JP Ventures, LLC v. E Cig Zone Inc. et al

Plaintiff: JP Ventures, LLC
Defendant: E Cig Zone Inc. and Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02212
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ian G. McFarland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC. (Zeuli, Anthony)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant E Cig Zone Inc.. (Zeuli, Anthony)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JP Ventures, LLC. filed by Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC, E Cig Zone Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Zeuli, Anthony)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. E Cig Zone Inc. answer due 9/21/2018; Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC answer due 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/21/2018. (HAM)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by JP Ventures, LLC.(Privratsky, Mark)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark)
August 3, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP Ventures, LLC. E Cig Zone Inc. served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Privratsky, Mark)
August 3, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP Ventures, LLC. Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Privratsky, Mark)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anthony Kaye for JP Ventures, LLC.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan Robert Marigoni for JP Ventures, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/3/2018. (JGK)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC on 8/1/18, filed by JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark) Modified on 8/3/2018 (AKL).
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on E Cig Zone Inc. on 8/1/18, filed by JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark) Modified on 8/3/2018 (AKL).
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan Marigoni. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6268450 filed by JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony C. Kaye. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6268314 filed by JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Anthony C. Kaye, Nathan R. Marigoni as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) Modified text on 8/7/2018 (lmb).
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to E Cig Zone Inc., Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC. (kt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2212 SRN/TNL. (kt)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff JP Ventures, LLC. (Privratsky, Mark)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6262118) filed by JP Ventures, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Privratsky, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Ventures, LLC v. E Cig Zone Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Cig Zone Inc.
Represented By: Anthony R Zeuli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor 5 Wholesale LLC
Represented By: Anthony R Zeuli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Mark R Privratsky
Represented By: Anthony Kaye
Represented By: Nathan Robert Marigoni
Represented By: Jonathon A Talcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?