Craig et al v. CenturyLink, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Craig, Amarendra Thummeti, Fernando Alberto Vildosola, State of Oregon, City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Amalgamated Bank, Don J. Scott, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity, Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. and K B C Asset Management N V
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc., Glen F. Post, III, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., David D. Cole, G. Clay Bailey, Karen Puckett, Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc and Dean J. Douglas
Petitioner: Mark D Alger, Sona Andresian, Art Kleppen, Allen Feldman, Essex Lacy and Tae Yi
Consolidated Plaintiff: Don J Scott
Case Number: 0:2018cv00296
Filed: February 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 179 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Addressing Plaintiffs' July 1, 2019 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) Response)(Gibbs, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 178 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE filed with permission of the court by State of Oregon . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Blatchley, Michael) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (MMG).
June 19, 2019 Filing 177 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Re: Addressing Plaintiffs' June 14, 2019 Letter. (Gibbs, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 176 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Oregon re Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed with permission of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A June 10, 2019 Order of Hon. Bethany A. Fountain Lindberg, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B June 11, 2019 Order of Hon. Bethany A. Fountain Lindberg, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C April 10, 2019 Transcript of Motion Hearing, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D June 7, 2019 Transcript of Motion Hearing)(Blatchley, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #174 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (McNab, William)
June 9, 2019 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 06/07/2019 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (78 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (LAS)
June 9, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2019 re #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Karen Puckett, Glen F. Post, III, Dean J. Douglas. A status update was given regarding the tentative settlement of the consumer fraud portion of the case. A request to stay that portion of the case until mid-August so that negotiations can be concluded, was requested. The Court ordered that an update, signed by both partes, shall be electronically submitted every 30-45 days. Order to follow.The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (GRR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 171 (Text-only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (TIME CHANGE ONLY): #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (GRR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Gibbs, Patrick)
January 22, 2019 Filing 169 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Re: In response to Plaintiffs' January 14, 2019 letter (submitted with the Court's prior permission). (Gibbs, Patrick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 168 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Oregon re Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed with permission of the Court. (Blatchley, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 167 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The motion hearing #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General scheduled on March 3, 1019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13E has been cancelled and will be rescheduled. (GRR)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Parties' Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing 318 is GRANTED. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 280. in case 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/19/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM(GRR)
November 9, 2018 Filing 165 Declaration of Patrick Gibbs in Support of #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 28 - 2016 1Q, #2 Exhibit(s) 29 - 4Q13 Earnings Presentation, #3 Exhibit(s) 30 - 4Q15 Earnings Presentation, #4 Exhibit(s) 31 - 4Q17 Earnings Presentation, #5 Exhibit(s) 32 - Prospectus 425 re Douglas, #6 Exhibit(s) 33 - Analyst.Investor Day June 24, 2015 Call Presentation, #7 Exhibit(s) 34 - Graph Comparison)(Gibbs, Patrick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM in Support re #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gibbs, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 163 DECLARATION of Michael D. Blatchley in Opposition to #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Blatchley, Michael)
October 12, 2018 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 161 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Lauren)
September 11, 2018 Filing 160 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #154 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett.(Lee, Lauren)
September 11, 2018 Filing 159 Redacted Document for #158 Sealed Exhibit 26 filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett.(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 158 SEALED EXHIBIT 26 re #157 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by CenturyLink, Inc., Glen F. Post, III, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., David D. Cole, Karen Puckett, Dean J. Douglas, and G. Clay Bailey.(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 157 Declaration of Patrick Gibbs in Support of #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2013, filed on February 27, 2014 with the Securities Exchange Commission (SEC), #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2014, filed on February 24, 2015 with the SEC, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2015, filed on February 25, 2016 with the SEC, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2016 filed on February 23, 2017 with the SEC, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2017, filed on March 1, 2018 with the SEC, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2013, filed on May 10, 2013 with the SEC, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2013, filed on August 8, 2013 with the SEC, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2013, filed on November 8, 2013 with the SEC, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2014, filed on May 9, 2014 with the SEC, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2014, filed on August 7, 2014 with the SEC, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2014, filed on November 6, 2014 with the SEC, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2015, filed on May 6, 2015 with the SEC, #13 Exhibit(s) 13 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2015, filed on August 6, 2015 with the SEC, #14 Exhibit(s) 14 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2015, filed on November 5, 2015 with the SEC, #15 Exhibit(s) 15 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2016, filed on May 5, 2016 with the SEC, #16 Exhibit(s) 16 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2016, filed on August 4, 2016 with the SEC, #17 Exhibit(s) 17 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2016, filed on November 4, 2016 with the SEC, #18 Exhibit(s) 18 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2017, filed on May 5, 2017 with the SEC, #19 Exhibit(s) 19 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2017, filed on August 7, 2017 with the SEC, #20 Exhibit(s) 20 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2017, filed on November 9, 2017 with the SEC, #21 Exhibit(s) 21 - CenturyLinks Code of Conduct, #22 Exhibit(s) 22 - Heidi Heiser Complaint filed in Heiser v. CenturyLink, Inc., No. CV2017-008928 (Maricopa Cty. Super. Ct.), #23 Exhibit(s) 23 - Bloomberg publication by Mosendz and Moritz titled CenturyLink Is Accused of Running a Wells Fargo-Like Scheme, dated June 16, 2017, #24 Exhibit(s) 24 - Assurance of Discontinuance and Approval for In the Matter of Qwest Corporation, d/b/a/ CenturyLink QC, No. CV2016-002842 (Maricopa Cty. Super. Ct. Apr. 4, 2016), #25 Exhibit(s) 25 - Public Utilities Commission of the State of California Revised General Order 168 titled Market Rules to Empower Telecommunications Consumers and to Prevent Fraud (Decision 06-03-013 in Rulemaking 00-02-004), #26 Exhibit(s) 27 - Summary Exhibit identifying all challenged statements in Plaintiffs Consolidated Securities Action Complaint, filed on June 26, 2018 (Docket No. 143))(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM in Support re #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #154 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Gibbs, Patrick)
September 11, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren G Lee on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Lee, Lauren)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EXPANSION OF WORD COUNT LIMIT on (147 in 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/23/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM(KMW) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (MMP).
August 23, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Windler on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Windler, Joseph)
August 23, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Aafedt on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Aafedt, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 149 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #147 Stipulation,. (McNab, William)
August 22, 2018 Filing 148 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Unopposed Letter Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Expand Word Count Limit. (McNab, William)
August 22, 2018 Filing 147 STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND SCHEDULE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. Jointly Signed by State of Oregon and Fernando Alberto Vildosola. (McNab, William)
August 22, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (McNab, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney - George Edward Anhang and Lyle Roberts (Gibbs, Patrick)
July 9, 2018 Filing 144 Summons Issued as to G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (AKL)
June 25, 2018 Filing 143 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Complaint) against CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett, Dean J. Douglas, G. Clay Bailey. filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. Filer requests summons issued. (Blatchley, Michael)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES ACTION. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/13/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(KMW)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/15/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(KMW)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant's Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers (MDL #87 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery specifically directed to their assertion that their claims are not subject to mandatory arbitration and class-action waivers. Additionally, Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery related to CenturyLink's Alternative Motion to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and, as the Court has previously ordered, Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery specifically directed to the Motion to Intervene. All motions regarding discovery disputes related to this paragraph, Paragraph 2, shall be submitted to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. 3. In all other respects, discovery in this case is stayed until the Court rules on CenturyLinks Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EFFECT OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EFFECT OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR) Modified on 5/2/2018 (AKL).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Motion of Lead Plaintiff Oregon for Consolidation of Related Action (MDL 53 ) is GRANTED. 2. Motion of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (MDL #46 ) is DENIED. 3. Within three weeks of the date of this Order, Lead Plaintiff shall meet and confer with Defendant and shall submit a joint draft case management order, which shall include a proposed deadline for filing a consolidated complaint, for the parties' Rule 26(f) conference, and any other pertinent deadlines. The Court also directs Lead Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer with the leadership counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant in the CenturyLink sales cases to propose a date for the next joint status conference. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(GRR)
April 17, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE by K B C Asset Management N V Notice of Withdrawal of KBC Asset Management NV's Lead Plaintiff Motion (Cambronne, Karl)
April 17, 2018 Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2018 re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. Motion was moved, argued and a preliminary ruling was made on the record. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (KMW)
April 16, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Bleichner, Bryan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE to Attorneys: For parties not planning to argue the pending motions before the Court on 4/17/18, you may dial into the conference bridge to listen to the hearing tomorrow at 11:00 a.m. Please find the attached instructions.
April 3, 2018 Filing 132 Plaintiff the State of Oregon's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to Respond to New Arguments Raised for the First Time in KBC Asset Managements Appeal Reply [MDL Docket No. 74] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/3/2018. (KMW)
March 23, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE to Attorneys. The Court is providing a conference call bridge for the status conference scheduled for 4/5/18 at 10:30 a.m. (Central Time). The Court would like to know ahead of time who will be joining the phone call and who will be coming to the hearing in person. Please e-mail the chambers emailbox at davis_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov if you plan to attend via phone conference or in person. We want to know the names of all participants so please list them in the e-mail if you are sending the confirmation for multiple attorneys. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
March 20, 2018 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Blatchley in SUPPORT OF #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Teamsters Local 445 Freight Division Pension Fund ECF No. 30, #2 Exhibit(s) B - In re Select Comfort Corp. Securities Litigation ECF No. 16)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 129 REPLY re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #127 Response, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Pio v. General Motors, ECF No. 20)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 127 RESPONSE re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge Oregon's Memorandum Of Law In Response To KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of William B. Federman in OPPOSITION TO #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Press Release, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Press Release, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Press Release, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - OR Loss Analysis, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Press Release)(Federman, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Federman, William)
March 12, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Lightdale on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III. (Lightdale, Sarah)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/7/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PROTECTIVE ORDER based upon the stipulation of the parties [Doc. #42 in 17-md-2795]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/6/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
March 5, 2018 Filing 121 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon.(Blatchley, Michael)
March 5, 2018 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Blatchley in SUPPORT OF #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - IMG Notice)(Blatchley, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2018 (AKL).
March 5, 2018 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Support re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 2, 2018 Filing 118 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon.(Blatchley, Michael)
February 27, 2018 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of the Motion of Lead Plaintiff Oregon for Consolidation of Related Action filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Blatchley, Michael)
February 21, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS. Motions Hearing is scheduled for 4/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW)
February 13, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Lockridge on behalf of State of Oregon. (Lockridge, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. Baxter-Kauf on behalf of State of Oregon. (Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
February 13, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Martin Fishbein on behalf of State of Oregon. (Fishbein, Gregg)
February 12, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Browne on behalf of State of Oregon. (Browne, John)
February 9, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Scott Dubanevich on behalf of State of Oregon. (Dubanevich, Keith)
February 8, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Bleichner on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V. (Bleichner, Bryan)
February 8, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Bores on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V. (Bores, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl L Cambronne on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V. (Cambronne, Karl)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO FILE UPDATED BRIEFS. Updated briefs in support of the Appeal of the Magistrate Judge Order #87 and Motion for Consolidation of Related Action #95 shall be filed by February 27, 2018. Updated opposition briefs shall be filed by March 13, 2018. Updated reply briefs shall be filed by March 20, 2018. The parties shall meet and confer regarding dates for oral argument and shall jointly propose several possible hearing dates to the Court. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/8/18. (KMW)
February 6, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E Gibbs on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III. (Gibbs, Patrick)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER #2. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/4/18. (KMW)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/6/17. (KMW)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STANDING ORDER SUSPENDING ALL DEADLINES PENDING ENTRY OF OMNIBUS SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/16/17. (KMW) Modified text on 2/6/2018 (ACH).
February 5, 2018 Filing 102 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-01005. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per MDL List.
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER directing transfer to District of Minnesota, In Re: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation (formerly CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation), MDL # 2795. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Transfer Order in MDL No.2795, IN RE: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation (formerly CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation) advising case shall be transferred to the District of Minnesota upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by State of Oregon. (aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
January 15, 2018 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc. (aty,Federman, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
January 15, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bernard Federman on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc (aty,Federman, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
January 11, 2018 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of William B. Federman)(aty,Federman, William) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 3:17-cv-01648-RGJ-JPM with opposition of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #3 Exhibit A - Notice of pendency of IMG action, #4 Exhibit B - Proposed Corrected Notice, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brandon Wade Creekbaum terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/21/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw Brandon W Creekbaum as Attorney by CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 24, 2017 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge Hicks filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MissPERS Reply Lead Pl Brief in Goldman Sachs case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defs Brief re Appointment of Lead Pl in Kaplan case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reply LP Brief in Kaplan case, #4 Exhibit 4 - KBC Brief in Oppn to Mot to Vacate CTO-1, #5 Exhibit 5 - Oregon Brief in Oppn to Motion to Vacate CTO-1)(aty,Levin, Gregg) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyle Roberts, #2 Exhibit A - List of Cases)(aty,Roberts, Lyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge S. Maurice Hicks, Jr. filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - S.A.C. Capital LP Order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND COMPLAINTS by State of Oregon, CenturyLink Inc, David D Cole, R Stewart Ewing Jr, Glen F Post III. (aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to add filers on 11/13/2017. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 87 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by K B C Asset Management N V . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Roy, James) Modified to correct event type, remove docket entry relationship and edit docket text on 11/3/2017. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gregg S Levin on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V regarding #85 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Reason: For attorneys admitted pro hac vice, signature or endorsement of local counsel is required. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 85 DEFICIENT APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 80 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Dube v Signet Jewelers Ltd)(aty,Levin, Gregg) Modified to reflect deficient status on 11/3/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted in its entirety as document #87 on 11/3/2017.(ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael M Mathai for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/25/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for Michael M. Mathai to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3494653) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Timothy S DeJong for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/20/2017. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #75 Motion to Continue. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture court ruling. See document 80 to view PDF image. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/20/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 10/20/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Consolidation by Clerk. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting granting #25 Motion to Consolidate Cases; #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #28 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 3:17-cv-1005. Member Case Number(s): 3:17-cv-1033, 3:17-cv-1065. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/19/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Timothy S. DeJong to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3491564) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 Joint MOTION to Continue October 25, 2017 Motion Hearing filed by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyle Roberts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(aty,Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 10/16/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 76 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Any joinder or opposition to the #75 Motion to Continue must be filed no later than 10/17/2017. No replies will be allowed. Compliance Deadline set for 10/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/11/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Continue October 25, 2017 Motion Hearing with opposition by State of Oregon, K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - JPML Transfer Brief, #3 Exhibit B - JPML Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit C - JPML CTO-1, #5 Exhibit D - JPML Transfer Reply, #6 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to add filer on 10/11/2017. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael D Blatchley for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Avi Josefson for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gerald H Silk for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Michael D. Blatchley to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481549) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Avi Josefson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481533) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Gerald H. Silk to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3481510) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by State of Oregon. (aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Keil M Mueller for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Keith S Dubanevich for State of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Keil M. Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3480047) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for Keith S. Dubanevich to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3480017) by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Gregg S Levin for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of James M Hughes for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrew P Arnold for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William H Narwold for K B C Asset Management N V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/22/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 59 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/21/2017 granting 58 Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing on #25 is RESET for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria, Federal Building, 3rd floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 58 Joint Oral MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Tice, Y) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for Gregg S. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468987) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Gregg Levin, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for James M. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468977) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing James Hughes, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for Andrew P. Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468968) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Andrew Arnold, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION for William H. Narwold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3468941) by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing William H. Narwold, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/21/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.. Each party is to call our AT&T conference number at 877-336-1829. When you are prompted for an access code, enter 2670431. You will be placed on hold and will not hear anything except silence. However, the Clerk will join the call shortly thereafter. Only counsel of record may participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/21/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case and in Opposition to the Competing Motion filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Hearing. Motion day set for 10/4/2017 at 1:30 PM in Alexandria Court House before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/18/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 18, 2017 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding #49 Notice of Deficiency. Action taken: Modified to reflect document withdrawn. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Granting Oral Argument on Motion of KBC Asset Management NV for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel and Opposition to Competing Motions by K B C Asset Management N V re 44 Motion for Hearing,. (aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 49 (WITHDRAWN) NOTICE of Deficiency to Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding 47 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion. Reason: Replies to response to motion are limited to 7 pages for Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 9/18/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by K B C Asset Management N V re 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (aty,Roy, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by State of Oregon. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event. See document 47 to view PDF image. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION/REQUEST for Oral Argument re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case by K B C Asset Management N V. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event. See document 44 to view PDF image. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation and in Opposition to Competing Motions filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Williams Sartor, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Brian de Haan, #3 Exhibit B - Chart of Oregon's Recoverable Losses, #4 Exhibit C - Chart of KBC's Recoverable Losses, #5 Exhibit D - Teva LP Order)(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to more accurately reflect document filed and to indicate deficient status on 9/12/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to remove deficient status and to edit docket text on 9/18/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate CaseMOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Amalgamated Bank. (aty,Lemmon, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Burge, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2017) (YocumSld, M). (Main Document 45 replaced on 9/12/2017) (YocumSld, M). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel, #24 MOTION to Consolidate CaseMOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel and Memorandum in Further Support of the Motion of KBC Asset Management NV for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by K B C Asset Management N V. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James P. Roy, #2 Exhibit A - Amalgamated Bank LIFO Loss Chart)(aty,Roy, James) Modified to indicate certificate of service filed as document #48 on 9/12/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 42 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi regarding #41 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. (aty,Houck, Tracy) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #41 MOTION to Withdraw. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice, styled as "Notice of Withdrawal" by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi. (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 8/31/2017. (ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate proposed order filed as document #42 on 8/31/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CenturyLink Inc. (aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/28/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 38 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Notice of Consent to Motion of Consolidation filed by City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity regarding #26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel . (aty,Burge, Jason) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 37 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order (Motion to Withdraw Motion) filed by Sona Andresian regarding #35 MOTION to Withdraw . (aty,Pendley, Patrick) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Motions Transferred regarding #35 MOTION to Withdraw. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 36 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent to Motion for Consolidation filed by K B C Asset Management N V regarding #25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case . (aty,Roy, James) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 8/25/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel , styled as NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Sona Andresian (aty,Pendley, Patrick) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 8/25/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 34 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent filed by State of Oregon regarding #28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel . (aty,Sartor, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks. Judge Robert G James no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Whidden, C) Modified on 8/24/2017 to modify docket text (Whidden, C). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE by Amalgamated Bank of Consent to Motion for Consolidation re #29 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Case MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel (aty,Lemmon, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew Allen Lemmon on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, Patrick W Pendley on behalf of Sona Andresian; Tracy W Houck on behalf of CenturyLink Investor Group; Jason W Burge on behalf of City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity; James Parkerson Roy on behalf of K B C Asset Management N V; Fred W Sartor, Jr on behalf of State of Oregon regarding #21 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; #24 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice; #25 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff; #26 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel; #28 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel; #29 DEFICIENT? MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion (i.e. Motion to Consolidate). Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. (crt,Williams, L) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I hereby disqualify myself from the handling of the above-captioned matter. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this matter is referred to Chief Judge Dee Drell for reassignment to another judge in accordance with the Courts Standing Order 1.62. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Consolidate by Amalgamated Bank, . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit / Declaration of Andrew Lemmon, #3 Exhibit A - News Wire, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume, #7 Proposed order)(Attorney Andrew Allen Lemmon added to party Amalgamated Bank(pty:mov))(aty,Lemmon, Andrew) Modified on 8/23/2017 to add motion event, and to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/24/2017. See document #32 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Appointment of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation by State of Oregon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of F Williams Sartor Jr, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed order)(Attorney Fred W Sartor, Jr added to party State of Oregon (pty:mov))(aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified on 8/23/2017 to add motion events for multiple relief requested and to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/24/2017. See document #34 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K B C Asset Management N V identifying Corporate Parent K B C Group N V. (aty,Roy, James) Modified to edit docket text on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-1033, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit of Jason W. Burge, #4 Exhibit A - Certifications, #5 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #6 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #7 Exhibit D - Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit F - Kirby McInerney Firm Resume, #10 Exhibit G - Fishman Haygood Firm Resume)(Attorney Jason W Burge added to party Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit(pty:mov), Attorney Jason W Burge added to party Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity(pty:mov))(aty,Burge, Jason) Modified on 8/23/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events, and to reflect submission as Deficient - consent language removed as not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel on 8/23/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/25/2017. See document #38 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by K B C Asset Management N V. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Declaration of James P. Roy, #3 Exhibit A - KBC's sworn Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Chart of KBC's Estimated Losses, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of pendency of class action, #6 Exhibit D - Motley Rice's firm resume, #7 Exhibit E - KBC's Declarations of Assignment, #8 Proposed order)(Attorney James Parkerson Roy added to party KBC Asset Management NV(pty:pla))(aty,Roy, James) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events (Williams, L). Added MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified on 8/23/2017 to reflect submission as Deficient (Williams, L). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/25/2017. See document #36 for consent statement. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 24 (WITHDRAWN) DEFICIENT? MOTION to Consolidate Case, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed order)(aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text, modify and add motion events - remove consent language not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Counsel of Choice on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified on 8/23/2017 to reflect submission as Deficient(Williams, L). Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 9/6/2017. (ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy W Houck on behalf of Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi (Attorney Tracy W Houck added to party CenturyLink Investor Group(pty:mov)) (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 22 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy W Houck on behalf of Mark D Alger, Allen Feldman, Art Kleppen, Essex Lacy, Tae Yi (Attorney Tracy W Houck added to party Benjamin Craig(pty:pla)) (aty,Houck, Tracy) Modified to indicate document electronically filed in error and to remove counsel Tracy W Houck as attorney for plaintiff Benjamin Craig on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to correct filers on 8/23/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 21 (WITHDRAWN) DEFICIENT MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 17-cv-01033, 17-cv-04695, MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Sona Andresian. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory M. Edleston, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Attorney Patrick W Pendley added to party Sona Andresian(pty:pla))(aty,Pendley, Patrick) Modified on 8/22/2017 to edit text and modify and add motion event(s), and to remove consent language not included within actual pleading (Williams, L). Added MOTION for Approval of Choice of Counsel on 8/22/2017 (Williams, L). Modified to indicate document withdrawn on 8/28/2017 (ThomasSld, T). [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lyle Roberts for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/21/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Wade Creekbaum for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/17/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of George Edward Anhang for CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr and Glen F Post, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/16/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice sent to Thomas M Hayes, III on behalf of CenturyLink Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/29/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Brandon W Creekbaum to Enroll as Counsel by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for George Anhang to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3438421) by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Lyle Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3438409) by CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of good standing, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Hayes, III on behalf of CenturyLink Inc, R Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F Post, III (Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party CenturyLink Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party R Stewart Ewing, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M Hayes, III added to party Glen F Post, III(pty:dft)) (aty,Hayes, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER: Considering the transfer to this Court of the above-captioned action on August 9, 2017, formerly Case No. 1:17-cv-4740, United States District Court, Southern District of New York, IT IS ORDERED that within twenty (20) days any attorney appearing as counsel of record in this action who is not presently admitted to practice before the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana exercise one of the following options: (1) File an Application to Practice in this Court; (2) File a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.6; or (3) Secure substitute counsel admitted to practice in this court for the party presently being represented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/11/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/11/2017. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 10 PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 9, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 9 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-04740. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 8, 2017 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the Monroe Division of the United States District Court - District of Western District of Louisiana (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.][Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO THE MONROE DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA: This Action could have been brought in the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division, and all of the parties consent to this Action proceeding in such District; and this action is transferred to the Monroe Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is requested to transfer the above-captioned Action and close it on the books of this Court. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2017) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
July 24, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Adam M. Apton, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 17-cv-4695. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glen F. Post, III. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R. Stewart Ewing, Jr.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CenturyLink, Inc.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Adam M. Apton, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet attached to Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:22;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:78;. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 23, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Benjamin Craig. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (rch) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Glen F. Post, III, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CenturyLink, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Apton, Adam) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CenturyLink, Inc., R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., Glen F. Post, III. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13817431)Document filed by Benjamin Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Apton, Adam)[Transferred from New York Southern on 8/9/2017.] [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 2/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig et al v. CenturyLink, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Craig
Represented By: Nicholas I Porritt
Represented By: Adam M Apton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarendra Thummeti
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Alberto Vildosola
Represented By: Michael D. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Michael M Mathai
Represented By: Gerald H Silk
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Keil M Mueller
Represented By: John Christopher Browne
Represented By: Michael D. Blatchley
Represented By: Fred W Sartor, Jr
Represented By: Richard A Lockridge
Represented By: Keith Scott Dubanevich
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Gregg Martin Fishbein
Represented By: George M Snellings, IV
Represented By: Timothy Shawn DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Detroit Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Bank
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don J. Scott
Represented By: Corey D Holzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund - Detroit & Vicinity
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Ravi Kishan Sangisetty
Represented By: Carin L Marcussen
Represented By: Stuart W Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K B C Asset Management N V
Represented By: Gregg S. Levin
Represented By: William Henry Narwold
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: James M Hughes
Represented By: John Parkerson Roy
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Bores
Represented By: Andrew P Arnold
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Represented By: Karl L Cambronne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen F. Post, III
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stewart Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Cole
Represented By: Brandon Wade Creekbaum
Represented By: George Edward Anhang
Represented By: Lyle Roberts
Represented By: Thomas M Hayes, III
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Clay Bailey
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Puckett
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Marketing Group U S A Inc
Represented By: Ravi Kishan Sangisetty
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean J. Douglas
Represented By: Patrick E Gibbs
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Sarah M. Lightdale
Represented By: Lauren G Lee
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark D Alger
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sona Andresian
Represented By: Patrick W Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Art Kleppen
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Feldman
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Essex Lacy
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tae Yi
Represented By: Tracy W Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Don J Scott
Represented By: Matthew E Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?