Boitnott v. Famous Dave's of America, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: Spirit SPE Portfolio CA C-Stores, LLC and Famous Dave's of America, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv01998
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2018. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 6/1/2019. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 11/1/2019. See order for further instructions and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/7/2018. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01786-SRN-SER, 0:18-cv-01998-SRN-SER(MME)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Scheduling Conference held on 9/4/2018. (MME)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Jerald Boitnott. Jointly signed by Defendants. (Michenfelder, Patrick) Modified text on 8/29/2018 (MMG).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-1998 (SRN/SER). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/24/2018. (lmb) Modified text on 7/24/2018 (lmb).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 8/28/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. See Order for further instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MME)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/17/2018. (CLB)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Chad A. Throndset as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th, Civil Rights Housing/Acc. ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-1998 (DSD/SER). (MMP)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Famous Dave's of America, Inc., Spirit SPE Portfolio CA C-Stores, LLC. (Sicoli, Amanda)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Famous Dave's of America, Inc., Spirit SPE Portfolio CA C-Stores, LLC. (Sicoli, Amanda)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-18-11280 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6231360) filed by Spirit SPE Portfolio CA C-Stores, LLC, Famous Dave's of America, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sicoli, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. Famous Dave's of America, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit SPE Portfolio CA C-Stores, LLC
Represented By: Brian A Dillon
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Famous Dave's of America, Inc.
Represented By: Brian A Dillon
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?