Plymouth County Retirement System v. Patterson Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Defendant: Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., Scott P. Anderson, James W Wiltz and R. Stephen Armstrong
Petitioner: Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Central Laborers Pension Plan, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System and Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System
Case Number: 0:2018cv00871
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Franklin L Noel
2 Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau dated July 25, 2019 #112 with the modification set forth in this Order. 2. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint #89 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in the Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/10/2019. (GRR)
August 22, 2019 Filing 114 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #113 Report and Recommendation filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olts, Lucas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 113 OBJECTION TO #112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Aaron)
July 25, 2019 Filing 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending granting in part and denying in part #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, James W Wiltz, R. Stephen Armstrong, Patterson Companies, Inc., Ann B. Gugino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/25/2019. (GFK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 111 RESPONSE re #110 Notice (Other), filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz.(Thomas, Aaron)
June 14, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Plymouth County Retirement System re #100 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A_In re Signet Jewelers Limited Securities Litigation, #2 Exhibit(s) B_Utesch v Lannett Company Inc)(Olts, Lucas) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (MMG).
May 24, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #107 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (JGK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #107 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Thomas, Aaron)
May 20, 2019 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 05/13/2019 before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (43 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (LAS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #103 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Olts, Lucas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #103 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Lockner, Anne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2019 re #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, James W Wiltz, R. Stephen Armstrong, Patterson Companies, Inc., Ann B. Gugino. Motion taken under advisement, written R&R to be issued. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (GFK)
May 3, 2019 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #101 Reply, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Thomas, Aaron)
May 3, 2019 Filing 101 REPLY re #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Aaron)
March 19, 2019 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olts, Lucas)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #98 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Plaintiffs may exceed the 12,000 word limit by an additional 3,000 words in their responsive memorandum of law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/12/2019. (GFK)
March 11, 2019 Filing 98 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Schlesier, Heather) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (MMG).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 has been RESCHEDULED to 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/23/2019. (MME)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Motion Hearing on Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #89 ] set for 3/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/23/2019. (MME)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OF REFERRAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) that United States Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau is designated to review the Motion to Dismiss #89 . Magistrate Judge Rau is to submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations of law on this motion which may be filed in this matter. An order will be issued ruling on this motion after the objection period is complete. Plaintiff shall contact Magistrate Judge Rau's Chambers to schedule a hearing for this motion. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/22/2019. (GRR)
January 18, 2019 Filing 94 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz.(Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Filing 93 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #89 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz.(Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT of Aaron G. Thomas in SUPPORT OF #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support re #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT : Date and time to be determined. (Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss/General THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Scott P. Anderson, R. Stephen Armstrong, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., James W Wiltz. (Thomas, Aaron)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED ORDER #87 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this request is GRANTED. Defendants may have an additional 3,000 word extension for their opening memorandum and reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/18/2019. (GRR)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. It is ordered that the request for a word limit extension 80 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have an additional 3,000 word extension for their opening memorandum and reply memorandum.. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (GRR)
January 11, 2019 Filing 86 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Thomas, Aaron)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heather Schlesier for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/19/2018. (JGK)
December 18, 2018 Filing 84 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #74 Amended Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
December 18, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heather Schlesier. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6555978 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
November 27, 2018 Filing 82 Summons Issued as to R. Stephen Armstrong, James W Wiltz. (kt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 81 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for James W. Wiltz Central Laborers Pension Plan, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 80 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for R. Stephen Armstrong Central Laborers Pension Plan, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dianne M Anderson for Plymouth County Retirement System.; granting #77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert David Klausner for Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers.; granting #78 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen H Cypen for Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/21/2018. (JGK)
November 20, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen H. Cypen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6507983 filed by Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers. (Lockner, Anne)
November 20, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert D. Klausner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6507889 filed by Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers. (Lockner, Anne)
November 20, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dianne Marie Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6507828 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
November 14, 2018 Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Dianne Anderson; Robert D. Klausner as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc., R Stephen Armstrong, James W Wiltz. filed by Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Central Laborers Pension Plan. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Singer, Steven)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyla Grant for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/24/2018. (JGK)
September 13, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyla Grant. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6368046 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER on #69 Stipulation. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/11/2018. (MME)
September 7, 2018 Filing 70 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #69 Stipulation,,. (Singer, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION Regarding the Filing of Lead Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. Jointly Signed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Plymouth County Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Central Laborers Pension Plan, Patterson Companies, Inc.,, Scott P. Anderson, and Ann B. Gugino. (Singer, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #65 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lucas F. Olts for Plymouth County Retirement System.; granting #66 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexi Pfeffer-Gillett for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/7/2018. (JGK)
September 7, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr on behalf of Plymouth County Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
September 6, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexi Pfeffer-Gillett. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6353116 filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
September 6, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucas F. Olts. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6353072 filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ORDER: In light of the parties' Stipulation [Doc. No. #58 ], and the Court's corresponding Order [Doc. No. #63 ], #31 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #26 Motion Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel are DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/30/2018. (EMA)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER on #58 Stipulation: See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/30/2018. (MME)
August 23, 2018 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 08/06/2018 before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (25 pages). Transcriber: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2018. (LAS) Modified text on 9/4/2018 (JGK).
August 23, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
August 21, 2018 Filing 60 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Danielle S. Myers, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Dennis J. Herman, Brant D. Penney as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
August 20, 2018 Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #58 Stipulation,. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
August 20, 2018 Filing 58 STIPULATION Regarding Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. Jointly Signed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, Plymouth County Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Fire Fighters and Police Officers, and Central LaborersPension Plan. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A Rosenfeld for Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/20/2018. (JDF)
August 15, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David A. Rosenfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6308126 filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
August 6, 2018 Filing 55 REQUEST for a 30-day TRANSCRIPT of a Digital Audio Recording. (Lockner, Anne)
August 6, 2018 Filing 54 REQUEST for a 30-day TRANSCRIPT of a Digital Audio Recording. (McCormick, Tricia)
August 6, 2018 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2018 re #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System, #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Court Reporter N/A) (EMA)
June 29, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G Thomas on behalf of Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Thomas, Aaron)
June 29, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Frank A. Taylor and Julie H. Firestone (Thomas, Aaron)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tricia L. McCormick for Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/18/2018. (JGK)
June 15, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tricia L. McCormick. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6173012 filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 6, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF ERRATA by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System re #28 Declaration in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Singer, Steven) Modified on 6/8/2018 (kt).
June 5, 2018 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr. in Opposition to #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel , #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Yahoo! Finance Historical Pricing Data)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 5, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel , #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
June 5, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and in Further Support of the Institutional Investors' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Singer, Steven)
June 4, 2018 Filing 44 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel from June P. Hoidal. (Hoidal, June)
May 30, 2018 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
May 30, 2018 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System.(Singer, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System.(Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 40 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System.(Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 39 Declaration of June P. Hoidal in Support of #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, University of Puerto Rico Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 36 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #31 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
May 29, 2018 Filing 35 Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr. in Support of #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Certification, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
May 29, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
May 29, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Puerto Rico Retirement Systems' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by University of Puerto Rico Retirement System, Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Hoidal, June)
May 29, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re #31 MOTION: Motion hearing set for 8/6/18 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3A, St. Paul, before Magistrate Judge Steven E. rau. (Blanchfield, Garrett) Modified on 5/30/2018 (kt).
May 29, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
May 29, 2018 Filing 30 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System.(Singer, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Singer, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 28 Declaration of Steven B. Singer in Support of #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Singer, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Singer, Steven)
May 29, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Central Laborers Pension Plan, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR: REFILE SEPARATELY Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Singer, Steven) Modified on 5/30/2018 (kt).
May 29, 2018 Filing 25 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED. MOTION Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel filed by Plymouth County Retirement System, Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers, Central Laborers Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Singer, Steven) Modified on 5/30/2018 (kt).
May 7, 2018 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-871 MJD/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
April 23, 2018 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Patterson Companies, Inc. (Thomas, Aaron) Modified text on 4/23/2018 (kt).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on #20 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/19/2018. (TMA)
April 16, 2018 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation. (Thomas, Aaron)
April 16, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Staying Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Thomas, Aaron)
April 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Weber on behalf of Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Weber, Jordan)
April 12, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank A Taylor on behalf of Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Taylor, Frank)
April 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie H Firestone on behalf of Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Firestone, Julie)
April 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G Thomas on behalf of Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Thomas, Aaron)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven Bennett Singer for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/11/2018. (JGK)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester R Hooker for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/11/2018. (JGK)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maya S. Saxena for Plymouth County Retirement System; and granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph E. White, III, for Plymouth County Retirement System. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/6/2018. (JLW)
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph E. White, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6048983 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
April 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven B. Singer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6048977 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
April 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maya Saxena. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6048968 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
April 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lester R. Hooker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6048929 filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
April 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plymouth County Retirement System. Ann B. Gugino served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Lockner, Anne)
April 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plymouth County Retirement System. Scott P. Anderson served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Lockner, Anne)
April 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plymouth County Retirement System. Patterson Companies, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Lockner, Anne)
March 28, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Steven B. Singer, Maya Saxena, Joseph E. White, III, Lester R. Hooker as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (ACH)
March 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Patterson Companies, Inc. (ACH)
March 28, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th Securities & Antitrust list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 18-cv-871 MJD/FLN. (ACH)
March 28, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Plymouth County Retirement System. (Lockner, Anne)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6034090) filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lockner, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plymouth County Retirement System v. Patterson Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann B. Gugino
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Julie H Firestone
Represented By: Frank A Taylor
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Julie H Firestone
Represented By: Frank A Taylor
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott P. Anderson
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Julie H Firestone
Represented By: Frank A Taylor
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Wiltz
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stephen Armstrong
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Steven Bennett Singer
Represented By: Lester R Hooker
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Represented By: Maya Susan Saxena
Represented By: Heather Schlesier
Represented By: Joseph E White, III
Represented By: Dianne M Anderson
Represented By: Brant D Penney
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Alexi Pfeffer-Gillett
Represented By: Kyla Grant
Represented By: Kyla Janine Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employees Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
Represented By: June Pineda Hoidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pembroke Pines Pension Fund for Firefighters and Police Officers
Represented By: Steven Bennett Singer
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Stephen H Cypen
Represented By: Robert David Klausner
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Central Laborers Pension Plan
Represented By: Steven Bennett Singer
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: University of Puerto Rico Retirement System
Represented By: June Pineda Hoidal
Represented By: Carolyn G Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gwinnett County Public Employees Retirement System
Represented By: David A Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven Bennett Singer
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Tricia L. McCormick
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?