Fredin v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: |
Brock Fredin |
Defendant: |
Grace Elizabeth Miller and Catherine Marie Schaefer |
Case Number: |
0:2018cv00466 |
Filed: |
February 16, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Minnesota |
Office: |
DMN Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Hildy Bowbeer |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Richard Nelson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 6, 2022 |
Filing
315
ORDER denying 306 Motion to Reconsider re 304 Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Brock Fredin. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 9/6/2022. (SMD)
|
June 2, 2022 |
Filing
304
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 298 Motion for Sanctions. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/2/2022. (SMD)
|
January 8, 2021 |
Filing
275
ORDER denying 238 Motion to Vacate Order; granting in part and deferring in part 246 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 259 Motion to Stay. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/8/2021.
|
December 18, 2020 |
Filing
265
ORDER denying 252 Motion to Disqualify District Judge. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/18/2020.
|
December 4, 2020 |
Filing
237
ORDER in Response to 222 Letter and 224 Corrected Letter Request to File Motion to Reconsider and to Stay Injunction. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/4/2020.
|
November 30, 2020 |
Filing
228
ORDER denying 207 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/30/2020. (SMD)
|
November 23, 2020 |
Filing
221
ORDER granting 186 Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant; granting 189 Defendants' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; denying 202 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/23/2020.
|
November 13, 2020 |
Filing
206
ORDER granting 171 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 193 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/13/2020.
|
February 21, 2019 |
Filing
49
ORDER adopting 38 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint that complies fully with this Order within fourteen days.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/21/2019. (SMD)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
44
AMENDED ORDER adopting 38 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. See Order for details. Plaintiff is orde red to file an amended complaint that complies fully with this Order within fourteen days. The Order at Docket No. 41 is hereby VACATED; and The Clerk of Court is directed to VACATE the Judgment entered in this matter on December 12, 2018. [Doc. No. 42]. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/22/2019. (SMD)
|
December 11, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER on Report and Recommendation; adopting 38 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. See Order for details. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint that complies fully with this Order within fourteen days. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/11/2018. (SMD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?