Fath et al v. Honda North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista and Christopher Hamilton
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv01549
Filed: June 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: St. Louis
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. of Class Action Fairness Act Compliance with attached Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Representative Copy, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7)(Andolina, Michael) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (MMP).
August 15, 2019 Filing 75 Declaration of Matthew D. Schelkopf in Support of #72 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release)(Schelkopf, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schelkopf, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #72 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Schelkopf, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton. (Schelkopf, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand against American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. filed by Troy Fath, Higinio Bautista, Christopher Hamilton. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Schelkopf, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER on #68 Stipulation. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/19/2019. (JLB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #68 Stipulation. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 19, 2019 Filing 68 STIPULATION re #44 Amended Complaint, by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista, and Christopher Hamilton. (Messmore, Isaac)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER on #65 Stipulation. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/21/2019. (JLB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE. (Messmore, Isaac)
June 19, 2019 Filing 65 STIPULATION re #44 Amended Complaint, Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly signed by plaintiffs. (Messmore, Isaac) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (MMG).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER on #62 Stipulation,. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. answer due 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/6/2019. (VLM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint #62 Stipulation,. (Messmore, Isaac)
May 6, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION re #44 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista, Christopher Hamilton, and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on #59 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/5/2019. (VLM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 60 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #59 Stipulation,. (Messmore, Isaac)
April 5, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION re #44 Amended Complaint, Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista, Christopher Hamilton, and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
March 22, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Andrew J. Chinsky (Messmore, Isaac)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Honda Motor Co., Inc. answer due 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/5/2019. (VLM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #55 Substituted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint, filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Messmore, Isaac)
March 1, 2019 Filing 55 Substituted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint, filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER on #52 Stipulation. Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by 3/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/6/2019. (VLM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #52 Stipulation,. (Messmore, Isaac)
February 4, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION re #44 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Higinio Bautista, Vincent Puma, and Christopher Hamilton. (Messmore, Isaac)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on #49 Stipulation is GRANTED, Defendant has until 2/4/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Docket No. 44. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/21/2018. (VLM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #49 Stipulation,. (Messmore, Isaac)
December 20, 2018 Filing 49 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Consolidated Class Action Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista, and Christopher Hamilton. (Messmore, Isaac)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason S. Rathod for Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton and for Vincent Puma.; granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Migliaccio for Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton and for Vincent Puma. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/12/2018. (JGK)
December 11, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicolas A. Migliaccio. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6543367 filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton, Vincent Puma. (Hedlund, Daniel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason S. Rathod. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6543317 filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Christopher Hamilton, Vincent Puma. (Hedlund, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (KNK)
November 30, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Consolidated Class Action Complaint against American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. filed by Troy Fath, Higinio Bautista, Vincent Puma, Christopher Hamilton. Filer requests summons issued. (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 43 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nicholas Migliaccio and Jason Rathod as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON CASE CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/21/2018. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01549-NEB-LIB, 0:18-cv-02933-NEB-LIB(kt)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/28/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 7/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/20/2018. (VLM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/9/2018. (VLM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #37 Stipulation. (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Matthew D. Schelkopf re #37 Stipulation by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Vincent Puma . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Hedlund, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION Regarding Case Consolidation, Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, and Case Schedule by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Vincent Puma. Jointly Signed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 36 STATEMENT OF CASE as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
November 5, 2018 Filing 35 AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, and Higinio Bautista.(Messmore, Isaac) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (MMP).
October 30, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J Rissman on behalf of Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Vincent Puma. (Rissman, Joshua)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 18-cv-2933 (DSD/LIB) be assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois, nunc pro tunc, by use of a card from the appropriate deck in the automated case assignment system. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/16/2018 and Judge David S. Doty on 10/17/18. (AKL)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/17/2018. (VLM)
October 10, 2018 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #30 Stipulation. (Messmore, Isaac)
October 10, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Protective Order by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, Higinio Bautista, and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(VLM)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-1549 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
September 5, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, and Higinio Bautista.(Messmore, Isaac)
August 23, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Honda Motor Co., Ltd. is a corporate parent of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
August 23, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on #22 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/20/2018. (VLM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Stipulation. (Messmore, Isaac)
August 17, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, and Higinio Bautista. (Messmore, Isaac)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #19 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/14/2018. (TJB)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation,. (Messmore, Isaac)
August 13, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Honda North America, Inc. and Honda Motor Co., Ltd. and to Strike Request for Punitive Damages by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, and Higinio Bautista. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Andolina for American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and for Honda North America, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/10/2018. (JGK)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Chinsky for American Honda Motor Co., Inc., and for Honda North America, Inc.; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael L. Mallow for American Honda Motor Co., Inc., and for Honda North America, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/9/2018. (JGK)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/6/2018. (VLM)
July 6, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 6, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Troy Fath, Vincent Puma, and Higinio Bautista. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 6, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael C. Andolina. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6212687 filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 6, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Mallow. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6212678 filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 6, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J. Chinsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6212657 filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Fath, Higinio Bautista, Vincent Puma. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018; Honda Motor Company, Ltd. served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018; Honda North America, Inc. served on 6/15/2018, answer due 7/6/2018. (Hedlund, Daniel)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew R Mendelsohn for Higinio Bautista,Troy Fath and for Vincent Puma. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/20/2018. (JGK)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf for Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, and Vincent Puma. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/20/2018. (JLW)
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6178503 filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Vincent Puma. (Hedlund, Daniel)
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew R. Mendelsohn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6178459 filed by Higinio Bautista, Troy Fath, Vincent Puma. (Hedlund, Daniel)
June 6, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
June 5, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT A to Complaint re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel) Modified text on 6/7/2018 (kt).
June 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Honda North America, Inc. (lmb)
June 5, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-1549 (WMW/LIB). (lmb)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Matthew D. Schelkopf, Joseph G. Sauder, Joseph B. Kenney, Matthew R. Mendelsohn, David A. Mazie as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Honda North America, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6150400) filed by Troy Fath, Higinio Bautista, Vincent Puma. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hedlund, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fath et al v. Honda North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Fath
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Joshua J Rissman
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Represented By: Matthew R Mendelsohn
Represented By: Catherine Sung-Yun K Smith
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Puma
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Joshua J Rissman
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Represented By: Matthew R Mendelsohn
Represented By: Catherine Sung-Yun K Smith
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Higinio Bautista
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Joshua J Rissman
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Represented By: Matthew R Mendelsohn
Represented By: Catherine Sung-Yun K Smith
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hamilton
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Chinsky
Represented By: Michael Andolina
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Isaac W Messmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Chinsky
Represented By: Michael Andolina
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Isaac W Messmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?