Hoekman et al v. Education Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Linda Hoekman and Deborah York
Defendant: Education Minnesota, Anoka Hennepin Education Minnesota, National Education Association, American Federation of Teachers, Anoka Hennepin School District, Mark Dayton, Governor, Lori Swanson, Attorney General and Todd L Doncavage
Case Number: 0:2018cv01686
Filed: June 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Anoka
Presiding Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying 195 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/25/2021. (avt)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 145 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 160 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/12/2021. (avt)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying (91) Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part (101) Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony in case 0:18-cv-01686-SRN-ECW (Hoekman); denying (58) Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part (72) Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony in case 0:18-cv-02384-SRN-ECW (Piekarski) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/27/2020. (JTJ) Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01686-SRN-ECW, 0:18-cv-02384-SRN-ECW
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoekman et al v. Education Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hoekman
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas P Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah York
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas P Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Minnesota
Represented By: David Aron
Represented By: Cedrick Frazier
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Margaret A Luger-Nikolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka Hennepin Education Minnesota
Represented By: David Aron
Represented By: Cedrick Frazier
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Margaret A Luger-Nikolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Education Association
Represented By: David Aron
Represented By: Cedrick Frazier
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Margaret A Luger-Nikolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: David Aron
Represented By: Cedrick Frazier
Represented By: Scott A Kronland
Represented By: Margaret A Luger-Nikolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka Hennepin School District
Represented By: John M Baker
Represented By: Jeanette M. Bazis
Represented By: Paul H Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dayton, Governor
Represented By: Jacob D Campion
Represented By: Alan I Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Swanson, Attorney General
Represented By: Jacob D Campion
Represented By: Alan I Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd L Doncavage
Represented By: Jacob D Campion
Represented By: Alan I Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?