Doughman et al v. Midland Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mark Doughman and Richard Doughman
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer P.A., Midland Funding LLC, John Doe Process Server and Executive Process LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02054
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Roseau
0 Judge: Leo I Brisbois
1 Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Encore Capital Group, LP is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Midland Funding LLC. (Ponessa, Russell)
September 14, 2018 20 Midland Funding LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC. (Ponessa, Russell)
September 13, 2018 19 Joint and Separate ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Executive Process LLC, Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-E) (Morris, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 18 Summons Issued as to Executive Process LLC dba EZ Messenger, Messerli & Kramer P.A., Midland Funding LLC. (KNK)
August 24, 2018 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Messerli & Kramer P.A., Midland Funding LLC, Executive Process LLC dba EZ Messenger. filed by Richard Doughman, Mark Doughman. Filer requests summons issued. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 24, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/22/2018. (VLM)
August 22, 2018 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation,. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Amend by Mark Doughman, Richard Doughman. Jointly Signed by Midland Funding LLC and Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint)(Lyons, Thomas)
August 17, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/17/2018. (VLM)
August 16, 2018 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Morris, Christopher)
August 16, 2018 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. Jointly Signed by Richard Doughman, Mark Doughman, and Midland Funding LLC. (Morris, Christopher)
August 7, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/7/2018. (VLM)
August 7, 2018 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Ponessa, Russell)
August 7, 2018 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Midland Funding LLC. Jointly Signed by Richard Doughman and Mark Doughman. (Ponessa, Russell)
August 1, 2018 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney By Robert M. Wallner, Esq. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 1, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Doughman, Mark Doughman. Messerli & Kramer P.A. served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 26, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Doughman, Mark Doughman. Midland Funding LLC served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 19, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe Process Server, Messerli & Kramer P.A., Midland Funding LLC. (MMP)
July 19, 2018 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 6th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2054 (JNE/LIB). (MMP)
July 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against John Doe Process Server, Messerli & Kramer P.A., Midland Funding LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6239688) filed by Richard Doughman, Mark Doughman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 7/19/2018 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doughman et al v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Doughman
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Represented By: Robert M Wallner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Doughman
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Represented By: Robert M Wallner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer P.A.
Represented By: Christopher R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Russell S Ponessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Process Server
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Process LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?