Kelley v. Boosalis
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Kelley
Defendant: Gus Boosalis
Case Number: 0:2018cv00868
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER in Response to 237 Defendant's Letter to District Judge, 236 Plaintiff's Letter to District Judge, canceling October 21, 2020 status conference. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/15/2020. (MJC)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application for Fees and Costs 213 in relation to prior Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 212 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/1/2019. (JTJ)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 201 Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Responses (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/9/2019. (JTJ)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Register Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/11/2019. (SMD)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS granting 104 Motion for Prejudgment Interest; denying 107 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 107 Motion for New Trial. Plaintiff shall promptly file with this Court its calculation of the appropriate award of prejudgment interest pursuant to this Order so that the Court can enter final judgment in this matter. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/7/2018. (SMD)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER in Response to Defendant's Objection to Jury Instruction. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/3/2018. (MJC)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER deferring ruling on 41 Defendant's Motion in Limine re: Reasonably Equivalent Value; deferring ruling on 43 Defendant's Motion in Limine re: Insolvency; denying 45 Defendant's Motion in Limine re: Criminal Prosecutions; def erring ruling on 47 Defendant's Motion in Limine re: Transfer-by-Transfer Analysis of Notes; deferring ruling on 49 Defendant's Motion in Limine re: Interest Rates; granting in part and deferring ruling in part on 58 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine re: Relevance; granting 63 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine re: Investigative Memoranda. (Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/19/2018. (MJC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Boosalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Kelley
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: J David Jackson
Represented By: Lucas J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Boosalis
Represented By: Daniel J. Frisk
Represented By: Don R. Grande
Represented By: Mark A. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?