Report (2016), #27 Exhibit(s) Ex. B-25, WWW Game Farm Report (2017))(Berry, Christopher) Modified on 10/17/2017 (AKL).
October 6, 2017 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center.(Berry, Christopher) LR 7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate is included in the filing. Modified text on 10/10/2017 (JDF).
October 6, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : at date and time to be determined. (Berry, Christopher)
October 6, 2017 Filing 9 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Berry, Christopher)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney Anthony T. Eliseuson to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Andrew Berry for Animal Legal Defense Fund and for Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/3/2017. (JLW)
October 2, 2017 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Berry. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5744635 filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Eliseuson, Anthony)
September 29, 2017 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christopher Berry as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife. (lmb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 17-cv-4496 (JNE/HB). (lmb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Interested Persons or Entities for All Plaintiffs by Anthony T Eliseuson on behalf of Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. (Eliseuson, Anthony)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fur-Ever Wild, Teresa Lynn Petter, Wolves, Woods & Wildlife (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-5743835) filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Lockwood Animal Rescue Center. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Eliseuson, Anthony) Modified text on 9/29/2017 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Fur-Ever Wild et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lockwood Animal Rescue Center
Represented By: Anthony T Eliseuson
Represented By: Alene Georgia Anello
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Represented By: Alexandra Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Anthony T Eliseuson
Represented By: Alene Georgia Anello
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: Jessica L Blome
Represented By: Alexandra Monson
Represented By: Tessa A. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolves, Woods & Wildlife
Represented By: Gary R Leistico
Represented By: Jayne Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fur-Ever Wild
Represented By: Gary R Leistico
Represented By: Jayne Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Lynn Petter
Represented By: Gary R Leistico
Represented By: Jayne Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?