Jackson v. Ossell et al
Plaintiff: Howard G. Jackson
Defendant: David Ossell, Melissa Gunderson and Human Services Department
Case Number: 0:2017cv05483
Filed: December 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Becky R. Thorson
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 153 Motion for Sanctions filed by David Ossell, denying 142 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Howard G. Jackson, and dismissing this case with prejudice (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/27/2020. (HAZ)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal, Disqualification, and Transfer of Venue; denying 101 Plaintiff's Request to Serve Party ; denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Reassign Case, Motion for Tort Claim, and Motion for Hearing; and granting 103 Plaintiff's Motion to Make My Complaint Not Protection. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/16/2019. (HAZ)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER in Response to 80 Request.(Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/24/2019. (DMM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 21 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by David Ossell (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/6/2018. (HAZ)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's "Motion to Consider more Evidence"; denying 29 Plaintiff's "Motions Judgment and Pay"; and denying 30 Plaintiff's "Motion" for "consent". (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/15/2018. (DMM) cc: Howard G. Jackson. Modified text on 10/15/2018 (MMP).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/30/2018. (HAZ) Modified text on 4/30/2018 (ACH). cc: Jackson
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Case dismissed without prejudice. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/27/2018. (HAZ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ossell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ossell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Services Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?