Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc. et al v. AutoMedx, LLC
Petitioner: Zoll Medical Corporation, Mr. Jon Rennert, Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mr. Jim Homuth, Mr. Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert and Mike Black
Respondent: AutoMedx, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02060
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving #14 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Petitioners Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award re #17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award . Replies due by 10/8/2018. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/4/2018. (HAZ)
August 31, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation.(Anderson, Clifford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation.(Anderson, Clifford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith in Support of #17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation.(Anderson, Clifford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Anderson, Clifford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award : Date and time to be determined. (Anderson, Clifford)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation. (Anderson, Clifford)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael W. Stockman as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation,. (Anderson, Clifford)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION Setting Briefing Schedule for Petitioners' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation. Jointly Signed by AutoMedx, LLC. (Anderson, Clifford)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Roshan N Rajkumar on behalf of AutoMedx, LLC. (Rajkumar, Roshan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jim Homuth, Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, ZOLL Medical Corporation, Jon Rennert. AutoMedx, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. ZOLL Medical Corporation is a corporate parent of Petitioner Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc. (Anderson, Clifford) Modified text on 7/23/2018 (MMP).
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Asahi Kasei US Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Petitioner ZOLL Medical Corporation. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. ZOLL Medical Corporation is a corporate parent of Petitioner Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc.. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford S Anderson on behalf of Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Jim Homuth, Jon Rennert, ZOLL Medical Corporation. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Benjamin P. Smith; Sharon R. Smith as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AutoMedx, LLC. (AKL)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18cv2060 JRT/TNL. (AKL)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #3 , #2 Petition Sealed Exhibits A & B . (Anderson, Clifford)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), by All Petitioners. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT A re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), by All Petitioners. (Anderson, Clifford)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITIONTO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against AutoMedx, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6241523) filed by Jim Homuth, Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Mike Black, Zoll Medical Corporation, Jon Rennert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc. et al v. AutoMedx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zoll Medical Corporation
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Jon Rennert
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Jim Homuth
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Mike Black
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jim Homuth
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jon Rennert
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Black
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AutoMedx, LLC
Represented By: Roshan N Rajkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?